Shah v. Meier Enterprises, Inc., et al

Plaintiff: Shantubhai N. Shah
Defendant: Steve Anderson, Paul Giever, Bobbi Keen, Meier Enterprises Directors, Meier Enterprises Employee Owners, Meier Enterprises Officers and Meier Enterprises, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2017cv00226
Filed: February 10, 2017
Court: Oregon District Court
Office: Portland (3) Office
Presiding Judge: John Jelderks
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 13, 2018 166 Opinion or Order of the Court Opinion and Order : Plaintiff's motions for sanctions (# 138 , # 154 ); motion for reconsideration (# 140 ); and motion to withdraw consent to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction (# 139 ) are DENIED. Plaintiff's motion for leave to file an affidavit (# 123 ) is GRANTED. For the reasons set out above, Defendants' motion for summary judgment (# 129 ) is GRANTED and Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment (# 72 , # 78 ) is DENIED. Signed on 9/13/2018 by Magistrate Judge John Jelderks. (jtj)
April 26, 2018 135 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER. Plaintiff's motion for leave to file a Second Amended Complaint (Dkt. # 112 ) is DENIED. See Opinion and Order for further details. Signed on 4/26/2018 by Magistrate Judge John Jelderks. (jtj)
February 20, 2018 101 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Plaintiff's Objections (Dkt. # 96 ), which are considered by this Court as a Motion for Reconsideration, are DENIED. Signed on 2/20/2018 by Magistrate Judge John Jelderks. (jtj)
February 13, 2018 97 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Court ADOPTS Magistrate Judge Jelderks's Findings & Recommendation 74 , and therefore, the motion to dismiss by Defendants "MEIER ENTERPRISES DIRECTORS," "MEIER ENTERPRISES OFFERS," and "MEIER ENTERPRISES EMPLOYEE OWNERS," 65 is granted. Signed on 2/13/2018 by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (jtj)
August 1, 2017 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: I have carefully considered Plaintiff's objections and conclude they do not/do provide a basis to modify the Magistrate Judge's Opinion & Order. The Court AFFIRMS Magistrate Judge Jelderks's Order 27 . Signed on 8/1/2017 by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (jtj)
June 15, 2017 27 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION and ORDER - For the reasons stated, Plaintiff's Motion to Remand 11 and Motion for Entry of Default 15 are DENIED. DATED this 15th day of June, 2017, by United States Magistrate Judge John Jelderks. (peg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shah v. Meier Enterprises, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Giever
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobbi Keen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meier Enterprises Directors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meier Enterprises Employee Owners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meier Enterprises Officers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meier Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Krishna Balasubramani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shantubhai N. Shah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?