MicroDental Laboratories, Inc. v. Hoofard
Plaintiff: MicroDental Laboratories, Inc.
Defendant: Steve Hoofard
Case Number: 2:2021cv00482
Filed: March 31, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael H Simon
Referring Judge: Patricia Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 12 U.S.C. ยง 1819
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Opinion and Order - The Court DENIES Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, Preliminary Injunction, and Expedited Discovery. ECF #12 . Signed on 5/28/2021 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
May 28, 2021 Filing 22 MINUTES OF ORAL ARGUMENT HEARING: ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (ECF #12 ) is taken under advisement on May 28, 2021. James M. Carman and Vanessa M. Anderson present as counsel for Plaintiff. Angela M. Ferrer and Andrew Altschul present as counsel for Defendant. Court Reporter: Dennis Apodaca. Judge Michael H. Simon presiding. (mja)
May 27, 2021 Filing 21 Reply to Motion for Temporary Restraining Order #12 Oral Argument requested. Filed by MicroDental Laboratories, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Anderson, Vanessa)
May 24, 2021 Filing 20 Declaration of Angela M. Ferrer ISO Motion to Dismiss. Filed by Steve Hoofard. (Related document(s): Motion to Dismiss #19 .) (Ferrer, Angela)
May 24, 2021 Filing 19 Motion to Dismiss . Filed by Steve Hoofard. (Ferrer, Angela)
May 24, 2021 Filing 18 Declaration of Steve Hoofard in support of Response. Filed by Steve Hoofard. (Related document(s): Response in Opposition to Motion #17 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Decl., #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Decl., #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Decl., #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 to Decl., #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5 to Decl., #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6 to Decl.) (Ferrer, Angela)
May 24, 2021 Filing 17 Response in Opposition to Motion for Temporary Restraining Order #12 . Filed by Steve Hoofard. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Def. Decl. ISO Response, #2 Exhibit Exhs 1-6, #3 Appendix) (Ferrer, Angela)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Scheduling Order - At the parties' request, the Court sets a briefing schedule on Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (ECF #12 ) as follows: Defendant's response is due by noon on May 24, 2021; Plaintiff's reply is due by noon on May 27, 2021; and Oral Argument is set for Friday, May 28, 2021 at 2:00 p.m. by videoconference via ZoomGov. The Court will provide the parties with ZoomGov connection information by separate email. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
May 17, 2021 Filing 15 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by All Defendants. Filed by MicroDental Laboratories, Inc.. (Anderson, Vanessa)
May 14, 2021 Filing 14 Notice of Case Reassignment: This case has been reassigned from Magistrate Judge Patricia Sullivan to Judge Michael H. Simon. (eo)
May 13, 2021 Filing 13 Amended Complaint . Filed by MicroDental Laboratories, Inc. against Steve Hoofard. (Carman, James)
May 13, 2021 Filing 12 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order . Filed by MicroDental Laboratories, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E) (Carman, James)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice regarding James M. Carman #10 is GRANTED. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia Sullivan. (dsg)
May 7, 2021 Filing 10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney James M. Carman. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8073482. Expedited Hearing requested. Filed by MicroDental Laboratories, Inc.. (Carman, James) Modified on 5/7/2021 to correct docket text(ecp).
May 7, 2021 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Vanessa M. Anderson. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8073482 #10 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ecp)
April 6, 2021 Filing 9 Clerk's Notice of Pay.gov Refund regarding Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8018035. The request has been granted and the amount of $402.00 will be refunded to Vanessa Anderson Related Doc #4 Request for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically. (lp)
April 2, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Issued Electronically as to Steve Hoofard. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (joha)
April 1, 2021 Filing 7 Amended Proposed Summons Filed by MicroDental Laboratories, Inc.. (Anderson, Vanessa)
April 1, 2021 Filing 6 Amended Proposed Summons Filed by MicroDental Laboratories, Inc.. (Anderson, Vanessa)
April 1, 2021 Filing 5 Amended Proposed Summons Filed by MicroDental Laboratories, Inc.. (Anderson, Vanessa)
April 1, 2021 Filing 4 Request for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically regarding Refund Request Due, 3 , Complaint, #1 . Filed by MicroDental Laboratories, Inc.. (Anderson, Vanessa)
April 1, 2021 Filing 3 A duplicate payment in the amount of $402.00 was submitted by MicroDental Laboratories, Inc. in the above-referenced case. For information on refund procedures, visit #Requesting a Refund of Electronically Paid Fees on the Court website. Refund Request is Due 4/12/2021. (nd)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Patricia Sullivan and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 7/29/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 8/30/2021. Pretrial Order is due by 8/30/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia Sullivan. (joha)
March 31, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8018142 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by MicroDental Laboratories, Inc. against Steve Hoofard (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Promissory Note 1, #2 Exhibit Promissory Note 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons). (Anderson, Vanessa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MicroDental Laboratories, Inc. v. Hoofard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MicroDental Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: Vanessa M. Anderson
Represented By: James M Carman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Hoofard
Represented By: Angela M. Ferrer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?