A.F. et al v. Providence Health Plan

Plaintiff: A.F. and A.P.
Defendant: Providence Health Plan
Case Number: 3:2013cv00776
Filed: May 8, 2013
Court: Oregon District Court
Office: Portland (3) Office
Presiding Judge: Dennis J. Hubel
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 24, 2016 147 Opinion or Order of the Court Opinion and Order - Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel (Dkt. 134 ) is GRANTED IN PART, as described on pages 26-30 of this Opinion and Order. Signed on 3/24/2016 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
January 7, 2016 133 Opinion or Order of the Court Opinion and Order - Plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment (Dkt. 105 ) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART, and Providence's motion to dismiss (Dkt. 111 ) is DENIED. Signed on 1/7/2016 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
August 8, 2014 91 Opinion or Order of the Court Opinion and Order - Plaintiffs' motion for partial summary judgment (Dkt. 59 ) is GRANTED, and Defendant's cross motion (Dkt. 67 ) is DENIED. Signed on 8/8/2014 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
December 24, 2013 56 Opinion or Order of the Court Opinion and Order - The Court finds that Plaintiffs have satisfied all of the requirements of Rule 23(a) and Rule 23(b)(2). Accordingly, the Court GRANTS Plaintiffs' Motion to Certify the injunctive 101 Class 36 . The class claim to be decided is whether Providence is violating ERISA or Oregon law by denying members coverage under the Developmental Disability Exclusion for ABA therapy services. The Court appoints Plaintiffs as class representatives, Stoll Stoll Berne Lokting & Shlacheter and Keith Dubanevich as lead class counsel, and Megan Glor as co-class counsel. The class is further defined in this Opinion and Order. Signed on 12/24/2013 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: A.F. et al v. Providence Health Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.F.
Represented By: Keith S. Dubanevich
Represented By: Nadine A. Gartner
Represented By: Megan E. Glor
Represented By: Joshua L. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.P.
Represented By: Keith S. Dubanevich
Represented By: Nadine A. Gartner
Represented By: Megan E. Glor
Represented By: Joshua L. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Providence Health Plan
Represented By: Aaron T. Bals
Represented By: William F. Gary
Represented By: Arden J. Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?