Buckman v. Hall
Petitioner: John R. Buckman
Respondent: Guy Hall
Case Number: 3:2007cv00141
Filed: January 26, 2007
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Office: Portland Office
County: Umatilla
Presiding Judge: Dennis J. Hubel
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER: Petitioner's Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss (ECF No. 182 ) is GRANTED. This proceeding is DISMISSED, with prejudice. In the event Petitioner appeals from this Order, the Court denies a Certificate of Appealability. See 28 U.S.C. § 2253(c)(2). Signed on 4/11/2017 by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (kms)
May 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 58 OPINION AND ORDER: Upon review, I agree with Judge Hubel's recommendation, and I ADOPT the F&R 54 as my own opinion, 55 . Signed on 5/25/09 by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (dls)
January 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 53 OPINION AND ORDER: Upon review, I agree with Judge Hubel's recommendation, and I ADOPT the F&R (#45) as my own opinion 46 . Signed on 1/23/09 by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (dls)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Buckman v. Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: John R. Buckman
Represented By: Kathleen M. Correll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Guy Hall
Represented By: Lynn David Larsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?