Margulies et al v. Tri-County Metropolitan Transportation Dist. of Oregon

Plaintiff: Christopher Day, Allen Margulies and John Olsen
Defendant: Tri-County Metropolitan Transportation Dist. of Oregon
Case Number: 3:2013cv00475
Filed: March 20, 2013
Court: Oregon District Court
Office: Portland (3) Office
Presiding Judge: Paul Papak
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act - Denial of Overtime Compensation
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 2, 2015 192 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED OPINION & ORDER: TriMet's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment as to All State Law Claims 146 is Denied in Part as it applies to Split-Shift Travel Time, Pre-Departure Time, Meeting Time, and Medical Examination Time related to compulsory examinations during the workday. TriMet's Motion is Granted in Part as it applies to Start-End Travel Time, Routinely Late Time, and the licensing and certification aspect of Medical Examination Time. TriMet's Motion for Pa rtial Summmy Judgment as to MAX Operators' FLSA Claims 153 is Denied in Part as it applies to Split-Shift Travel Time, Pre-Departure Time, the category of Meeting Time related to payroll corrections, and Medical Examination Time related to compulsory examinations during the workday. TriMet's Motion is Granted in Part as it applies to Start-End Travel Time, Routinely Late Time, the categories of Meeting Time related to travel and waiting, and the licensing and certification aspect of Medical Examination Time. Finally, TriMet's Motion to Strike 189 is Denied as Moot. Signed on 7/2/15 by Magistrate Judge Paul Papak. (gm)
June 30, 2015 191 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION and ORDER - TriMet's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment as to All State Law Claims 146 is denied in part as it applies to Split-Shift Travel Time, Pre-Departure Time, Meeting Time, and Medical Examination Time related to comp ulsory examinations during the workday. TriMet's Motion is granted in part as it applies to Start-End Travel Time, Routinely Late Time, and the licensing and certification aspect of Medical Examination Time. TriMet's Motion for Partial Sum mary Judgment as to MAX Operators' FLSA Claims 153 is denied in part as it applies to Split-Shift Travel Time, Pre-Departure Time, the category of Meeting Time related to payroll corrections, and Medical Examination Time related to compuls ory examinations during the workday. TriMet's Motion is granted in part as it applies toStart-End Travel Time, Routinely Late Time, the categories of Meeting Time related to travel and waiting, and the licensing and certification aspect of Medical Examination Time. Finally, TriMet's Motion to Strike 189 is denied as moot. Signed on 6/30/2015 by Magistrate Judge Paul Papak. (mja)
September 8, 2014 136 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION & ORDER: TriMet's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 120 is Granted in Part and Denied in Part. The sixty-five plaintiffs, including Margulies, who ceased working as a bus or train operator prior to June 22, 2012, failed to provide timely notice under the OTCA and, thus, summary judgment on those plaintiffs' state-law claims is Granted in favor of TriMet. The remaining twenty-eight plaintiffs identified in TriMet's motion provided timely notice and, thus, summary judgment on those plaintiffs' state-law claims is Denied. Signed on 9/8/14 by Magistrate Judge Paul Papak. (gm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Margulies et al v. Tri-County Metropolitan Transportation Dist. of Oregon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Day
Represented By: Paul L. Breed
Represented By: Steven G. Tidrick
Represented By: Joel B. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allen Margulies
Represented By: Paul L. Breed
Represented By: Steven G. Tidrick
Represented By: Joel B. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Olsen
Represented By: Paul L. Breed
Represented By: Steven G. Tidrick
Represented By: Joel B. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tri-County Metropolitan Transportation Dist. of Oregon
Represented By: Kimberly A. Sewell
Represented By: Gregory E. Skillman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?