Baldin et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al

Plaintiff: Amy Baldin and Lugano Properties 4, LLC
Defendant: Northwest Trustee Services, Inc., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. and Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2012cv00648
Filed: April 12, 2012
Court: Oregon District Court
Office: Portland (3) Office
Presiding Judge: John V. Acosta
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 24, 2016 223 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION and ORDER - I agree with Judge Acosta's recommendation and I ADOPT the F&R 219 as my own opinion. IT IS SO ORDERED. DATED this 24th day of May, 2016, by Chief United States District Judge Michael W. Mosman (peg)
September 16, 2015 203 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER: Upon review, I agree with Judge Acostas recommendation and I ADOPT the F&R 199 as my own opinion. Signed on 9/16/15 by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (dls)
December 6, 2013 138 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER: Upon review, I agree with Judge Acostas recommendation, and I ADOPT the F&R 133 as my own opinion. Signed on 12/6/13 by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (dls)
March 4, 2013 102 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER: Upon review, I agree with Judge Acostas recommendation, and I ADOPT the F&R 100 as my own opinion. Signed on 3/4/13 by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (dls)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baldin et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Baldin
Represented By: Michael P. O'Rourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lugano Properties 4, LLC
Represented By: Michael P. O'Rourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northwest Trustee Services, Inc.
Represented By: Ian H. Kyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Brian T. Kiolbasa
Represented By: Lee C. Nusich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc.
Represented By: Brian T. Kiolbasa
Represented By: Lee C. Nusich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?