Goldingay v. Cheveron, U.S.A, etc
Plaintiff: Roger Goldingay
Defendant: Chevron U.S.A. and Progressive Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2017cv01491
Filed: September 22, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Office: Portland (3) Office
Presiding Judge: Michael H. Simon
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Torts to Land
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 92 Opinion and Order on Attorney Fees - Plaintiffs' Motion for Award of Reasonable Attorney Fees (ECF 73 ) is granted in part. After considering the written submissions of the parties and making the deductions detailed in this Opinion and Order, t he Court awards Plaintiffs collectively $78,609.77 in attorney fees against Progressive Casualty Insurance Company and awards Plaintiffs collectively $48,504.28 in attorney fees against Chevron U.S.A. Inc. This reflects a reduction of approximately 36 percent from the total amount requested by Plaintiffs. Signed on 2/22/2019 by Judge Michael H. Simon. Associated Cases: 3:17-cv-01491-SI, 3:17-cv-01494-SI (mja)
August 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 66 Opinion and Order - Defendant Chevron U.S.A. Inc.'s Motion for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings (ECF 55 ), joined by Defendant Progressive Casualty Insurance Company (ECF 56 ), is GRANTED. Signed on 8/3/2018 by Judge Michael H. Simon.Associated Cases: 3:17-cv-01491-SI, 3:17-cv-01494-SI (mja)
January 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Opinion and Order - Progressive's Motion to Dismiss (ECF 15 ) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Chevron's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (ECF 17 ) is GRANTED. Both motions are granted as to Plaintiffs' claim for financial elder abuse, which is dismissed with prejudice, and granted as to Plaintiffs' request for declaratory judgment, which is dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiffs may file an amended pleading within two weeks from the date of this Opinion and Order if they believe that additional allegations will cure the identified deficiencies. Signed on 1/25/2018 by Judge Michael H. Simon.Associated Cases: 3:17-cv-01491-SI, 3:17-cv-01494-SI (mja)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goldingay v. Cheveron, U.S.A, etc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chevron U.S.A.
Represented By: David A. Bledsoe
Represented By: Julie Wilson-McNerney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Kristin M. Asai
Represented By: J. Matthew Donohue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Goldingay
Represented By: Brooks MacInnes Foster
Represented By: Andrea R. Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?