Pinnell v. Belleque

Case Number: 3:2006cv00828
Filed: June 9, 2006
Court: Oregon District Court
Office: Portland Office
Presiding Judge: Anna J. Brown
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty - Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - Stay of Execution
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 16, 2015 355 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING Oral Argument set for 12/22/2015 and Dismissing Habeas Corpus Petition. Signed on 12/16/2015 by Judge Anna J. Brown. (bb)
January 15, 2015 338 Opinion or Order of the Court Opinion and Order. For the reasons in this Opinion and Order, the Court DISMISSES without prejudice certain defaulted claims as specified and will address other specified claims on the merits in due course. The Court directs counsel to confer and to submit no later than 02/02/2015, a detailed, jointly-proposed case-management schedule. See attached 43 page Opinion and Order. Signed on 01/15/2015 by Judge Anna J. Brown. (bb)
December 20, 2012 313 Opinion or Order of the Court Order. The Court will contact the parties shortly to schedule a status conference to discuss the Order and to set a schedule for further proceedings in this case. Signed on 12/20/2012 by Judge Anna J. Brown. (bb)
June 2, 2010 217 Opinion or Order of the Court Opinion and Order - The Court DENIES Petitioner's Motion 191 for Summary Adjudication of the Seventeenth Claim for Relief. Signed on 6/2/2010 by Judge Anna J. Brown. (See formal Opinion and Order, 26-pages) (ecp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pinnell v. Belleque
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.

Why Is My Information Online?