Farmers Insurance Exchange et al v. First Choice Chiropractic & Rehabilitation et al

Plaintiff: 21st Century Centennial Insurance Company, 21st Century Insurance Company, 21st Century Pacific Insurance Company, Coast National Insurance Company, Farmers Insurance Company of Oregon, Farmers Insurance Company of Washington, Farmers Insurance Exchange, Mid-Century Insurance Company and Truck Insurance Exchange
Defendant: David Avolio, Sunita Bhasin, Kelly Coley, Marcus Cool, Aaron Davison, First Choice Chiropractic & Rehabilitation, Joel Ingersoll, Ajay Mohabeer, David Petroff, Sean Robins and Pardis Tajipour
Case Number: 3:2013cv01883
Filed: October 22, 2013
Court: Oregon District Court
Office: Portland (3) Office
Presiding Judge: Paul Papak
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 15, 2016 333 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - The Court ADOPTS IN PART Judge Papak's Findings and Recommendations. Dkt. 319 . Defendants' Motion to Amend (Dkt. 231 ) is DENIED as moot. Defendants' Second Motion for Summary Judgment (Dkt. 172 ) is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART, as described in Judge Papak's Findings and Recommendations (Dkt. 319 ), with the exception of Judge Papak's recommendation that Plaintiffs' UTPA damages should be reduced by the amount that Plaintiffs have already been reimbursed by other insurers. The parties will submit additional briefing on that issue as directed in this Order. Defendants' Third Motion for Summary Judgment (Dkt. 182 ) is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART, as described in Judge Papa k's Findings and Recommendations (Dkt. 319). Defendants' First Motion to Strike (Dkt. 236 ) is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. Defendants' First Motion to Strike is GRANTED to the extent it seeks to strike paragraph 65 of the Darn ell Declaration. Defendants' First Motion to Strike is DENIED in all other respects. Defendants' Second Motion to Strike (Dkt. 288 ) is DENIED. Plaintiffs' Second Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Dkt. 184 ) is DENIED. Plaintiffs& #039; Third Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Dkt. 206 ) is DENIED. Plaintiffs' Fourth Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Dkt. 211 ) is DENIED. Plaintiffs' Motions to Strike (Dkts. 295 , 297 ) are both DENIED. Signed on 4/15/2016 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
July 22, 2015 157 Opinion or Order of the Court Opinion and Order - The Court ADOPTS Judge Papak's Findings and Recommendation. Dkt. 145 . Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Dkt. 93 ) is GRANTED, and Defendants' Fourth, Sixth, and Seventh Counterclaims for defamation , tortious interference with contract, and tortious interference with prospective economic advantage are DISMISSED. Defendants' Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Dkt. 128 ) is DENIED as it applies to Plaintiffs' Fifth cause of act ion under the UTPA. Defendants' Cross-Motion is GRANTED in part as it applies to: (a) Plaintiffs' claims for violation of RICO and ORICO (Second, Third, and Fourth causes of action), and to the extent Plaintiffs seek recovery on claims for which they have received partial or full reimbursement; (b) Plaintiffs common law fraud claim (First cause of action), to the extent Plaintiffs seek recovery on claims for which they have received partial or full reimbursement; and (c) Plaintiffs 9; unjust enrichment claim (Sixth cause of action), to the extent Plaintiffs seek recovery on claims for which they have received partial or full reimbursement. Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike the Declaration of Robert Dietz, as articulated in its Response to First Choice's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Dkt 140 ), is DENIED. Signed on 7/22/2015 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
July 18, 2014 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - The Court ADOPTS Judge Papak's Findings and Recommendation (Dkt. 41 ). The Court grants in part and denies in part defendants First Choice, Dr. Bhasin, Kelly Coley, David Petroff, and Dr. Tajipour's motion to dismiss and mo tion to strike (Dkt. 19 ), grants in part and denies in part defendant Dr. Cool's motion to dismiss and motion to strike (Dkt. 22 ), grants in part and denies in part defendants Dr. Davidson, Dr. Ingersoll, and Dr. Robins's motion to dism iss and motion to strike (Dkt. 28 ), and grants in part and denies in part Dr. Mohabeer's motion to dismiss and motion to strike (Dkt. 34 ). The Court dismisses without prejudice and with leave to amend Plaintiffs' FAC to the extent it seeks $2,096,926 in damages relating to third-party claims (Dkt. 10 ). Signed on 7/18/2014 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Farmers Insurance Exchange et al v. First Choice Chiropractic & Rehabilitation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 21st Century Centennial Insurance Company
Represented By: Ryan J. Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 21st Century Insurance Company
Represented By: Ryan J. Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 21st Century Pacific Insurance Company
Represented By: Ryan J. Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coast National Insurance Company
Represented By: Ryan J. Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Farmers Insurance Company of Oregon
Represented By: Ryan J. Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Farmers Insurance Company of Washington
Represented By: Ryan J. Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Farmers Insurance Exchange
Represented By: Ryan J. Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mid-Century Insurance Company
Represented By: Ryan J. Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Truck Insurance Exchange
Represented By: Ryan J. Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Avolio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunita Bhasin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Coley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcus Cool
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Davison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Choice Chiropractic & Rehabilitation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joel Ingersoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ajay Mohabeer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Petroff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean Robins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pardis Tajipour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?