Johnson v. Federal Bureau of Prisons
Plaintiff: Larry Dale Johnson
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Prisons
Case Number: 3:2015cv00581
Filed: April 8, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Office: Portland (3) Office
Presiding Judge: John V. Acosta
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER: The Court ADOPTS in part Magistrate Judge Acostas Findingsand Recommendation 120 . Specifically, the Court (1) GRANTS Defendants Motion 102 to Dismiss the Third Amended Complaint to the extent that the Court concludes Plaintiff has not esta blished this Court has subject-matter jurisdiction; (2) GRANTS Plaintiff leave to file a Fourth Amended Complaint no later than August 9, 2018, to add allegations sufficient to establish that [Plaintiff] timely submitted, and that the BOP timely rec eived, his 2014 IACA Claim; and (3) DENIES Plaintiffs Motion 116 to Supplement [the Third] Amended Complaint.Because the Court concludes Plaintiff has not establishedthis Court has subject-matter jurisdiction, the Court alsoconcludes it is unclear that it has the authority to evaluate thesufficiency of Plaintiffs claim. The Court, therefore, DECLINESto adopt the remaining Findings and Recommendation as to whetherPlaintiff failed to state a claim. The Court advises Plaintiff that the Magistrate Judge will review Plaintiffs Fourth Amended Complaint and will recommend sua sponte dismissal of the Fourth Amended Complaint if it fails to comply with the May 30, 2018, Findings and Recommendation or this Courts Order. If Plaintiff fails to file a Fourth Amended Complaint by August 9, 2018, or if Plaintiffs Fourth Amended Complaint does not comply with the Findings and Recommendation or this Courts Order, the Court will dismiss this matter with prejudice. IT IS SO ORDERED. DATED this 16th day of July, 2018 by United States Senior District Judge Anna J. Brown (copy of this order mailed to plaintiff) (peg)
April 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER The Court DISMISSES Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint(#90). The Court GRANTS Plaintiff leave to file a Third AmendedComplaint no later than May 17, 2017, only to allege the factsthat give rise to his claim to compel the Bureau of Prisons toaccept or to reject Plaintiff's IACA claim as set out in theFindings and Recommendation 91 , which is ADOPTED. IT IS SO ORDERED. DATED this 17th day of April, 2017, by United States District Judge Anna J. Brown. (copy mailed to plaintiff) (peg)
February 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER: The Court DISMISSES Plaintiff's Amended Complaint 65 . The Court GRANTS Plaintiff leave to file a Second Amended Complaint no later than March 16, 2017, only to seek to compel the BOP to decide whether to accept or reject his underlying administrative claim under the APA... Signed on 2/24/2017 by Judge Anna J. Brown. (copy mailed to plaintiff) (kms)
February 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER The Court DENIES Plaintiffs Motion 38 to Strike Pursuantto FRCP 12 and GRANTS Plaintiffs Second Motion 51 to Strike Defendants Footnote #1. The Court ADOPTS Magistrate Judge Acostas Findings andRecommendation 23 and, therefore, GRA NTS BOPs Motion 14 to Dismiss. The Court GRANTS Plaintiff leave to file an Amended Complaint no later than March 23, 2016, for the sole purpose of alleging a claim under the APA to compel the BOP to decide whether to accept or to reject Plaintiffs IACA claim that wasfiled after Plaintiffs March 2014 release and related to his alleged work-related injuries suffered in 2011 and 2013. The Court advises Plaintiff that the Magistrate Judge will review Plaintiffs Amended Complaint and will recommend striking sua sponte any claims that Plaintiff includes in his AmendedComplaint that do not comply with the Courts limited leave to amend. IT IS SO ORDERED. DATED this 25th day of February, 2016, by United States District Judge Anna J. Brown. (copy mailed to plaintiff this date) (peg)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Federal Bureau of Prisons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Prisons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Dale Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?