Grimsley v. Landis et al
Petitioner: Robert Grimsley
Respondent: Brad Cain, Lung S. Hung and Erin Landis
Case Number: 2:2020cv00501
Filed: March 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael J McShane
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Mandamus and Other
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 12, 2020 Filing 6 JUDGMENT: This action is DISMISSED. Signed on 5/12/2020 by Judge Michael J. McShane.**1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Robert Grimsley, Prisoner ID: 21089091) (dsg)
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: Petitioner fails to show that he has exhausted his state remedies by seeking review in the Oregon appellate courts. Moreover, petitioner fails to show that special circumstances warrant federal court intervention, particularly in the context of the state court's decision. Accordingly, the Court abstains from exercising jurisdiction over the petition, and this action is DISMISSED. Signed on 5/12/2020 by Judge Michael J. McShane.**2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Robert Grimsley, Prisoner ID: 21089091) (dsg)
April 21, 2020 Filing fee in amount of $5.00 collected; Receipt No. 88428 issued. **PRINT NEF ONLY**(Robert Grimsley, Prisoner ID: 21089091) (re)
April 6, 2020 Filing 4 Clerk's Notice of Emailing to Robert Grimsley, Prisoner ID: 21089091 regarding Magistrate Consent by Party, #3 . **PRINT NEF ONLY**(Robert Grimsley, Prisoner ID: 21089091) (dsg)
April 6, 2020 Filing 3 Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. **PRINT NEF ONLY. The Court will e-mail a PDF of the Consent to Jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge form filed in this case to the prison for delivery to the inmate litigant.**(Robert Grimsley, Prisoner ID: 21089091) (dsg)
March 26, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Michael J. McShane. **3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Robert Grimsley, Prisoner ID: 21089091) (dsg)
March 26, 2020 Filing 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241- Federal). NO FEE, NO IFP. Filed by Robert Grimsley against Brad Cain, Lung S. Hung, Erin Landis.**PRINT NEF ONLY**(Robert Grimsley, Prisoner ID: 21089091) (dsg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grimsley v. Landis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Robert Grimsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Brad Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Lung S. Hung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Erin Landis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?