Grimsley v. Cain
Petitioner: Robert Grimsley
Respondent: Brad Cain
Case Number: 2:2020cv00500
Filed: March 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael J McShane
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2020 Filing 14 Clerk's Notice of Emailing to Robert Grimsley, Prisoner ID: 21089091 regarding Magistrate Consent by Party, #11 . **PRINT NEF ONLY**(Robert Grimsley, Prisoner ID: 21089091) (dsg)
May 20, 2020 Filing 13 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Filed by Robert Grimsley.**PRINT NEF ONLY**(Robert Grimsley, Prisoner ID: 21089091) (dsg)
May 20, 2020 Filing 12 Motion for Reconsideration of Order on Motion to Expedite and Order on motion for preliminary injunction 7 . Filed by Robert Grimsley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)**PRINT NEF ONLY**(Robert Grimsley, Prisoner ID: 21089091) (dsg)
May 20, 2020 Filing 11 Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. **PRINT NEF ONLY. The Court will e-mail a PDF of the Consent to Jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge form filed in this case to the prison for delivery to the inmate litigant.**(Robert Grimsley, Prisoner ID: 21089091) (dsg)
May 15, 2020 Filing 10 Notice of Attorney Substitution:Attorney Kristen E. Boyd is substituted as counsel of record in place of Attorney Lynn David Larsen Filed by Brad Cain.**2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Robert Grimsley, Prisoner ID: 21089091) (Boyd, Kristen)
May 13, 2020 Filing 9 Acceptance and Acknowledgment of Service of Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and Scheduling Order upon the State Attorney General on behalf of Brad Cain. Filed by Brad Cain.**1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Robert Grimsley, Prisoner ID: 21089091) (Larsen, Lynn)
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Habeas Corpus Scheduling Order Serving Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus 2254 #1 on respondent. Answer is due by 7/13/2020. Signed on 5/12/2020 by Judge Michael J. McShane. (Attachments: #1 Acceptance and Acknowledgment, #2 Petition)**15 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Robert Grimsley, Prisoner ID: 21089091) (dsg)
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Denying Motion to Expedite/Accelerate #5 ; Denying Motion for a Preliminary Injunction #5 ). Plaintiff must file a separate civil rights action pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 1983 in order to challenge the conditions of his confinement. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. **PRINT NEF ONLY**(Robert Grimsley, Prisoner ID: 21089091) (ps3)
April 28, 2020 Filing 6 Supplemental Petition. Filed by Robert Grimsley. **PRINT NEF ONLY**(Robert Grimsley, Prisoner ID: 21089091) (dsg)
April 28, 2020 Filing 5 Motion to Expedite or Accelerate and Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Filed by Robert Grimsley.**PRINT NEF ONLY**(Robert Grimsley, Prisoner ID: 21089091) (dsg)
April 21, 2020 Filing fee in amount of $5.00 collected; Receipt No. 88427 issued. **PRINT NEF ONLY**(Robert Grimsley, Prisoner ID: 21089091) (re)
April 6, 2020 Filing 4 Clerk's Notice of Emailing to Robert Grimsley, Prisoner ID: 21089091 regarding Magistrate Consent by Party, #3 . **PRINT NEF ONLY**(Robert Grimsley, Prisoner ID: 21089091) (dsg)
April 6, 2020 Filing 3 Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. **PRINT NEF ONLY. The Court will e-mail a PDF of the Consent to Jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge form filed in this case to the prison for delivery to the inmate litigant.**(Robert Grimsley, Prisoner ID: 21089091) (dsg)
March 26, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Michael J. McShane. **3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Robert Grimsley, Prisoner ID: 21089091) (dsg)
March 26, 2020 Filing 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254 - State). NO FEE, NO IFP. Filed by Robert Grimsley against Brad Cain.**PRINT NEF ONLY**(Robert Grimsley, Prisoner ID: 21089091) (dsg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grimsley v. Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Robert Grimsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Brad Cain
Represented By: Lynn David Larsen
Represented By: Kristen E. Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?