Estate of Susan K. Dick v. Deseret Mutual Benefit Administrators
Plaintiff: Estate of Susan K. Dick
Defendant: Deseret Mutual Benefit Administrators
Case Number: 2:2021cv01194
Filed: August 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Andrew D Hallman
Referring Judge: Patricia Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2021 Filing 5 Notice of Case Reassignment: This case has been reassigned from Magistrate Judge Patricia Sullivan to Magistrate Judge Andrew D. Hallman. (dsg)
August 26, 2021 Filing 4 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Deseret Mutual Benefit Administrators waiver sent on 8/18/2021. Filed by Estate of Susan K. Dick. (Stanke, Samuel)
August 13, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to Deseret Mutual Benefit Administrators. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (joha)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Patricia Sullivan and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 12/13/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 1/10/2022. Pretrial Order is due by 1/10/2022. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia Sullivan. (joha)
August 13, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: BORDC-8191785 Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Bobby Dick against Deseret Mutual Benefit Administrators (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons). (Stanke, Samuel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Estate of Susan K. Dick v. Deseret Mutual Benefit Administrators
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Susan K. Dick
Represented By: Samuel T. Stanke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deseret Mutual Benefit Administrators
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?