Lewis v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Steven Lewis
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2016cv00241
Filed: February 8, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Office: Portland (3) Office
Presiding Judge: Anna J. Brown
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: Granting Motion for Attorney Fees 17 . Signed on 7/29/2019 by Judge Anna J. Brown. (ecp)
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Judge Anna J. Brown. Granting Application for Fees Pursuant to EAJA 15 . (rrr)
December 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Opinion and Order - The Court REVERSES the decision of the Commissioner and REMANDS this matter pursuant to sentence four of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g) for further administrative proceedings consistent with this Opinion and Order. Signed on 12/30/2016 by Judge Anna J. Brown. (mja)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Lewis
Represented By: Jeffrey Hugh Baird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Janice E. Hebert
Represented By: Leisa A. Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?