Newman v. Oregon Department of Corrections et al

Plaintiff: Rico Carlos Newman
Defendant: Mr. Geeir, Colette S. Peters, Dr. Peng, B. Greesbael, Aimee Hughes, Brad Cain, T.L.C. Committee Members, Vishami Brady, Paula Myers, Joe Bugher, Nurse Gillmore-Angels, Joe Defoe, Aja Villareal, Lisa Koltes, Jackie Wick, Jane/John Doe #3, Christopher DiGiulio, Sheila Mecham, Kandy Shepard, Garth Gulick, Nicole Carr, Debi Nicholson, Oregon Department of Corrections, Monica Landerverde, Dave Brown, John Doe #1, Rod McNitt and Jane/John Doe #2
Case Number: 2:2019cv01081
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael J McShane
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Granting Motion for Extension of Time #9 . Waiver of Service is due by 9/25/2019. Denying Motion for a Preliminary Injunction #11 ); Denying Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order #11 . Plaintiff fails to establish the likelihood of irreparable harm or success on the merits of his claim. Plaintiff alleges that proposed surgery will cause irreparable harm; plaintiff can decline to consent to the surgery and the court will assess the merits of his claims in due course. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. **PRINT NEF ONLY**(Rico Newman, Prisoner ID: 12397798) (ps3)
August 27, 2019 Filing 11 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Titled, "Order to Show Cause for an Preliminary Injunction & Temporary Restraining Order." Filed by Rico Carlos Newman.**PRINT NEF ONLY**(Rico Newman, Prisoner ID: 12397798) (dsg)
August 26, 2019 Filing 10 Declaration of Andrew Hallman In Support of Motion to Extend Time to File Waiver. Filed by Oregon Department of Corrections. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Time #9 .)**PRINT ALL**(Rico Newman, Prisoner ID: 12397798) (Hallman, Andrew)
August 26, 2019 Filing 9 Motion for Extension of Time to file Waiver. Filed by Oregon Department of Corrections.**PRINT ALL**(Rico Newman, Prisoner ID: 12397798) (Hallman, Andrew)
July 25, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver of Service is due by 8/26/2019.**4 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Rico Newman, Prisoner ID: 12397798) (jw) (Notice and Complaint sent via e-mail to ODOJ and Andrew Hallman)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Plaintiff's Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis #1 is GRANTED, and plaintiff's Motion for Appointment of Counsel is DENIED #4 . IT IS ORDERED that the Oregon Department of Corrections shall collect from plaintiff's account the $350.00 filing fee and forward payments to the Clerk of the Court. Signed on 07/25/2019 by Judge Michael J. McShane. (mailed copy of order to ODOC) **3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Rico Newman, Prisoner ID: 12397798) (jw)
July 12, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Michael J. McShane. **3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Rico Newman, Prisoner ID: 12397798) (dsg)
July 12, 2019 Filing 5 Declaration of Rico Newman. Filed by Rico Carlos Newman. (Related document(s): Motion to Appoint Counsel #4 .)**PRINT NEF ONLY**(Rico Newman, Prisoner ID: 12397798) (dsg)
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Filed by Rico Carlos Newman.**PRINT NEF ONLY**(Rico Newman, Prisoner ID: 12397798) (dsg)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 Complaint. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. In forma pauperis pending. Filed by Rico Carlos Newman against Vishami Brady, Dave Brown, Joe Bugher, Brad Cain, Nicole Carr, Joe Defoe, Christopher DiGiulio, John Doe #1, Jane/John Doe #2, Jane/John Doe #3, Geeir, Gillmore-Angels, B. Greesbael, Garth Gulick, Aimee Hughes, Lisa Koltes, Monica Landerverde, Rod McNitt, Sheila Mecham, Paula Myers, Debi Nicholson, Oregon Department of Corrections, Peng, Colette S. Peters, Kandy Shepard, T.L.C. Committee Members, Aja Villareal, Jackie Wick (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet).**PRINT NEF ONLY**(Rico Newman, Prisoner ID: 12397798) (dsg)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 Declaration of Rico Newman. Filed by Rico Carlos Newman. (Related document(s): Application for leave to proceed ifp #1 .) (dsg) **PRINT NEF ONLY**(Rico Newman, Prisoner ID: 12397798)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Rico Carlos Newman. (dsg)**PRINT NEF ONLY**(Rico Newman, Prisoner ID: 12397798)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Newman v. Oregon Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Geeir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colette S. Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Peng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Greesbael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aimee Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T.L.C. Committee Members
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vishami Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paula Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Bugher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Gillmore-Angels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Defoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aja Villareal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Koltes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackie Wick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane/John Doe #3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher DiGiulio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheila Mecham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kandy Shepard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garth Gulick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicole Carr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debi Nicholson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oregon Department of Corrections
Represented By: Andrew D. Hallman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monica Landerverde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dave Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rod McNitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane/John Doe #2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rico Carlos Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?