Christian v. Umpqua Bank
Plaintiff: Jennifer Christian
Defendant: Umpqua Bank
Case Number: 3:2016cv01938
Filed: October 4, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Office: Portland (3) Office
Presiding Judge: Anna J. Brown
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal - Employment Discrim
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 71 Opinion and Order. The Court AWARDS costs to Defendant in the amount of $7,690.81 and directs the Clerk to tax these costs against Plaintiff. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed on 7/10/18 by Judge Anna J. Brown. (jy)
May 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 63 Opinion and Order. The Court GRANTS Defendants' Motion (# 49 ) for Summary Judgment and, accordingly, DISMISSES this matter with prejudice. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed on 5/22/18 by Judge Anna J. Brown. (jy)
February 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: The Court DENIES Plaintiff's Motion to Remand 9 . Signed on 02/02/2017 by Judge Anna J. Brown. See attached 11 page Opinion and Order for full text. (bb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Christian v. Umpqua Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Christian
Represented By: Crystal M. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Umpqua Bank
Represented By: Alysia J. Harris
Represented By: Leah C. Lively
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?