Oregon Advocacy Center et al v. Mink et al
Case Number: 3:2002cv00339
Filed: October 28, 2019
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Oregon
Office: Portland (3) Office
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 598 ORDER: The Court DECLARES that Marion County Circuit Court Judge Lindsay Partridge's order and directive discussed herein, to the extent they tend to prohibit, restrict, or impair the release of the state criminal defendant who is the su bject of this Order, are void. Defendants are hereby ORDERED to continue to implement the length of stay recommendations in the Court- appointed neutral expert's June 2022 report as described in this Court's July 2023 order, ECF 416 , an d are further ORDERED to release from the Oregon State Hospital and transport to the Marion County Jail the state criminal defendant who is the subject of defendants' notice and noncompliance. Signed on 4/14/2025 by Judge Adrienne Nelson. Associated Cases: 3:02-cv-00339-AN, 3:21-cv-01637-AN, 6:22-cv-01460-AN (joha)
March 20, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 591 OPINION AND ORDER: Plaintiffs' Motion for Imposition of Sanctions, ECF 566 , is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Sanctions are imposed against amicus curiae Marion County and attorney Steve Elzinga under the Court's inherent aut hority as follows: amicus curiae Marion County's Response to Motion for Order to Show Cause, ECF 547 , is STRICKEN from the record. The Court declines to award sanctions against any other counsel and declines to award sanctions against either Marion County or Steve Elzinga under the All Writs Act, the vexatious litigant statute, or FRCP 11. Signed on 3/20/2025 by Judge Adrienne Nelson. Associated Cases: 3:02-cv-00339-AN, 3:21-cv-01637-AN, 6:22-cv-01460-AN. (joha)
March 11, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 581 OPINION & ORDER: Amicus curiae Marion County's Motion to Intervene Limited in Response to Plaintiff Disability Rights Oregon's Motion for a Rule to Show Cause, ECF 544 , is DENIED.(154 in 6:22-cv-01460-AN, 544 in 3:02-cv-00339-AN, 329 in 3:21-cv-01637-AN). Signed on March 11, 2025 by Judge Adrienne Nelson. Associated Cases: 3:02-cv-00339-AN, 3:21-cv-01637-AN, 6:22-cv-01460-AN (eo)
April 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 485 OPINION AND ORDER: Amicus curiae Marion County's Motion to Expedite or Accelerate Ruling, ECF 479 , is GRANTED, and its Second Motion to Intervene, ECF 478 , is DENIED. Signed on 4/4/2024 by Judge Adrienne Nelson. Associated Cases: 3:02-cv-00339-AN, 3:21-cv-01637-AN. (joha)
March 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 475 Opinion and Order: For the foregoing reasons, Judge Broyles's order violates the Supremacy Clause. Defendants' Petition for Expedited Ruling on Supremacy Clause [ECF 460] is GRANTED. Signed on 3/6/2024 by Judge Michael W. Mosman. Associated Cases: 3:02-cv-00339-MO, 3:21-cv-01637-MO (kms)
October 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 452 Opinion and Order: Defendants' Petition for Expedited Ruling on Supremacy Clause [ECF 448] is GRANTED. Signed on 10/17/2023 by Judge Michael W. Mosman.Associated Cases: 3:02-cv-00339-MO, 3:21-cv-01637-MO (kms)
January 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 338 Opinion and Order: For the reasons stated on the record and above, I DENY Intervenors' Motion to Dissolve or Modify [ECF 284] the September 1 Order, with leave to renew. Signed on 1/9/2023 by Judge Michael W. Mosman.Associated Cases: 3:02-cv-00339-MO, 3:21-cv-01637-MO, 6:22-cv-01460-MO (kms)
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 271 ORDER TO IMPLEMENT NEUTRAL EXPERT'S RECOMMENDATIONS. See Order for further details. Signed on 9/1/2022 by Judge Michael W. Mosman. Associated Cases: 3:02-cv-00339-MO, 3:21-cv-01637-MO (joha)
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 256 OPINION AND ORDER: Defendant's Request for Judicial Notice [ECF 252 ] is GRANTED. I take judicial notice of the materials provided. Plaintiffs' Motion for Order to Implement Neutral Expert's Recommendations [ECF 253] is GRAN TED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. The Parties shall implement the recommendations in the Court's Neutral Expert's January and June 2022 reports. Dr. Pinals may grant extensions of other deadlines in her recommendations after conferring wit h the parties. Any such extensions shall be documented in Defendants' monthly progress reports. To the extent contempt proceedings arise out of the efforts state litigants are making in this case, I ENJOIN any action that seeks to hold those associated with this case in contempt for their efforts to comply with the permanent injunction. Signed on 8/16/2022 by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (joha) (Main Document 256 replaced on 8/16/2022) (cw).
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 147 OPINION AND ORDER: I DENY Plaintiffs' requests 134 to modify the injunction, hold a status hearing in six months, and be declared the prevailing party under 42 U.S.C. § 1988 and their Motion 140 for attorney fees. Signed on 10/28/19 by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (dls)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oregon Advocacy Center et al v. Mink et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?