Simpson v. Commissioner Social Security Administration

Defendant: Commissioner Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Dale Simpson
Case Number: 3:2013cv00584
Filed: April 4, 2013
Court: Oregon District Court
Office: Portland (3) Office
Presiding Judge: Michael H. Simon
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 10, 2016 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Plaintiff's counsel's amended motion for attorney fees pursuant to 42 U.S.C. § 406(b) (Dkt. 22 ) is GRANTED. Plaintiff's counsel is entitled to $16,902.22, in § 406(b) fees, representing approximately 25 percent of Plaintiff's retroactive benefits recovery. When issuing the section 406(b) check for payment to Plaintiff's attorney, the Commissioner is directed to subtract the $4,484.57 previously awarded under EAJA and send Plaintiff&# 039;s attorney the balance of $12,417.65, less any applicable administrative assessment as allowed by statute. The original motion for § 406(b) fees (Dkt. 21 ) is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed on 2/10/2016 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja) Modified on 2/10/2016 to change date signed (mja).
January 23, 2015 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Granting Plaintiff's Application for Fees Pursuant to EAJA 18 . Plaintiff is awarded $4,484.57 for attorney's fees under 28 U.S.C. § 2412. EAJA fees are subject to any offsets allowed under the Treasury Offset P rogram, as discussed in Ratliff, 560 U.S. at 593-94. Because Plaintiff has filed with the court an assignment of EAJA fees to counsel (Dkt. 18 -1), Defendant shall cause the payment of fees, after any applicable offsets, to be made directly to Plaintiff's counsel. Signed on 1/23/2015 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
November 6, 2014 16 Opinion or Order of the Court Opinion and Order - The decision by the Commissioner is REMANDED for further proceedings. Signed on 11/6/14 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simpson v. Commissioner Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Social Security Administration
Represented By: Adrian L. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale Simpson
Represented By: Steven J. Munson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?