Feken-Criss v. Commissioner Social Security

Defendant: Commissioner Social Security
Plaintiff: Carol Ann Feken-Criss
Case Number: 3:2011cv00740
Filed: June 17, 2011
Court: Oregon District Court
Office: Portland Office
Presiding Judge: James A. Redden
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 12, 2013 39 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER. Plaintiff's motion for attorneys' fees (#29) is granted in the amount of $18,719.50. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed on 03/12/2013 by Judge James A. Redden. (pvh)
January 7, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER for EAJA Fees. Signed on 01/07/2013 by Judge James A. Redden. (pvh)
July 17, 2012 22 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER. Signed on 07/17/2012 by Judge James A. Redden. (pvh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Feken-Criss v. Commissioner Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Social Security
Represented By: Adrian L. Brown
Represented By: Nancy A. Mishalanie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Ann Feken-Criss
Represented By: Martin R. Cohen
Represented By: Linda S. Ziskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?