Rushford v. Cain
Petitioner: Michael Rushford
Respondent: Brad Cain
Case Number: 2:2020cv01388
Filed: August 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Karin J Immergut
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2020 Filing 7 Notice of Attorney Substitution:Attorney Oliver W. Loewy is substituted as counsel of record in place of Attorney Lisa Hay Filed by Michael Rushford. (Loewy, Oliver)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This Court grants Petitioner's Motion for Appointment of Counsel #3 . The Federal Public Defender, 101 S.W. Main Street, Suite 1700, Portland, Oregon 97204, is appointed to represent Petitioner in this proceeding. Signed on 9/15/2020 by Judge Karin J. Immergut. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Michael Rushford, Prisoner ID: 10371217) (dsg)
September 14, 2020 Filing fee in amount of $5.00 collected; Receipt No. 90149 issued. **PRINT NEF ONLY**(Michael Rushford, Prisoner ID: 10371217) (ljp)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: ThisCourt DENIES Rushford's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #1 . Rushford shall submit the $5.00 filing fee within thirty days of the date of this Order. Failure to submit the filing fee shall result in the dismissal of this proceeding. Signed on 8/24/2020 by Judge Karin J. Immergut. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Michael Rushford, Prisoner ID: 10371217) (dsg)
August 14, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Karin J. Immergut. **3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Michael Rushford, Prisoner ID: 10371217) (joha)
August 14, 2020 Filing 3 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Filed by Michael Rushford.**PRINT NEF ONLY**(Michael Rushford, Prisoner ID: 10371217) (joha)
August 14, 2020 Filing 2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254 - State). Filed by Michael Rushford against Brad Cain. **PRINT NEF ONLY**(Michael Rushford, Prisoner ID: 10371217) (joha)
August 14, 2020 Filing 1 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Michael Rushford.**PRINT NEF ONLY**(Michael Rushford, Prisoner ID: 10371217) (joha)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rushford v. Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Michael Rushford
Represented By: Lisa Hay
Represented By: Oliver W. Loewy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Brad Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?