Lifestyle Ventures, LLC v. County of Clackamas et al
Plaintiff: Lifestyle Ventures, LLC
Defendant: Rebecca Ceniga, County of Clackamas and Michael McAllister
Case Number: 3:2015cv01291
Filed: July 13, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Office: Portland (3) Office
Presiding Judge: Stacie F. Beckerman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER: The Court ADOPTS Magistrate Judge Beckerman's Findings and Recommendation (#74) and, therefore, GRANTS Defendants' Motion (#58) to Dismiss and DISMISSES this case with prejudice. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed on 3/6/2018 by Judge Anna J. Brown. (gw)
January 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER: The Court ADOPTS Magistrate Judge Beckerman's Findings and Recommendation 51 and, accordingly, DENIES Plaintiff's Motion 30 for Leave to File Amended Complaint to add new claims relating to Lot 4400. Consistent with this Court's Order 46 issued August 4, 2016, adopting the Magistrate Judge's Findings and Recommendation 34 issued May 18, 2016; the Court allows Plaintiff to amend its original negligence claim as to those parts that do not relate to Lot 4400 or due-process claims. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed on 1/26/2017 by Judge Anna J. Brown. (gw)
August 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER: The Court ADOPTS Magistrate Judge Beckerman's Findings and Recommendation 34 and, therefore, GRANTS Plaintiff's own Motion to Dismiss the First and Second Claims; DENIES as moot Defendants' Motion 18 to Dismiss Plain tiff's Complaint for lack of jurisdiction; DENIES Defendants' Motion 18 to Dismiss Plaintiff's Third Claim; GRANTS without prejudice Defendants' Motion 18 to Dismiss Plaintiff's Fourth Claim; and GRANTS Plaintiff leave to amend its Complaint only as to the Fourth Claim for negligence by a date to be set by the Magistrate Judge. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed on 8/4/2016 by Judge Anna J. Brown. (gw)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lifestyle Ventures, LLC v. County of Clackamas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca Ceniga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Clackamas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael McAllister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lifestyle Ventures, LLC
Represented By: Mark E. Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?