Clark et al v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Rebecca D. Clark and Bryon O. Clark
Defendant: Vale Oregon Irrigation District and United States of America
Case Number: 2:2019cv01085
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Patricia Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued Electronically as to United States of America. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (rs)
August 2, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed Summons Return of Service (Santiago, Louis)
August 2, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Summons Return of Service (Santiago, Louis)
August 2, 2019 Filing 3 Amended Complaint . Filed by Bryon O. Clark, Rebecca D. Clark against All Defendants. (Santiago, Louis)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Patricia Sullivan and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 11/12/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 12/9/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 12/9/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia Sullivan. (rs)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5923357 Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Bryon O. Clark, Rebecca D. Clark against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (Santiago, Louis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clark et al v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vale Oregon Irrigation District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca D. Clark
Represented By: Louis A. Santiago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryon O. Clark
Represented By: Louis A. Santiago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?