Nay v. Nur Transport LLC et al
Plaintiff: Tim Nay
Defendant: Nur Transport LLC, Hassen Ibrahim and Mohamed Nur Kulale
Case Number: 2:2022cv00254
Filed: February 16, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Andrew D Hallman
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Wrongful Death
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 24, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2022 Filing 8 Notice of Case Reassignment: This case has been reassigned from Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo to Magistrate Judge Andrew D. Hallman and transferred to the Pendleton Division. (eo)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo: Although defendants removed this action from the Circuit Court of the State of Oregon for the County of Multnomah, the complaint alleges that the events underlying the causes of action occurred in Huntington, Oregon, in Baker County. Accordingly, the case is transferred to the Pendleton division for all further proceedings pursuant to Local Rule 3-3(b). (gm)
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 6/21/2022. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 7/18/2022. Pretrial Order is due by 7/18/2022. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (sb)
February 18, 2022 ***NON-PUBLIC***Clerk's Office review of new civil case opened by an attorney. There were no errors observed. (sb)
February 16, 2022 Filing 5 Notice to Adverse Party of Removal of Case to Federal Court Filed by All Defendants. (LaForest, Hansary)
February 16, 2022 Filing 4 Declaration of Mohamed Kulale In Support Of Notice of Removal. Filed by All Defendants. (Related document(s): Notice of Removal, 1 .) (LaForest, Hansary)
February 16, 2022 Filing 3 Declaration of Hassen Ibrahim In Support Of Notice of Removal. Filed by All Defendants. (Related document(s): Notice of Removal, 1 .) (LaForest, Hansary)
February 16, 2022 Filing 2 Declaration of Nur Transport LLC In Support Of Notice of Removal. Filed by All Defendants. (Related document(s): Notice of Removal, 1 .) (LaForest, Hansary)
February 16, 2022 Filing 1 Notice of Removal of Case Number 22CV02558 from Multnomah County Circuit Court. Filing Fee in amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8411929 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by Nur Transport LLC, Hassen Ibrahim, Mohamed Nur Kulale (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Notice of Removal, # 3 Exhibit 2 to Notice of Removal). (LaForest, Hansary)
February 16, 2022 ***NON-PUBLIC****** Case Flags Edited. Law Clerk David Baker assigned. (gm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nay v. Nur Transport LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tim Nay
Represented By: Brian B. Williams
Represented By: Tomas Osborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nur Transport LLC
Represented By: Derek J. Ashton
Represented By: Hansary LaForest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hassen Ibrahim
Represented By: Derek J. Ashton
Represented By: Hansary LaForest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mohamed Nur Kulale
Represented By: Derek J. Ashton
Represented By: Hansary LaForest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?