Visser v. Commissioner Social Security Administration

Defendant: Commissioner Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Harold Visser
Case Number: 3:2013cv00508
Filed: March 25, 2013
Court: Oregon District Court
Office: Portland (3) Office
Presiding Judge: Janice M. Stewart
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:0405g Review of Commissioner's Final Decision
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 15, 2015 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Court ADOPTS Magistrate Judge Stewart's Findings and Recommendation 25 . Accordingly, the Court GRANTS Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion 24 for Attorney Fees under 28 U.S.C. § 406(b); AWARDS Plaintiffs counsel attorneys fees in the amount of $5,639.20; and DIRECTS Plaintiffs counsel to refund to Plaintiff the attorneys fees of $2,054.20 previously received byPlaintiffs counsel pursuant to the EAJA. Signed on 01/15/2015 by Judge Anna J. Brown. (bb)
July 29, 2014 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Granting Stipulated Motion for Fees Pursuant to EAJA 21 . Signed on 7/29/14 by Magistrate Judge Janice M. Stewart. (jlr)
April 29, 2014 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Court ADOPTS Magistrate Judge Stewart's Findings and Recommendation 17 . Accordingly, the Court REVERSES the decision of the Commissioner and REMANDS this matter pursuant to sentence four of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g) for the calculation and award of benefits. Signed on 04/29/2014 by Judge Anna J. Brown. (bb) Modified on 4/30/2014 to correct date of signature of judge (bb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Visser v. Commissioner Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Social Security Administration
Represented By: Adrian L. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold Visser
Represented By: Merrill Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?