Roof v. Bowser
Petitioner: Frank Roof
Respondent: Troy Bowser
Case Number: 2:2019cv01438
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Stacie F Beckerman
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2019 Filing 9 Notice of Attorney Substitution:Attorney Kristen E. Boyd is substituted as counsel of record in place of Attorney Lynn David Larsen Filed by Troy Bowser. (Boyd, Kristen)
October 28, 2019 Filing 8 Acceptance and Acknowledgment of Service of Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and Scheduling Order upon the State Attorney General on behalf of Troy Bowser. Filed by Troy Bowser. (Larsen, Lynn)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Habeas Corpus Scheduling Order Serving Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus 2254 #2 on respondent. Answer is due by 12/23/2019. Signed on 10/22/2019 by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (Attachments: #1 Acceptance and Acknowledgment of Service Form, #2 Petition) (joha)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This Court grants Petitioner's Motion for Appointment of Counsel (ECF No. #3 ). The Federal Public Defender, 101 S.W. Main Street, Suite 1700, Portland, Oregon 97204, is appointed to represent petitioner in this proceeding. See 18 U.S.C. 3006A(a)(2)(B). Signed on 10/22/2019 by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 10/23/2019. Petition #2 and a Copy of this Order sent to FPD via interoffice mail on 10/23/2019. ) (joha)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: This Court DENIES Roof's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #1 . Roof shall submit the $5.00 filing fee within thirty days of the date of this Order. Failure to submit the filing fee shall result in the dismissal of this proceeding. Signed on 10/2/19 by Judge Michael Mosman. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 10/2/19.) (dsg)
September 9, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 9/9/2019.) (joha)
September 6, 2019 Filing 3 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Filed by Frank Roof. (joha)
September 6, 2019 Filing 2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254 - State). Filed by Frank Roof against Troy Bowser (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibits 1-14, #3 Exhibits 15-24). (joha)
September 6, 2019 Filing 1 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Frank Roof. (joha)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roof v. Bowser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Frank Roof
Represented By: Lisa Hay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Troy Bowser
Represented By: Lynn David Larsen
Represented By: Kristen E. Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?