Eaton v. Peters et al
Plaintiff: Aaron Eaton and Aaron Dale Eaton
Defendant: Sargent Roberts, Corrections Officer Surber, Troy Bowser and Collette Peters
Case Number: 2:2019cv01718
Filed: October 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Patricia Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2019 Filing 11 Answer to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand (Defendants' Answer and Affirmative Defenses with Jury Trial Demanded). Filed by Sargent Roberts, Collette Peters, Troy Bowser. (Nordyke, Vanessa)
November 22, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued Electronically as to Corrections Officer Surber. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (sss)
November 22, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued Electronically as to Sargent Roberts. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (sss)
November 22, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued Electronically as to Troy Bowser. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (sss)
November 22, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued Electronically as to Collette Peters. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (sss)
November 21, 2019 Filing 6 Proposed Summons Filed by Aaron Dale Eaton. (Burgess, John)
November 21, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed Summons Filed by Aaron Dale Eaton. (Burgess, John)
November 21, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Summons Filed by Aaron Dale Eaton. (Burgess, John)
November 21, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons Filed by Aaron Dale Eaton. (Burgess, John)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Patricia Sullivan and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 2/26/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 3/27/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 3/27/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia Sullivan. (jtj)
October 28, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-6059225 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Aaron Eaton against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment). (Burgess, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eaton v. Peters et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sargent Roberts
Represented By: Vanessa A. Nordyke
Represented By: Robert E. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corrections Officer Surber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Troy Bowser
Represented By: Vanessa A. Nordyke
Represented By: Robert E. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Collette Peters
Represented By: Vanessa A. Nordyke
Represented By: Robert E. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Eaton
Represented By: Carl Lee Post
Represented By: John D. Burgess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Dale Eaton
Represented By: Carl Lee Post
Represented By: John D. Burgess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?