Google Inc. v. Traffic Information LLC Featured Case
Plaintiff: Google Inc.
Defendant: Traffic Information LLC
Case Number: 3:2009cv00642
Filed: June 9, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Office: Portland Office
Presiding Judge: Dennis J. Hubel
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Declaratory Judgment
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2010 Filing 61 OFFICIAL COURT TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS FILED Markman Hearing held on September 8, 2010 before Judge Dennis J. Hubel, Court Reporter Dennis W. Apodaca, telephone number (503) 326-8182. Transcript may be viewed at Court's public terminal or purchased from the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. Afterwards it may be obtained through PACER-See Policy at ord.uscourts.gov. Notice of Intent to Redact Transcript is due by 10/15/2010. Redaction Request due 10/28/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/8/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/6/2011. (Apodaca, Dennis)
September 14, 2010 Filing 60 Notice of Lodgment of Markman Hearing Materials Filed by Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Attachment A) (Markley, Julia)
September 13, 2010 Filing 59 Notice (NOTICE OF LODGMENT OF MARKMAN HEARING MATERIALS) Filed by Traffic Information LLC (Attachments: # 1 Traffic's Markman Presentation) (Quisenberry, C.)
September 8, 2010 Filing 58 MINUTES of Proceedings: Markman Hearing held. Thomas Shunk; Christina Moser; Julia Markley present as counsel for plaintiff(s). C. Dale Quisenberry; Timothy DeJong present as counsel for defendant(s). Court Reporter: Dennis Apodaca. Magistrate Judge Dennis J. Hubel presiding. (kb)
August 13, 2010 Filing 57 Brief Plaintiff's Rebuttal Claim Construction Brief. Filed by Google Inc.. (Markley, Julia)
August 13, 2010 Filing 56 Report (TRAFFIC INFORMATION, LLC'S RESPONSIVE CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF). Filed by Traffic Information LLC. (Quisenberry, C.)
August 13, 2010 Filing 55 MINUTES of Proceedings: Telephone Status Conference held regarding the September 8, 2010, Markman Hearing. Thomas Shunk; Christina Moser; Julia Markley present as counsel for plaintiff(s). C. Dale Quisenberry; Timothy DeJong present as counsel for defendant(s). Court Reporter: Bonita Shumway. Magistrate Judge Dennis J. Hubel presiding. (kb)
August 4, 2010 Filing 54 Scheduling Order by Magistrate Judge Dennis J. Hubel: A Telephone Status Conference is set for August 13, 2010 at 10:00 a.m. The court will place the call. (kb)
July 16, 2010 Filing 53 Report (TRAFFIC INFORMATION, LLC'S OPENING CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF). Filed by Traffic Information LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Attachment, # 3 Attachment, # 4 Attachment, # 5 Attachment, # 6 Attachment, # 7 Attachment, # 8 Attachment, # 9 Attachment, # 10 Attachment) (Quisenberry, C.)
July 16, 2010 Filing 52 Brief Plaintiff's Opening Claim Construction Brief. Filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E part1, # 6 Exhibit E part 2, # 7 Exhibit E part 3, # 8 Exhibit E part 4, # 9 Exhibit E part 5, # 10 Exhibit F part 1, # 11 Exhibit F part 2, # 12 Exhibit G, # 13 Exhibit H) (Markley, Julia)
July 2, 2010 Filing 51 Stipulated Protective Order. Signed on 7/2/10 by Magistrate Judge Dennis J. Hubel. (kb)
July 2, 2010 Filing 50 Joint Statement of Claims Construction Chart. Filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A) (Markley, Julia)
June 30, 2010 Filing 49 Stipulated Motion for Protective Order. Filed by Google Inc.. (Markley, Julia)
June 25, 2010 Filing 48 OFFICIAL COURT TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS FILED Oral Argument held on October 21, 2009 before Judge Dennis J. Hubel, Court Reporter Amanda M. LeGore, telephone number 503-326-8184. Transcript may be viewed at Court's public terminal or purchased from the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. Afterwards it may be obtained through PACER-See Policy at ord.uscourts.gov. Notice of Intent to Redact Transcript is due by 7/6/2010. Redaction Request due 7/19/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/29/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/27/2010. (LeGore, Amanda)
June 15, 2010 Filing 47 Stipulated Motion for Protective Order [PROPOSED]. Filed by Google Inc.. (Markley, Julia)
June 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER: The parties' Joint Motion for Extension of Time for Parties to Exchange Identification of Claim Terms 44 is GRANTED, up to and including 6/4/10. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Dennis J. Hubel. (kb)
May 27, 2010 Filing 45 Declaration of Thomas H. Shunk. Filed by Google Inc.. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Time 44 .) (Markley, Julia)
May 27, 2010 Filing 44 Joint Motion for Extension of Time for Parties to Exchange Identification of Claim Terms. Filed by Google Inc.. (Markley, Julia)
May 3, 2010 Filing 43 MINUTES of Proceedings: The court will apply that portion of Rule 4-5(c) of the Patent Rules for the Northern of District of Ohio which requires that each party include a brief (not to exceed one page) statement for each term it proposes be construed, supporting or refuting the contention that the construction of those terms will be dispositive or promote settlement, as follows: The statements shall be included with the parties' exchange of proposed claims to be construed, which are due 5/28/10, and shall be included for filing with the court with the parties' Joint Claims Construction Chart, due 7/2/10. The court confirmed with counsel that final ruling on claim construction will be by the district judge, the exact timing of which will be determined later. The court ruled on disputes between the parties with respect to a proposed protective order as reflected in the record; parties will file a new proposed stipulated protective order accordingly. A trial will be set at a later date. Julia Markley; Christina Moser; Thomas Shunk present as counsel for plaintiff(s). C. Dale Quisenberry present as counsel for defendant(s). Court Reporter: KB/FTR. Magistrate Judge Dennis J. Hubel presiding. (kb)
May 3, 2010 Filing 42 Reply to Counterclaims. Filed by Google Inc.. (Related document(s): Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim 37 .) (Markley, Julia)
April 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 41 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Dennis J. Hubel: Signed 4/21/10. (see formal order) (kb)
April 16, 2010 Filing 40 Scheduling Order by Magistrate Judge Dennis J. Hubel:- The Telephone Status Conference set for May 3, 2010, is RESET to 11:30 a.m. (change in time only). (kb)
April 13, 2010 Filing 39 MINUTES of Proceedings - Record of Rule 16 Conference: A new case schedule is set, which will be set forth in a separate order. A Telephone Status Conference is set for May 3, 2010 at 11:00 a.m., at which the court will address with counsel which patent rules will apply to this case, and a trial will be set. The court directs, and parties confirm that they will further confer and file a proposed stipulated protective order before May 3, 2010, or advise the court of any dispute between them about that order at the May 3, 2010 Status Conference. The parties' previously filed motions for protective order, 24 and 36 , are deemed MOOT. Julia Markley; Christina Moser; Thomas Shunk present as counsel for plaintiff(s). C. Dale Quisenberry; Timothy DeJong present as counsel for defendant(s). Court Reporter: KB/FTR. Magistrate Judge Dennis J. Hubel presiding. (kb)
April 12, 2010 Filing 38 Second Joint Proposed Pretrial Order Lodged Joint Amended Submission Regarding Scheduling and Request for Amendment of the Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Filed by all parties. (Markley, Julia)
April 12, 2010 Filing 37 Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand TRAFFIC INFORMATION, LLCS ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND COUNTERCLAIMS, Counterclaim Google Inc.. Filed by Traffic Information LLC. (Quisenberry, C.)
April 12, 2010 Filing 36 Proposed Motion for Protective Order NOTICE OF ANTICIPATED PROPOSED PROTECTIVE ORDER BY DEFENDANT TRAFFIC INFORMATION, LLC. Filed by Traffic Information LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order PROPOSED STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER) (Quisenberry, C.)
April 12, 2010 Filing 35 Notice of Anticipated Proposed Protective Order Filed by Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Proposed Stipulated Protective Order) (Markley, Julia)
April 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 34 RECORD OF ORDER: Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint 33 is granted, in part. Defendant's response to the complaint shall be filed no later than 4:30 p.m., April 12, 2010. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Dennis J. Hubel. (kb)
April 1, 2010 Filing 33 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR TRAFFIC INFORMATION, LLC TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT - EXPEDITED CONSIDERATION REQUESTED). Filed by Traffic Information LLC. (Quisenberry, C.)
March 22, 2010 Filing 31 Scheduling Order by Magistrate Judge Dennis J. Hubel: A Rule 16 Conference is set for 4/13/2010 at 10:30 a.m., by telephone. The court will place the call. (kb)
March 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER: Denying Motion to Dismiss Case for Lack of Jurisdiction 8 ; Denying Motion to Change or Transfer Venue (Related Doc # 8 ) ; Adopting Findings and Recommendation 27 . Signed on 3/19/10 by Judge Garr M. King. (ljl)
March 11, 2010 Filing 30 Response to Objections Titled as: Response to Traffic's Objection to Magistrate Judge's Findings and Recommendation Regarding Traffic's Motion to Dismiss or Transfer. Filed by Google Inc.. (Markley, Julia)
February 22, 2010 Filing 29 Objections (TRAFFIC'S OBJECTIONS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION) to Findings & Recommendation: Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction titled as "Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction andAlternative Motion to Change or Transfer Venue " 8 Findings & Recommendation: Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction titled as "Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction andAlternative Motion to Change or Transfer Venue " 8 27 . Filed by Traffic Information LLC. (Quisenberry, C.)
February 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 28 RECORD OF ORDER Order by Magistrate Judge Dennis J. Hubel - referring Findings & Recommendation 27 to Judge Garr M. King. (kb)
February 2, 2010 Filing 27 Findings & Recommendation: Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and, Alternative Motion to Change or Transfer Venue 8 , should be denied. Objections to the Findings and Recommendation are due by 2/22/2010. Signed on 2/2/10 by Magistrate Judge Dennis J. Hubel. (see 15-page f&r) (kb)
December 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 26 RECORD OF ORDER by Judge Dennis J. Hubel: There shall be no further briefing with respect to the Motion by Traffic Information, LLC for Protective Order and to Stay Discovery 24 . The court will enter its Findings and Recommendation on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and, Alternative Motion to Change or Transfer Venue, 8 , soon after the first of the year, after which the court will address any further briefing schedule to be set on defendant's newly filed motion 24 . (kb)
December 16, 2009 Filing 25 Declaration of C. DALE QUISENBERRY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION BY TRAFFIC INFORMATION, LLC FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AND TO STAY DISCOVERY. Filed by Traffic Information LLC. (Attachments: # 1 EXHIBIT 1 TO CDQ DECLARATION, # 2 EXHIBIT 2 TO CDQ DECLARATION, # 3 EXHIBIT 2 TO CDQ DECLARATION) (Quisenberry, C.)
December 16, 2009 Filing 24 Motion (MOTION BY TRAFFIC INFORMATION, LLC FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AND TO STAY DISCOVERY). Filed by Traffic Information LLC. (Attachments: # 1 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION BY TRAFFIC INFORMATION, LLC FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AND TO STAY DISCOVERY) (Quisenberry, C.)
October 23, 2009 Filing 23 Corporate Disclosure Statement (PLAINTIFF TRAFFIC INFORMATION, LLC'S CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT). Filed by Traffic Information LLC. (Quisenberry, C.)
October 21, 2009 Filing 22 MINUTES of Proceedings: Oral Argument held on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and, Alternative Motion to Change or Transfer Venue 8 - ORDER taking the motion under advisement this date. The Scheduling Conference is continued to a later date. Thomas Shunk; Julia Markley present as counsel for plaintiff(s). C. Dale Quisenberry; Timothy DeJong present as counsel for defendant(s). Court Reporter: Amanda Legore. Magistrate Judge Dennis J. Hubel presiding. ( (kb)
October 19, 2009 Filing 21 Scheduling Order by Magistrate Judge Dennis J. Hubel: A Scheduling Conference will immediately follow the motion argument set in this matter for October 21, 2009, at 10:00 a.m.; counsel shall therefore have their calendars available to them at this proceeding. (kb)
October 7, 2009 Filing 20 Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines [Titled: Joint Submission Regarding Scheduling and Request for Amendment of the Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order]. Filed by Google Inc.. (Markley, Julia)
October 2, 2009 Filing 19 Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) Agreement. Filed by Google Inc.. (Markley, Julia)
September 18, 2009 Filing 18 Reply (REPLY OF TRAFFIC INFORMATION, LLC TO OPPOSITION BY GOOGLE INC. TO MOTION TO DISMISS OR TRANSFER) to Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction titled as "Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction andAlternative Motion to Change or Transfer Venue " 8 . Filed by Traffic Information LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Second Declaration of Kevin Russell, # 2 Attachment Declaration of Richard Qian, # 3 Attachment Declaration of Bruce DeKock) (Quisenberry, C.)
September 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time 15 is GRANTED. Defendant's reply in support of its Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and, Alternative Motion to Change or Transfer Venue 8 is now due 9/18/09. Oral argument on the motion remains set for 10/21/09. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Dennis J. Hubel. (kb)
September 10, 2009 Filing 16 Order - Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of C. Dale Quisenberry for Traffic Information LLC. Application Fee in amount of $100 collected. Receipt No. 28910 issued. Signed on 9/9/2009 by Magistrate Judge Dennis J. Hubel. (ecp)
September 9, 2009 Filing 15 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief. Filed by Traffic Information LLC. (DeJong, Timothy)
September 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 14 RECORD OF SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Dennis J. Hubel: Oral argument on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and Alternative Motion to Change or Transfer Venue 8 is set for October 21, 2009, at 10:00 a.m., in Courtroom #9B. (kb)
September 3, 2009 Filing 13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice titled as "Application for Special Admission - Pro Hac Vice For C. Dale Quisenberry ". Filed by Traffic Information LLC. (DeJong, Timothy) Modified on 9/14/2009 (ljl).
August 28, 2009 Filing 12 Declaration of Christina J. Moser. Filed by Google Inc.. (Related document(s): Memorandum in Opposition, 11 .) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22) (Markley, Julia)
August 28, 2009 Filing 11 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction titled as "Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction andAlternative Motion to Change or Transfer Venue " 8 Oral Argument requested. Filed by Google Inc.. (Markley, Julia)
August 14, 2009 Filing 10 Declaration of Kevin L. Russell In Support of Traffic Information, LLC's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and Alternative Motion to Transfer Venue. Filed by Traffic Information LLC. (Related document(s): Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction,, Motion to change/transfer venue, 8 .) (DeJong, Timothy)
August 14, 2009 Filing 9 Memorandum in Support of Traffic Information, LLC's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and Alternative Motion to Transfer Venue. Filed by Traffic Information LLC. (Related document(s): Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction,, Motion to change/transfer venue, 8 .) (DeJong, Timothy)
August 14, 2009 Filing 8 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction titled as "Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and, Alternative Motion to Change or Transfer Venue ". Oral Argument requested. Filed by all defendants. (DeJong, Timothy)
July 31, 2009 Filing 7 Summons Returned Executed. as to Traffic Information LLC served on 7/30/2009, answer due on 8/19/2009 Filed by Google Inc.. (Markley, Julia)
July 28, 2009 Summons Issued as to Traffic Information LLC (ljl)
June 26, 2009 Filing 6 Order Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Christina J. Moser for Google Inc.. Application Fee in amount of $100 collected. Receipt No. 27525 issued. Signed on 06/26/09 by Magistrate Judge Dennis J. Hubel. (pvh)
June 26, 2009 Filing 5 Order Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Thomas H. Shunk for Google Inc.. Application Fee in amount of $100 collected. Receipt No. 27524 issued. Signed on 06/26/09 by Magistrate Judge Dennis J. Hubel. (pvh)
June 12, 2009 Filing 4 Patent Report: This report is submitted pursuant to Title 35 Section 290 USC which requires the clerks of the courts of the United States, within one month after the filing of an action under this title shall give notice thereof in writing to the Commissioner, setting forth so far as known the names and addresses of the parties, name of the inventor, and the designating number of the patent upon which the action has been brought. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Complaint) (ecp)
June 12, 2009 Filing 3 Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order and Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Dennis J. Hubel. Discovery is to be completed by 10/7/2009. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 11/6/2009. Pretrial Order is due by 11/6/2009. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Dennis J. Hubel. (ecp)
June 9, 2009 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement. Filed by Google Inc.. (ecp)
June 9, 2009 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing Fee in amount of $350 collected. Receipt No. 27364 issued Jury Trial Requested: Yes.Filed by Google Inc. against Traffic Information LLC. (ecp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Google Inc. v. Traffic Information LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Google Inc.
Represented By: Julia E. Markley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Traffic Information LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?