Colcord v. Premera Blue Cross
Plaintiff: Colcord and Marshall Colcord
Defendant: Premera Blue Cross
Case Number: 3:2015cv00516
Filed: March 27, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Office: Portland (3) Office
Presiding Judge: Michael H Simon
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other Contract Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2020 Filing 309 JUDGMENT. Signed on 3/2/2020 by Judge Michael H. Simon. Docketed in all Member Cases. (mja)
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 308 Order Granting Motion for Attorney's Fees, Costs, and Service Awards. Signed on 3/2/2020 by Judge Michael H. Simon. Docketed in all Member Cases. (mja)
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 307 Order Granting Final Approval of Class Action Settlement. Signed on 3/2/2020 by Judge Michael H. Simon. Docketed in all Member Cases. (mja)
March 2, 2020 Filing 306 MINUTES OF FAIRNESS HEARING: ORDER - All objections that have been received by the Court are overruled. Class Member Ronald Owen's Motion to Deny Attorney Fees & Awards (ECF #308 ) is denied. Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement (ECF #281 ) and Plaintiffs' Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees (ECF #284 ) will be addressed in separate written orders to follow. Kim D. Stephens, Keith S. Dubanevich, Jason T. Dennett, Tina Wolfson, Cicily Shiel, and Yoona Park present as counsel for Plaintiffs. Paul G. Karlsgodt, James A. Sherer, Darin M. Sands, and Tim McMichael present as counsel for Defendant. Christopher Love present as counsel for Class Members Laura Webster, Gabriel Webster, Ross Imbler, Shrif Ailey, and April Allred. Court Reporter: Dennis Apodaca. Judge Michael H. Simon presiding. Docketed in all Member Cases. (mja)
March 2, 2020 Filing 305 Declaration of Darrell L. Cochran . Filed by All Plaintiffs. Docketed in all Member Cases. (Cochran, Darrell)
February 28, 2020 Filing 304 Motion to Deny Attorney Fees. filedby Ronald Owen. Associated Cases: 3:15-md-02633-SI, 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 3:15-cv-01262-SI, 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 3:15-cv-01392-SI, 3:15-cv-01472-SI, 3:17-cv-01648-SI (joha) Modified on 3/2/2020 change title of motion (mja).
February 19, 2020 Filing 303 Declaration of Jason T. Dennett . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Reply to Motion,,,,,,,,,, (294 in 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 317 in 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 288 in 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 290 in 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 297 in 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 295 in 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 284 in 3:15-cv-01392-SI, 289 in 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 289 in 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 292 in 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 288 in 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 289 in 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 289 in 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 302 in 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 292 in 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 290 in 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 290 in 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 294 in 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 311 in 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 292 in 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 305 in 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 298 in 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 293 in 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 178 in 3:17-cv-01648-SI, 294 in 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 296 in 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 295 in 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 305 in 3:15-md-02633-SI, 304 in 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 290 in 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 293 in 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 299 in 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 291 in 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 294 in 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 288 in 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 289 in 3:15-cv-01262-SI, 291 in 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 290 in 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 301 in 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 292 in 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 261 in 3:15-cv-01472-SI, 304 in 3:15-cv-01170-SI).) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-9)Docketed in all Member Cases. (Stephens, Kim)
February 19, 2020 Filing 302 Supplemental Declaration of Kim D. Stephens . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Reply to Motion,,,,,,,,,, (294 in 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 317 in 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 288 in 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 290 in 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 297 in 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 295 in 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 284 in 3:15-cv-01392-SI, 289 in 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 289 in 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 292 in 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 288 in 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 289 in 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 289 in 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 302 in 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 292 in 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 290 in 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 290 in 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 294 in 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 311 in 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 292 in 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 305 in 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 298 in 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 293 in 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 178 in 3:17-cv-01648-SI, 294 in 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 296 in 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 295 in 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 305 in 3:15-md-02633-SI, 304 in 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 290 in 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 293 in 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 299 in 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 291 in 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 294 in 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 288 in 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 289 in 3:15-cv-01262-SI, 291 in 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 290 in 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 301 in 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 292 in 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 261 in 3:15-cv-01472-SI, 304 in 3:15-cv-01170-SI).) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)Docketed in all Member Cases. (Stephens, Kim)
February 19, 2020 Filing 301 Reply in Support of to Motion for Settlement Titled as "Plaintiffs Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Memorandum in Support"(265 in 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 273 in 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 267 in 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 272 in 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 260 in 3:15-cv-01392-SI, 268 in 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 274 in 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 264 in 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 266 in 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 281 in 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 269 in 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 278 in 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 266 in 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 268 in 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 270 in 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 275 in 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 267 in 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 270 in 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 237 in 3:15-cv-01472-SI, 264 in 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 270 in 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 268 in 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 266 in 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 265 in 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 154 in 3:17-cv-01648-SI, 287 in 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 271 in 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 266 in 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 280 in 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 281 in 3:15-md-02633-SI, 265 in 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 270 in 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 271 in 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 264 in 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 266 in 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 293 in 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 277 in 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 265 in 3:15-cv-01262-SI, 280 in 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 269 in 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 268 in 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 265 in 3:15-cv-01163-SI), Motion for Attorney Fees Titled as "Plaintiffs' Motion and Supporting Memorandum For an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Expenses and for Representative Plaintiff Service Awards"(269 in 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 269 in 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 263 in 3:15-cv-01392-SI, 270 in 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 280 in 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 240 in 3:15-cv-01472-SI, 268 in 3:15-cv-01262-SI, 283 in 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 290 in 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 271 in 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 269 in 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 271 in 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 274 in 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 267 in 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 268 in 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 268 in 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 276 in 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 273 in 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 267 in 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 278 in 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 273 in 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 272 in 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 281 in 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 268 in 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 271 in 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 269 in 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 284 in 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 274 in 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 277 in 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 284 in 3:15-md-02633-SI, 273 in 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 283 in 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 268 in 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 271 in 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 272 in 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 269 in 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 157 in 3:17-cv-01648-SI, 296 in 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 267 in 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 270 in 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 275 in 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 273 in 3:15-cv-01161-SI) Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Plaintiffs.Docketed in all Member Cases. (Stephens, Kim)
February 6, 2020 Filing 300 Declaration of Rachel McCown in Support of Response to February 3, 2020 Court Order. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Scheduling,,,,,,,, (299 in 3:15-md-02633-SI).)Docketed in all Member Cases. (Stephens, Kim)
February 6, 2020 Filing 299 Declaration of Kim D. Stephens in Support of Response to February 3, 2020 Court Order. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Scheduling,,,,,,,, (299 in 3:15-md-02633-SI).)Docketed in all Member Cases. (Stephens, Kim)
February 6, 2020 Filing 298 Brief Class Counsel's Response to February 3, 2020 Court Order. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Scheduling,,,,,,,, (299 in 3:15-md-02633-SI).)Docketed in all Member Cases. (Stephens, Kim)
February 6, 2020 Filing 297 Supplemental Declaration of Cameron R. Azari on Implementation and Adequacy of Settlement Notice Plan. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Settlement, (265 in 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 273 in 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 267 in 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 272 in 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 260 in 3:15-cv-01392-SI, 268 in 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 274 in 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 264 in 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 266 in 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 281 in 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 269 in 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 278 in 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 266 in 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 268 in 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 270 in 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 275 in 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 267 in 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 270 in 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 237 in 3:15-cv-01472-SI, 264 in 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 270 in 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 268 in 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 266 in 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 265 in 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 154 in 3:17-cv-01648-SI, 287 in 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 271 in 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 266 in 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 280 in 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 281 in 3:15-md-02633-SI, 265 in 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 270 in 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 271 in 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 264 in 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 266 in 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 293 in 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 277 in 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 265 in 3:15-cv-01262-SI, 280 in 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 269 in 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 268 in 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 265 in 3:15-cv-01163-SI).)Docketed in all Member Cases. (Stephens, Kim)
February 4, 2020 Filing 296 Objection(s) by Lynn Apiyo Adidas. Filed by All Plaintiffs.Associated Cases: 3:15-md-02633-SI, 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 3:15-cv-01262-SI, 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 3:15-cv-01392-SI, 3:15-cv-01472-SI, 3:17-cv-01648-SI (Dubanevich, Keith)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 295 ORDER - In the Court's Opinion and Order Preliminarily Approving Class Action Settlement and Notice Procedures and Setting Final Approval Hearing (ECF #279 ) at Page 57, paragraph 19, the Court ordered as follows: "All opening briefs and supporting documents in support of a request for final approval of the Settlement, the Settlement Benefits, the Service Award, and a motion for Attorney's Fees and Costs must be filed and served on or before January 10, 2020, and must be posted on the Settlement Website." (emphasis added). This order was made, in part, to ensure that counsel's motion for attorney's fees and supporting documents complied with the requirements of In re Mercury, 618 F.3d 988 (9th Cir. 2010), and Rule 23(h)(1) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure to provide adequate notice of the attorney's fee motion, directed to class members in a reasonable manner, in sufficient time before the deadline for objections so that class members could meaningfully evaluate the motion and consider potential objections. The Long Form Notice to class members also stated that the motion for attorney's fees and its supporting documents would be made available on the website before the deadline to object (See ECF 273 -1 at 61). Several objectors, who are also among the Named Plaintiffs in this action, have raised objections (see ECF Nos. #290 - #294 ). Their objections include that class counsel did not post the fee motion and supporting documents on the settlement website by January 10, 2020, as ordered by the Court, and that the documents were not posted as late as January 28, 2020, even though the deadline for class member objections was January 29, 2020. The Court visited the settlement website, www.premerasettlement.com, today and did not see the motions for final approval or attorney's fees. Class Counsel is ordered to respond on or before February 6, 2020, describing how Class Counsel complied with the Court's order contained in Paragraph 19 on Page 57 of the Opinion and Order granting preliminary approval of the settlement. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. Filed in all associated cases of 3:15-md-02633-SI. (mja)
February 3, 2020 Filing 294 Objection by Ian Hickey to Proposed Settlement. Filed in all associated cases of 3:15-md-02633-SI. (mja)
February 3, 2020 Filing 293 Objection by Anita Hickey to Proposed Settlement. Filed in all associated cases of 3:15-md-02633-SI. (mja)
February 3, 2020 Filing 292 Objection by John Hickey to Proposed Settlement. Filed in all associated cases of 3:15-md-02633-SI. (mja)
February 3, 2020 Filing 291 Objection by Kim Simonsen to Proposed Settlement. Filed in all associated cases of 3:15-md-02633-SI. (mja)
January 31, 2020 Filing 290 Objection by April Allred to Proposed Settlement. Filed in all associated cases of 3:15-md-02633-SI. (mja)
January 31, 2020 Filing 289 Objection by Ross Imbler to Proposed Settlement. Filed in all associated cases of 3:15-md-02633-SI. (mja)
January 31, 2020 Filing 288 Objection by Shrif Ailey to Proposed Settlement. Filed in all associated cases of 3:15-md-02633-SI. (mja)
January 31, 2020 Filing 287 Objection by Laura Webster to Proposed Settlement. Filed in all associated cases of 3:15-md-02633-SI. (mja)
January 31, 2020 Filing 286 Objection by Gabriel Webster to Proposed Settlement. Filed in all associated cases of 3:15-md-02633-SI. (mja)
January 24, 2020 Filing 283 Objection by Nancy Costlow to Proposed Settlement. Associated Cases: 3:15-md-02633-SI, 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 3:15-cv-01262-SI, 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 3:15-cv-01392-SI, 3:15-cv-01472-SI, 3:17-cv-01648-SI (sb)
January 13, 2020 Filing 282 Objection by Anna Silverfish to Proposed Settlement. Associated Cases: 3:15-md-02633-SI, 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 3:15-cv-01262-SI, 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 3:15-cv-01392-SI, 3:15-cv-01472-SI, 3:17-cv-01648-SI (sb)
January 10, 2020 Filing 281 Declaration of Kim D. Stephens in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval and Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Settlement, (265 in 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 273 in 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 267 in 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 272 in 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 260 in 3:15-cv-01392-SI, 268 in 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 274 in 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 264 in 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 266 in 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 281 in 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 269 in 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 278 in 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 266 in 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 268 in 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 270 in 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 275 in 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 267 in 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 270 in 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 237 in 3:15-cv-01472-SI, 264 in 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 270 in 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 268 in 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 266 in 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 265 in 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 154 in 3:17-cv-01648-SI, 287 in 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 271 in 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 266 in 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 280 in 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 281 in 3:15-md-02633-SI, 265 in 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 270 in 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 271 in 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 264 in 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 266 in 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 293 in 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 277 in 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 265 in 3:15-cv-01262-SI, 280 in 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 269 in 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 268 in 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 265 in 3:15-cv-01163-SI), Motion for Attorney Fees, (269 in 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 269 in 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 263 in 3:15-cv-01392-SI, 270 in 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 280 in 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 240 in 3:15-cv-01472-SI, 268 in 3:15-cv-01262-SI, 283 in 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 290 in 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 271 in 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 269 in 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 271 in 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 274 in 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 267 in 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 268 in 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 268 in 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 276 in 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 273 in 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 267 in 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 278 in 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 273 in 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 272 in 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 281 in 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 268 in 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 271 in 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 269 in 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 284 in 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 274 in 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 277 in 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 284 in 3:15-md-02633-SI, 273 in 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 283 in 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 268 in 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 271 in 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 272 in 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 269 in 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 157 in 3:17-cv-01648-SI, 296 in 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 267 in 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 270 in 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 275 in 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 273 in 3:15-cv-01161-SI).) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A1, #2 Exhibit A2, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C1-C15, #5 Exhibit C16-C30)Docketed in all Member Cases. (Stephens, Kim)
January 10, 2020 Filing 280 Motion for Attorney Fees Titled as "Plaintiffs' Motion and Supporting Memorandum For an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Expenses and for Representative Plaintiff Service Awards". Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Docketed in all Member Cases. (Stephens, Kim)
January 10, 2020 Filing 279 Supplemental Declaration of Cameron R. Azari, Esq. on Implementation and Adequacy of Settlement Notice Plan. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Settlement, (154 in 3:17-cv-01648-SI).)Docketed in all Member Cases. (Park, Yoona)
January 10, 2020 Filing 278 Declaration of Keith S. Dubanevich in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Settlement, (154 in 3:17-cv-01648-SI).)Docketed in all Member Cases. (Park, Yoona)
January 10, 2020 Filing 277 Motion for Settlement Titled as "Plaintiffs Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Memorandum in Support". Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Document Judgment)Docketed in all Member Cases. (Park, Yoona)
December 30, 2019 Filing 276 Declaration of Cameron R. Azari on Implementation and Adequacy of Notice. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Opinion and Order, (279 in 3:15-md-02633-SI).)Docketed in all Member Cases. (Stephens, Kim)
November 8, 2019 Filing 285 Objection by Dennis Chong to Proposed Settlement.Associated Cases: 3:15-md-02633-SI, 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 3:15-cv-01262-SI, 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 3:15-cv-01392-SI, 3:15-cv-01472-SI, 3:17-cv-01648-SI (mja)
November 1, 2019 Filing 284 Objection by Phillip Costantinou to Proposed Settlement.Associated Cases: 3:15-md-02633-SI, 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 3:15-cv-01262-SI, 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 3:15-cv-01392-SI, 3:15-cv-01472-SI, 3:17-cv-01648-SI (mja)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 275 Opinion and Order - Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Proposed Settlement Agreement (ECF 273 ) is GRANTED. The Court directs the Clerk of the Court to send a copy of this Opinion and Order to the Clerk of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Signed on 7/29/2019 by Judge Michael H. Simon. Filed in all associated cases of 3:15-md-02633-SI. (mja)
June 20, 2019 Filing 274 Supplement to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Proposed Settlement Agreement. (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by Barbara Lynch, Elizabeth Black, Ralph Christopherson, Howard Kaplowitz, Mary Fuerst, Anne P Emerson, Debbie Hansen-Bosse, Krishnendu Chakraborty, Madhuchanda Chakraborty, William Fitch, Catherine Bushman, Ilene Hirsh, Stuart Hirsh, Kevin Smith, Eric Forseter. (Related document(s): Motion for Settlement(146 in 3:17-cv-01648-SI).) (Attachments: #1 Supplement To Exhibit 1)Docketed in all Member Cases. (Stephens, Kim)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 273 Scheduling Order by Judge Michael H. Simon. ORDER Due to the pending Unopposed Motion for Settlement (ECF 273 ) the Telephone Conference set for June 5, Oral Argument set for July 19, Pretrial Conference set for September 30, Final Pretrial Conference set for October 7, and the 3-week Jury Trial set for October 21, are STRICKEN. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon.Filed in all associated cases of 3:15-md-02633-SI. (mja)
May 31, 2019 Filing 272 Declaration of Cameron R. Azari in Support of Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Proposed Settlement Agreement. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Settlement(273 in 3:15-md-02633-SI).) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)Docketed in all Member Cases. (Stephens, Kim)
May 30, 2019 Filing 271 Declaration of Jerry Thompson in Support of Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Proposed Settlement Agreement. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Settlement(273 in 3:15-md-02633-SI).)Docketed in all Member Cases. (Stephens, Kim)
May 30, 2019 Filing 270 Declaration of Robert L. Vigil, Ph.D. in Support of Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Proposed Settlement Agreement. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Settlement(273 in 3:15-md-02633-SI).) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Errata 2)Docketed in all Member Cases. (Stephens, Kim)
May 30, 2019 Filing 269 Unopposed Motion for Settlement (Preliminary Approval). Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Settlement Agreement with Exhibits)Docketed in all Member Cases. (Stephens, Kim)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 268 Order - At the parties' request, the Court is STRIKING the telephone conference set for 5/22/2019 at 8:00AM. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. Filed in all associated cases: 3:15-md-02633-SI (mja)
May 1, 2019 Filing 267 MINUTES OF TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE: Status of case discussed as stated on the record. ORDER - Setting a further Telephone Status Conference for 5/22/2019 at 8:00AM. The Court will provide the parties with a call-in number by separate sealed entry. Keith S. Dubanevich and Kim D. Stephens present as counsel for Plaintiffs. James A. Sherer and David A. Carney present as counsel for Premera Blue Cross. Court Reporter: Ryan White. Judge Michael H. Simon presiding. Docketed in all Member Cases. (mja)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 266 Order - The Case Management Conference set for 4/1/2019 is STRICKEN. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon.Filed in All Associated Cases of 3:15-md-02633-SI. (mja)
March 20, 2019 Filing 265 MINUTES OF TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE: Status of case discussed as stated on the record. Keith S. Dubanevich and Kim D. Stephens present as counsel for Plaintiff(s). Paul G. Karlsgodt, James A. Sherer, and David A. Carney present as counsel for Premera Blue Cross. Court Reporter: Dennis Apodaca. Judge Michael H. Simon presiding. Docketed in all Member Cases. (mja)
March 6, 2019 Filing 264 MINUTES OF TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE: Status of case discussed as stated on the record. Order - Setting a further Telephone Status Conference for 3/20/2019 at 8:00AM. The Court will provide the parties with a call-in number by separate sealed entry. Keith S. Dubanevich and Kim D. Stephens present as counsel for Plaintiffs. Paul G. Karlsgodt and David A. Carney present as counsel for Premera Blue Cross. Court Reporter: Dennis Apodaca. Judge Michael H. Simon presiding. Docketed in all Member Cases. (mja)
February 13, 2019 Filing 263 Reply Brief in Response to Court Order of February 6, 2019, Regarding References to State-Specific Data Storage Information. Filed by Premera Blue Cross. (Related document(s): Scheduling,,,,, Order,,,, (265 in 3:15-md-02633-SI, 265 in 3:15-md-02633-SI, 252 in 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 252 in 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 250 in 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 250 in 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 277 in 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 277 in 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 254 in 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 254 in 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 264 in 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 264 in 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 221 in 3:15-cv-01472-SI, 221 in 3:15-cv-01472-SI, 262 in 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 262 in 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 248 in 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 248 in 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 257 in 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 257 in 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 249 in 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 249 in 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 264 in 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 264 in 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 261 in 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 261 in 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 252 in 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 252 in 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 254 in 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 254 in 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 250 in 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 250 in 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 255 in 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 255 in 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 259 in 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 259 in 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 249 in 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 249 in 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 249 in 3:15-cv-01262-SI, 249 in 3:15-cv-01262-SI, 253 in 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 253 in 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 251 in 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 251 in 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 250 in 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 250 in 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 252 in 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 252 in 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 248 in 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 248 in 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 249 in 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 249 in 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 254 in 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 254 in 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 271 in 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 271 in 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 250 in 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 250 in 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 251 in 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 251 in 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 253 in 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 253 in 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 265 in 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 265 in 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 250 in 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 250 in 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 249 in 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 249 in 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 244 in 3:15-cv-01392-SI, 244 in 3:15-cv-01392-SI, 256 in 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 256 in 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 253 in 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 253 in 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 255 in 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 255 in 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 252 in 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 252 in 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 138 in 3:17-cv-01648-SI, 138 in 3:17-cv-01648-SI, 248 in 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 248 in 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 258 in 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 258 in 3:15-cv-01159-SI).)Associated Cases: 3:15-md-02633-SI, 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 3:15-cv-01262-SI, 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 3:15-cv-01392-SI, 3:15-cv-01472-SI, 3:17-cv-01648-SI (Sands, Darin)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 262 OPINION and ORDER - Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel (ECF #231 ) is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART as described in this Order. Premera's Motion to Compel (ECF #240 ) is DENIED. Signed on 2/6/2019 by Judge Michael H. Simon. Docketed in all Member Cases. (mja)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 261 Order - The Court notes that the parties have redacted from the publicly-filed briefs relating to the motion for class certification the state(s) in which the data was stored. The Court further notes, however, that this type of information has been made publicly available in other data breach cases. See, e.g., In re Zappos.com, Inc., 2016 WL 4521681, at *1 (D. Nev. August 29, 2016) (noting that Zappos's servers were located in Kentucky and Nevada); In re Target Corp. Customer Data Sec. Breach Litig., 309 F.R.D. 482, 486 (D. Minn. 2015) (noting that Target's servers were located in Minnesota); Natl Union Fire Ins. Co. of Pittsburgh v. Tyco Integrated Sec., LLC, 2015 WL 3905018, at *3 (S.D. Fla. June 25, 2015) (noting that Tyco's servers were located in Jacksonville, Florida and Aurora, Colorado). On or before February 13, 2019, Premera shall file with the Court a brief of no more than five pages explaining why the state(s) in which Premera's servers are located is confidential information. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. Filed in all Associated Cases of 3:15-md-02633-SI. (mja)
February 5, 2019 Filing 260 Reply [REDACTED COPY] of Document 218. Reply to Motion to Certify the Class and Memorandum in Support of Motion(156 in 3:15-md-02633-SI) Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Plaintiffs.Docketed in all Member Cases. (Park, Yoona)
February 5, 2019 Filing 259 Response in Opposition [REDACTED COPY] of Document 190. Response in Opposition to Motion to Certify the Class and Memorandum in Support of Motion(156 in 3:15-md-02633-SI, 146 in 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 152 in 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 158 in 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 148 in 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 164 in 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 146 in 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 152 in 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 170 in 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 147 in 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 143 in 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 150 in 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 143 in 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 145 in 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 155 in 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 145 in 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 149 in 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 151 in 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 143 in 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 147 in 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 144 in 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 142 in 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 145 in 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 143 in 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 142 in 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 144 in 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 145 in 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 142 in 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 157 in 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 157 in 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 146 in 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 147 in 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 142 in 3:15-cv-01262-SI, 142 in 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 141 in 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 141 in 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 143 in 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 141 in 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 148 in 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 137 in 3:15-cv-01392-SI, 114 in 3:15-cv-01472-SI, 31 in 3:17-cv-01648-SI, 143 in 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 141 in 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 143 in 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 145 in 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 142 in 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 145 in 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 156 in 3:15-md-02633-SI, 141 in 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 158 in 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 31 in 3:17-cv-01648-SI, 146 in 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 152 in 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 142 in 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 143 in 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 142 in 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 155 in 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 164 in 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 143 in 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 145 in 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 149 in 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 144 in 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 144 in 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 142 in 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 170 in 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 152 in 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 142 in 3:15-cv-01262-SI, 157 in 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 147 in 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 141 in 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 143 in 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 151 in 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 150 in 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 157 in 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 148 in 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 114 in 3:15-cv-01472-SI, 147 in 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 146 in 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 147 in 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 148 in 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 146 in 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 137 in 3:15-cv-01392-SI, 145 in 3:15-cv-01164-SI) Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Plaintiffs.Docketed in all Member Cases. (Park, Yoona)
February 5, 2019 Filing 258 Motion to Certify the Class [REDACTED COPY] of Document 156. Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Plaintiffs.Docketed in all Member Cases. (Park, Yoona)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 257 Scheduling Order by Judge Michael H. Simon. Order - At the parties' request, the Telephone Status Conference set for 2/6/2019 is STRICKEN. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. Filed in all associated cases of 3:15-md-02633-SI. (mja)
February 1, 2019 Filing 256 Notice re Response in Opposition to Motion,,,,, (185 in 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 181 in 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 175 in 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 176 in 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 191 in 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 175 in 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 191 in 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 186 in 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 65 in 3:17-cv-01648-SI, 176 in 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 179 in 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 178 in 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 177 in 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 178 in 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 177 in 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 190 in 3:15-md-02633-SI, 175 in 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 180 in 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 177 in 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 179 in 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 180 in 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 177 in 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 176 in 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 183 in 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 186 in 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 204 in 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 176 in 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 181 in 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 192 in 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 184 in 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 179 in 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 171 in 3:15-cv-01392-SI, 182 in 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 181 in 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 179 in 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 180 in 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 198 in 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 182 in 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 189 in 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 148 in 3:15-cv-01472-SI, 177 in 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 176 in 3:15-cv-01262-SI) of Supplemental Authority Filed by Premera Blue Cross. (Related document(s): Response in Opposition to Motion,,,,, (185 in 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 181 in 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 175 in 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 176 in 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 191 in 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 175 in 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 191 in 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 186 in 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 65 in 3:17-cv-01648-SI, 176 in 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 179 in 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 178 in 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 177 in 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 178 in 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 177 in 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 190 in 3:15-md-02633-SI, 175 in 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 180 in 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 177 in 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 179 in 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 180 in 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 177 in 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 176 in 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 183 in 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 186 in 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 204 in 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 176 in 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 181 in 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 192 in 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 184 in 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 179 in 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 171 in 3:15-cv-01392-SI, 182 in 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 181 in 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 179 in 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 180 in 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 198 in 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 182 in 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 189 in 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 148 in 3:15-cv-01472-SI, 177 in 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 176 in 3:15-cv-01262-SI).) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - CareFirst opinion)Associated Cases: 3:15-md-02633-SI, 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 3:15-cv-01262-SI, 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 3:15-cv-01392-SI, 3:15-cv-01472-SI, 3:17-cv-01648-SI (Karlsgodt, Paul)
January 30, 2019 Filing 255 Declaration of James Sherer in Support of Defendant's Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Compel Further Respnses. (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by Premera Blue Cross. (Related document(s): Reply to Motion(131 in 3:17-cv-01648-SI).) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-9)Docketed in all Member Cases. (Sands, Darin)
January 30, 2019 Filing 254 Reply Brief in Support of to Motion to Compel (113 in 3:17-cv-01648-SI). (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by Premera Blue Cross.Docketed in all Member Cases. (Sands, Darin)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 253 ORDER - Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Premera's Motion to Compel Further Responses to Requests for Production of Documents, Set Two (ECF #256 ) is GRANTED. Defendant's reply is due by 1/30/2019. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. Docketed in all Member Cases. (mja)
January 25, 2019 Filing 252 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response/Reply to Motion to Compel (227 in 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 227 in 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 252 in 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 246 in 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 226 in 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 223 in 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 232 in 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 226 in 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 227 in 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 228 in 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 225 in 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 229 in 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 231 in 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 113 in 3:17-cv-01648-SI, 224 in 3:15-cv-01262-SI, 237 in 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 225 in 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 224 in 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 224 in 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 233 in 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 236 in 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 224 in 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 229 in 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 225 in 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 224 in 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 219 in 3:15-cv-01392-SI, 239 in 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 196 in 3:15-cv-01472-SI, 228 in 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 228 in 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 227 in 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 240 in 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 230 in 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 225 in 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 230 in 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 229 in 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 225 in 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 223 in 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 240 in 3:15-md-02633-SI, 223 in 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 239 in 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 234 in 3:15-cv-01105-SI). Filed by Premera Blue Cross.Docketed in all Member Cases. (Sands, Darin)
January 25, 2019 Filing 251 Notice re Response in Opposition to Motion,,,,, (185 in 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 181 in 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 175 in 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 176 in 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 191 in 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 175 in 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 191 in 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 186 in 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 65 in 3:17-cv-01648-SI, 176 in 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 179 in 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 178 in 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 177 in 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 178 in 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 177 in 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 190 in 3:15-md-02633-SI, 175 in 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 180 in 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 177 in 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 179 in 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 180 in 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 177 in 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 176 in 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 183 in 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 186 in 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 204 in 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 176 in 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 181 in 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 192 in 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 184 in 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 179 in 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 171 in 3:15-cv-01392-SI, 182 in 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 181 in 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 179 in 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 180 in 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 198 in 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 182 in 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 189 in 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 148 in 3:15-cv-01472-SI, 177 in 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 176 in 3:15-cv-01262-SI) Supplemental Authority Filed by Premera Blue Cross. (Related document(s): Response in Opposition to Motion,,,,, (185 in 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 181 in 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 175 in 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 176 in 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 191 in 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 175 in 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 191 in 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 186 in 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 65 in 3:17-cv-01648-SI, 176 in 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 179 in 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 178 in 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 177 in 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 178 in 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 177 in 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 190 in 3:15-md-02633-SI, 175 in 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 180 in 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 177 in 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 179 in 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 180 in 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 177 in 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 176 in 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 183 in 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 186 in 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 204 in 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 176 in 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 181 in 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 192 in 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 184 in 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 179 in 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 171 in 3:15-cv-01392-SI, 182 in 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 181 in 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 179 in 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 180 in 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 198 in 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 182 in 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 189 in 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 148 in 3:15-cv-01472-SI, 177 in 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 176 in 3:15-cv-01262-SI).) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Advocate ruling)Associated Cases: 3:15-md-02633-SI, 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 3:15-cv-01262-SI, 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 3:15-cv-01392-SI, 3:15-cv-01472-SI, 3:17-cv-01648-SI (Karlsgodt, Paul)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 250 ORDER - Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Premera's Motion to Compel Further Responses to Requests for Production of Documents, Set Two. (ECF 253 ) is GRANTED. Defendant's reply is due by 1/25/2019. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. Docketed in all Member Cases. (mja)
January 16, 2019 Filing 249 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Premera's Motion to Compel Further Responses to Requests for Production of Documents, Set Two. Filed by Premera Blue Cross.Docketed in all Member Cases. (Sands, Darin)
January 10, 2019 Filing 248 Declaration of Matthew Strebe Regarding Premera's Motion to Compel. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion to compel(227 in 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 227 in 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 252 in 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 246 in 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 226 in 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 223 in 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 232 in 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 226 in 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 227 in 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 228 in 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 225 in 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 229 in 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 231 in 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 113 in 3:17-cv-01648-SI, 224 in 3:15-cv-01262-SI, 237 in 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 225 in 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 224 in 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 224 in 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 233 in 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 236 in 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 224 in 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 229 in 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 225 in 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 224 in 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 219 in 3:15-cv-01392-SI, 239 in 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 196 in 3:15-cv-01472-SI, 228 in 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 228 in 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 227 in 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 240 in 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 230 in 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 225 in 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 230 in 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 229 in 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 225 in 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 223 in 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 240 in 3:15-md-02633-SI, 223 in 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 239 in 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 234 in 3:15-cv-01105-SI).)Docketed in all Member Cases. (Stephens, Kim)
January 10, 2019 Filing 247 Declaration of Karen H. Riebel in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Compel Further Responses to Requests for Production of Documents, Set Two. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion to compel(227 in 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 227 in 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 252 in 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 246 in 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 226 in 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 223 in 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 232 in 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 226 in 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 227 in 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 228 in 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 225 in 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 229 in 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 231 in 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 113 in 3:17-cv-01648-SI, 224 in 3:15-cv-01262-SI, 237 in 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 225 in 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 224 in 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 224 in 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 233 in 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 236 in 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 224 in 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 229 in 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 225 in 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 224 in 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 219 in 3:15-cv-01392-SI, 239 in 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 196 in 3:15-cv-01472-SI, 228 in 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 228 in 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 227 in 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 240 in 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 230 in 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 225 in 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 230 in 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 229 in 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 225 in 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 223 in 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 240 in 3:15-md-02633-SI, 223 in 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 239 in 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 234 in 3:15-cv-01105-SI).)Docketed in all Member Cases. (Stephens, Kim)
January 10, 2019 Filing 246 Declaration of Bradley K. King in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Compel Further Responses to Requests for Production of Documents, Set Two. (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion to compel(240 in 3:15-md-02633-SI).) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)Docketed in all Member Cases. (Stephens, Kim)
January 10, 2019 Filing 245 Declaration of Jason T. Dennett in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Compel Further Responses to Requests for Production of Documents, Set Two. (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion to compel(227 in 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 227 in 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 252 in 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 246 in 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 226 in 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 223 in 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 232 in 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 226 in 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 227 in 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 228 in 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 225 in 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 229 in 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 231 in 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 113 in 3:17-cv-01648-SI, 224 in 3:15-cv-01262-SI, 237 in 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 225 in 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 224 in 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 224 in 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 233 in 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 236 in 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 224 in 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 229 in 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 225 in 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 224 in 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 219 in 3:15-cv-01392-SI, 239 in 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 196 in 3:15-cv-01472-SI, 228 in 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 228 in 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 227 in 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 240 in 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 230 in 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 225 in 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 230 in 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 229 in 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 225 in 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 223 in 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 240 in 3:15-md-02633-SI, 223 in 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 239 in 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 234 in 3:15-cv-01105-SI).) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)Docketed in all Member Cases. (Stephens, Kim)
January 10, 2019 Filing 244 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Compel (240 in 3:15-md-02633-SI, 228 in 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 236 in 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 240 in 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 230 in 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 246 in 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 228 in 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 234 in 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 252 in 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 229 in 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 225 in 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 232 in 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 225 in 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 227 in 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 237 in 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 227 in 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 231 in 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 233 in 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 225 in 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 229 in 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 226 in 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 224 in 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 227 in 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 225 in 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 224 in 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 226 in 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 227 in 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 224 in 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 239 in 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 239 in 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 228 in 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 229 in 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 224 in 3:15-cv-01262-SI, 224 in 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 223 in 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 223 in 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 225 in 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 223 in 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 230 in 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 219 in 3:15-cv-01392-SI, 196 in 3:15-cv-01472-SI, 113 in 3:17-cv-01648-SI). (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by All Plaintiffs.Docketed in all Member Cases. (Stephens, Kim)
January 7, 2019 Filing 243 Notice re Response in Opposition to Motion,,,,, (185 in 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 181 in 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 175 in 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 176 in 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 191 in 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 175 in 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 191 in 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 186 in 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 65 in 3:17-cv-01648-SI, 176 in 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 179 in 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 178 in 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 177 in 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 178 in 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 177 in 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 190 in 3:15-md-02633-SI, 175 in 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 180 in 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 177 in 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 179 in 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 180 in 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 177 in 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 176 in 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 183 in 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 186 in 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 204 in 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 176 in 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 181 in 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 192 in 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 184 in 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 179 in 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 171 in 3:15-cv-01392-SI, 182 in 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 181 in 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 179 in 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 180 in 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 198 in 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 182 in 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 189 in 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 148 in 3:15-cv-01472-SI, 177 in 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 176 in 3:15-cv-01262-SI) of Supplemental Authority Filed by Premera Blue Cross. (Related document(s): Response in Opposition to Motion,,,,, (185 in 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 181 in 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 175 in 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 176 in 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 191 in 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 175 in 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 191 in 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 186 in 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 65 in 3:17-cv-01648-SI, 176 in 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 179 in 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 178 in 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 177 in 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 178 in 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 177 in 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 190 in 3:15-md-02633-SI, 175 in 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 180 in 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 177 in 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 179 in 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 180 in 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 177 in 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 176 in 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 183 in 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 186 in 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 204 in 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 176 in 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 181 in 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 192 in 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 184 in 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 179 in 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 171 in 3:15-cv-01392-SI, 182 in 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 181 in 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 179 in 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 180 in 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 198 in 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 182 in 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 189 in 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 148 in 3:15-cv-01472-SI, 177 in 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 176 in 3:15-cv-01262-SI).) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Sutherland ruling)Associated Cases: 3:15-md-02633-SI, 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 3:15-cv-01262-SI, 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 3:15-cv-01392-SI, 3:15-cv-01472-SI, 3:17-cv-01648-SI (Karlsgodt, Paul)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 242 ORDER - Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response (ECF #244 ) to Motion to Compel (ECF #240 ) is GRANTED. Response due 1/10/2019. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. Docketed in all Member Cases. (mja)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 241 Order - Telephone status conferences for 2019 are set for the first Wednesday of the month at 8:00AM beginning February 2019 and continuing through June 2019, except for April when the Court is scheduled to meet with the parties for an in-person case management conference on April 1, 2019 at 10:00AM in Courtroom 15B. The telephone status conference dates are as follows: February 6, 2019, March 6, 2019, May 1, 2019, and June 5, 2019. The Court's call-in number remains the same and can be found on the docket, under seal, following this order. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. Filed in all associated cases of 3:15-md-02633-SI.(mja)
December 28, 2018 Filing 240 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response/Reply to Motion to Compel (113 in 3:17-cv-01648-SI). Filed by All Plaintiffs.Docketed in all Member Cases. (Riebel, Karen)
December 21, 2018 Filing 239 Supplemental Declaration of Kate M. Baxter-Kauf in Support of Reply Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel. (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Reply to Motion,,,,, (230 in 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 115 in 3:17-cv-01648-SI, 229 in 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 227 in 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 221 in 3:15-cv-01392-SI, 233 in 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 229 in 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 239 in 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 226 in 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 231 in 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 235 in 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 230 in 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 241 in 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 231 in 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 242 in 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 254 in 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 227 in 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 198 in 3:15-cv-01472-SI, 227 in 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 241 in 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 230 in 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 238 in 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 231 in 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 248 in 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 226 in 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 226 in 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 226 in 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 225 in 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 228 in 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 232 in 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 226 in 3:15-cv-01262-SI, 229 in 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 234 in 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 242 in 3:15-md-02633-SI, 225 in 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 236 in 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 227 in 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 228 in 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 225 in 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 229 in 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 232 in 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 227 in 3:15-cv-01115-SI).)Docketed in all Member Cases. (Riebel, Karen)
December 21, 2018 Filing 238 Reply to Motion to Compel Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel and Memorandum in Support(210 in 3:15-cv-01392-SI, 214 in 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 224 in 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 216 in 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 215 in 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 220 in 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 221 in 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 219 in 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 216 in 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 218 in 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 231 in 3:15-md-02633-SI, 215 in 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 227 in 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 225 in 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 223 in 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 218 in 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 243 in 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 222 in 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 217 in 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 237 in 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 230 in 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 104 in 3:17-cv-01648-SI, 214 in 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 215 in 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 219 in 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 187 in 3:15-cv-01472-SI, 216 in 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 216 in 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 218 in 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 220 in 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 216 in 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 231 in 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 221 in 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 217 in 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 215 in 3:15-cv-01262-SI, 230 in 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 218 in 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 220 in 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 215 in 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 228 in 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 219 in 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 214 in 3:15-cv-01264-SI). (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by All Plaintiffs.Docketed in all Member Cases. (Riebel, Karen)
December 20, 2018 Filing 237 Declaration of James Sherer . (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by Premera Blue Cross. (Related document(s): Motion to compel(113 in 3:17-cv-01648-SI).) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)Docketed in all Member Cases. (Sands, Darin)
December 20, 2018 Filing 236 Motion to Compel . (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Oral Argument requested. Filed by Premera Blue Cross.Docketed in all Member Cases. (Sands, Darin)
December 14, 2018 Filing 235 Declaration of Randal L. Gainer in Support of Defendant Premera Blue Cross's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel. Filed by Premera Blue Cross. (Related document(s): Memorandum in Opposition, (109 in 3:17-cv-01648-SI).)Docketed in all Member Cases. (Sands, Darin)
December 14, 2018 Filing 234 Declaration of Nichole L. Sterling in Support of Defendant Premera Blue Cross's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel. Filed by Premera Blue Cross. (Related document(s): Memorandum in Opposition, (109 in 3:17-cv-01648-SI).)Docketed in all Member Cases. (Sands, Darin)
December 14, 2018 Filing 233 Declaration of Gabriel Bender In Support of Defendant Premera Blue Cross's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel. Filed by Premera Blue Cross. (Related document(s): Memorandum in Opposition, (109 in 3:17-cv-01648-SI).)Docketed in all Member Cases. (Sands, Darin)
December 14, 2018 Filing 232 Memorandum in Opposition Defendant Premera Blue Cross's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel to Motion to Compel Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel and Memorandum in Support(104 in 3:17-cv-01648-SI). Filed by Premera Blue Cross.Docketed in all Member Cases. (Sands, Darin)
December 7, 2018 Filing 231 Notice re Notice,,, (216 in 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 220 in 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 215 in 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 215 in 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 214 in 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 218 in 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 213 in 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 215 in 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 217 in 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 214 in 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 217 in 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 217 in 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 218 in 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 219 in 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 236 in 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 221 in 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 230 in 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 224 in 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 230 in 3:15-md-02633-SI, 209 in 3:15-cv-01392-SI, 213 in 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 216 in 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 215 in 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 222 in 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 213 in 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 218 in 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 214 in 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 242 in 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 214 in 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 219 in 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 223 in 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 229 in 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 220 in 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 215 in 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 217 in 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 214 in 3:15-cv-01262-SI, 229 in 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 227 in 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 186 in 3:15-cv-01472-SI, 103 in 3:17-cv-01648-SI, 226 in 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 219 in 3:15-cv-01107-SI) Response to Plaintiffs' Notice of Supplemental Authority Filed by Premera Blue Cross. (Related document(s): Notice,,, (216 in 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 220 in 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 215 in 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 215 in 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 214 in 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 218 in 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 213 in 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 215 in 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 217 in 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 214 in 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 217 in 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 217 in 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 218 in 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 219 in 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 236 in 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 221 in 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 230 in 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 224 in 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 230 in 3:15-md-02633-SI, 209 in 3:15-cv-01392-SI, 213 in 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 216 in 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 215 in 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 222 in 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 213 in 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 218 in 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 214 in 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 242 in 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 214 in 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 219 in 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 223 in 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 229 in 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 220 in 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 215 in 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 217 in 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 214 in 3:15-cv-01262-SI, 229 in 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 227 in 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 186 in 3:15-cv-01472-SI, 103 in 3:17-cv-01648-SI, 226 in 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 219 in 3:15-cv-01107-SI).)Associated Cases: 3:15-md-02633-SI, 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 3:15-cv-01262-SI, 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 3:15-cv-01392-SI, 3:15-cv-01472-SI, 3:17-cv-01648-SI (Karlsgodt, Paul)
December 5, 2018 Filing 230 MINUTES OF TELEPHONE CONFERENCE: Order - Plaintiffs' unopposed letter request to postpone the exchange of expert reports until 90 days after the Court's ruling on class certification is GRANTED. Order - Plaintiffs' reply to their motion to compel (ECF #231 ) is due by 12/21/2018. Kim D. Stephens present as counsel for Plaintiffs. James A. Sherer and David A. Carney present as counsel for Defendant. Court Reporter: Dennis Apodaca. Judge Michael H. Simon presiding. Docketed in all Member Cases. (mja) Modified on 12/5/2018 to correct text regarding reply to the motion to compel (mja).
November 30, 2018 Filing 229 OFFICIAL COURT TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS FILED Motion hearing held on November 15, 2018 before Judge Michael H. Simon, Court Reporter Nancy M. Walker, telephone number 503-326-8186 or e-mail nancy_walker@ord.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at Court's public terminal or purchased from the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. Afterwards it may be obtained from the Court Reporter (503-326-8186 or nancy_walker@ord.uscourts.gov) or through PACER-See Policy at ord.uscourts.gov. Notice of Intent to Redact Transcript is due by 12/7/2018. Redaction Request due 12/21/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/31/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/28/2019. Docketed in all Member Cases. (Walker, Nancy)
November 30, 2018 Filing 228 Declaration of Kate M. Baxter-Kauf in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel. (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion to compel, (210 in 3:15-cv-01392-SI, 214 in 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 224 in 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 216 in 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 215 in 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 220 in 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 221 in 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 219 in 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 216 in 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 218 in 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 231 in 3:15-md-02633-SI, 215 in 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 227 in 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 225 in 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 223 in 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 218 in 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 243 in 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 222 in 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 217 in 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 237 in 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 230 in 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 104 in 3:17-cv-01648-SI, 214 in 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 215 in 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 219 in 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 187 in 3:15-cv-01472-SI, 216 in 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 216 in 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 218 in 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 220 in 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 216 in 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 231 in 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 221 in 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 217 in 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 215 in 3:15-cv-01262-SI, 230 in 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 218 in 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 220 in 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 215 in 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 228 in 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 219 in 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 214 in 3:15-cv-01264-SI).) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)Docketed in all Member Cases. (Riebel, Karen)
November 30, 2018 Filing 227 Motion to Compel Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel and Memorandum in Support. (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Plaintiffs.Docketed in all Member Cases. (Riebel, Karen)
November 28, 2018 Filing 226 Notice of Supplemental Authority Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)Associated Cases: 3:15-md-02633-SI, 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 3:15-cv-01262-SI, 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 3:15-cv-01392-SI, 3:15-cv-01472-SI, 3:17-cv-01648-SI (Stephens, Kim)
November 15, 2018 Filing 225 MINUTES OF ORAL ARGUMENT HEARING: Order - Plaintiffs' motion to certify the class (ECF #156 ) is taken under advisement on 11/15/2018. Plaintiffs' motions to exclude expert opinions (ECF #211 , #214 & #216 ) are taken under advisement 11/15/2018. James Pizzirusso, Tina Wolfson, Keith S. Dubanevich, Cicily Shiel, Kim D. Stephens, Kate M. Baxter-Kauf, and Jason T. Dennett present as counsel for Plaintiffs. Paul G. Karlsgodt, James A. Sherer, Darin M. Sands, David A. Carney and Tim McMichael present as counsel for Defendant. Court Reporter: Nancy Walker. Judge Michael H. Simon presiding. Docketed in all Member Cases. (mja)
November 14, 2018 Filing 224 Notice re Memorandum in Opposition,,,,,,,,,,,,,, (222 in 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 209 in 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 211 in 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 209 in 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 178 in 3:15-cv-01472-SI, 222 in 3:15-md-02633-SI, 234 in 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 219 in 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 212 in 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 205 in 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 209 in 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 206 in 3:15-cv-01262-SI, 206 in 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 213 in 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 211 in 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 228 in 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 212 in 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 207 in 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 215 in 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 205 in 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 207 in 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 208 in 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 211 in 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 95 in 3:17-cv-01648-SI, 216 in 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 201 in 3:15-cv-01392-SI, 214 in 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 208 in 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 218 in 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 210 in 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 206 in 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 221 in 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 207 in 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 210 in 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 205 in 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 207 in 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 206 in 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 210 in 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 209 in 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 221 in 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 207 in 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 206 in 3:15-cv-01169-SI) of Correction Filed by Premera Blue Cross. (Related document(s): Memorandum in Opposition,,,,,,,,,,,,,, (222 in 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 209 in 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 211 in 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 209 in 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 178 in 3:15-cv-01472-SI, 222 in 3:15-md-02633-SI, 234 in 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 219 in 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 212 in 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 205 in 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 209 in 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 206 in 3:15-cv-01262-SI, 206 in 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 213 in 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 211 in 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 228 in 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 212 in 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 207 in 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 215 in 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 205 in 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 207 in 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 208 in 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 211 in 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 95 in 3:17-cv-01648-SI, 216 in 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 201 in 3:15-cv-01392-SI, 214 in 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 208 in 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 218 in 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 210 in 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 206 in 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 221 in 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 207 in 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 210 in 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 205 in 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 207 in 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 206 in 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 210 in 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 209 in 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 221 in 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 207 in 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 206 in 3:15-cv-01169-SI).)Associated Cases: 3:15-md-02633-SI, 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 3:15-cv-01262-SI, 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 3:15-cv-01392-SI, 3:15-cv-01472-SI, 3:17-cv-01648-SI (Karlsgodt, Paul)
November 12, 2018 Filing 223 Declaration of Cecily C. Shiel re: Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motions to Exclude Expert Opinions of Premera's Experts. (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Reply to Motion,,,,,,,,,,,,,, (210 in 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 210 in 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 213 in 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 99 in 3:17-cv-01648-SI, 226 in 3:15-md-02633-SI, 216 in 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 225 in 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 218 in 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 210 in 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 225 in 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 222 in 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 217 in 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 214 in 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 182 in 3:15-cv-01472-SI, 213 in 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 215 in 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 220 in 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 209 in 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 210 in 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 211 in 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 212 in 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 211 in 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 215 in 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 214 in 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 205 in 3:15-cv-01392-SI, 226 in 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 223 in 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 212 in 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 219 in 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 232 in 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 211 in 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 215 in 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 213 in 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 214 in 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 238 in 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 211 in 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 209 in 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 213 in 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 209 in 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 216 in 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 210 in 3:15-cv-01262-SI, 211 in 3:15-cv-01092-SI).) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)Docketed in all Member Cases. (Dubanevich, Keith)
November 12, 2018 Filing 222 Reply to Motion Titled as "Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Expert Opinions of C. Federico Campbell"(198 in 3:15-cv-01262-SI, 201 in 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 214 in 3:15-md-02633-SI, 198 in 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 199 in 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 199 in 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 207 in 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 203 in 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 87 in 3:17-cv-01648-SI, 213 in 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 200 in 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 211 in 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 201 in 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 199 in 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 202 in 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 204 in 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 208 in 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 206 in 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 197 in 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 213 in 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 226 in 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 202 in 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 200 in 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 201 in 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 203 in 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 198 in 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 197 in 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 210 in 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 193 in 3:15-cv-01392-SI, 204 in 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 199 in 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 197 in 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 201 in 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 198 in 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 214 in 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 199 in 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 220 in 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 202 in 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 170 in 3:15-cv-01472-SI, 205 in 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 203 in 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 198 in 3:15-cv-01263-SI), Motion Titled as "Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Expert Opinions of Robert Anderson, Jr."(201 in 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 200 in 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 210 in 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 84 in 3:17-cv-01648-SI, 202 in 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 194 in 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 195 in 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 205 in 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 197 in 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 167 in 3:15-cv-01472-SI, 199 in 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 200 in 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 203 in 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 196 in 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 198 in 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 211 in 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 210 in 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 196 in 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 208 in 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 201 in 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 200 in 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 198 in 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 197 in 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 199 in 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 194 in 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 198 in 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 195 in 3:15-cv-01262-SI, 196 in 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 199 in 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 195 in 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 207 in 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 211 in 3:15-md-02633-SI, 190 in 3:15-cv-01392-SI, 195 in 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 194 in 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 198 in 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 204 in 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 217 in 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 196 in 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 223 in 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 195 in 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 196 in 3:15-cv-01266-SI), Motion Titled as "Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Expert Opinions of Keith Wojcieszek"(199 in 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 202 in 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 204 in 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 202 in 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 201 in 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 172 in 3:15-cv-01472-SI, 216 in 3:15-md-02633-SI, 200 in 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 206 in 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 205 in 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 203 in 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 213 in 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 201 in 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 201 in 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 201 in 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 200 in 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 205 in 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 212 in 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 215 in 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 199 in 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 200 in 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 201 in 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 228 in 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 203 in 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 216 in 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 206 in 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 200 in 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 203 in 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 207 in 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 222 in 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 208 in 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 203 in 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 195 in 3:15-cv-01392-SI, 199 in 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 210 in 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 209 in 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 215 in 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 89 in 3:17-cv-01648-SI, 204 in 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 204 in 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 205 in 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 200 in 3:15-cv-01262-SI) Oral Argument requested. (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by All Plaintiffs.Docketed in all Member Cases. (Dubanevich, Keith)
November 7, 2018 Filing 221 MINUTES OF TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE: Status of the case discussed as stated on the record. Keith S. Dubanevich, Kim D. Stephens, James Pizzirusso, Kate M. Baxter-Kauf, and Tina Wolfson present as counsel for plaintiff(s). Paul G. Karlsgodt, James A. Sherer, Darin M. Sands, and David A. Carney present as counsel for Premera. Court Reporter: Dennis Apodaca. Judge Michael H. Simon presiding. Docketed in all Member Cases. (mja)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 220 Opinion and Order - The Court GRANTS IN PART and DENIES IN PART Plaintiffs' Motion for Sanctions for Defendant's Discovery Misconduct (ECF #182 ) as provided in this Opinion and Order. Signed on 11/5/2018 by Judge Michael H. Simon. Filed in all associated cases: 3:15-md-02633-SI. (mja)
November 5, 2018 Filing 219 Declaration of David A. Carney in Support of Combined Opposition. (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by Premera Blue Cross. (Related document(s): Memorandum in Opposition,,,,,,,,,,,,,, (222 in 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 209 in 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 211 in 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 209 in 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 178 in 3:15-cv-01472-SI, 222 in 3:15-md-02633-SI, 234 in 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 219 in 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 212 in 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 205 in 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 209 in 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 206 in 3:15-cv-01262-SI, 206 in 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 213 in 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 211 in 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 228 in 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 212 in 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 207 in 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 215 in 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 205 in 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 207 in 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 208 in 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 211 in 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 95 in 3:17-cv-01648-SI, 216 in 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 201 in 3:15-cv-01392-SI, 214 in 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 208 in 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 218 in 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 210 in 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 206 in 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 221 in 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 207 in 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 210 in 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 205 in 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 207 in 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 206 in 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 210 in 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 209 in 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 221 in 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 207 in 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 206 in 3:15-cv-01169-SI).) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Strebe testimony, #2 Exhibit 2 - Email exchange, #3 Exhibit 3 - Kroll)Docketed in all Member Cases. (Karlsgodt, Paul)
November 5, 2018 Filing 218 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Titled as "Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Expert Opinions of Keith Wojcieszek"(216 in 3:15-md-02633-SI, 204 in 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 212 in 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 216 in 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 206 in 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 222 in 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 204 in 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 210 in 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 228 in 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 205 in 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 201 in 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 208 in 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 201 in 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 203 in 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 213 in 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 203 in 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 207 in 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 209 in 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 201 in 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 205 in 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 202 in 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 200 in 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 203 in 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 201 in 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 200 in 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 202 in 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 203 in 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 200 in 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 215 in 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 215 in 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 204 in 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 205 in 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 200 in 3:15-cv-01262-SI, 200 in 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 199 in 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 199 in 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 201 in 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 199 in 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 206 in 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 195 in 3:15-cv-01392-SI, 172 in 3:15-cv-01472-SI, 89 in 3:17-cv-01648-SI), Motion Titled as "Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Expert Opinions of Robert Anderson, Jr."(211 in 3:15-md-02633-SI, 199 in 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 207 in 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 211 in 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 201 in 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 217 in 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 199 in 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 205 in 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 223 in 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 200 in 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 196 in 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 203 in 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 196 in 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 198 in 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 208 in 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 198 in 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 202 in 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 204 in 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 196 in 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 200 in 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 197 in 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 195 in 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 198 in 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 196 in 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 195 in 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 197 in 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 198 in 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 195 in 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 210 in 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 210 in 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 199 in 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 200 in 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 195 in 3:15-cv-01262-SI, 195 in 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 194 in 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 194 in 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 196 in 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 194 in 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 201 in 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 190 in 3:15-cv-01392-SI, 167 in 3:15-cv-01472-SI, 84 in 3:17-cv-01648-SI), Motion Titled as "Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Expert Opinions of C. Federico Campbell"(214 in 3:15-md-02633-SI, 202 in 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 210 in 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 214 in 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 204 in 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 220 in 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 202 in 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 208 in 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 226 in 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 203 in 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 199 in 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 206 in 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 199 in 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 201 in 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 211 in 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 201 in 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 205 in 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 207 in 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 199 in 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 203 in 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 200 in 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 198 in 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 201 in 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 199 in 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 198 in 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 200 in 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 201 in 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 198 in 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 213 in 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 213 in 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 202 in 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 203 in 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 198 in 3:15-cv-01262-SI, 198 in 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 197 in 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 197 in 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 199 in 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 197 in 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 204 in 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 193 in 3:15-cv-01392-SI, 170 in 3:15-cv-01472-SI, 87 in 3:17-cv-01648-SI). (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by Premera Blue Cross.Docketed in all Member Cases. (Karlsgodt, Paul)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 217 SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Simon - The Court sets an expedited briefing schedule on Plaintiffs' motions to exclude expert testimony #211 , #214 , #216 as follows: (1) Responses to these three motions shall be due no later than 12:00PM, on Monday, November 5, 2018. (2) Replies to the responses shall be due no later than 12:00PM, on Monday, November 12, 2018. (peg)
October 25, 2018 Filing 216 Expert Declaration of Peter E. Rossi (Rebuttal Expert Report). (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion to certify class, (156 in 3:15-md-02633-SI).)Docketed in all Member Cases. (Stephens, Kim)
October 25, 2018 Filing 215 Declaration of Jason T. Dennett in Support of Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification. (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion to certify class, (156 in 3:15-md-02633-SI).) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)Docketed in all Member Cases. (Stephens, Kim)
October 25, 2018 Filing 214 Reply to Motion to Certify the Class and Memorandum in Support of Motion(143 in 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 141 in 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 143 in 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 145 in 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 142 in 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 145 in 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 156 in 3:15-md-02633-SI, 141 in 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 158 in 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 31 in 3:17-cv-01648-SI, 146 in 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 152 in 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 142 in 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 143 in 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 142 in 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 155 in 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 164 in 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 143 in 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 145 in 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 149 in 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 144 in 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 144 in 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 142 in 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 170 in 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 152 in 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 142 in 3:15-cv-01262-SI, 157 in 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 147 in 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 141 in 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 143 in 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 151 in 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 150 in 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 157 in 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 148 in 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 114 in 3:15-cv-01472-SI, 147 in 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 146 in 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 147 in 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 148 in 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 146 in 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 137 in 3:15-cv-01392-SI, 145 in 3:15-cv-01164-SI) Oral Argument requested. (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by All Plaintiffs.Docketed in all Member Cases. (Stephens, Kim)
October 24, 2018 Filing 213 Declaration of Swathi Bojedla in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Expert Opinions of Keith Wojcieszek. (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion - Miscellaneous, (89 in 3:17-cv-01648-SI).) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)Docketed in all Member Cases. (Dubanevich, Keith)
October 24, 2018 Filing 212 Motion Titled as "Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Expert Opinions of Keith Wojcieszek". (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Plaintiffs.Docketed in all Member Cases. (Dubanevich, Keith)
October 24, 2018 Filing 211 Declaration of Jason T. Dennett in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Expert Opinions of C. Federico Campbell. (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion - Miscellaneous, (87 in 3:17-cv-01648-SI).) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)Docketed in all Member Cases. (Dubanevich, Keith)
October 24, 2018 Filing 210 Motion Titled as "Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Expert Opinions of C. Federico Campbell". (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Plaintiffs.Docketed in all Member Cases. (Dubanevich, Keith)
October 24, 2018 Filing 209 Declaration of James J. Pizzirusso in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Expert Opinions of Robert Anderson, Jr.. (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion - Miscellaneous, (84 in 3:17-cv-01648-SI).) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)Docketed in all Member Cases. (Dubanevich, Keith)
October 24, 2018 Filing 208 Declaration of Cecily C. Shiel in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Expert Opinions of Robert Anderson, Jr.. (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion - Miscellaneous, (84 in 3:17-cv-01648-SI).) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Docketed in all Member Cases. (Dubanevich, Keith)
October 24, 2018 Filing 207 Motion Titled as "Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Expert Opinions of Robert Anderson, Jr.". (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Plaintiffs.Docketed in all Member Cases. (Dubanevich, Keith)
October 23, 2018 Filing 206 Second Declaration of Jason T. Dennett in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Sanctions. (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Imposition of Sanctions, (182 in 3:15-md-02633-SI).) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10)Docketed in all Member Cases. (Stephens, Kim)
October 23, 2018 Filing 205 Declaration of Cecily C. Shiel re Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion for Sanctions. (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Reply to Motion,,,,, (191 in 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 207 in 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 192 in 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 208 in 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 214 in 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 192 in 3:15-cv-01262-SI, 199 in 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 200 in 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 198 in 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 193 in 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 220 in 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 197 in 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 193 in 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 198 in 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 194 in 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 201 in 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 192 in 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 195 in 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 193 in 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 196 in 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 192 in 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 81 in 3:17-cv-01648-SI, 195 in 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 191 in 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 197 in 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 195 in 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 207 in 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 187 in 3:15-cv-01392-SI, 196 in 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 208 in 3:15-md-02633-SI, 202 in 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 204 in 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 193 in 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 197 in 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 191 in 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 205 in 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 193 in 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 192 in 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 164 in 3:15-cv-01472-SI, 195 in 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 196 in 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 194 in 3:15-cv-01162-SI).) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)Docketed in all Member Cases. (Stephens, Kim)
October 23, 2018 Filing 204 Reply in Support to Motion for Imposition of Sanctions for Defendant's Discovery Misconduct(171 in 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 167 in 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 168 in 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 169 in 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 168 in 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 170 in 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 171 in 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 183 in 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 172 in 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 169 in 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 171 in 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 178 in 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 169 in 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 168 in 3:15-cv-01262-SI, 167 in 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 171 in 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 168 in 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 169 in 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 196 in 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 173 in 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 170 in 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 178 in 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 182 in 3:15-md-02633-SI, 57 in 3:17-cv-01648-SI, 174 in 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 184 in 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 176 in 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 169 in 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 173 in 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 168 in 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 174 in 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 163 in 3:15-cv-01392-SI, 167 in 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 177 in 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 172 in 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 175 in 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 172 in 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 181 in 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 183 in 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 173 in 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 190 in 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 140 in 3:15-cv-01472-SI). (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by All Plaintiffs.Docketed in all Member Cases. (Stephens, Kim)
October 11, 2018 Filing 203 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Emily R. Fedeles (MDL admission). Your login is: erfedeles. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp)
October 9, 2018 Filing 202 Declaration of Joel Seymour ISO Premera's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Sanctions for Defendant's Discovery Misconduct. (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by Premera Blue Cross. (Related document(s): Response in Opposition to Motion, (77 in 3:17-cv-01648-SI).)Docketed in all Member Cases. (Sands, Darin)
October 9, 2018 Filing 201 Declaration of James A. Sherer ISO Premera's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Sanctions for Defendant's Discovery Misconduct. (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by Premera Blue Cross. (Related document(s): Response in Opposition to Motion, (77 in 3:17-cv-01648-SI).) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-7 p. 21, #2 Exhibit 7 p. 22-15)Docketed in all Member Cases. (Sands, Darin)
October 9, 2018 Filing 200 Declaration of Edwin Christian ISO Premera's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Sancations for Defendant's Discovery Misconduct. (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by Premera Blue Cross. (Related document(s): Response in Opposition to Motion, (77 in 3:17-cv-01648-SI).) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)Docketed in all Member Cases. (Sands, Darin)
October 9, 2018 Filing 199 Response in Opposition to Motion for Imposition of Sanctions for Defendant's Discovery Misconduct(57 in 3:17-cv-01648-SI, 57 in 3:17-cv-01648-SI). (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by Premera Blue Cross.Docketed in all Member Cases. (Sands, Darin)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 198 Scheduling Order by Judge Michael H. Simon. Order - At the parties' request, the Telephone Status Conference set for 10/3/2018 is STRICKEN. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon.Filed in All Associated Cases of 3:15-md-02633-SI. (mja)
September 27, 2018 Filing 197 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Nichole L. Sterling (MDL admission). Your login is: nlsterling. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER - Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Imposition of Sanctions (ECF #199 ) is GRANTED. Defendant's response due by 10/9/2018. Plaintiffs' reply is due by 10/23/2018. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. Docketed in all Member Cases. (mja)
September 27, 2018 Filing 195 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response/Reply to Motion for Imposition of Sanctions for Defendant's Discovery Misconduct(171 in 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 167 in 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 168 in 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 169 in 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 168 in 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 170 in 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 171 in 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 183 in 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 172 in 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 169 in 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 171 in 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 178 in 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 169 in 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 168 in 3:15-cv-01262-SI, 167 in 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 171 in 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 168 in 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 169 in 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 196 in 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 173 in 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 170 in 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 178 in 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 182 in 3:15-md-02633-SI, 57 in 3:17-cv-01648-SI, 174 in 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 184 in 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 176 in 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 169 in 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 173 in 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 168 in 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 174 in 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 163 in 3:15-cv-01392-SI, 167 in 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 177 in 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 172 in 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 175 in 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 172 in 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 181 in 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 183 in 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 173 in 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 190 in 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 140 in 3:15-cv-01472-SI). Filed by Premera Blue Cross.Docketed in all Member Cases. (Karlsgodt, Paul)
September 19, 2018 Filing 194 Declaration of David A. Carney . (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by Premera Blue Cross. (Related document(s): Response in Opposition to Motion,,,,, (181 in 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 175 in 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 176 in 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 65 in 3:17-cv-01648-SI, 176 in 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 178 in 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 177 in 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 190 in 3:15-md-02633-SI, 175 in 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 180 in 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 177 in 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 183 in 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 204 in 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 192 in 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 184 in 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 179 in 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 182 in 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 179 in 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 198 in 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 185 in 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 191 in 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 175 in 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 191 in 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 186 in 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 179 in 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 177 in 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 178 in 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 179 in 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 180 in 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 177 in 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 176 in 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 186 in 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 176 in 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 181 in 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 171 in 3:15-cv-01392-SI, 181 in 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 180 in 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 182 in 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 189 in 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 148 in 3:15-cv-01472-SI, 177 in 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 176 in 3:15-cv-01262-SI).) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- About the Premera Cyberattack, #2 Exhibit 2- Premera Response to Interrogatories, #3 Exhibit 3- Mandiant Intrusion Report, #4 Exhibit 4- Plaintiffs' Response to Interrogatories, #5 Exhibit 5- Ailey Depo, #6 Exhibit 6- Black Depo, #7 Exhibit 7- Bushman Depo, #8 Exhibit 8- Smith Depo, #9 Exhibit 9- Christopherson Depo, #10 Exhibit 10- Hansen-Bosse Depo, #11 Exhibit 11- L. Webster Depo, #12 Exhibit 12- Bazelon Depo, #13 Exhibit 13- Van Dyke Depo, #14 Exhibit 14- Rossi Depo, #15 Exhibit 15- Black SPD, #16 Exhibit 16- Fuerst Depo, #17 Exhibit 17- Kaplowitz Depo, #18 Exhibit 18- K. Chakraborty Depo, #19 Exhibit 19- Lynch Depo, #20 Exhibit 20- Allred Depo, #21 Exhibit 21- Emerson Depo, #22 Exhibit 22- M. Chakraborty Depo, #23 Exhibit 23- Fitch Depo, #24 Exhibit 24- Imbler Depo, #25 Exhibit 25- Forseter Depo, #26 Exhibit 26- Christophers Booklet, #27 Exhibit 27- Kaplowitz Booklet, #28 Exhibit 28- Feurst Booklet, #29 Exhibit 29- Forseter Booklet, #30 Exhibit 30- Ailey Booklet, #31 Exhibit 31- Imbler Booklet, #32 Exhibit 32- BJS Study, #33 Exhibit 33- Murphy Depo, #34 Exhibit 34- S. Hirsh Depo)Docketed in all Member Cases. (Karlsgodt, Paul)
September 19, 2018 Filing 193 Declaration of Megan Smith . (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by Premera Blue Cross. (Related document(s): Response in Opposition to Motion,,,,, (185 in 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 181 in 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 175 in 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 176 in 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 191 in 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 175 in 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 191 in 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 186 in 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 65 in 3:17-cv-01648-SI, 176 in 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 179 in 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 178 in 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 177 in 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 178 in 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 177 in 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 190 in 3:15-md-02633-SI, 175 in 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 180 in 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 177 in 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 179 in 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 180 in 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 177 in 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 176 in 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 183 in 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 186 in 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 204 in 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 176 in 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 181 in 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 192 in 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 184 in 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 179 in 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 171 in 3:15-cv-01392-SI, 182 in 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 179 in 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 181 in 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 180 in 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 198 in 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 182 in 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 189 in 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 148 in 3:15-cv-01472-SI, 177 in 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 176 in 3:15-cv-01262-SI).) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- K. Chakraborty, #2 Exhibit 2- M. Chakraborty, #3 Exhibit 3- S. Hirsh, #4 Exhibit 4- I. Hirsh)Docketed in all Member Cases. (Karlsgodt, Paul)
September 19, 2018 Filing 192 Declaration of Ken Chandler . (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by Premera Blue Cross. (Related document(s): Response in Opposition to Motion,,,,, (185 in 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 181 in 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 175 in 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 176 in 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 191 in 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 175 in 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 191 in 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 186 in 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 65 in 3:17-cv-01648-SI, 176 in 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 179 in 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 178 in 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 177 in 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 178 in 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 177 in 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 190 in 3:15-md-02633-SI, 175 in 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 180 in 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 177 in 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 179 in 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 180 in 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 177 in 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 176 in 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 183 in 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 186 in 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 204 in 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 176 in 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 181 in 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 192 in 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 184 in 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 179 in 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 171 in 3:15-cv-01392-SI, 182 in 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 179 in 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 181 in 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 180 in 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 198 in 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 182 in 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 189 in 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 148 in 3:15-cv-01472-SI, 177 in 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 176 in 3:15-cv-01262-SI).) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Eugene Water & Electric Board RFP, #2 Exhibit B- Alaska Railroad RFP, #3 Exhibit C- Electro Scientific Industries RFP, #4 Exhibit D- University of Alaska RFP, #5 Exhibit E- Clearwater Paper Corporation Health Plan, #6 Exhibit F- Ukpeagvik Inupiat Corporation RFP, #7 Exhibit G- Kitsap Credit Union RFP, #8 Exhibit H- Port of Seattle RFP, #9 Exhibit I- Federal Way Public Schools RFP, #10 Exhibit J- County of Spokane RFP, #11 Exhibit K- Virginia Mason Medical Center RFP)Docketed in all Member Cases. (Karlsgodt, Paul)
September 19, 2018 Filing 191 Declaration of Jennifer Tisch . (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by Premera Blue Cross. (Related document(s): Response in Opposition to Motion,,,,, (185 in 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 181 in 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 175 in 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 176 in 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 191 in 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 175 in 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 191 in 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 186 in 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 65 in 3:17-cv-01648-SI, 176 in 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 179 in 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 178 in 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 177 in 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 178 in 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 177 in 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 190 in 3:15-md-02633-SI, 175 in 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 180 in 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 177 in 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 179 in 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 180 in 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 177 in 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 176 in 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 183 in 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 186 in 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 204 in 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 176 in 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 181 in 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 192 in 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 184 in 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 179 in 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 171 in 3:15-cv-01392-SI, 182 in 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 179 in 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 181 in 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 180 in 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 198 in 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 182 in 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 189 in 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 148 in 3:15-cv-01472-SI, 177 in 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 176 in 3:15-cv-01262-SI).) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Privacy Mailings Policy)Docketed in all Member Cases. (Karlsgodt, Paul)
September 19, 2018 Filing 190 Expert Declaration of Jonathan M. Orszag . (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by Premera Blue Cross. (Related document(s): Response in Opposition to Motion,,,,, (185 in 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 181 in 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 175 in 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 176 in 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 191 in 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 175 in 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 191 in 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 186 in 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 65 in 3:17-cv-01648-SI, 176 in 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 179 in 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 178 in 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 177 in 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 178 in 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 177 in 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 190 in 3:15-md-02633-SI, 175 in 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 180 in 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 177 in 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 179 in 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 180 in 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 177 in 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 176 in 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 183 in 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 186 in 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 204 in 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 176 in 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 181 in 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 192 in 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 184 in 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 179 in 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 171 in 3:15-cv-01392-SI, 182 in 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 179 in 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 181 in 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 180 in 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 198 in 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 182 in 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 189 in 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 148 in 3:15-cv-01472-SI, 177 in 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 176 in 3:15-cv-01262-SI).)Docketed in all Member Cases. (Karlsgodt, Paul)
September 19, 2018 Filing 189 Expert Declaration of Keith Wojcieszek . (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by Premera Blue Cross. (Related document(s): Response in Opposition to Motion,,,,, (185 in 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 181 in 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 175 in 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 176 in 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 191 in 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 175 in 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 191 in 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 186 in 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 65 in 3:17-cv-01648-SI, 176 in 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 179 in 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 178 in 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 177 in 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 178 in 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 177 in 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 190 in 3:15-md-02633-SI, 175 in 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 180 in 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 177 in 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 179 in 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 180 in 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 177 in 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 176 in 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 183 in 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 186 in 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 204 in 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 176 in 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 181 in 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 192 in 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 184 in 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 179 in 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 171 in 3:15-cv-01392-SI, 182 in 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 179 in 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 181 in 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 180 in 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 198 in 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 182 in 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 189 in 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 148 in 3:15-cv-01472-SI, 177 in 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 176 in 3:15-cv-01262-SI).)Docketed in all Member Cases. (Karlsgodt, Paul)
September 19, 2018 Filing 188 Expert Declaration of C. Federico Campbell . (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by Premera Blue Cross. (Related document(s): Response in Opposition to Motion,,,,, (185 in 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 181 in 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 175 in 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 176 in 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 191 in 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 175 in 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 191 in 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 186 in 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 65 in 3:17-cv-01648-SI, 176 in 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 179 in 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 178 in 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 177 in 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 178 in 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 177 in 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 190 in 3:15-md-02633-SI, 175 in 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 180 in 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 177 in 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 179 in 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 180 in 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 177 in 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 176 in 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 183 in 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 186 in 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 204 in 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 176 in 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 181 in 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 192 in 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 184 in 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 179 in 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 171 in 3:15-cv-01392-SI, 182 in 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 179 in 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 181 in 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 180 in 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 198 in 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 182 in 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 189 in 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 148 in 3:15-cv-01472-SI, 177 in 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 176 in 3:15-cv-01262-SI).)Docketed in all Member Cases. (Karlsgodt, Paul)
September 19, 2018 Filing 187 Expert Declaration of Robert Anderson Jr. . (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by Premera Blue Cross. (Related document(s): Response in Opposition to Motion,,,,, (185 in 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 181 in 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 175 in 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 176 in 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 191 in 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 175 in 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 191 in 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 186 in 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 65 in 3:17-cv-01648-SI, 176 in 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 179 in 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 178 in 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 177 in 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 178 in 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 177 in 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 190 in 3:15-md-02633-SI, 175 in 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 180 in 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 177 in 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 179 in 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 180 in 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 177 in 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 176 in 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 183 in 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 186 in 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 204 in 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 176 in 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 181 in 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 192 in 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 184 in 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 179 in 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 171 in 3:15-cv-01392-SI, 182 in 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 179 in 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 181 in 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 180 in 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 198 in 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 182 in 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 189 in 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 148 in 3:15-cv-01472-SI, 177 in 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 176 in 3:15-cv-01262-SI).)Docketed in all Member Cases. (Karlsgodt, Paul)
September 19, 2018 Filing 186 Response in Opposition to Motion to Certify the Class and Memorandum in Support of Motion(156 in 3:15-md-02633-SI, 146 in 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 152 in 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 158 in 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 148 in 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 164 in 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 146 in 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 152 in 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 170 in 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 147 in 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 143 in 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 150 in 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 143 in 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 145 in 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 155 in 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 145 in 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 149 in 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 151 in 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 143 in 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 147 in 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 144 in 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 142 in 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 145 in 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 143 in 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 142 in 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 144 in 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 145 in 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 142 in 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 157 in 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 157 in 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 146 in 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 147 in 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 142 in 3:15-cv-01262-SI, 142 in 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 141 in 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 141 in 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 143 in 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 141 in 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 148 in 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 137 in 3:15-cv-01392-SI, 114 in 3:15-cv-01472-SI, 31 in 3:17-cv-01648-SI, 146 in 3:15-cv-01172-SI) Oral Argument requested. (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by Premera Blue Cross.Docketed in all Member Cases. (Karlsgodt, Paul)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER - Defendant's Unopposed Motion for One Day Extension of Time in Which to File Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification (ECF #188 ) is GRANTED as follows: Defendant's response is due by 9/19/2018. Plaintiffs' reply is due by 10/25/2018. Oral argument remains set for 11/15/2018 at 10:00AM before Judge Michael H. Simon. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. Docketed in all Member Cases. (mja)
September 18, 2018 Filing 184 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response/Reply to Motion to Certify the Class and Memorandum in Support of Motion(143 in 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 141 in 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 143 in 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 145 in 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 142 in 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 145 in 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 156 in 3:15-md-02633-SI, 141 in 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 158 in 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 31 in 3:17-cv-01648-SI, 146 in 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 152 in 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 142 in 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 143 in 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 142 in 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 155 in 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 164 in 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 143 in 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 145 in 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 149 in 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 144 in 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 144 in 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 142 in 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 170 in 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 152 in 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 142 in 3:15-cv-01262-SI, 157 in 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 147 in 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 141 in 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 143 in 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 151 in 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 150 in 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 157 in 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 148 in 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 114 in 3:15-cv-01472-SI, 147 in 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 146 in 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 147 in 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 148 in 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 146 in 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 137 in 3:15-cv-01392-SI, 145 in 3:15-cv-01164-SI). Filed by Premera Blue Cross.Docketed in all Member Cases. (Karlsgodt, Paul)
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER - Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Extend Plaintiffs' Deadline to Respond to Defendant's File Rate Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF #186 ) is GRANTED. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. Docketed in all Member Cases. (mja)
September 14, 2018 Filing 182 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response/Reply to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (162 in 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 161 in 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 189 in 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 164 in 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 165 in 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 168 in 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 166 in 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 163 in 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 162 in 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 162 in 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 50 in 3:17-cv-01648-SI, 133 in 3:15-cv-01472-SI, 171 in 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 166 in 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 176 in 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 171 in 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 170 in 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 160 in 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 183 in 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 160 in 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 165 in 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 161 in 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 175 in 3:15-md-02633-SI, 163 in 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 161 in 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 167 in 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 160 in 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 165 in 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 162 in 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 164 in 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 167 in 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 164 in 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 169 in 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 156 in 3:15-cv-01392-SI, 162 in 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 176 in 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 161 in 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 164 in 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 177 in 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 166 in 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 161 in 3:15-cv-01262-SI, 174 in 3:15-cv-01153-SI). Filed by All Plaintiffs.Docketed in all Member Cases. (Dubanevich, Keith)
September 5, 2018 Filing 181 Minutes of Telephone Conference: Status of case discussed as stated on the record. Keith S. Dubanevich, Kim D. Stephens, and Kate M. Baxter-Kauf present as counsel for Plaintiffs. Paul G. Karlsgodt, James A. Sherer, Darin M. Sands, David A. Carney, and Nicole L. Sterling present as counsel for Premera. Court Reporter: Dennis Apodaca. Judge Michael H. Simon presiding. Docketed in all Member Cases. (mja)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER - The parties' joint motion to extend word-count limitation and briefing schedule for Plaintiffs' motion for sanctions for Defendant's discovery misconduct (ECF 181 ) is GRANTED. Premera's response to Plaintiffs' motion for sanction ECF #182 ) is due by 9/28/2018. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. Docketed in all Member Cases. (mja)
August 30, 2018 Filing 177 Joint Motion to File Excess Pages and Extend Briefing Schedule for Plaintiffs' Motion for Sanctions for Defendant's Discovery Misconduct. Filed by All Plaintiffs.Docketed in all Member Cases. (Stephens, Kim)
August 24, 2018 Filing 176 Declaration of Randy Christensen in Support of Filed-Rate Motion for Summary Judgment. (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by Premera Blue Cross. (Related document(s): Motion for Partial Summary Judgment(175 in 3:15-md-02633-SI).) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 2006 Statement of Benefits)Docketed in all Member Cases. (Karlsgodt, Paul)
August 24, 2018 Filing 175 Declaration of Marshall Blaine in Support of Filed Rate Motion for Summary Judgment. (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by Premera Blue Cross. (Related document(s): Motion for Partial Summary Judgment(175 in 3:15-md-02633-SI).) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Large Group Rating Model 2011)Docketed in all Member Cases. (Karlsgodt, Paul)
August 24, 2018 Filing 174 Declaration of Jim Tedford in Support of Filed-Rate Motion for Summary Judgment. (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by Premera Blue Cross. (Related document(s): Motion for Partial Summary Judgment(175 in 3:15-md-02633-SI).) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Visible Technologies Medical 2011, #2 Exhibit 2 - Short Form 2012, #3 Exhibit 3 - Colliers Filing Transmittal Form 2012, #4 Exhibit 4 - Colliers Filing Transmittal Form 2013, #5 Exhibit 5 - Colliers Filing Transmittal Form 2014, #6 Exhibit 6 - Colliers Filing Transmittal Form 2015, #7 Exhibit 7 - Variola Filing Transmittal Form 2009, #8 Exhibit 8 - Variola Filing Transmittal Form 2012, #9 Exhibit 9 - Variola Filing Transmittal Form 2013, #10 Exhibit 10 - 2012 WAHIT Rate Filing, #11 Exhibit 11 - WEA Example One, #12 Exhibit 12 - WEA Example Two, #13 Exhibit 13 - WEA Example Three, #14 Exhibit 14 - Premera Medicare Supplement Rate 2013)Docketed in all Member Cases. (Karlsgodt, Paul)
August 24, 2018 Filing 173 Declaration of Julia Cooper in Support of Filed Rate Motion for Summary Judgment. (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by Premera Blue Cross. (Related document(s): Motion for Partial Summary Judgment(162 in 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 161 in 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 189 in 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 164 in 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 165 in 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 168 in 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 166 in 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 163 in 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 162 in 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 162 in 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 50 in 3:17-cv-01648-SI, 133 in 3:15-cv-01472-SI, 171 in 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 166 in 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 176 in 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 171 in 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 170 in 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 160 in 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 183 in 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 160 in 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 165 in 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 161 in 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 175 in 3:15-md-02633-SI, 163 in 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 161 in 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 167 in 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 160 in 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 165 in 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 162 in 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 164 in 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 167 in 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 164 in 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 169 in 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 156 in 3:15-cv-01392-SI, 162 in 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 176 in 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 161 in 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 164 in 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 177 in 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 166 in 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 161 in 3:15-cv-01262-SI, 174 in 3:15-cv-01153-SI).) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 2007 AK Small Group Rate Filing, #2 Exhibit 2 - 2004 AK Small Group Rate Filing, #3 Exhibit 3 - 2004 AK Small Group Filing Follow-Up Letters, #4 Exhibit 4 - 2004 AK Small Group Filing Approval, #5 Exhibit 5 - AK 2005 Small Group Rate Filing, #6 Exhibit 6 - 2005 AK Small Group Filing Approval)Docketed in all Member Cases. (Karlsgodt, Paul)
August 24, 2018 Filing 172 Declaration of David A. Carney in Support of Filed-Rate Motion for Summary Judgment. (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by Premera Blue Cross. (Related document(s): Motion for Partial Summary Judgment(162 in 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 161 in 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 162 in 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 162 in 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 166 in 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 176 in 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 171 in 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 170 in 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 160 in 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 183 in 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 161 in 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 163 in 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 167 in 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 160 in 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 165 in 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 164 in 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 167 in 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 164 in 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 169 in 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 162 in 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 161 in 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 164 in 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 177 in 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 161 in 3:15-cv-01262-SI, 189 in 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 164 in 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 165 in 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 168 in 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 166 in 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 163 in 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 50 in 3:17-cv-01648-SI, 133 in 3:15-cv-01472-SI, 171 in 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 160 in 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 165 in 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 175 in 3:15-md-02633-SI, 161 in 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 162 in 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 156 in 3:15-cv-01392-SI, 176 in 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 166 in 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 174 in 3:15-cv-01153-SI).) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Health Insurance Primer, #2 Exhibit 2 - The Market Structure of the Health Insurance Industry, #3 Exhibit 3 - Private Health Insurance Premiums and Rate Reviews, #4 Exhibit 4 - GAO Report to Congressional Requesters, #5 Exhibit 5 - John Bertko Congressional Tesimony, #6 Exhibit 6 - HHS Rate Increase Disclosure and Review-Proposed Rule, #7 Exhibit 7 - Kaiser Family Foundatino Focus on Health Reform, #8 Exhibit 8 - Alaska Attorney General Opinion, #9 Exhibit 9 - Sharif Ailey Depo Testimony, #10 Exhibit 10 - Amazon Benefits Booklet 2013, #11 Exhibit 11 - Mary Fuerst Depo Testimony, #12 Exhibit 12 - Ross Imbler Depo Testimony, #13 Exhibit 13 - Ross Imbler LinkedIn Resume, #14 Exhibit 14 - Krishnendu Chakraborty Depo Testimony, #15 Exhibit 15 - Howard Kaplowitz Depo Testimony, #16 Exhibit 16 - Catherine Bushman Depo Testimony, #17 Exhibit 17 - April Allred Depo Testimony, #18 Exhibit 18 - Barbara Lynch Depo Testimony, #19 Exhibit 19 - Ralph Christopherson Depo Testimony, #20 Exhibit 20 - Stuart Hirsh Depo Testimony, #21 Exhibit 21 - McCarthy Complaint)Docketed in all Member Cases. (Karlsgodt, Paul)
August 24, 2018 Filing 171 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment . (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Oral Argument requested. Filed by Premera Blue Cross.Docketed in all Member Cases. (Karlsgodt, Paul).
August 3, 2018 Filing 170 Exhibits 101-113 to Declaration of Yoona Park re Motion to Certify the Class and Memorandum in Support of Motion(142 in 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 145 in 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 156 in 3:15-md-02633-SI, 31 in 3:17-cv-01648-SI, 152 in 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 142 in 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 164 in 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 144 in 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 144 in 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 170 in 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 142 in 3:15-cv-01262-SI, 157 in 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 143 in 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 157 in 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 147 in 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 146 in 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 137 in 3:15-cv-01392-SI, 145 in 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 143 in 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 141 in 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 143 in 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 145 in 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 141 in 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 158 in 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 146 in 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 143 in 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 142 in 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 155 in 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 143 in 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 145 in 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 149 in 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 142 in 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 152 in 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 147 in 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 141 in 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 151 in 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 150 in 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 148 in 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 114 in 3:15-cv-01472-SI, 147 in 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 148 in 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 146 in 3:15-cv-01104-SI), Declaration,,,,, (157 in 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 155 in 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 149 in 3:15-cv-01392-SI, 176 in 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 159 in 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 153 in 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 158 in 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 154 in 3:15-cv-01262-SI, 182 in 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 168 in 3:15-md-02633-SI, 155 in 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 154 in 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 153 in 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 155 in 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 159 in 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 158 in 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 164 in 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 126 in 3:15-cv-01472-SI, 169 in 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 160 in 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 157 in 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 164 in 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 162 in 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 161 in 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 155 in 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 43 in 3:17-cv-01648-SI, 163 in 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 154 in 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 155 in 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 169 in 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 157 in 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 156 in 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 160 in 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 154 in 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 167 in 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 158 in 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 157 in 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 153 in 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 154 in 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 156 in 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 170 in 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 159 in 3:15-cv-01107-SI). (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 101, #2 Exhibit 102, #3 Exhibit 103, #4 Exhibit 104, #5 Exhibit 105, #6 Exhibit 106, #7 Exhibit 107, #8 Exhibit 108, #9 Exhibit 109, #10 Exhibit 110, #11 Exhibit 111, #12 Exhibit 112 (Part 1 of 2), #13 Exhibit 112 (Part 2 of 2), #14 Exhibit 113 (Part 1 of 2), #15 Exhibit 113 (Part 2 of 2))Docketed in all Member Cases. (Park, Yoona)
August 3, 2018 Filing 169 Exhibits 81-100 to Declaration of Yoona Park re Motion to Certify the Class and Memorandum in Support of Motion(142 in 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 145 in 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 156 in 3:15-md-02633-SI, 31 in 3:17-cv-01648-SI, 152 in 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 142 in 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 164 in 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 144 in 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 144 in 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 170 in 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 142 in 3:15-cv-01262-SI, 157 in 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 143 in 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 157 in 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 147 in 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 146 in 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 137 in 3:15-cv-01392-SI, 145 in 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 143 in 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 141 in 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 143 in 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 145 in 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 141 in 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 158 in 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 146 in 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 143 in 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 142 in 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 155 in 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 143 in 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 145 in 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 149 in 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 142 in 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 152 in 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 147 in 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 141 in 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 151 in 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 150 in 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 148 in 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 114 in 3:15-cv-01472-SI, 147 in 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 148 in 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 146 in 3:15-cv-01104-SI), Declaration,,,,, (157 in 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 155 in 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 149 in 3:15-cv-01392-SI, 176 in 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 159 in 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 153 in 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 158 in 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 154 in 3:15-cv-01262-SI, 182 in 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 168 in 3:15-md-02633-SI, 155 in 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 154 in 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 153 in 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 155 in 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 159 in 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 158 in 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 164 in 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 126 in 3:15-cv-01472-SI, 169 in 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 160 in 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 157 in 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 164 in 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 162 in 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 161 in 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 155 in 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 43 in 3:17-cv-01648-SI, 163 in 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 154 in 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 155 in 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 169 in 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 157 in 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 156 in 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 160 in 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 154 in 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 167 in 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 158 in 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 157 in 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 153 in 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 154 in 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 156 in 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 170 in 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 159 in 3:15-cv-01107-SI). (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 81 (Part 1 of 4), #2 Exhibit 81 (Part 2 of 4), #3 Exhibit 81 (Part 3 of 4), #4 Exhibit 81 (Part 4 of 4), #5 Exhibit 82, #6 Exhibit 83, #7 Exhibit 84, #8 Exhibit 85, #9 Exhibit 86, #10 Exhibit 87, #11 Exhibit 88, #12 Exhibit 89, #13 Exhibit 90, #14 Exhibit 91, #15 Exhibit 92, #16 Exhibit 93, #17 Exhibit 94, #18 Exhibit 95, #19 Exhibit 96, #20 Exhibit 97, #21 Exhibit 98, #22 Exhibit 99, #23 Exhibit 100)Docketed in all Member Cases. (Park, Yoona)
August 3, 2018 Filing 168 Exhibits 61-80 to Declaration of Yoona Park re Motion to Certify the Class and Memorandum in Support of Motion(142 in 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 145 in 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 156 in 3:15-md-02633-SI, 31 in 3:17-cv-01648-SI, 152 in 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 142 in 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 164 in 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 144 in 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 144 in 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 170 in 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 142 in 3:15-cv-01262-SI, 157 in 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 143 in 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 157 in 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 147 in 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 146 in 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 137 in 3:15-cv-01392-SI, 145 in 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 143 in 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 141 in 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 143 in 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 145 in 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 141 in 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 158 in 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 146 in 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 143 in 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 142 in 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 155 in 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 143 in 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 145 in 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 149 in 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 142 in 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 152 in 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 147 in 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 141 in 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 151 in 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 150 in 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 148 in 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 114 in 3:15-cv-01472-SI, 147 in 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 148 in 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 146 in 3:15-cv-01104-SI), Declaration,,,,, (157 in 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 155 in 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 149 in 3:15-cv-01392-SI, 176 in 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 159 in 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 153 in 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 158 in 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 154 in 3:15-cv-01262-SI, 182 in 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 168 in 3:15-md-02633-SI, 155 in 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 154 in 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 153 in 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 155 in 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 159 in 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 158 in 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 164 in 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 126 in 3:15-cv-01472-SI, 169 in 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 160 in 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 157 in 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 164 in 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 162 in 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 161 in 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 155 in 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 43 in 3:17-cv-01648-SI, 163 in 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 154 in 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 155 in 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 169 in 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 157 in 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 156 in 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 160 in 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 154 in 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 167 in 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 158 in 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 157 in 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 153 in 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 154 in 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 156 in 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 170 in 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 159 in 3:15-cv-01107-SI). (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 61, #2 Exhibit 62, #3 Exhibit 63, #4 Exhibit 64, #5 Exhibit 65, #6 Exhibit 66, #7 Exhibit 67, #8 Exhibit 68, #9 Exhibit 69, #10 Exhibit 70, #11 Exhibit 71, #12 Exhibit 72, #13 Exhibit 73, #14 Exhibit 74, #15 Exhibit 75, #16 Exhibit 76, #17 Exhibit 77, #18 Exhibit 78, #19 Exhibit 79, #20 Exhibit 80)Docketed in all Member Cases. (Park, Yoona)
August 3, 2018 Filing 167 Exhibits 41-60 to Declaration of Yoona Park re Motion to Certify the Class and Memorandum in Support of Motion(142 in 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 145 in 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 156 in 3:15-md-02633-SI, 31 in 3:17-cv-01648-SI, 152 in 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 142 in 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 164 in 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 144 in 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 144 in 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 170 in 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 142 in 3:15-cv-01262-SI, 157 in 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 143 in 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 157 in 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 147 in 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 146 in 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 137 in 3:15-cv-01392-SI, 145 in 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 143 in 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 141 in 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 143 in 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 145 in 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 141 in 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 158 in 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 146 in 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 143 in 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 142 in 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 155 in 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 143 in 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 145 in 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 149 in 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 142 in 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 152 in 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 147 in 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 141 in 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 151 in 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 150 in 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 148 in 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 114 in 3:15-cv-01472-SI, 147 in 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 148 in 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 146 in 3:15-cv-01104-SI), Declaration,,,,, (157 in 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 155 in 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 149 in 3:15-cv-01392-SI, 176 in 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 159 in 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 153 in 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 158 in 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 154 in 3:15-cv-01262-SI, 182 in 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 168 in 3:15-md-02633-SI, 155 in 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 154 in 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 153 in 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 155 in 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 159 in 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 158 in 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 164 in 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 126 in 3:15-cv-01472-SI, 169 in 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 160 in 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 157 in 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 164 in 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 162 in 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 161 in 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 155 in 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 43 in 3:17-cv-01648-SI, 163 in 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 154 in 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 155 in 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 169 in 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 157 in 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 156 in 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 160 in 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 154 in 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 167 in 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 158 in 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 157 in 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 153 in 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 154 in 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 156 in 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 170 in 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 159 in 3:15-cv-01107-SI). (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 41, #2 Exhibit 42, #3 Exhibit 43, #4 Exhibit 44, #5 Exhibit 45, #6 Exhibit 46, #7 Exhibit 47, #8 Exhibit 48, #9 Exhibit 49, #10 Exhibit 50, #11 Exhibit 51, #12 Exhibit 52, #13 Exhibit 53, #14 Exhibit 54, #15 Exhibit 55, #16 Exhibit 56, #17 Exhibit 57, #18 Exhibit 58, #19 Exhibit 59, #20 Exhibit 60)Docketed in all Member Cases. (Park, Yoona)
August 3, 2018 Filing 166 Exhibits 21-40 to Declaration of Yoona Park re Motion to Certify the Class and Memorandum in Support of Motion(142 in 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 145 in 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 156 in 3:15-md-02633-SI, 31 in 3:17-cv-01648-SI, 152 in 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 142 in 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 164 in 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 144 in 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 144 in 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 170 in 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 142 in 3:15-cv-01262-SI, 157 in 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 143 in 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 157 in 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 147 in 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 146 in 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 137 in 3:15-cv-01392-SI, 145 in 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 143 in 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 141 in 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 143 in 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 145 in 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 141 in 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 158 in 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 146 in 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 143 in 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 142 in 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 155 in 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 143 in 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 145 in 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 149 in 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 142 in 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 152 in 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 147 in 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 141 in 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 151 in 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 150 in 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 148 in 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 114 in 3:15-cv-01472-SI, 147 in 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 148 in 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 146 in 3:15-cv-01104-SI), Declaration,,,,, (157 in 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 155 in 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 149 in 3:15-cv-01392-SI, 176 in 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 159 in 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 153 in 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 158 in 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 154 in 3:15-cv-01262-SI, 182 in 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 168 in 3:15-md-02633-SI, 155 in 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 154 in 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 153 in 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 155 in 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 159 in 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 158 in 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 164 in 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 126 in 3:15-cv-01472-SI, 169 in 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 160 in 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 157 in 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 164 in 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 162 in 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 161 in 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 155 in 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 43 in 3:17-cv-01648-SI, 163 in 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 154 in 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 155 in 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 169 in 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 157 in 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 156 in 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 160 in 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 154 in 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 167 in 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 158 in 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 157 in 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 153 in 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 154 in 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 156 in 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 170 in 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 159 in 3:15-cv-01107-SI). (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 21, #2 Exhibit 22, #3 Exhibit 23, #4 Exhibit 24, #5 Exhibit 25, #6 Exhibit 26, #7 Exhibit 27, #8 Exhibit 28, #9 Exhibit 29, #10 Exhibit 30 (Part 1 of 8), #11 Exhibit 30 (Part 2 of 8), #12 Exhibit 30 (Part 3 of 8), #13 Exhibit 30 (Part 4 of 8), #14 Exhibit 30 (Part 5 of 8), #15 Exhibit 30 (Part 6 of 8), #16 Exhibit 30 (Part 7 of 8), #17 Exhibit 30 (Part 8 of 8), #18 Exhibit 31, #19 Exhibit 32, #20 Exhibit 33, #21 Exhibit 34, #22 Exhibit 35, #23 Exhibit 36, #24 Exhibit 37, #25 Exhibit 38, #26 Exhibit 39, #27 Exhibit 40)Docketed in all Member Cases. (Park, Yoona)
August 3, 2018 Filing 165 Exhibits 1-20 to Declaration of Yoona Park re Motion to Certify the Class and Memorandum in Support of Motion(142 in 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 145 in 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 156 in 3:15-md-02633-SI, 31 in 3:17-cv-01648-SI, 152 in 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 142 in 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 164 in 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 144 in 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 144 in 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 170 in 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 142 in 3:15-cv-01262-SI, 157 in 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 143 in 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 157 in 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 147 in 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 146 in 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 137 in 3:15-cv-01392-SI, 145 in 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 143 in 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 141 in 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 143 in 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 145 in 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 141 in 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 158 in 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 146 in 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 143 in 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 142 in 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 155 in 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 143 in 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 145 in 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 149 in 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 142 in 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 152 in 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 147 in 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 141 in 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 151 in 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 150 in 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 148 in 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 114 in 3:15-cv-01472-SI, 147 in 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 148 in 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 146 in 3:15-cv-01104-SI), Declaration,,,,, (157 in 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 155 in 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 149 in 3:15-cv-01392-SI, 176 in 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 159 in 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 153 in 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 158 in 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 154 in 3:15-cv-01262-SI, 182 in 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 168 in 3:15-md-02633-SI, 155 in 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 154 in 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 153 in 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 155 in 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 159 in 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 158 in 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 164 in 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 126 in 3:15-cv-01472-SI, 169 in 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 160 in 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 157 in 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 164 in 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 162 in 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 161 in 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 155 in 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 43 in 3:17-cv-01648-SI, 163 in 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 154 in 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 155 in 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 169 in 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 157 in 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 156 in 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 160 in 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 154 in 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 167 in 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 158 in 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 157 in 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 153 in 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 154 in 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 156 in 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 170 in 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 159 in 3:15-cv-01107-SI). (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12 (Part 1 of 2), #13 Exhibit 12 (Part 2 of 2), #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20)Docketed in all Member Cases. (Park, Yoona)
August 3, 2018 Filing 164 Declaration of Yoona Park in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification. (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion to certify class, (143 in 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 141 in 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 143 in 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 145 in 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 142 in 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 145 in 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 156 in 3:15-md-02633-SI, 141 in 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 158 in 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 31 in 3:17-cv-01648-SI, 146 in 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 152 in 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 142 in 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 143 in 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 142 in 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 155 in 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 164 in 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 143 in 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 145 in 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 149 in 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 144 in 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 144 in 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 142 in 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 170 in 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 152 in 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 142 in 3:15-cv-01262-SI, 157 in 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 147 in 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 141 in 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 143 in 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 151 in 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 150 in 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 157 in 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 148 in 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 114 in 3:15-cv-01472-SI, 147 in 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 146 in 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 147 in 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 148 in 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 146 in 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 137 in 3:15-cv-01392-SI, 145 in 3:15-cv-01164-SI).)Docketed in all Member Cases. (Park, Yoona)
August 3, 2018 Filing 163 Declaration of James Van Dyke in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification. (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion to certify class, (143 in 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 141 in 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 143 in 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 145 in 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 142 in 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 145 in 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 156 in 3:15-md-02633-SI, 141 in 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 158 in 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 31 in 3:17-cv-01648-SI, 146 in 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 152 in 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 142 in 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 143 in 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 142 in 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 155 in 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 164 in 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 143 in 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 145 in 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 149 in 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 144 in 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 144 in 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 142 in 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 170 in 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 152 in 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 142 in 3:15-cv-01262-SI, 157 in 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 147 in 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 141 in 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 143 in 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 151 in 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 150 in 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 157 in 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 148 in 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 114 in 3:15-cv-01472-SI, 147 in 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 146 in 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 147 in 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 148 in 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 146 in 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 137 in 3:15-cv-01392-SI, 145 in 3:15-cv-01164-SI).) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)Docketed in all Member Cases. (Dubanevich, Keith)
August 3, 2018 Filing 162 Declaration of Matthew Strebe in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification. (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion to certify class, (143 in 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 141 in 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 143 in 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 145 in 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 142 in 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 145 in 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 156 in 3:15-md-02633-SI, 141 in 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 158 in 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 31 in 3:17-cv-01648-SI, 146 in 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 152 in 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 142 in 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 143 in 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 142 in 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 155 in 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 164 in 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 143 in 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 145 in 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 149 in 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 144 in 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 144 in 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 142 in 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 170 in 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 152 in 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 142 in 3:15-cv-01262-SI, 157 in 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 147 in 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 141 in 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 143 in 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 151 in 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 150 in 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 157 in 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 148 in 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 114 in 3:15-cv-01472-SI, 147 in 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 146 in 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 147 in 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 148 in 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 146 in 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 137 in 3:15-cv-01392-SI, 145 in 3:15-cv-01164-SI).) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)Docketed in all Member Cases. (Dubanevich, Keith)
August 3, 2018 Filing 161 Declaration of Peter E. Rossi in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification. (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion to certify class, (143 in 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 141 in 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 143 in 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 145 in 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 142 in 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 145 in 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 156 in 3:15-md-02633-SI, 141 in 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 158 in 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 31 in 3:17-cv-01648-SI, 146 in 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 152 in 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 142 in 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 143 in 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 142 in 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 155 in 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 164 in 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 143 in 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 145 in 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 149 in 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 144 in 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 144 in 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 142 in 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 170 in 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 152 in 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 142 in 3:15-cv-01262-SI, 157 in 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 147 in 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 141 in 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 143 in 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 151 in 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 150 in 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 157 in 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 148 in 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 114 in 3:15-cv-01472-SI, 147 in 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 146 in 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 147 in 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 148 in 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 146 in 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 137 in 3:15-cv-01392-SI, 145 in 3:15-cv-01164-SI).) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)Docketed in all Member Cases. (Dubanevich, Keith)
August 3, 2018 Filing 160 Declaration of Dr. Coleman Bazelon in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification. (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion to certify class, (143 in 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 141 in 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 143 in 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 145 in 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 142 in 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 145 in 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 156 in 3:15-md-02633-SI, 141 in 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 158 in 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 31 in 3:17-cv-01648-SI, 146 in 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 152 in 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 142 in 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 143 in 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 142 in 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 155 in 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 164 in 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 143 in 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 145 in 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 149 in 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 144 in 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 144 in 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 142 in 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 170 in 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 152 in 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 142 in 3:15-cv-01262-SI, 157 in 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 147 in 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 141 in 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 143 in 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 151 in 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 150 in 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 157 in 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 148 in 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 114 in 3:15-cv-01472-SI, 147 in 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 146 in 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 147 in 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 148 in 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 146 in 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 137 in 3:15-cv-01392-SI, 145 in 3:15-cv-01164-SI).) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)Docketed in all Member Cases. (Dubanevich, Keith)
August 3, 2018 Filing 159 Declaration of Tina Wolfson in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification (Class Counsel). Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion to certify class, (143 in 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 141 in 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 143 in 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 145 in 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 142 in 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 145 in 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 156 in 3:15-md-02633-SI, 141 in 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 158 in 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 31 in 3:17-cv-01648-SI, 146 in 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 152 in 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 142 in 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 143 in 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 142 in 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 155 in 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 164 in 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 143 in 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 145 in 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 149 in 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 144 in 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 144 in 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 142 in 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 170 in 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 152 in 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 142 in 3:15-cv-01262-SI, 157 in 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 147 in 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 141 in 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 143 in 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 151 in 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 150 in 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 157 in 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 148 in 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 114 in 3:15-cv-01472-SI, 147 in 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 146 in 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 147 in 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 148 in 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 146 in 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 137 in 3:15-cv-01392-SI, 145 in 3:15-cv-01164-SI).) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)Docketed in all Member Cases. (Dubanevich, Keith)
August 3, 2018 Filing 158 Declaration of Tina Wolfson in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification. (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion to certify class, (143 in 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 141 in 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 143 in 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 145 in 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 142 in 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 145 in 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 156 in 3:15-md-02633-SI, 141 in 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 158 in 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 31 in 3:17-cv-01648-SI, 146 in 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 152 in 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 142 in 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 143 in 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 142 in 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 155 in 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 164 in 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 143 in 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 145 in 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 149 in 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 144 in 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 144 in 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 142 in 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 170 in 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 152 in 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 142 in 3:15-cv-01262-SI, 157 in 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 147 in 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 141 in 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 143 in 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 151 in 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 150 in 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 157 in 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 148 in 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 114 in 3:15-cv-01472-SI, 147 in 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 146 in 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 147 in 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 148 in 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 146 in 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 137 in 3:15-cv-01392-SI, 145 in 3:15-cv-01164-SI).) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)Docketed in all Member Cases. (Dubanevich, Keith)
August 3, 2018 Filing 157 Declaration of Kim D. Stephens in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion to certify class, (143 in 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 141 in 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 143 in 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 145 in 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 142 in 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 145 in 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 156 in 3:15-md-02633-SI, 141 in 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 158 in 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 31 in 3:17-cv-01648-SI, 146 in 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 152 in 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 142 in 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 143 in 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 142 in 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 155 in 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 164 in 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 143 in 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 145 in 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 149 in 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 144 in 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 144 in 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 142 in 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 170 in 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 152 in 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 142 in 3:15-cv-01262-SI, 157 in 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 147 in 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 141 in 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 143 in 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 151 in 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 150 in 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 157 in 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 148 in 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 114 in 3:15-cv-01472-SI, 147 in 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 146 in 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 147 in 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 148 in 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 146 in 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 137 in 3:15-cv-01392-SI, 145 in 3:15-cv-01164-SI).)Docketed in all Member Cases. (Dubanevich, Keith)
August 3, 2018 Filing 156 Declaration of Cecily C. Shiel in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification. (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion to certify class, (143 in 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 141 in 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 143 in 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 145 in 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 142 in 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 145 in 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 156 in 3:15-md-02633-SI, 141 in 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 158 in 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 31 in 3:17-cv-01648-SI, 146 in 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 152 in 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 142 in 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 143 in 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 142 in 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 155 in 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 164 in 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 143 in 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 145 in 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 149 in 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 144 in 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 144 in 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 142 in 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 170 in 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 152 in 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 142 in 3:15-cv-01262-SI, 157 in 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 147 in 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 141 in 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 143 in 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 151 in 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 150 in 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 157 in 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 148 in 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 114 in 3:15-cv-01472-SI, 147 in 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 146 in 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 147 in 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 148 in 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 146 in 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 137 in 3:15-cv-01392-SI, 145 in 3:15-cv-01164-SI).) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Docketed in all Member Cases. (Dubanevich, Keith)
August 3, 2018 Filing 155 Declaration of Karen Hanson Riebel in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion to certify class, (31 in 3:17-cv-01648-SI).) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)Docketed in all Member Cases. (Dubanevich, Keith)
August 3, 2018 Filing 154 Declaration of James J. Pizzirusso in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion to certify class, (31 in 3:17-cv-01648-SI).) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)Docketed in all Member Cases. (Dubanevich, Keith)
August 3, 2018 Filing 153 Declaration of Keith S. Dubanevich in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion to certify class, (31 in 3:17-cv-01648-SI).) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)Docketed in all Member Cases. (Dubanevich, Keith)
August 3, 2018 Filing 152 Motion to Certify the Class and Memorandum in Support of Motion. (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Plaintiffs.Docketed in all Member Cases. (Dubanevich, Keith)
July 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 151 Scheduling Order by Judge Michael H. Simon. Order - At the parties' request, the Telephone Conference set for 8/1/2018 at 8:00AM is STRICKEN. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. Filed in all associated cases of 3:15-md-02633-SI (mja)
July 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 150 Pretrial Order No 16. See attached order for details. Signed on 7/6/2018 by Judge Michael H. Simon. Order - The Telephone Status Conference Set for 7/11/2018 is STRICKEN. Filed in all associated cases of 3:15-md-02633-SI. (mja)
July 3, 2018 Filing 149 Joint Motion Regarding Class Certification Briefing and Oral Argument Schedule. Filed by Premera Blue Cross.Docketed in all Member Cases. (Karlsgodt, Paul)
June 22, 2018 Filing 148 OFFICIAL COURT TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS FILED Telephone Status Conference held on June 12, 2018 before Judge Michael H. Simon, Court Reporter Bonita J. Shumway, telephone number 503-326-8188 or bonita_shumway@ord.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at Court's public terminal or purchased from the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. Afterwards it may be obtained through the Court Reporter or PACER-See Policy at ord.uscourts.gov. Notice of Intent to Redact Transcript is due by 6/29/2018. Redaction Request due 7/13/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/23/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/20/2018. Docketed in all Member Cases. (Shumway, Bonita)
June 22, 2018 Filing 147 Notice of Appearance of Arielle S. Wagner appearing on behalf of All Plaintiffs Filed by on behalf of All Plaintiffs.Associated Cases: 3:15-md-02633-SI, 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 3:15-cv-01262-SI, 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 3:15-cv-01392-SI, 3:15-cv-01472-SI, 3:17-cv-01648-SI (Wagner, Arielle)
June 12, 2018 Filing 146 Minutes of Telephone Conference: Status of case discussed as stated on the record. Keith S. Dubanevich and Kim D. Stephens present as counsel for plaintiff(s). Paul G. Karlsgodt, James A. Sherer, Darin M. Sands, David A. Carney, and Nichole Sterling. present as counsel for defendant(s). Court Reporter: Bonita Shumway. Judge Michael H. Simon presiding. Docketed in all Member Cases. (mja)
May 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 145 Scheduling Order - Due to a conflict in the Court's schedule, the Court is resetting the Telephone Status Conference from 6/6/2018 to 6/12/2018 at 8:00AM. The Court will provide the parties with a call-in number by separate sealed entry. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon.Filed in all Associated Cases of 3:15-md-02633-SI. (mja)
April 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 144 Scheduling Order by Judge Michael H. Simon. Order - The Telephone Status Conference set for 5/2/2018 is STRICKEN. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon.Filed in All Associated Cases of 3:15-md-02633-SI. (mja)
April 18, 2018 Filing 143 Minutes of Telephone Status Conference: Status of case discussed as stated on the record. Keith S. Dubanevich, Kim D. Stephens, and Tina Wolfson present as counsel for Plaintiffs. Paul G. Karlsgodt, James Sherer, and David A. Carney present as counsel for Defendant. Court Reporter: Dennis Apodaca. Judge Michael H. Simon presiding. Docketed in all Member Cases. (mja)
March 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 142 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 15 - (See formal Order for details) The Court directs the Clerk of Court to send a copy of this Order to the Clerk of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Signed on 3/19/2018 by Judge Michael H. Simon. Docketed in all Member Cases. (mja)
March 16, 2018 Filing 141 Stipulated Motion for Order Titled as "Stipulated Request Between the Parties and Non-Party FireEye, Inc. for an Order Under Federal Rules of Evidence 502(D) and (E) and [Proposed] Order". Filed by All Plaintiffs.Docketed in all Member Cases. (Dubanevich, Keith)
March 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 140 Order - At the parties' request, the Court is STRIKING the Telephone Conference set for 3/7/2018 at 8:00AM. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon.Filed in All Associated Cases of 3:15-md-2633.
February 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 139 Scheduling Order by Judge Michael H. Simon. Order - Due to a conflict in the Court's schedule, the Court is resetting the Telephone Status Conference from 4/4/2018 to 4/18/2018 at 8:00AM. The Court will provide the parties with a call-in number by separate sealed entry. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. Filed in all Associated Cases: 3:15-md-02633-SI.
February 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 138 Order - At the parties' request, the Court is striking the Telephone Conference set for 2/7/2018 at 8:00AM. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. Filed in All Associated Cases: 3:15-md-02633-SI,
January 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 137 Pretrial Order No. 14. Signed 1/16/2018 by Judge Michael H. Simon.Filed in All Associated Cases: 3:15-md-02633-SI
December 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 136 Scheduling Order by Judge Michael H. Simon. Order - At the parties' request, the Telephone Status Conference set for 1/3/2018 is STRICKEN. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon.Filed in all Associated Cases: 3:15-md-02633-SI, (mja)
December 6, 2017 Filing 135 Minutes of Telephone Status Conference: Discovery and other case matters discussed as stated on the record. Order - The parties are directed to confer on the current case schedule and file a motion to amend that schedule no later than 12/20/2017. Telephone Status Conferences for 2018 are set for the first Wednesday of the month at 8:00AM, except for July of 2018 when it will be set for the second Wednesday of that month due to the holiday. The Telephone Status Conference dates are as follows: 1/3/2018, 2/7/2018, 3/7/2018, 4/4/2018, 5/2/2018, 6/6/2018, 7/11/2018, 8/1/2018, 9/5/2018, 10/3/2018, 11/7/2018, and 12/5/2018. The Court's call-in number remains the same and can be found on the docket, under seal, following this order. Keith S. Dubanevich, Kim D. Stephens, and Swathi Bojedla present as counsel for plaintiff(s). Paul G. Karlsgodt, James A. Sherer and Darin M. Sands present as counsel for defendant(s). Court Reporter: Nancy Walker. Judge Michael H. Simon presiding. Docketed in all Member Cases. (mja)
November 8, 2017 Filing 134 Minutes of Telephone Status Conference - Discovery issues raised in the parties' October 27, 2017, letter are resolved as stated on the record. Kieth S. Dubanevich, Kim D. Stephens, Kate M. Baxter-Kauf, Swathi Bojedla, and Howard T. Longman present as counsel for Plaintiff(s). Paul G. Karlsgodt, James A. Sherer and Darin M. Sands present as counsel for Defendant. Court Reporter: Dennis Apodaca. Judge Michael H. Simon presiding. Docketed in all Member Cases. (mja)
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 133 Order - Due to a conflict in the Court's schedule, the Court is resetting the Telephone Status Conference from 11/1/2017 to 11/8/2017 at 8:00AM. The Court will provide the parties with a call-in number by separate sealed entry. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)Filed in all associated cases: 3:15-md-02633-SI,
October 27, 2017 Filing 132 Notice of Change of Address. Filed by All Plaintiffs.Associated Cases: 3:15-md-02633-SI, 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 3:15-cv-01262-SI, 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 3:15-cv-01392-SI, 3:15-cv-01472-SI, 3:17-cv-01648-SI (Wolfson, Tina)
October 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 131 Opinion and Order - Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel (ECF 110 ) is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART as described in this Opinion and Order. Signed on 10/27/2017 by Judge Michael H. Simon. filed in all Associated Cases of 3:15-md-02633-SI (mja)
October 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 130 Pretrial Order No. 13. Signed on 10/5/2017 by Judge Michael H. Simon. Filed in all associated cases: (mja)
October 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 129 Pretrial Order No. 12 - Order Terminating Appointment of Special Master - Special Master Henry Kantor has reported to the Court and the parties that a conflict of interest has been discovered. After consulting with the parties, the Court hereby terminates the appointment of the Special Master. The Court directs the Clerk of the Court to send a copy of this Order to the Clerk of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Signed on 10/5/2017 by Judge Michael H. Simon. Filed in all Associated Cases: 3:15-md-02633-SI
October 4, 2017 Filing 128 MINUTES of Telephone Status Conference: Status of case discussed as stated on the record. Keith S. Dubanevich, Kim D. Stephens, James Pizzirusso, Swathi Bojedla and Tina Wolfson present as counsel for plaintiff(s). Paul G. Karlsgodt, James A. Sherer and Darin M. Sands present as counsel for defendant(s). Court Reporter: Dennis Apodaca. Judge Michael H. Simon presiding. Docketed in all Member Cases. (mja)
September 18, 2017 Filing 127 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Plaintiff Darin Purcell Filed by Darin Purcell.Associated Cases: 3:15-md-02633-SI, 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 3:15-cv-01262-SI, 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 3:15-cv-01392-SI, 3:15-cv-01472-SI (Stephens, Kim)
September 12, 2017 Filing 126 Stipulated Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Plaintiff Joann Welch Filed by Joann V Welch.Associated Cases: 3:15-md-02633-SI, 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 3:15-cv-01262-SI, 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 3:15-cv-01392-SI, 3:15-cv-01472-SI (Stephens, Kim)
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 125 Order - The hearings in this matter, including the pretrial conferences and trial date, have been moved from Courtroom 13B to Courtroom 15B, before Judge Michael H. Simon. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. Filed in all Associated Cases: 3:15-md-02633-SI
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 124 Scheduling Order by Judge Michael H. Simon. Order - At the parties' request, the Telephone Status Conference set for 9/6/2017 is STRICKEN. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon.Filed in all Associated Cases: 3:15-md-02633-SI
July 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 123 Order - At the parties' request, the status conference set for 8/2/2017 is STRICKEN. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon.filed in all associated cases
June 30, 2017 Filing 122 Supplemental Brief on Privilege Issues. Filed by Premera Blue Cross. (Related document(s): Scheduling Conference,, (111 in 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 113 in 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 109 in 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 111 in 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 111 in 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 108 in 3:15-cv-01262-SI, 132 in 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 115 in 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 114 in 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 108 in 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 112 in 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 118 in 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 107 in 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 103 in 3:15-cv-01392-SI, 110 in 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 108 in 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 80 in 3:15-cv-01472-SI, 108 in 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 117 in 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 115 in 3:15-md-02633-SI, 123 in 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 110 in 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 107 in 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 116 in 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 112 in 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 130 in 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 109 in 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 113 in 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 114 in 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 109 in 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 107 in 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 111 in 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 121 in 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 124 in 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 123 in 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 118 in 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 113 in 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 108 in 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 109 in 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 112 in 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 109 in 3:15-cv-01160-SI).)Docketed in all Member Cases. (Karlsgodt, Paul)
June 30, 2017 Filing 121 Supplemental Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion to compel, (106 in 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 75 in 3:15-cv-01472-SI, 103 in 3:15-cv-01262-SI, 106 in 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 105 in 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 127 in 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 116 in 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 104 in 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 108 in 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 102 in 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 107 in 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 118 in 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 110 in 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 103 in 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 102 in 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 103 in 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 106 in 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 108 in 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 109 in 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 112 in 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 107 in 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 108 in 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 111 in 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 119 in 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 103 in 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 110 in 3:15-md-02633-SI, 113 in 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 106 in 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 98 in 3:15-cv-01392-SI, 107 in 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 104 in 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 104 in 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 109 in 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 104 in 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 113 in 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 118 in 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 104 in 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 103 in 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 125 in 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 105 in 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 102 in 3:15-cv-01264-SI).) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Docketed in all Member Cases. (Dubanevich, Keith)
June 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 120 Scheduling Order by Judge Michael H. Simon. Order - A the parties' request, the Court is STRIKING the Telephone Status Conference set for 7/5/2017. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon.filed in all Associated Cases. (mja)
June 27, 2017 Filing 119 Notice of Attorney Withdrawal: of McKean J. Evans Filed by Joann V WelchAssociated Cases: 3:15-md-02633-SI, 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 3:15-cv-01262-SI, 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 3:15-cv-01392-SI, 3:15-cv-01472-SI (Evans, McKean)
June 16, 2017 Filing 118 MINUTES of Proceedings: Order - The parties are directed to submit simultaneous briefing regarding the issues stated on the record by June 30, 2017. Keith S. Dubanevich, Kim D. Stephens, and Kate M. Baxter-Kauf present as counsel for plaintiff(s). James A. Sherer, Darin M. Sands, David A. Carney and Nichole Sterling present as counsel for defendant(s). Court Reporter: Dennis Apodaca. Special Master Henry Kantor presiding. Docketed in all Member Cases. (mja) Modified on 6/23/2017 correct spelling of Plaintiff's attorney Keith Dubanevich. (mja).
June 14, 2017 Filing 117 MINUTES of Telephone Conference: Discovery matters discussed as stated on the record. Keith S. Dubanevich, Kim D. Stephens, and James Pizzirusso present as counsel for plaintiff(s). Paul G. Karlsgodt, James A. Sherer, Darin M. Sands and David A. Carney present as counsel for defendant(s). Court Reporter: Dennis Apodaca. Judge Michael H. Simon presiding. Docketed in all Member Cases. (mja)
June 7, 2017 Filing 116 Response in Opposition to Motion to Compel entitled "Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel and Memorandum in Support"(110 in 3:15-md-02633-SI, 106 in 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 75 in 3:15-cv-01472-SI, 103 in 3:15-cv-01262-SI, 106 in 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 105 in 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 127 in 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 116 in 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 104 in 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 108 in 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 102 in 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 107 in 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 118 in 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 110 in 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 103 in 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 102 in 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 103 in 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 106 in 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 108 in 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 109 in 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 112 in 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 107 in 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 108 in 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 111 in 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 119 in 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 103 in 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 110 in 3:15-md-02633-SI, 113 in 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 106 in 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 98 in 3:15-cv-01392-SI, 107 in 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 104 in 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 104 in 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 109 in 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 104 in 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 113 in 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 118 in 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 104 in 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 103 in 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 125 in 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 105 in 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 102 in 3:15-cv-01264-SI). (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by Premera Blue Cross. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James Sherer, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of James Sherer, #3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of James Sherer, #4 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of James Sherer, #5 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of James Sherer)Docketed in all Member Cases. (Karlsgodt, Paul)
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 115 Scheduling Order by Judge Michael H. Simon. Order - Due to a conflict in the Court's schedule, the Court is resetting the Telephone Status Conference from 6/7/2017 to 6/14/2017 at 8:30AM. The Court will provide the parties with a call-in number by separate sealed entry. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. Filed in all Associated Cases of 3:15-md-02633-SI.
May 24, 2017 Filing 114 Declaration of Keith S. Dubanevich in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel. (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion to compel, (106 in 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 75 in 3:15-cv-01472-SI, 103 in 3:15-cv-01262-SI, 106 in 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 105 in 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 127 in 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 116 in 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 104 in 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 108 in 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 102 in 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 107 in 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 118 in 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 110 in 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 103 in 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 102 in 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 103 in 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 106 in 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 108 in 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 109 in 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 112 in 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 107 in 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 108 in 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 111 in 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 119 in 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 103 in 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 110 in 3:15-md-02633-SI, 113 in 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 106 in 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 98 in 3:15-cv-01392-SI, 107 in 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 104 in 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 104 in 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 109 in 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 104 in 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 113 in 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 118 in 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 104 in 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 103 in 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 125 in 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 105 in 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 102 in 3:15-cv-01264-SI).) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit)Docketed in all Member Cases. (Dubanevich, Keith)
May 24, 2017 Filing 113 Motion to Compel entitled "Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel and Memorandum in Support". (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Plaintiffs.Docketed in all Member Cases. (Dubanevich, Keith)
May 10, 2017 Filing 112 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal of Plaintiffs Anne Michelle Blackwolfe, Robert Foulon, Theresa Foulon, Crystal Hayes, Kevin McLallen, and Surya Prakash by All Plaintiffs. Filed by All Plaintiffs. Docketed in all Member Cases. (Stephens, Kim)
May 10, 2017 Filing 111 MINUTES of Telephone Conference: Order - Setting a briefing schedule as follows: Plaintiffs' brief regarding attorney-client privilege issues is due by 5/24/2017. Defendant's response is due by 6/7/2017. Oral Argument is set for 6/16/2017 at 1:30PM in Portland, Courtroom 13B, before Special Master Henry Kantor. Keith S. Dubanevich, Kim D. Stephens, Jason T. Dennett, Kate M. Baxter-Kauf, McKean J. Evans, and Swathi Bojedla present as counsel for plaintiff(s). Paul G. Karlsgodt, James A. Sherer, David A. Carney, and Darin M. Sands present as counsel for defendant(s). Court Reporter: Dennis Apodaca. Special Master Henry Kator. Judge Michael H. Simon presiding. Docketed in all Member Cases. (mja)
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 110 SCHEDULING ORDER - The Court will hold a telephonic status conference with the parties and Special Master Henry Kantor on Wednesday, May 10, 2017, at 9:00 AM. The Courtroom Deputy separately will provide a call-in telephone number. Judge Michael H. SimonFiled in all associated cases of 3:15-md-02633-SI.
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 109 Pretrial Order No. 11 - Order Appointing Special Master. Signed on 5/3/2017 by Judge Michael H. Simon. Filed in all associated Cases of 3:15-md-02633-SI.
May 3, 2017 Filing 108 Declaration of Henry Kantor. Filed by Henry Kantor. Docketed in all Member Cases. (mja)
May 3, 2017 Filing 107 Minutes of Telephone Status Conference: Appointment of a Special Master and other procedural matters discussed as stated on the Record. Keith S. Dubanevich, Kim D. Stephens, James Pizzirusso and Jason T. Dennett present as counsel for plaintiff(s). Paul G. Karlsgodt, James A. Sherer and Darin M. Sands present as counsel for defendant(s). Court Reporter: Dennis Apodaca. Judge Michael H. Simon presiding. Docketed in all Member Cases. (mja)
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER - At the parties' joint request, the Court strikes the hearing and trial dates previously set for October 6, 2017; March 23, 2018; July 13, 2018; October 5, 2018, October 12, 2018, and October 29, 2018, and replaces them as set forth in the attached Pretrial Order No. 10 (Amended Case Schedule). Judge Michael H. Simon. Filed in all associated cases. (mja)
April 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 105 Order - Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Order Clarifying Stipulated Protective Order (ECF #100 ) is GRANTED. The Stipulated Protective Order entered on September 11, 2015, (ECF #41 ) also allows for the production of consumer credit information pursuant to 15 U.S.C. 1681B by non-party Consumerinfo.com, subject to an "Attorneys' Eyes Only" designation. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. Filed in all associated cases. (mja)
April 12, 2017 Filing 104 Unopposed Motion for Order Clarifying Stipulated Protective Order. Filed by All Plaintiffs.Docketed in all Member Cases. (Dubanevich, Keith)
April 5, 2017 Filing 103 MINUTES of Telephone Status Conference: Discovery matters discussed as stated on the record. Keith S. Dubanevich, Kim D. Stephens, and Kate M. Baxter-Kauf present as counsel for plaintiff(s). Paul G. Karlsgodt and Darin M. Sands present as counsel for defendant(s). Court Reporter: Dennis Apodaca. Judge Michael H. Simon presiding. Docketed in all Member Cases. (mja)
February 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 102 Order - At the parties' request, the telephone status conference set for 3/1/2017 is STRICKEN. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. Entered in all associated cases of 3:15-md-02633-SI.
February 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER - Defendant Premera Blue Cross's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (ECF #95 ) is GRANTED. Answer due by 3/9/2017. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
February 17, 2017 Filing 100 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer . Filed by Premera Blue Cross.Docketed in all Member Cases. (Sands, Darin)
February 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 99 Pretrial Order No. 9 - During the remainder of 2017, regular telephonic status conferences will be held among the Parties and the Court, generally on the first Wednesday of each month. By noon Pacific time on the Friday before each status conference, the Parties will inform the Court of any issues that need to be resolved in accordance with the procedures described above, or otherwise as the Parties may request. If the Parties need an earlier decision outside of the regular status conference, they will present their request in a joint letter to the Court. The monthly telephonic status conferences for 2017 will be held as follows: Wednesday, March 1, 2017, 8:00 a.m.; Wednesday, April 5, 2017, 8:00 a.m.; Wednesday, May 3, 2017, 8:00 a.m.; Wednesday, June 7, 2017, 8:00 a.m.; Wednesday, July 5, 2017, 8:00 a.m.; Wednesday, August 2, 2017, 8:00 a.m.; Wednesday, September 6, 2017, 8:00 a.m.; Wednesday, October 4, 2017, 8:00 a.m.; Wednesday, November 1, 2017, 8:00 a.m.; and Wednesday, December 6, 2017, 8:00 a.m. Signed on 2/16/2017 by Judge Michael H. Simon. Filed in all Associated Cases:
February 16, 2017 Filing 98 MINUTES of Telephone Conference: The parties discussed procedures for discovery disputes as stated on the record. Pretrial Order No. 9 to follow. Kim D. Stephens and James Joseph Pizzirusso present as counsel for plaintiff(s). James A. Sherer, Paul G. Karlsgodt and Darin M. Sands present as counsel for defendant(s). Court Reporter: Dennis Apodaca. Judge Michael H. Simon presiding. Docketed in all Member Cases. (mja)
February 9, 2017 Filing 97 MINUTES OF TELEPHONE CONFERENCE: Order - Setting a further telephone status conference for 2/16/2017 at 2:00PM. The Court will provide the parties with a call-in number by separate sealed entry. Keith S. Dubanevich, James J. Pizzirusso, Jason T. Dennett, Kate M. Baxter-Kauf, Michaela Spero and Ben Thomassen present as counsel for plaintiff(s). Paul G. Karlsgot and James A. Sherer present as counsel for defendant(s). Court Reporter: Nancy Walker. Judge Michael H. Simon presiding. Docketed in all Member Cases. (mja)
February 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 96 OPINION AND ORDER: Premeras Motion to Dismiss (ECF 78) is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. Premeras motion is GRANTED against Plaintiffs claims as follows: (1) Plaintiffs fraud-based claims alleging active concealment of fraud are dismissed; (2) Plaintiffs fraud-based claims alleging affirmative misrepresentations that are contained in Premeras Preferred Bronze policy booklet are dismissed; (3) Plaintiffs contract-based claims alleging breach of express contract based on either the Preferred Bronze policy or Premeras Code of Conduct are dismissed; (4) Plaintiffs contract-based claims alleging breach of an implied term in an express contract is dismissed for those Plaintiffs whose contract is governed by Washington law; and (5) the alternative claim for breach of an implied-in-fact contract asserted by Plaintiffs other than the Policyholder Plaintiffs is dismissed. Premeras Motion to Dismiss is DENIED in all other respects. Signed on 2/9/2017 by Judge Michael H. Simon.Associated Cases: 3:15-md-02633-SI, 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 3:15-cv-01262-SI, 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 3:15-cv-01392-SI, 3:15-cv-01472-SI (kms)
January 27, 2017 Filing 95 OFFICIAL COURT TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS FILED Motion Hearing held on January 19, 2017 before Judge Michael H. Simon, Court Reporter Dennis W. Apodaca, telephone number (503) 326-8182 or dennis_apodaca@ord.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at Court's public terminal or purchased from the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. Afterwards it may be obtained through PACER-See Policy at ord.uscourts.gov. Notice of Intent to Redact Transcript is due by 2/6/2017. Redaction Request due 2/21/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/2/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/1/2017. Docketed in all Member Cases. (Apodaca, Dennis)
January 26, 2017 Filing 94 Supplement entitled "Plaintiffs' Supplemental Brief in Opposition to Premera's Motion to Dismiss". Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, (75 in 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 76 in 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 77 in 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 76 in 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 75 in 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 76 in 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 74 in 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 78 in 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 78 in 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 88 in 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 76 in 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 74 in 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 78 in 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 47 in 3:15-cv-01472-SI, 70 in 3:15-cv-01392-SI, 78 in 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 90 in 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 78 in 3:15-md-02633-SI, 79 in 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 75 in 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 79 in 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 80 in 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 77 in 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 84 in 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 99 in 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 81 in 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 75 in 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 74 in 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 79 in 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 75 in 3:15-cv-01262-SI, 90 in 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 83 in 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 85 in 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 85 in 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 97 in 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 91 in 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 80 in 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 76 in 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 82 in 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 81 in 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 80 in 3:15-cv-01107-SI).)Docketed in all Member Cases. (Dubanevich, Keith)
January 26, 2017 Filing 93 Supplement Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss. Filed by Premera Blue Cross. (Related document(s): Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, (75 in 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 76 in 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 77 in 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 76 in 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 75 in 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 76 in 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 74 in 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 78 in 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 78 in 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 88 in 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 76 in 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 74 in 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 78 in 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 47 in 3:15-cv-01472-SI, 70 in 3:15-cv-01392-SI, 78 in 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 90 in 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 78 in 3:15-md-02633-SI, 79 in 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 75 in 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 79 in 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 80 in 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 77 in 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 84 in 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 99 in 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 81 in 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 75 in 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 74 in 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 79 in 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 75 in 3:15-cv-01262-SI, 90 in 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 83 in 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 85 in 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 85 in 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 97 in 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 91 in 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 80 in 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 76 in 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 82 in 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 81 in 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 80 in 3:15-cv-01107-SI).)Docketed in all Member Cases. (Karlsgodt, Paul)
January 19, 2017 Filing 92 MINUTES of Oral Argument Hearing: Order - The parties shall submit supplemental briefing, not to exceed five pages, within one week. Premera's Motion to Dismiss (ECF #78 ) will be taken under advisement on 1/27/2017. Jason T. Dennett, Keith S. Dubanevich, Kim D. Stephens and Theodore W. Maya present as counsel for plaintiff(s). Paul G. Karlsgodt, David A. Carney, and Darin M. Sands present as counsel for defendant(s). Timothy McMichael present as in-house counsel for Premera. Court Reporter: Dennis Apodaca. Judge Michael H. Simon presiding. Docketed in all Member Cases. (mja)
December 22, 2016 Filing 91 OFFICIAL COURT TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS FILED Telephone Oral Argument held on 12/7/2016 before Judge Michael H. Simon, Court Reporter Bonita J. Shumway, telephone number 503-326-8188 or bonita_shumway@ord.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at Court's public terminal or purchased from the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. Afterwards it may be obtained through the Court Reporter or PACER-See Policy at ord.uscourts.gov. Notice of Intent to Redact Transcript is due by 1/3/2017. Redaction Request due 1/17/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/26/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/27/2017. Docketed in all Member Cases. (Shumway, Bonita)
December 19, 2016 Filing 90 Reply to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (75 in 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 76 in 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 77 in 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 76 in 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 75 in 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 76 in 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 74 in 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 78 in 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 78 in 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 88 in 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 76 in 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 74 in 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 78 in 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 47 in 3:15-cv-01472-SI, 70 in 3:15-cv-01392-SI, 78 in 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 90 in 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 78 in 3:15-md-02633-SI, 79 in 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 75 in 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 79 in 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 80 in 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 77 in 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 84 in 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 99 in 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 81 in 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 75 in 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 74 in 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 79 in 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 75 in 3:15-cv-01262-SI, 90 in 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 83 in 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 85 in 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 85 in 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 97 in 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 91 in 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 80 in 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 76 in 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 82 in 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 81 in 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 80 in 3:15-cv-01107-SI) Oral Argument requested. Filed by Premera Blue Cross.Docketed in all Member Cases. (Karlsgodt, Paul)
December 16, 2016 Filing 89 Transcript Designation and Order Form for the hearing held on 12/07/2016 before Judge Michael H. Simon. Court Reporter: Bonita Shumway. Tape Number: 82. Telephone Conference re Discovery Dispute. Filed by Bradd Guenser, Sandra Dudley, Marjorie Prothero, Erwin Eykel, Lynne Burkhardt, Barbara Lynch, Margie Marie Green, Juanita Olson, Sandy Archibald, Elizabeth Black, Ralph Christopherson, Stephanie Cornwell-George, Ronald O'Brien, Mark Woodford, Melanie Woodford, Andres L Gowin, Todd W Gowin, Alanna C Shores, Howard Kaplowitz, Natalie Miller, Rohit Anand, Shilpy Anand, Sharon Surman, Timothy Surman, Sr, Antero Vigil, Jean Vigil, Jeremy Vijil, Mary Fuerst, Ann Michelle Blackwolfe, Jonathan Blackwolfe, Anne P Emerson, Joann V Welch, All Plaintiffs, Lawrence Cushnie, Casey Devine, Debbie Hansen-Bosse, Kendal L. Kaihoi, Paul Danis, Lars Linden, Suzanne Saunders, Andra Flint, Dushy Facchinello, Mark D Flaten, Shana M Guthrie, Maria S Webb, Krishnendu Chakraborty, Madhuchanda Chakraborty, Kathleen Connor, Tennielle Cossey, Donald Bruce Mountjoy, July Astengo, Matthew Astengo, Marshall Colcord, Marianna Powers, William Fitch, Darin Purcell, Eric Forseter, Kayla Joy Sherwood, Patricia Cummings, Samuel Castanon III, Peter Hoirup, Yolanda Hoirup, Alex Mitchell Hardan, Paul Daniel Hardan, Rhonda Lynn Hardan. Docketed in all Member Cases. (Stephens, Kim)
December 7, 2016 Filing 88 MINUTES of Telephone Conference: Order - The oral argument hearing on Defendant's motion to dismiss (ECF #78 ), and the third case management conference set for 1/9/2017, are STRICKEN and RESET to 1/19/2017 at 08:30AM in Portland, Courtroom 13B, before Judge Michael H. Simon. Kim D. Stephens, James Joseph Pizzirusso, Swathi Bojedla and Michaela Spero present as counsel for plaintiff(s). Paul G. Karlsgodt, James A. Sherer and Darin M. Sands present as counsel for defendant(s). Court Reporter: Bonita Shumway. Judge Michael H. Simon presiding. Docketed in all Member Cases. (mja)
December 5, 2016 Filing 87 Response entitled "Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition to Premera's Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint" to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (78 in 3:15-md-02633-SI). Filed by All Plaintiffs.Docketed in all Member Cases. (Park, Yoona)
November 4, 2016 Filing 86 Declaration of Kerry Follis in Support of Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint. Filed by Premera Blue Cross. (Related document(s): Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, (75 in 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 76 in 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 77 in 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 76 in 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 75 in 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 76 in 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 74 in 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 78 in 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 78 in 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 88 in 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 76 in 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 74 in 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 78 in 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 47 in 3:15-cv-01472-SI, 70 in 3:15-cv-01392-SI, 78 in 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 90 in 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 78 in 3:15-md-02633-SI, 79 in 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 75 in 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 79 in 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 80 in 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 77 in 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 84 in 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 99 in 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 81 in 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 75 in 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 74 in 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 79 in 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 75 in 3:15-cv-01262-SI, 90 in 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 83 in 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 85 in 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 85 in 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 97 in 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 91 in 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 80 in 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 76 in 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 82 in 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 81 in 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 80 in 3:15-cv-01107-SI).) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Attachmate Corp Benefits Plan, #2 Exhibit B - Colliers International Benefits Plan)Docketed in all Member Cases. (Karlsgodt, Paul)
November 4, 2016 Filing 85 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Oral Argument requested. Filed by Premera Blue Cross. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Privacy Practices, #2 Exhibit B - OPM Final Audit Report, #3 Exhibit C - Blue Cross Select, #4 Exhibit D - Blue Cross Bronze, #5 Exhibit E - Premera Code of Conduct)Docketed in all Member Cases. (Karlsgodt, Paul)
October 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER - Defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time in which to file a motion to dismiss and amendment to briefing schedule (ECF 76 ) is GRANTED as follows: Defendant's motion to dismiss is due by 11/4/2016. Plaintiffs' response is due by 12/5/2016. Defendant's reply is due by 12/19/2016. The Oral Argument Hearing set for 1/9/2017 at 10:00AM remains as previously scheduled. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
October 20, 2016 Filing 83 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time in Which to File a Motion to Dismiss and Amendment to Briefing Schedule. Filed by Premera Blue Cross.Docketed in all Member Cases. (Karlsgodt, Paul)
September 30, 2016 Filing 82 Amended Complaint entitled "Plaintiffs' First Amended Consolidated Class Action Allegation Complaint". Filed by Bradd Guenser, Sandra Dudley, Marjorie Prothero, Erwin Eykel, Lynne Burkhardt, Barbara Lynch, Margie Marie Green, Juanita Olson, Sandy Archibald, Elizabeth Black, Ralph Christopherson, Stephanie Cornwell-George, Ronald O'Brien, Mark Woodford, Melanie Woodford, Andres L Gowin, Todd W Gowin, Alanna C Shores, Howard Kaplowitz, Natalie Miller, Rohit Anand, Shilpy Anand, Sharon Surman, Timothy Surman, Sr, Antero Vigil, Jean Vigil, Jeremy Vijil, Mary Fuerst, Ann Michelle Blackwolfe, Jonathan Blackwolfe, Anne P Emerson, Joann V Welch, All Plaintiffs, Lawrence Cushnie, Casey Devine, Debbie Hansen-Bosse, Kendal L. Kaihoi, Paul Danis, Lars Linden, Suzanne Saunders, Andra Flint, Dushy Facchinello, Mark D Flaten, Maria S Webb, Krishnendu Chakraborty, Madhuchanda Chakraborty, Kathleen Connor, Tennielle Cossey, Donald Bruce Mountjoy, July Astengo, Matthew Astengo, Marshall Colcord, Marianna Powers, William Fitch, Darin Purcell, Eric Forseter, Kayla Joy Sherwood, Patricia Cummings, Samuel Castanon III, Peter Hoirup, Yolanda Hoirup, Alex Mitchell Hardan, Paul Daniel Hardan, Rhonda Lynn Hardan against All Plaintiffs.Associated Cases: 3:15-md-02633-SI, 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 3:15-cv-01262-SI, 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 3:15-cv-01392-SI, 3:15-cv-01472-SI (Dubanevich, Keith)
September 2, 2016 Filing 81 Notice of Joint Statement of the Parties Regarding ADR Filed by Premera Blue Cross, Premera Blue Cross, Premera Blue Cross, Premera Blue Cross, Premera Blue Cross, Premera Blue Cross, Premera Blue Cross, Premera, Premera Blue Cross, Premera Blue Cross, Premera Blue Cross, Premera Blue CrossAssociated Cases: 3:15-md-02633-SI, 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 3:15-cv-01262-SI, 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 3:15-cv-01392-SI, 3:15-cv-01472-SI (Karlsgodt, Paul)
August 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 80 Pretrial Order No. 8. (Amended Case Schedule) Signed on 8/18/2016 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (Filed in all Associated Cases). (mja)
August 18, 2016 Filing 79 Unopposed Motion for Order entitled "Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Proposed Case Scheduling Order". Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Docketed in all Member Cases. (Dubanevich, Keith)
August 18, 2016 Filing 78 Notice of Appearance of Yoona Park appearing on behalf of All Plaintiffs (additional Interim Liaison Plaintiffs Counsel) Filed by on behalf of All Plaintiffs Associated Cases: 3:15-md-02633-SI, 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 3:15-cv-01262-SI, 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 3:15-cv-01392-SI, 3:15-cv-01472-SI (Park, Yoona)
August 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 77 Pretrial Order No. 7. Signed on 8/15/2016 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (Filed in all Associated Cases). (pvh)
August 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 76 Order - At the parties' request, the case management conference set for 8/2/2016 is STRICKEN. The parties are directed to confer on a new date for a case management conference and notify the court. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. Filed in all Associated Cases.
August 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 75 Opinion and Order - Premera's Motion to Dismiss (ECF #49 ) is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. Plaintiffs have insufficiently alleged fraud by affirmative misrepresentation, active concealment, or omission. Plaintiffs also have insufficiently alleged breach of express contract and breach of implied contract. Plaintiffs further have insufficiently alleged breach of fiduciary duty by failing adequately to allege the existence of a fiduciary relationship. Plaintiffs have sufficiently alleged unjust enrichment, violation of the California Confidentiality of Medical Information Act, causation, and damages. Plaintiffs have leave to file a Second Consolidated Class Action Complaint consistent with this Opinion and Order. Signed on 8/1/2016 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)Filed in Associated Cases
June 30, 2016 Filing 74 MINUTES of Telephone Conference: Status of case discussed as stated on the record. Ari J. Scharg, James J. Pizzirusso, Tina Wolfson, Keith S. Dubanevich, and Kim D. Stephens present as counsel for plaintiff(s). James A. Sherer, Darin M. Sands, and Paul G. Karlsgodt present as counsel for defendant(s). Court Reporter: Dennis Apodaca. Judge Michael H. Simon presiding. Docketed in all Member Cases. (mja)
June 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 73 Order - At the parties' request, the Court is setting a telephone conference to discuss the case schedule and discovery issues for 6/30/2016 at 01:30PM. The Court will provide a call-in number by separate sealed entry.
June 2, 2016 Filing 72 Notice of Plaintiffs' Statement of Supplemental Authority Filed by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)Associated Cases: 3:15-md-02633-SI, 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 3:15-cv-01262-SI, 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 3:15-cv-01392-SI, 3:15-cv-01472-SI (Dubanevich, Keith)
May 23, 2016 Filing 71 Notice of Attorney Withdrawal: Mark A. Friel Filed by All PlaintiffsAssociated Cases: 3:15-md-02633-SI, 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 3:15-cv-01262-SI, 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 3:15-cv-01392-SI, 3:15-cv-01472-SI (Friel, Mark)
April 14, 2016 Filing 70 Joint ADR Report . Filed by All Plaintiffs.Associated Cases: 3:15-md-02633-SI, 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 3:15-cv-01262-SI, 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 3:15-cv-01392-SI, 3:15-cv-01472-SI(Stephens, Kim)
February 24, 2016 Filing 69 Minutes of Oral Argument and Status Held on February 24, 2016. Order - Defendant's motion to dismiss (Dkt. #49 ) is taken under advisement this date. Ari Scharg, Christopher I. Brain, Tina Wolfson, Jason T. Dennett, Keith S. Dubanevich, and Kim D. Stephens present as counsel for plaintiff(s). Paul G. Karlsgodt, Theodore J. Kobus III, David A. Carney, and Darin M. Sands present as counsel for defendant(s). Timothy McMichael present as in-house counsel for Premera. Court Reporter: Dennis. Judge Michael H. Simon presiding. Docketed in all Member Cases. (mja)
February 23, 2016 Filing 68 Agenda for Hearing on February 24, 2016, 10:00 a.m. - 12 noon by Judge Michael H. Simon. Filed in all Associated Cases (mja)
February 17, 2016 Filing 67 Notice of Supplemental Authority in Support of Motion to Dismiss Filed by Premera Blue Cross (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Judge Bowdre's Order 2-17-16, #2 Exhibit 2 - Transcript from motions hearing 2-10-16)Associated Cases: 3:15-md-02633-SI, 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 3:15-cv-01262-SI, 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 3:15-cv-01392-SI, 3:15-cv-01472-SI (Karlsgodt, Paul)
February 17, 2016 Filing 66 Notice Plaintiffs' Statement of Supplemental Authority in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Filed by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Attachment A)Associated Cases: 3:15-md-02633-SI, 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 3:15-cv-01262-SI, 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 3:15-cv-01392-SI, 3:15-cv-01472-SI (Stephens, Kim)
February 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 65 Pretrial Order No. 6. Signed on 2/3/2016 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (Filed in all Associated Cases)
February 3, 2016 Filing 64 Stipulated Motion for Order Under Federal Rules of Evidence 502(d)( and (e) and [Proposed] Order. Filed by Premera Blue Cross.Docketed in all Member Cases. (Karlsgodt, Paul)
January 29, 2016 Filing 63 Reply to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Memorandum in Support(47 in 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 47 in 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 48 in 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 49 in 3:15-md-02633-SI, 47 in 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 52 in 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 51 in 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 52 in 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 50 in 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 20 in 3:15-cv-01472-SI, 53 in 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 47 in 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 48 in 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 55 in 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 48 in 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 48 in 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 57 in 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 71 in 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 52 in 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 70 in 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 51 in 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 49 in 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 54 in 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 50 in 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 48 in 3:15-cv-01262-SI, 54 in 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 48 in 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 47 in 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 63 in 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 63 in 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 54 in 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 52 in 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 42 in 3:15-cv-01392-SI, 49 in 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 58 in 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 51 in 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 53 in 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 64 in 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 58 in 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 50 in 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 61 in 3:15-cv-01153-SI) Oral Argument requested. Filed by Premera Blue Cross. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Website Release, #2 Exhibit B - HB Letter)Docketed in all Member Cases. (Warren, Daniel)
December 30, 2015 Filing 62 Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Memorandum in Support(49 in 3:15-md-02633-SI, 47 in 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 47 in 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 48 in 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 49 in 3:15-md-02633-SI, 47 in 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 52 in 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 51 in 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 52 in 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 50 in 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 20 in 3:15-cv-01472-SI, 53 in 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 47 in 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 48 in 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 55 in 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 48 in 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 48 in 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 57 in 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 71 in 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 52 in 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 70 in 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 51 in 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 49 in 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 54 in 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 50 in 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 48 in 3:15-cv-01262-SI, 54 in 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 48 in 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 47 in 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 63 in 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 63 in 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 54 in 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 52 in 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 42 in 3:15-cv-01392-SI, 49 in 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 58 in 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 51 in 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 53 in 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 64 in 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 58 in 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 50 in 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 61 in 3:15-cv-01153-SI) Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Docketed in all Member Cases. (Stephens, Kim)
December 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 61 Pretrial Order No. 5 - The Parties' Stipulated Request for an Order Governing Discovery of Documents and Electronically Stored Information (Dkt. #50 ) is adopted. Signed on 12/29/2015 by Judge Michael H. Simon. Filed in all associated cases of 3:15-md-02633-SI (mja)
December 18, 2015 Filing 60 Notice of Filing Joint Rule 26(f) Report Filed by All Plaintiffs Associated Cases: 3:15-md-02633-SI, 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 3:15-cv-01262-SI, 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 3:15-cv-01392-SI, 3:15-cv-01472-SI (Stephens, Kim)
December 18, 2015 Filing 59 Proposed Stipulation and Order Governing Discovery of Documents and Electronically Stored Information by All Plaintiffs. Filed by All Plaintiffs. Docketed in all Member Cases. (Stephens, Kim)
November 20, 2015 Filing 58 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Memorandum in Support. Oral Argument requested. Filed by Premera Blue Cross. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Privacy Practices, #2 Exhibit B - Code of Conduct, #3 Exhibit c - OPM Final Audit Report)Docketed in all Member Cases. (Warren, Daniel)
November 13, 2015 Filing 57 Notice of Joint Statement of the Parties Regarding ADR Filed by Premera Blue CrossAssociated Cases: 3:15-md-02633-SI, 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 3:15-cv-01262-SI, 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 3:15-cv-01392-SI, 3:15-cv-01472-SI (Karlsgodt, Paul)
November 12, 2015 Filing 56 OFFICIAL COURT TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS FILED Telephone Conference held on October 29, 21015 before Judge Michael H. Simon, Court Reporter Dennis W. Apodaca, telephone number (503) 326-8182 or dennis_apodaca@ord.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at Court's public terminal or purchased from the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. Afterwards it may be obtained through PACER-See Policy at ord.uscourts.gov. Notice of Intent to Redact Transcript is due by 11/23/2015. Redaction Request due 12/7/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/17/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/16/2016. Docketed in all Member Cases. (Apodaca, Dennis)
October 29, 2015 Filing 55 MINUTES OF TELEPHONIC CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - On October 29, 2015, the Court held a telephonic case management conference with the parties at their joint request. For the reasons discussed on the record during that case management conference, the Court modifies the Case Scheduling Order (Dkt. #39 ) as shown in the attached Pretrial Order No. 4. Kim D. Stephens and Keith S. Dubanevich present as counsel for plaintiff(s). Darrin Sands and Paul Karlsgodt present as counsel for defendant(s). Court Reporter: Dennis Apodaca. Judge Michael H. Simon presiding. Docketed in all Member Cases. (mja)
October 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 54 Scheduling Order by Judge Michael H. Simon. Order - Setting a telephone case management conference for 10/29/2015 at 10:00AM. The Court will provide the parties with a call-in number prior to the call by separate email. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. All associated cases included. (mja)
October 6, 2015 Filing 53 Amended Complaint titled as "Plaintiffs' Consolidated Class Action Allegation Complaint". Filed by Bradd Guenser, Sandra Dudley, Marjorie Prothero, Erwin Eykel, Lynne Burkhardt, Barbara Lynch, Margie Marie Green, Juanita Olson, Sandy Archibald, Elizabeth Black, Ralph Christopherson, Stephanie Cornwell-George, Ronald O'Brien, Mark Woodford, Melanie Woodford, Andres L Gowin, Todd W Gowin, Alanna C Shores, Howard Kaplowitz, Natalie Miller, Rohit Anand, Shilpy Anand, Sharon Surman, Timothy Surman, Sr, Antero Vigil, Jean Vigil, Jeremy Vijil, Mary Fuerst, Ann Michelle Blackwolfe, Jonathan Blackwolfe, Anne P Emerson, Joann V Welch, All Plaintiffs, Lawrence Cushnie, Casey Devine, Debbie Hansen-Bosse, Kendal L. Kaihoi, Paul Danis, Lars Linden, Suzanne Saunders, Andra Flint, Dushy Facchinello, Mark D Flaten, Shana M Guthrie, Maria S Webb, Krishnendu Chakraborty, Madhuchanda Chakraborty, Kathleen Connor, Tennielle Cossey, Donald Bruce Mountjoy, July Astengo, Matthew Astengo, Marshall Colcord, Marianna Powers, William Fitch, Darin Purcell, Eric Forseter, Kayla Joy Sherwood, Patricia Cummings, Samuel Castanon III, Peter Hoirup, Yolanda Hoirup, Alex Mitchell Hardan, Paul Daniel Hardan, Rhonda Lynn Hardan against All Defendants.Associated Cases: 3:15-md-02633-SI, 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 3:15-cv-01262-SI, 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 3:15-cv-01392-SI, 3:15-cv-01472-SI (Dubanevich, Keith)
October 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 52 Order Re: Leadership Structure and Responsibilities of Plaintiffs' Counsel. Signed on 10/6/2015 by Judge Michael H. Simon.
October 6, 2015 Filing 51 Joint Proposed Form of Order Submitted Entitled "[Proposed] Order Re: Leadership Structure and Responsibilities of Plaintiffs' Counsel". Filed by All Plaintiffs. Docketed in all Member Cases. (Dubanevich, Keith)
September 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 50 Stipulated Protective Order. Signed on 9/11/2015 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
August 28, 2015 Filing 49 Motion for Protective Order by Premera Blue Cross, Premera Blue Cross, Premera Blue Cross, Premera Blue Cross, Premera Blue Cross, Premera Blue Cross, Premera Blue Cross, Premera, Premera Blue Cross, Premera Blue Cross, Premera Blue Cross, Premera Blue Cross. Filed by Premera Blue Cross, Premera Blue Cross, Premera Blue Cross, Premera Blue Cross, Premera Blue Cross, Premera Blue Cross, Premera Blue Cross, Premera, Premera Blue Cross, Premera Blue Cross, Premera Blue Cross, Premera Blue Cross. Docketed in all Member Cases. (Karlsgodt, Paul) Modified on 9/9/2015 to correct docket event (dsg).
August 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 48 Pretrial Order No. 3 (Case Scheduling Order). The parties' Proposed Case Scheduling Order (Dkt. #38 ) is accepted, and the attached case schedule is adopted. Signed on 8/26/2015 by Judge Michael H. Simon. Filed in all other Associated Cases (mja)
August 21, 2015 Filing 47 Joint Proposed Form of Order Submitted by All Parties. Filed by All Plaintiffs. Docketed in all Member Cases. (Stephens, Kim)
August 12, 2015 Filing 46 OFFICIAL COURT TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS FILED Case Management Conference held on August 7, 2015 before Judge Michael H. Simon, Court Reporter Dennis W. Apodaca, telephone number (503) 326-8182 or dennis_apodaca@ord.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at Court's public terminal or purchased from the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. Afterwards it may be obtained through PACER-See Policy at ord.uscourts.gov. Notice of Intent to Redact Transcript is due by 8/24/2015. Redaction Request due 9/8/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/17/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/13/2015. Docketed in all Member Cases. (Apodaca, Dennis)
August 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 45 Pretrial Order No. 2. Signed on 8/7/2015 by Judge Michael H. Simon.Filed in all member cases. (mja)
August 7, 2015 Filing 44 MINUTES of Case Management Conference: Order - The parties' pending Motions to Appoint Counsel 11 , 12 , 18 , and #19 are GRANTED in PART and DENIED in PART. A Joint Proposed Case Management Schedule is due by 8/21/2015. A Consolidated Master Complaint is due by 10/6/2015. Interim lead and liaison Plaintiffs' counsel shall file their proposal for leadership structure and responsibilities by 10/6/2015. For more details regarding this hearing, see Pretrial Order No. 2, following this entry. Steven D. Larsen, Stephen R. Basser, Mark Fried, Clifford Cantor, Keith Dubanevich, Kim Stephens, Chris Brain, Erik Gibbs, Tina Wolfson, Beth E. Terrell, John A Yanchunis, Robin L. Greenwald, Bryan L. Clobes, Ari Sharg, David S. Senoff, John Wallace, Richard S. Yugler, Thane W. Tienson, Robert A. Lubitz, William B. Federman, McKean Evans and Patrice L. Bishop present as counsel for plaintiff(s). Darin M. Sands, Paul G. Karlsgodt, Daniel R. Warren and Andrei Rado present as counsel for defendant(s). Court Reporter: Dennis Apodaca. Judge Michael H. Simon presiding. Docketed in all Member Cases. (mja)
August 6, 2015 Filing 43 Response to Other Groups' Motions for Appointment of Lead Counsel to Motion for Appointment of Counsel titled as "Motion and Memorandum of Points of Authorities in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for Appointment of Cafferty Clobes Meriwether & Sprengel LLP as Interim Lead Counsel and Stoll Stoll Berne Lokting & Shl(11 in 3:15-md-02633-SI), Joint Motion for Appointment of Counsel of Plaintiffs' Proposed Leadership Structure(18 in 3:15-md-02633-SI), Motion for Appointment of Counsel [Corrected](19 in 3:15-md-02633-SI), Motion for Appointment of Counsel titled "Joint Motion in Application for Appointment as Plaintiffs' Steering Committe Members and Liaison Counsel"(12 in 3:15-md-02633-SI). Filed by Ann Michelle Blackwolfe, Jonathan Blackwolfe.Docketed in all Member Cases. (Yugler, Richard)
August 6, 2015 Filing 42 Notice of Appearance of Patrice L. Bishop appearing on behalf of Howard Kaplowitz Filed by on behalf of Howard KaplowitzAssociated Cases: 3:15-md-02633-SI, 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 3:15-cv-01262-SI, 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 3:15-cv-01392-SI, 3:15-cv-01472-SI (Bishop, Patrice)
August 6, 2015 Filing 41 Notice re Motion to Appoint Counsel,,,,,, (28 in 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 21 in 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 40 in 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 16 in 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 14 in 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 17 in 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 27 in 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 18 in 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 32 in 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 11 in 3:15-cv-01392-SI, 17 in 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 22 in 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 33 in 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 19 in 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 22 in 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 21 in 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 17 in 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 32 in 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 23 in 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 39 in 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 19 in 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 17 in 3:15-cv-01262-SI, 27 in 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 17 in 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 19 in 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 16 in 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 20 in 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 16 in 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 19 in 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 16 in 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 26 in 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 24 in 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 21 in 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 21 in 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 20 in 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 21 in 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 16 in 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 17 in 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 18 in 3:15-md-02633-SI, 21 in 3:15-cv-01172-SI) Filed by Kendal L. Kaihoi (Related document(s): Motion to Appoint Counsel,,,,,, (28 in 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 21 in 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 40 in 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 16 in 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 14 in 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 17 in 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 27 in 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 18 in 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 32 in 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 11 in 3:15-cv-01392-SI, 17 in 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 22 in 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 33 in 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 19 in 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 22 in 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 21 in 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 17 in 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 32 in 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 23 in 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 39 in 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 19 in 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 17 in 3:15-cv-01262-SI, 27 in 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 17 in 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 19 in 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 16 in 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 20 in 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 16 in 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 19 in 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 16 in 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 26 in 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 24 in 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 21 in 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 21 in 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 20 in 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 21 in 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 16 in 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 17 in 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 18 in 3:15-md-02633-SI, 21 in 3:15-cv-01172-SI).) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 3:15-md-02633-SI, 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 3:15-cv-01262-SI, 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 3:15-cv-01392-SI (Senoff, David)
August 5, 2015 Filing 40 Notice of Association of Attorney Richard S. Yugler. Filed by Ann Michelle Blackwolfe, Jonathan BlackwolfeAssociated Cases: 3:15-md-02633-SI, 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 3:15-cv-01262-SI, 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 3:15-cv-01392-SI (Yugler, Richard)
August 5, 2015 Filing 39 Supplement to Motion and Memorandum of Points of Authorities in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for Appointment of Cafferty Clobes Meriwether & Sprengel LLP as Interim Lead Counsel and Stoll Stoll Berne Lokting & Shlachter P.C. as Interim Liaison Counsel. Filed by Erwin Eykel, Juanita Olson, Stephanie Cornwell-George, Ronald O'Brien, Mark Woodford, Melanie Woodford, Natalie Miller, Rohit Anand, Shilpy Anand, Sharon Surman, Timothy Surman, Sr, Antero Vigil, Jean Vigil, Jeremy Vijil, Anne P Emerson, Mark D Flaten, Shana M Guthrie, Maria S Webb, Eric Forseter, Kayla Joy Sherwood. (Related document(s): Motion to Appoint Counsel,,,, (11 in 3:15-md-02633-SI).) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit O, #2 Exhibit P)Docketed in all Member Cases. (Dubanevich, Keith)
July 31, 2015 Filing 38 Proposed Joint Case Management Schedule . Filed by Barbara Lynch, Casey Devine, Kathleen Connor, Tennielle Cossey, Donald Bruce Mountjoy, Marianna Powers. Associated Cases: 3:15-md-02633-SI, 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 3:15-cv-01262-SI, 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 3:15-cv-01392-SI (Gibbs, Eric)
July 31, 2015 Filing 37 Joint Brief Regarding Initial Case Management. Filed by Barbara Lynch, Casey Devine, Kathleen Connor, Tennielle Cossey, Donald Bruce Mountjoy, Marianna Powers. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Contact Information Chart)Associated Cases: 3:15-md-02633-SI, 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 3:15-cv-01262-SI, 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 3:15-cv-01392-SI (Gibbs, Eric)
July 31, 2015 Filing 36 Proposed Joint Case Management Schedule . Filed by Bradd Guenser, Sandy Archibald, Mary Fuerst, Lawrence Cushnie, Marshall Colcord, Darin Purcell. Associated Cases: 3:15-md-02633-SI, 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 3:15-cv-01262-SI, 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 3:15-cv-01392-SI (Stephens, Kim)
July 31, 2015 Filing 35 Brief re The Cushnie Plaintiffs' Preliminary Statement Addressing Matters Relevant to the Initial Case Management Conference. Filed by Bradd Guenser, Sandy Archibald, Mary Fuerst, Lawrence Cushnie, Marshall Colcord, Darin Purcell. Associated Cases: 3:15-md-02633-SI, 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 3:15-cv-01262-SI, 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 3:15-cv-01392-SI (Stephens, Kim)
July 31, 2015 Filing 34 Proposed Joint Case Management Schedule . Filed by Premera Blue Cross, Premera Blue Cross, Premera Blue Cross, Premera Blue Cross, Premera Blue Cross, Premera Blue Cross, Premera Blue Cross, Premera, Premera Blue Cross, Premera Blue Cross, Premera Blue Cross, Premera Blue Cross. Associated Cases: 3:15-md-02633-SI, 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 3:15-cv-01262-SI, 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 3:15-cv-01392-SI (Karlsgodt, Paul)
July 31, 2015 Filing 33 Brief Regarding Initial Case Management. Filed by Premera Blue Cross, Premera Blue Cross, Premera Blue Cross, Premera Blue Cross, Premera Blue Cross, Premera Blue Cross, Premera Blue Cross, Premera, Premera Blue Cross, Premera Blue Cross, Premera Blue Cross, Premera Blue Cross. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Draft Stipulated Protective Order)Associated Cases: 3:15-md-02633-SI, 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 3:15-cv-01262-SI, 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 3:15-cv-01392-SI (Karlsgodt, Paul)
July 31, 2015 Filing 32 Proposed Joint Case Management Schedule . Filed by Marjorie Prothero, Erwin Eykel, Juanita Olson, Stephanie Cornwell-George, Ronald O'Brien, Mark Woodford, Melanie Woodford, Natalie Miller, Rohit Anand, Shilpy Anand, Sharon Surman, Timothy Surman, Sr, Antero Vigil, Jean Vigil, Jeremy Vijil, Anne P Emerson, Eric Forseter, Kayla Joy Sherwood. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)Associated Cases: 3:15-md-02633-SI, 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 3:15-cv-01262-SI, 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 3:15-cv-01392-SI (Dubanevich, Keith)
July 31, 2015 Filing 31 Brief Entitled "Case Summary Brief". Filed by Marjorie Prothero, Erwin Eykel, Juanita Olson, Stephanie Cornwell-George, Ronald O'Brien, Mark Woodford, Melanie Woodford, Natalie Miller, Sharon Surman, Timothy Surman, Sr, Antero Vigil, Jean Vigil, Jeremy Vijil, Anne P Emerson, Mark D Flaten, Shana M Guthrie, Maria S Webb, Eric Forseter, Kayla Joy Sherwood. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)Associated Cases: 3:15-md-02633-SI, 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 3:15-cv-01262-SI, 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 3:15-cv-01392-SI (Dubanevich, Keith)
July 29, 2015 Filing 30 Supplemental Declaration of Cliff Cantor . Filed by Lawrence Cushnie. (Related document(s): Motion to Appoint Counsel,,,,,, (28 in 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 21 in 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 40 in 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 16 in 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 14 in 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 17 in 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 27 in 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 18 in 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 32 in 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 11 in 3:15-cv-01392-SI, 17 in 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 22 in 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 33 in 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 19 in 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 22 in 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 21 in 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 17 in 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 32 in 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 23 in 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 39 in 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 19 in 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 17 in 3:15-cv-01262-SI, 27 in 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 17 in 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 19 in 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 16 in 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 20 in 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 16 in 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 19 in 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 16 in 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 26 in 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 24 in 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 21 in 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 21 in 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 20 in 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 21 in 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 16 in 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 17 in 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 18 in 3:15-md-02633-SI, 21 in 3:15-cv-01172-SI).)Associated Cases: 3:15-md-02633-SI, 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 3:15-cv-01262-SI, 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 3:15-cv-01392-SI (Cantor, Clifford)
July 29, 2015 Filing 29 Notice re Motion to Appoint Counsel,,,,,, (28 in 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 21 in 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 40 in 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 16 in 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 14 in 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 17 in 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 27 in 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 18 in 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 32 in 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 11 in 3:15-cv-01392-SI, 17 in 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 22 in 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 33 in 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 19 in 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 22 in 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 21 in 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 17 in 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 32 in 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 23 in 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 39 in 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 19 in 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 17 in 3:15-cv-01262-SI, 27 in 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 17 in 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 19 in 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 16 in 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 20 in 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 16 in 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 19 in 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 16 in 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 26 in 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 24 in 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 21 in 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 20 in 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 21 in 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 21 in 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 16 in 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 17 in 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 18 in 3:15-md-02633-SI, 21 in 3:15-cv-01172-SI) Statement in Support of Joint Application for Appointment of Plaintiffs' Proposed Leadership Structure [DE 18] Filed by Sandra Dudley (Related document(s): Motion to Appoint Counsel,,,,,, (28 in 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 21 in 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 40 in 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 16 in 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 14 in 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 17 in 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 27 in 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 18 in 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 32 in 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 11 in 3:15-cv-01392-SI, 17 in 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 22 in 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 33 in 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 19 in 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 22 in 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 21 in 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 17 in 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 32 in 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 23 in 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 39 in 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 19 in 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 17 in 3:15-cv-01262-SI, 27 in 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 17 in 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 19 in 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 16 in 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 20 in 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 16 in 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 19 in 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 16 in 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 26 in 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 24 in 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 21 in 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 20 in 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 21 in 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 21 in 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 16 in 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 17 in 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 18 in 3:15-md-02633-SI, 21 in 3:15-cv-01172-SI).)Associated Cases: 3:15-md-02633-SI, 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 3:15-cv-01262-SI, 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 3:15-cv-01392-SI (Pascucci, Michael)
July 29, 2015 Filing 28 Motion for Appointment of Counsel [Corrected]. Oral Argument requested. Filed by Elizabeth Black, Howard Kaplowitz, Ann Michelle Blackwolfe, Jonathan Blackwolfe, Paul Danis, Krishnendu Chakraborty, Madhuchanda Chakraborty, July Astengo, Matthew Astengo, Alex Mitchell Hardan, Paul Daniel Hardan, Rhonda Lynn Hardan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Yugler Firm Resume, #2 Exhibit 2 - Federman Firm Resume, #3 Exhibit 3 - Yugler Cert. Good Standing, #4 Exhibit 4 - Federman Cert. Good Standing, #5 Exhibit 5 - Marcussen Cert. Good Standing, #6 Exhibit 6 - Grant Firm Resume, #7 Exhibit 7 - Stull Firm Resume, #8 Exhibit 8 - Graifman Firm Resume, #9 Exhibit 9 - Cantor Firm Resume, #10 Exhibit 10 - [Proposed] Order)Associated Cases: 3:15-md-02633-SI, 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 3:15-cv-01262-SI, 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 3:15-cv-01392-SI (Federman, William)
July 28, 2015 Filing 27 Joint Motion for Appointment of Counsel of Plaintiffs' Proposed Leadership Structure. Oral Argument requested. Filed by Bradd Guenser, Sandy Archibald, Mary Fuerst, Lawrence Cushnie, Marshall Colcord, Darin Purcell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Firm Resume Edelson PC, #2 Exhibit 2 - Certificate of Good Standing A. Scharg, #3 Exhibit 3 - T. Wolfson CV, #4 Exhibit 4 - Certificate of Good Standing T. Wolfson, #5 Exhibit 5 - K. Stephens CV, #6 Exhibit 6 - Certificate of Good Standing K. Stephens, #7 Exhibit 7 - Firm Resume Tousley Brain Stephens, #8 Exhibit 8 - Letter to Defense Counsel, #9 Exhibit 9 - Letter from Defense Counsel, #10 Exhibit 10 - Firm Resume Hausfeld, #11 Exhibit 11 - J. Pizzirusso CV, #12 Exhibit 12 - Certificate of Good Standing J. Pizzirusso, #13 Exhibit 13 - G. Lynch CV, #14 Exhibit 14 - Certificate of Good Standing G. Lynch)Associated Cases: 3:15-md-02633-SI, 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 3:15-cv-01262-SI, 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 3:15-cv-01392-SI (Stephens, Kim)
July 28, 2015 Filing 26 Declaration of Cliff Cantor in support of motions for appointment of interim lead counsel. Filed by Juanita Olson. (Related document(s): Motion to Appoint Counsel,,,,,, (14 in 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 11 in 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 25 in 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 10 in 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 14 in 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 10 in 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 13 in 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 26 in 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 9 in 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 7 in 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 9 in 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 21 in 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 14 in 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 16 in 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 12 in 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 10 in 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 32 in 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 20 in 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 9 in 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 13 in 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 14 in 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 19 in 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 15 in 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 10 in 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 12 in 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 17 in 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 10 in 3:15-cv-01262-SI, 25 in 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 10 in 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 9 in 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 14 in 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 15 in 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 12 in 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 12 in 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 20 in 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 4 in 3:15-cv-01392-SI, 9 in 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 11 in 3:15-md-02633-SI, 14 in 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 33 in 3:15-cv-01106-SI).)Associated Cases: 3:15-md-02633-SI, 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 3:15-cv-01262-SI, 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 3:15-cv-01392-SI (Cantor, Clifford)
July 28, 2015 Filing 25 Declaration of John A. Yanchunis in Support of Motion to Appoint Counsel. Filed by Kathleen Connor, Tennielle Cossey, Donald Bruce Mountjoy. (Related document(s): Motion to Appoint Counsel,,,, (21 in 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 13 in 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 11 in 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 14 in 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 26 in 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 10 in 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 33 in 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 10 in 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 15 in 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 15 in 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 10 in 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 21 in 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 26 in 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 27 in 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 10 in 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 11 in 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 18 in 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 13 in 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 22 in 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 13 in 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 34 in 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 20 in 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 15 in 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 8 in 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 15 in 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 11 in 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 16 in 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 10 in 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 15 in 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 17 in 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 11 in 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 12 in 3:15-md-02633-SI, 11 in 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 14 in 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 11 in 3:15-cv-01262-SI, 13 in 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 15 in 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 16 in 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 5 in 3:15-cv-01392-SI, 12 in 3:15-cv-01165-SI).) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - John A. Yanchunis CV, #2 Exhibit B - John A. Yanchunis Certificate of Good Standing)Associated Cases: 3:15-md-02633-SI, 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 3:15-cv-01262-SI, 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 3:15-cv-01392-SI (Gibbs, Eric)
July 28, 2015 Filing 24 Declaration of Ariana J. Tadler in Support of Motion to Appoint Counsel. Filed by Barbara Lynch, Casey Devine. (Related document(s): Motion to Appoint Counsel,,,, (21 in 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 13 in 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 11 in 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 14 in 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 26 in 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 10 in 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 33 in 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 10 in 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 15 in 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 15 in 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 10 in 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 21 in 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 26 in 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 27 in 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 10 in 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 11 in 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 18 in 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 13 in 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 22 in 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 13 in 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 34 in 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 20 in 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 15 in 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 8 in 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 15 in 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 11 in 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 16 in 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 10 in 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 15 in 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 17 in 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 11 in 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 12 in 3:15-md-02633-SI, 11 in 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 14 in 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 11 in 3:15-cv-01262-SI, 13 in 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 15 in 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 16 in 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 5 in 3:15-cv-01392-SI, 12 in 3:15-cv-01165-SI).) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Ariana J. Tadler CV, #2 Exhibit B - Ariana J. Tadler Certificate of Good Standing)Associated Cases: 3:15-md-02633-SI, 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 3:15-cv-01262-SI, 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 3:15-cv-01392-SI (Gibbs, Eric)
July 28, 2015 Filing 23 Declaration of Robin L. Greenwald in Support of Motion to Appoint Counsel. Filed by Kathleen Connor, Tennielle Cossey, Donald Bruce Mountjoy. (Related document(s): Motion to Appoint Counsel,,,, (21 in 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 13 in 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 11 in 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 14 in 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 26 in 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 10 in 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 33 in 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 10 in 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 15 in 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 15 in 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 10 in 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 21 in 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 26 in 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 27 in 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 10 in 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 11 in 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 18 in 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 13 in 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 22 in 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 13 in 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 34 in 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 20 in 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 15 in 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 8 in 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 15 in 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 11 in 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 16 in 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 10 in 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 15 in 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 17 in 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 11 in 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 12 in 3:15-md-02633-SI, 11 in 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 14 in 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 11 in 3:15-cv-01262-SI, 13 in 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 15 in 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 16 in 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 5 in 3:15-cv-01392-SI, 12 in 3:15-cv-01165-SI).) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Robin Greenwald CV, #2 Exhibit B - Robin Greenwald Certificate of Good Standing)Associated Cases: 3:15-md-02633-SI, 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 3:15-cv-01262-SI, 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 3:15-cv-01392-SI (Gibbs, Eric)
July 28, 2015 Filing 22 Declaration of Eric H. Gibbs in Support of Motion to Appoint Counsel. Filed by Marianna Powers. (Related document(s): Motion to Appoint Counsel,,,, (21 in 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 13 in 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 11 in 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 14 in 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 26 in 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 10 in 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 33 in 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 10 in 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 15 in 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 15 in 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 10 in 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 21 in 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 26 in 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 27 in 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 10 in 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 11 in 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 18 in 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 13 in 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 22 in 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 13 in 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 34 in 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 20 in 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 15 in 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 8 in 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 15 in 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 11 in 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 16 in 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 10 in 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 15 in 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 17 in 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 11 in 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 12 in 3:15-md-02633-SI, 11 in 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 14 in 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 11 in 3:15-cv-01262-SI, 13 in 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 15 in 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 16 in 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 5 in 3:15-cv-01392-SI, 12 in 3:15-cv-01165-SI).) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Girard Gibbs Firm Resume, #2 Exhibit B - CV of Eric H. Gibbs, #3 Exhibit C - Eric H. Gibbs Certificate of Good Standing)Associated Cases: 3:15-md-02633-SI, 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 3:15-cv-01262-SI, 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 3:15-cv-01392-SI (Gibbs, Eric)
July 28, 2015 Filing 21 Motion for Appointment of Counsel titled "Joint Motion in Application for Appointment as Plaintiffs' Steering Committe Members and Liaison Counsel". Oral Argument requested. Filed by Barbara Lynch, Casey Devine, Kathleen Connor, Tennielle Cossey, Donald Bruce Mountjoy, Marianna Powers.Associated Cases: 3:15-md-02633-SI, 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 3:15-cv-01262-SI, 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 3:15-cv-01392-SI (Gibbs, Eric)
July 28, 2015 Filing 20 Motion for Appointment of Counsel titled as "Motion and Memorandum of Points of Authorities in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for Appointment of Cafferty Clobes Meriwether & Sprengel LLP as Interim Lead Counsel and Stoll Stoll Berne Lokting & Shlachter P.C. as Interim Liaison Counsel". Oral Argument requested. Filed by Erwin Eykel, Juanita Olson, Stephanie Cornwell-George, Ronald O'Brien, Mark Woodford, Melanie Woodford, Natalie Miller, Rohit Anand, Shilpy Anand, Sharon Surman, Timothy Surman, Sr, Antero Vigil, Jean Vigil, Jeremy Vijil, Anne P Emerson, Mark D Flaten, Shana M Guthrie, Maria S Webb, Eric Forseter, Kayla Joy Sherwood. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit E-1, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N)Associated Cases: 3:15-md-02633-SI, 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 3:15-cv-01262-SI, 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 3:15-cv-01268-SI, 3:15-cv-01392-SI (Dubanevich, Keith)
July 21, 2015 Filing 19 Notice of Appearance of Christopher I. Brain appearing on behalf of Bradd Guenser, Marshall Colcord Filed by on behalf of Bradd Guenser, Marshall ColcordAssociated Cases: 3:15-md-02633-SI, 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 3:15-cv-01172-SI, 3:15-cv-01262-SI, 3:15-cv-01263-SI, 3:15-cv-01264-SI, 3:15-cv-01265-SI, 3:15-cv-01266-SI, 3:15-cv-01267-SI, 3:15-cv-01268-SI (Brain, Christopher)
July 16, 2015 Filing 18 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Attorney Jason T. Dennett. Your login is: jtdennett. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp)
July 16, 2015 Filing 17 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Attorney Christopher I. Brain. Your login is: cibrain. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp)
July 7, 2015 Filing 16 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Attorney James J. Pizzirusso. Your login is: jjpizzirusso. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp)
July 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Pretrial Order No. 1: The Court will hold an initial case management conference in this matter on Friday, August 7, 2015, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 13B, before Judge Michael H. Simon. Signed 7/2/2015 by Judge Michael H. Simon. Associated Cases: 3:15-md-02633-SI, 3:15-cv-00516-SI, 3:15-cv-00572-SI, 3:15-cv-01092-SI, 3:15-cv-01101-SI, 3:15-cv-01102-SI, 3:15-cv-01103-SI, 3:15-cv-01104-SI, 3:15-cv-01105-SI, 3:15-cv-01106-SI, 3:15-cv-01107-SI, 3:15-cv-01115-SI, 3:15-cv-01153-SI, 3:15-cv-01154-SI, 3:15-cv-01155-SI, 3:15-cv-01156-SI, 3:15-cv-01157-SI, 3:15-cv-01158-SI, 3:15-cv-01159-SI, 3:15-cv-01160-SI, 3:15-cv-01161-SI, 3:15-cv-01162-SI, 3:15-cv-01163-SI, 3:15-cv-01164-SI, 3:15-cv-01165-SI, 3:15-cv-01166-SI, 3:15-cv-01167-SI, 3:15-cv-01168-SI, 3:15-cv-01169-SI, 3:15-cv-01170-SI, 3:15-cv-01171-SI, 3:15-cv-01172-SI (mja) Modified on 7/2/2015 to add signature date (mja). (mja).
June 25, 2015 Filing 14 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Attorney Paul G. Karlsgodt. Your login is: pgkarlsgodt. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp)
June 17, 2015 Filing 13 Notice of Case Reassignment: This case has been reassigned from Judge Anna J. Brown to Judge Michael H. Simon. (eo)
April 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Judge Anna J. Brown. The Court STRIKES the deadline for Defendant to file a response to Plaintiff's Complaint and the case-management dates previously set. The Court will schedule a Rule 16 Conference to reset case-management dates if this matter is not transferred by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation to a single court for consolidated pretrial proceedings. Defendant's Motion #7 to Stay, therefore, is MOOT. (bb)
April 27, 2015 Filing 11 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Attorney Paul G. Karlsgodt (appearing Pro Hac Vice). Your login is: pgkarlsgodt. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp)
April 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Paul G. Karlsgodt for Premera Blue Cross. Application Fee in amount of $100 collected. Receipt No. 0979-4092271 issued. Signed on 4/27/2015 by Judge Anna J. Brown. (ecp)
April 27, 2015 Filing 9 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Attorney Daniel R. Warren (appearing Pro Hac Vice). Your login is: drwarren. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp)
April 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Daniel R. Warren for Premera Blue Cross. Application Fee in amount of $100 collected. Receipt No. 0979-4092252 issued. Signed on 4/27/2015 by Judge Anna J. Brown. (ecp)
April 24, 2015 Filing 7 Unopposed Motion for Stay Pending Proceedings Before Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation and Ex. A. Filed by Premera Blue Cross. (Sands, Darin)
April 24, 2015 Filing 6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Paul G. Karlsgodt . Filing fee in the amount of $100 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-4092271. Filed by Premera Blue Cross. (Sands, Darin)
April 24, 2015 Filing 5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Daniel R. Warren . Filing fee in the amount of $100 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-4092252. Filed by Premera Blue Cross. (Sands, Darin)
April 7, 2015 Filing 4 Affidavit of Service of Complaint, #1 upon Premera Blue Cross served on 4/3/2015 Filed by Marshall Colcord. (Stephens, Kim)
March 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Anna J. Brown and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 7/27/2015. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 8/24/2015. Pretrial Order is due by 8/24/2015. Ordered by Judge Anna J. Brown. (cib)
March 27, 2015 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Premera Blue Cross. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (cib)
March 27, 2015 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-4060510 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Marshall Colcord against Premera Blue Cross (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons). (Stephens, Kim)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Colcord v. Premera Blue Cross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Premera Blue Cross
Represented By: Paul G. Karlsgodt
Represented By: Nichole L. Sterling
Represented By: Darin M. Sands
Represented By: Emily R. Fedeles
Represented By: Daniel R. Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colcord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marshall Colcord
Represented By: Chase C. Alvord
Represented By: Jason T. Dennett
Represented By: Christopher I. Brain
Represented By: James J. Pizzirusso
Represented By: Ari J. Scharg
Represented By: Tina Wolfson
Represented By: Kim D. Stephens
Represented By: Keith S. Dubanevich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?