Grecco v. Commissioner Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Kimberly A. Grecco
Defendant: Commissioner Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2015cv01379
Filed: July 23, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Office: Portland (3) Office
Presiding Judge: Mark D. Clarke
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER: I adopt Magistrate Judge Clarke's F&R 34 in its entirety. Accordingly, the Motion for Attorney Fees 32 is granted. Counsel should be awarded $6,248.25 under 42 U.S.C. § 406(b), the amount left after subtracting the $9,500.00 in EAJA fees that have already been paid to counsel. Signed on 9/26/2018 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER: Granting Application for Fees Pursuant to EAJA 27 . Signed on 05/19/2017 by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (rsm)
December 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER: Adopting Findings and Recommendation 23 . See, Formal Order. Signed on 12/13/2016 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (rr)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grecco v. Commissioner Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Social Security Administration
Represented By: Janice E. Hebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly A. Grecco
Represented By: Karen Stolzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?