United States of America v. Idaho Power Company et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Idaho Power Company and IDACORP Inc
Case Number: 2:2020cv02282
Filed: December 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Patricia Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1345
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice regarding Christine R. Arnold #11 is GRANTED. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia Sullivan. (dsg)
January 26, 2021 Filing 11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Christine R. Arnold. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: CORDC-7826485. Filed by Idaho Power Company, IDACORP Inc. (Arnold, Christine)
January 26, 2021 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Christine R. Arnold. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: CORDC-7826485 #11 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ecp)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice regarding Jennifer Reinhardt-Tessmer #6 is GRANTED. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia Sullivan. (dsg)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice regarding Wade L. Woodard #7 is GRANTED. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia Sullivan. (dsg)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order for Administrative Correction of the Record pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 60(a) regarding #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. A Clerical error has been discovered in the case record: The Document was not signed. The following corrections were made to the record: A corrected PDF has been uploaded and has replaced the incorrect attachment.The Notice of Electronic Filing will be regenerated to all parties. (cw)
January 25, 2021 Filing 7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Wade L. Woodard. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7820526. Filed by All Defendants. (Woodard, Wade) (Main Document 7 replaced on 1/25/2021) (cw).
January 25, 2021 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Wade L. Woodard. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7820526 #7 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ecp)
January 22, 2021 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Jennifer Reinhardt-Tessmer. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7808859 #6 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ecp)
January 21, 2021 Filing 6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney ennifer Reinhardt-Tessmer. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7808859. Filed by Idaho Power Company. (Reinhardt-Tessmer, Jennifer)
January 6, 2021 Filing 5 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Idaho Power Company waiver sent on 1/5/2021. Filed by United States of America. (McClurg, Carla)
January 6, 2021 Filing 4 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by IDACORP Inc waiver sent on 1/5/2021. Filed by United States of America. (McClurg, Carla)
December 30, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to IDACORP Inc, Idaho Power Company. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (joha)
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Patricia Sullivan and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 4/29/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 6/1/2021. Pretrial Order is due by 6/1/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia Sullivan. (joha)
December 30, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint. (fee exempt status selected (AUSA)) Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by United States of America against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons). (McClurg, Carla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Idaho Power Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Idaho Power Company
Represented By: Wade L. Woodard
Represented By: Jennifer Reinhardt-Tessmer
Represented By: Christine R Arnold
Represented By: Sarah J. Crooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IDACORP Inc
Represented By: Christine R Arnold
Represented By: Wade L. Woodard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Carla G. McClurg
Represented By: Alexis Lien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?