Shannon et al v. Bayview Loan Servicing LLC et al

Plaintiff: Deborah Shannon and Tim Shannon
Defendant: Bayview Loan Servicing LLC and JP Morgan Chase Bank National Association
Case Number: 3:2016cv01016
Filed: June 6, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Office: Portland (3) Office
Presiding Judge: Michael W. Mosman
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345 Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 88 OPINION AND ORDER: As stated at the April 20, 2018, hearing, I GRANT Defendants' Motion to Dismiss 79 , DENY the Shannons' Motion for Leave to File Fourth Amended Complaint 83 , and dismiss this action with prejudice. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (kms)
June 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 Stipulation and Order Of Dismissal With Prejudice Against Bayview Loan Servicing LLC and M&T Bank. Granting Motion to Dismiss 65 . Signed on 6/7/17 by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (cib)
February 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 OPINION AND ORDER: Bayview's Motion to Remand to State Court 14 is GRANTED and it is ORDERED that the foreclosure case improperly removed under Dkt. No. 6, which is state Case No. CV13050449, be REMANDED to the Clackamas County Circuit Court. Signed on 02/08/2017 by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (rs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shannon et al v. Bayview Loan Servicing LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayview Loan Servicing LLC
Represented By: John M. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank National Association
Represented By: Frederick B. Burnside
Represented By: Kevin H. Kono
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Shannon
Represented By: John A. Cochran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tim Shannon
Represented By: John A. Cochran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?