Crabtree v. Washburn
Petitioner: Shawn Andrew Crabtree
Respondent: Susan Washburn
Case Number: 2:2021cv00284
Filed: February 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Marco A Hernandez
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Should Petitioner wish to proceed with this case, he must submit the $5.00 filing fee (or proof of prior payment) within 30 days of the date of this Order. Should he fail to do so, the Court will dismiss this case without prejudice. Signed on 4/20/2021 by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 4/21/2021.) (dsg)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Notice regarding Fee Payment. Filed by Shawn Andrew Crabtree. (dsg)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. (dsg)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DENYING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS: Petitioner's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #1 is DENIED. Should Petitioner wish to continue with this case, he must submit the requisite filing fee within 30 days of the date of this Order. Petitioner is advised that failure to submit the fee shall result in the dismissal of this proceeding. Signed on 3/16/2021 by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 3/17/2021.) (dsg)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Status Report by Shawn Andrew Crabtree. Filed by Shawn Andrew Crabtree. (dsg)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 2/23/2021.) (joha)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Filed by Shawn Andrew Crabtree. (joha)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254 - State). Filed by Shawn Andrew Crabtree against Susan Washburn. (joha)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Shawn Andrew Crabtree. (joha)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crabtree v. Washburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Shawn Andrew Crabtree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Susan Washburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?