Beck v. Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Lucille Beck
Defendant: Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2013cv00879
Filed: May 24, 2013
Court: Oregon District Court
Office: Portland (3) Office
Presiding Judge: John V. Acosta
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 16, 2016 222 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED OPINION and ORDER - For the aforementioned reasons, Becks Motion for Attorneys Fees and Costs 205 , 207 is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. Beck is awarded attorney fees in the amount of $1,081,370.50 and costs in the amount of $9,254.96. IT IS SO ORDERED. DATED this 16th day of September, 2016, by United States Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (peg)
September 12, 2016 221 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION and ORDER - Becks Motion for Attorneys Fees and Costs 205 and Cost Bill 207 are GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. Beck is awarded attorney fees in the amount of $984,544.50 and costs in the amount of $9,254.96.IT IS SO ORDERED. DATED this 12th day of September, 2016, by United States Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (peg)
July 6, 2015 114 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION and ORDER - Metropolitan's motion for partial summary judgment 104 is DENIED and Beck's motion for partial summary judgment 92 is GRANTED. Beck's claims will proceed to trial for the purpose of determining the true RCV and ACV of her home. IT IS SO ORDERED. DATED this 6th day of July, 2015, by United States Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (peg)
August 26, 2014 86 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION and ORDER - Metropolitan's Motion for Leave to Amend Answer and Affirmative Defenses 54 is DENIED. IT IS SO ORDERED. DATED this 26th day of August, 2014, by United States Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (peg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beck v. Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucille Beck
Represented By: Andrew T. Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?