Harris et al v. City of Portland Police Department
Plaintiff: L. H., Latte Harris, Tera Harris and Deona Mitchell
Defendant: City of Portland Police Department
Case Number: 3:2015cv00853
Filed: May 19, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Office: Portland (3) Office
Presiding Judge: Marco A. Hernandez
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 189 Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law. The Court finds in favor of all Defendants on all of Plaintiffs claims. Defendants are directed to submit a judgment consistent with this ruling within the next ten days. Signed on 6/1/2017 by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (jp)
February 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 126 OPINION AND ORDER: City Defendants Motion to Compel 119 is GRANTED. Plaintiff is ORDERED to provide a complete response to City Defendants May 10, 2016, First Request for Production by providing the requested signed medical releases to City Defendants no later than February 20, 2017. Signed on 2/8/2017 by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (jp)
November 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 107 OPINION AND ORDER: The Court grants in part City Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment 66 . County Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 59 is denied. See attached 18-page Opinion and Order for full text. Signed on 11/16/2016 by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (jp)
March 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 35 OPINION & ORDER: The County Defendants' motion to dismiss 20 for lackof subject matter jurisdiction and failure to demand relief is DENIED. Harriss claims under the Second and Ninth Amendment are dismissed sua sponte for failure to state a claim. See 8-page opinion & order attached. Signed on 3/8/2016 by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. Copy of this order mailed to Plaintiff Harris. (mr)
February 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 OPINION & ORDER: The City Defendants' motions to dismiss 22 and 25 are GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Harris's claims against the City Defendants under the Second, Eighth, Ninth, and Fourteenth Amendments are dismissed with prejudice. Harris's claims against Officer Congdon are also dismissed, with leave to amend. Harris's Fourth Amendment claims against the remaining individual City Defendants survive. The Portland Police Bureau is dismissed. Harris may, if s he so desires, submit an amended complaint which includes factual allegations against Officer Congdon, names the City of Portland as a Defendant, and addresses the deficiencies of her Monell claims identified in this Opinion & Order within 30 days of the date below. See 13-page opinion & order attached. Signed on 2/24/2016 by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. Copy of this opinion & order mailed to Plaintiff Harris. (mr)
July 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 7 OPINION & ORDER: Harris's application to proceed in forma pauperis 1 is granted and her IFP status is confirmed. Her complaint 2 is dismissed sua sponte without prejudice for failure to state a cognizable claim, and her motion for app ointment of counsel 3 is denied. Ms. Harris shall file an amended complaint, consistent with this Opinion & Order, within 30 days of the date below. See 5-page opinion & order attached. Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. Copy of this order mailed to Plaintiff Tera Harris. (mr)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris et al v. City of Portland Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Portland Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L. H.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latte Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tera Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deona Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?