Anderson v. Lifeways, Inc.
Plaintiff: Carolyn Anderson
Defendant: Lifeways, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv01765
Filed: November 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Patricia Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:451
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #4 is GRANTED. Answer is due by 2/6/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia Sullivan. (dsg)
December 17, 2019 Filing 5 Declaration of David J. Riewald in Support of Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Filed by Lifeways, Inc.. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition #4 .) (Riewald, David)
December 17, 2019 Filing 4 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint, #1 . Filed by Lifeways, Inc.. (Riewald, David)
November 6, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to Lifeways, Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (rs)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Patricia Sullivan and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 3/5/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 4/6/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 4/6/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia Sullivan. (rs)
November 3, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-6066826 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Carolyn Anderson against Lifeways, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons). (Stevens, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson v. Lifeways, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lifeways, Inc.
Represented By: David J. Riewald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Anderson
Represented By: Michael O. Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?