Makaneole v. Solarworld Industries America, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Michael Makaneole
Defendant: Kelly Services, Inc., Randstad Professionals US, LP, SolarWorld Industries America, LP, SolarWorld Industries Services, LLC, SolarWorld Power Projects, Inc. and Solarworld Industries America, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2014cv01528
Filed: September 24, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Office: Portland (3) Office
Presiding Judge: Paul Papak
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 259 OPINION AND ORDER: Upon review, I agree with Judge Russos recommendation and I ADOPT the F&R 246 as my own opinion. Mr. Makaneoles Motion to File a Second Amended Complaint 230 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Specifically, Mr. Makaneole m ay amend his complaint with respect to his ORS Chapter 652 claims but may not amend with respect to his Chapter 653 claims. The amended complaint is due fourteen days from the date of this order Signed on 9/23/2019 by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (kms)
May 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDER: Adopting the Magistrate's Findings and Recommendation 198 . Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification 164 is Granted. Signed on 5/29/18 by Judge Anna J. Brown. (gm)
February 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 191 OPINION & ORDER: Makaneole's constructive Request/Motion 189 for partial stay of these proceedings is Denied. Signed on 2/2/18 by Magistrate Judge Paul Papak. (gm)
May 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER: Adopting the Magistrate's Findings and Recommendation 160 . Defendant Kelly's Bill of Costs 153 is Denied. Signed on 5/30/17 by Judge Anna J. Brown. (gm)
January 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER: Adopting the Magistrate's Findings and Recommendation 126 . Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Production of Documents 79 is Granted in Part and Denied in Part; Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Interrogatory Respon ses 81 is Granted in Part and Denied in Part; Solarworld's Motion for Summary Judgment 82 is Denied; Kelly's Motion for Summary Judgment 84 is Granted; Randstad's Motion for Summary Judgment 86 is Granted in Part and Denied in Part; Kelly's Request for Judicial Notice 119 is Granted; and Randstad's Request for Judicial Notice 122 is Granted. Signed on 1/17/17 by Judge Anna J. Brown. (gm)
March 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER: The Court ADOPTS as modified Magistrate Judge Papaks Findings and Recommendation 43 . Accordingly, the Court: 1. DENIES Kelly Services Motion 7 to Dismiss; 2. GRANTS Kelly Services Alternative Motion 7 for More Definite Statement pursuant to Rule 12(e); 3. GRANTS Randstad Professionals Motion 10 to Dismiss as to Plaintiffs First, Second, and Third Claims; 4. DENIES Randstad Professionals Motion 10 to Dismissas to Plaintiffs request for attorneys fees; 5. DISMISSES withou t prejudice Plaintiffs First, Second, and Third Claims; and 6. GRANTS Plaintiff leave to file an Amended Complaint no later than April 6, 2015, to cure the deficiencies set out in the Findings and Recommendation. Signed on 03/09/2015 by Judge Anna J. Brown. (bb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Makaneole v. Solarworld Industries America, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Services, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua M. Henderson
Represented By: Michael W. Kopp
Represented By: Gerald L. Maatman, Jr.
Represented By: Andrew S. Moses
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randstad Professionals US, LP
Represented By: Clarence M. Belnavis
Represented By: Elizabeth K. Bonucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SolarWorld Industries America, LP
Represented By: John Baird Dudrey
Represented By: Todd A. Hanchett
Represented By: Victor Joseph Kisch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SolarWorld Industries Services, LLC
Represented By: John Baird Dudrey
Represented By: Todd A. Hanchett
Represented By: Victor Joseph Kisch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SolarWorld Power Projects, Inc.
Represented By: John Baird Dudrey
Represented By: Todd A. Hanchett
Represented By: Victor Joseph Kisch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Solarworld Industries America, Inc.
Represented By: John Baird Dudrey
Represented By: Todd A. Hanchett
Represented By: Victor Joseph Kisch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Makaneole
Represented By: Karen A. Moore
Represented By: David Arthur Schuck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?