Lane v. Commissioner Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Clayton Eugene Lane
Defendant: Commissioner Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2017cv00778
Filed: May 18, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Office: Portland (3) Office
Presiding Judge: Marco A. Hernandez
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:0405g Review of Commissioner's Final Decision
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Order for Fees Pursuant to EAJA. Signed on 2/19/2019 by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (mja)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER: Granting Application for Fees Pursuant to EAJA 23 . Signed on 10/1/2018 by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (jp)
June 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Opinion and Order. The Commissioners decision is REVERSED and REMANDED for immediate payment of benefits. Signed on 6/21/2018 by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (sss)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lane v. Commissioner Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Social Security Administration
Represented By: Janice E. Hebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clayton Eugene Lane
Represented By: Merrill Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?