Underwood v. 1450 SE Orient, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Laura L. Underwood
Defendant: Denise K. Concannon, Michael R. Munzing, Aligra Marie Rainy, T.R. Jones LLC, Mason Reed Walker, CO2 Company Auction House LLC, Sugar Tree Farm, LLC, BCC Holdings, LLC, Meghan Walstatter, Troy H. Duzon, Alpha Alternative Solutions, LLC, Visionary Enterprises, Inc., K J K Enterprises LLC, Steven James Lemma, John Jeffrey Plummer, Melissa Ann Kruse, Nathan Cole Howard, Connie Renee Barnes, Stonies, LLC, Varasay Joe Sysavath, OG3, LLC, Stephen Andrew Bailey, Mark Steven Capps, Capitol Green Leaf LLC, Hannah Elizabeth Hayes, Robert Jay Wayman, Jason Reynolds, Benjamin James Robison, Columbia Alternative Medical Center LLC, Greenlink Retail, Inc., Elsner Inc., Colby Lee Jackson, Jake Clifford Kalil Hill, Jayne Inc., Samuel Swain Heywood, Canyon Cannabis LLC, David Douglas Demarre, Megawood Enterprises Inc., Gregg Goldenberg, Merle Leon Thomas, Vernonia's Natural Choice LLC, 3 Kids, Inc., Samuel Alexander, The Lucky Leaf LLC, Nole Emerson Bullock, Melissa A. Giersbach, East Fork Agriculture LLC, Marc Groleau, Wee Farms, LLC, Donald F. Kirby, Ian Robert Watson, Timothy Lee Horst, The New Amsterdam LLC, Robert Marion Elam, Michael Connor Degance, Matthew Scott Walstatter, David Arlen Alport, Williams LLC, Kent Thompson, Robert David Galloway, Powellhurst Alternative Medical Center LLC, Tristan Levi Kuhns, Travis James Moffatt, Julie Louise Worley, Michael James Scarbrough, Dror Bezalel, Justin James West, N&A Investments, LLC, Patrick Stephen Todd, Michelle Renee Reschert, Bula Farms, LLC, James Michael Fisher, Julie Ann Widmer, Spencer J. Mullen, High Mountain Retail LLC, Happy Lane, LLC, Midori Retail, LLC, Yisroel N. Shenkman, Herbal Remedies 2 Inc., Joel Matthew Fischer, Allison Colt Gantzer, Ptown Investments, LLC, Salmon Run Holdings, LLC, Uplift Botanicals LLC, Medicine Tree LLC, Anna Marie Schrab, Evette Marie Pavich, Steven Penman, Scissortail Farms, LLC, Kip Lyle Rowles, Zachary Carl Kohler, Jaclyn M. Iwanski, Wendy Dawn Brisbin, Kevin Patrick Walsh, Jeremy Scott Kwit, OC Joe, LLC, Aaron Robert Mitchell, Ralph O. Robinson, David Gary Sather, John Philip Widmer, Izidor Mikhli, Green Box, LLC, Hilltop Pharmaceuticals Inc., Green Mart, LLC, Harold James Lareau, Nicholas Louis Pavich, Jr., Brandon Dale Decamp, David Neal Schwimmer, The Joint on Market Street LLC, Rod James Maguire, Justin Gedde, The Gorge Green Cross Inc., Little Amsterdam Wellness Center LLC, The 5 of Us L.L.C., Herbal Grasslands, LLC, Roy Allen Mitchell, Farma on Hawthorne, Inc., Sheri Lynn Ralston, Tropicannabis, LLC, Gregory Lynn Tidey, Jr., Jason Cain, Joseph River Perkins, Adrian Nathaniel Wayman, Bloom Well, Inc., Robert Truvette Taylor, Joseph James Haddad, TLC Medical, Inc., Agronomy, LLC, Rachel Lillian Jones, Ryan Chandler Huggins, Attikus Enterprises, Inc., Aaron Howard, Adam Raymond Kirkwood, Demetrios N. Themelis, Taylor Jordan Rembowski, The Holistic Choice Inc., Willamette Valley Resources LLC, Covey William Baack, Today's Herbal Choice, Inc., Urban Farmacy, LLC, Jered Dwayne Decamp, Willow Management LLC, Nehalem Bay Wellness, Ltd., Canby Growing Farms, Inc., Tidepool Oregon City, Inc., Tidepool Cannon Beach, Inc., La Mota Hollywood, LLC, Kevin Lee Fisher, William Hal Blair, Tidepool Northeast, Inc., Michael James Rachford, Pacific Highway Investments, LLC, Cherry City Compassion Inc., Derek Scott Herman, Dennis Wayne Sivers, David Alan Kline, Kind Leaf Pendleton LLC, Puregon LLC, Steven William Pitzer, Darlene Siegel, Grand, LLC, Oregon Candy Farm, LLC, Duzon Enterprises, LLC, Joshua John Cino, JJH Law, a Professional Corporation, JAMA Industry LLC, Brandon Joel Krenzler, Jerrod Thompson, Miranda Marie Murray, The Green Planet, Inc., Lesta Amorette Bentley, Cindy G. Cusick, Melissa Sue Maguire, Alexander Nicholas Pavich, Buddha's Wellness Center LLC, Patrick James Learned, Tammy Lynne Brown, Wolf D LLC, Case Dennison Van Dorne, 1450 SE Orient, LLC, Michelle Renee Barnes, Andrew Joseph Buck, Dispenserve LLC, James Ambrose Galba, Matthew Correy Schwimmer, Chronic Creations LLC, Randall Jon Mallette, Craig Sean Leivent, Margaret Renee Amala, WWMP, LLC, Marek Ryszard Zamojski, Teran Forest Wilson, Jennifer Ann Pitzer, Joe Zhou, Christopher Dale Ostlund, Abdullah Frakes Naimi, Terry Emmett Wilson, Gregory Neale Perrin, Sabrina Clare Baack, All Systems as Promised, Inc., Certified Portland LLC, Hai Chheng Gov, Ancient Remedies LLC, Robb Randolph Arnold, Talent Health Club LLC, Joel Jennings, Mia Marie Bullock, James Samuel Wakefield, Tyson J. Lewis, 7Points Inc., Hawthco One Corporation, Milton John Robinson, Jeffrey Lynn Buckley, Mario Salvatore Mamone, P.W.C.C., LLC, Mark Alan Cusick, Todd James Fulscher, Ryan Joseph Walsh, David Craig Bryant, Tidewater Retail, Inc., Daniel Neil Westman, Western Oregon Dispensary Inc., High Noon Farm LLC, Robert J. Metcalfe, Jamin A. Giersbach, Andrew Ryan Clinton, Joint on Market Street LLC, Holistic Choice Inc., Lucky Leaf LLC, Gorge Green Cross Inc., 5 of Us L.L.C., New Amsterdam LLC and Green Planet, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv01366
Filed: July 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Office: Portland (3) Office
Presiding Judge: Paul Papak
Referring Judge: Jolie A Russo
Nature of Suit: Civil (RICO) Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2019 Filing 372 Affidavit of Service upon Milton John Robinson served on 1/15/2019 (Attachments: #1 Proof of Mailing) Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
February 15, 2019 Filing 371 Joint Response to Objections to Findings & Recommendation. Related document(s): #370 Objections to Findings & Recommendation,. Filed by All Defendants. (Davidson, Clifford)
February 11, 2019 Filing 370 Objections to Findings & Recommendation: Motion to Sever and Dismiss for Improper Joinder #193 , Motion to Sever and Dismiss for Improper Joinder #199 should be granted/denied #364 . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 369 ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo: Granting Defendants Samuel Alexander, All Systems as Promised, Inc., Alpha Alternative Solutions LLC, Margaret Renee Amala aka Margaret Sperry, Ancient Remedies LLC, Robb Randolph Arnold, Attikus Enterprises, Inc., Lesta Amorette Bentley, William Hal Blair, Jeffrey Lynn Buckley, Canyon Cannabis LLC, Certified Portland LLC, Cindy G. Cusick, Mark Alan Cusick, David Douglas DeMarre, East Fork Agriculture LLC, Robert Marion Elam, Farma on Hawthorne, Inc., Joel Matthew Fischer, 1450 SE Orient, LLC, James Ambrose Galba, Robert David Galloway, Hai Chheng Gov, Hannah Elizabeth Hayes, Herbal Grasslands LLC, Samuel Swain Heywood, High Mountain Retail LLC, High Noon Farm LLC, Aaron Howard, Nathan Cole Howard, Jaclyn Iwanski, Colby Lee Jackson, Jayne, Inc., Kind Leaf Pendleton LLC, Donald Kirby, Adam Raymond Kirkwood, K J K Enterprises LLC, David Alan Kline, Brandon Joel Krenzler, La Mota Hollywood LLC, Tyson J. Lewis, Melissa Sue Maguire, Rod James Maguire, Medicine Tree LLC, Izidor Mikhli, Aaron Robert Mitchell, Roy Allen Mitchell, Michael R. Munzing, OC Joe, LLC, Christopher Dale Ostlund, Steven Penman, Joseph River Perkins, Gregory Neale Perrin, Jason Reynolds, Ralph O. Robinson, Benjamin James Robison, Kip Lyle Rowles, David Neal Schwimmer, Matthew Correy Schwimmer, Yisroel N. Shenkman, Darlene Siegel, 7 Points Inc., Sugar Tree Farm LLC, Varasay Joe Sysavath, The Joint on Market Street LLC, The Lucky Leaf LLC, The New Amsterdam LLC, Demetrios N. Themelis, Jerrod Thompson, Kent Thompson, 3 Kids, Inc., Tropicannabis, LLC, Urban Farmacy, LLC, Visionary Enterprises, Inc., Mason Reed Walker, John Philip Widmer, Julie Ann Widmer, Willamette Valley Resources LLC dba Kline Cultivation, WWMP, LLC, Marek Zamojski, and Joe Zhou's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time #367 as follows: The deadline for each defendant (if a defendant so desires) to file a response to Plaintiff's Motions for Award of Service Costs and Attorneys' Fees Pertaining to Service of Process will be due on or before 14 days following the date on which Plaintiff's counsel confirms to the Court and counsel that filing has been completed on all such motions with respect to all defendants who have been served and for whom counsel has filed a Notice of Appearance in this case. (gm)
February 5, 2019 Filing 368 Declaration of Alexander M. Tinker in Support of 88 Group Defendants' Unopposed Motion For Extension of Time For Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's Motions For Award of Service Costs, etc.. Filed by Ancient Remedies LLC, Robb Randolph Arnold, Attikus Enterprises, Inc., Lesta Amorette Bentley, William Hal Blair, Jeffrey Lynn Buckley, Canyon Cannabis LLC, Certified Portland LLC, Cindy G. Cusick, Mark Alan Cusick, David Douglas Demarre, East Fork Agriculture LLC, Robert Marion Elam, Farma on Hawthorne, Inc., Joel Matthew Fischer, James Ambrose Galba, Robert David Galloway, Hai Chheng Gov, Hannah Elizabeth Hayes, Herbal Grasslands, LLC, Samuel Swain Heywood, High Mountain Retail LLC, High Noon Farm LLC, Aaron Howard, Nathan Cole Howard, Jaclyn M. Iwanski, Colby Lee Jackson, Jayne Inc., Joint on Market Street LLC, K J K Enterprises LLC, Kind Leaf Pendleton LLC, Donald F. Kirby, Adam Raymond Kirkwood, David Alan Kline, Brandon Joel Krenzler, La Mota Hollywood, LLC, Tyson J. Lewis, Lucky Leaf LLC, Melissa Sue Maguire, Rod James Maguire, Medicine Tree LLC, Izidor Mikhli, Aaron Robert Mitchell, Roy Allen Mitchell, Michael R. Munzing, New Amsterdam LLC, OC Joe, LLC, Christopher Dale Ostlund, Steven Penman, Joseph River Perkins, Gregory Neale Perrin, Jason Reynolds, Ralph O. Robinson, Benjamin James Robison, Kip Lyle Rowles, 1450 SE Orient, LLC, 3 Kids, Inc., 7Points Inc., Samuel Alexander, All Systems as Promised, Inc., Alpha Alternative Solutions, LLC, Margaret Renee Amala, David Neal Schwimmer, Matthew Correy Schwimmer, Yisroel N. Shenkman, Darlene Siegel, Sugar Tree Farm, LLC, Varasay Joe Sysavath, Demetrios N. Themelis, Jerrod Thompson, Kent Thompson, Tropicannabis, LLC, Urban Farmacy, LLC, Visionary Enterprises, Inc., WWMP, LLC, Mason Reed Walker, John Philip Widmer, Julie Ann Widmer, Willamette Valley Resources LLC, Marek Ryszard Zamojski, Joe Zhou. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to a Motion,,,,,,,,, #367 .) (Tinker, Alexander)
February 5, 2019 Filing 367 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response/Reply to Motion for Award of Service Costs and Attorneys' Fees Pertaining to Service of Process on Defendant Travis James Moffatt #360 , Motion for Award of Service Costs and Attorneys' Fees Pertaining to Service of Defendant Miranda Marie Murray #361 , Motion for Award of Service Costs and Attorneys' Fees Pertaining to Service of Process on Defendant The Green Planet, Inc. #363 , Motion for Award of Service Costs and Attorneys' Fees Pertaining to Service of Defendant Justin James West #362 . Filed by Ancient Remedies LLC, Robb Randolph Arnold, Attikus Enterprises, Inc., Lesta Amorette Bentley, William Hal Blair, Jeffrey Lynn Buckley, Canyon Cannabis LLC, Certified Portland LLC, Cindy G. Cusick, Mark Alan Cusick, David Douglas Demarre, East Fork Agriculture LLC, Robert Marion Elam, Farma on Hawthorne, Inc., Joel Matthew Fischer, James Ambrose Galba, Robert David Galloway, Hai Chheng Gov, Hannah Elizabeth Hayes, Herbal Grasslands, LLC, Samuel Swain Heywood, High Mountain Retail LLC, High Noon Farm LLC, Aaron Howard, Nathan Cole Howard, Jaclyn M. Iwanski, Colby Lee Jackson, Jayne Inc., Joint on Market Street LLC, K J K Enterprises LLC, Kind Leaf Pendleton LLC, Donald F. Kirby, Adam Raymond Kirkwood, David Alan Kline, Brandon Joel Krenzler, La Mota Hollywood, LLC, Tyson J. Lewis, Lucky Leaf LLC, Melissa Sue Maguire, Rod James Maguire, Medicine Tree LLC, Izidor Mikhli, Aaron Robert Mitchell, Roy Allen Mitchell, Michael R. Munzing, New Amsterdam LLC, OC Joe, LLC, Christopher Dale Ostlund, Steven Penman, Joseph River Perkins, Gregory Neale Perrin, Jason Reynolds, Ralph O. Robinson, Benjamin James Robison, Kip Lyle Rowles, 1450 SE Orient, LLC, 3 Kids, Inc., 7Points Inc., Samuel Alexander, All Systems as Promised, Inc., Alpha Alternative Solutions, LLC, Margaret Renee Amala, David Neal Schwimmer, Matthew Correy Schwimmer, Yisroel N. Shenkman, Darlene Siegel, Sugar Tree Farm, LLC, Varasay Joe Sysavath, Demetrios N. Themelis, Jerrod Thompson, Kent Thompson, Tropicannabis, LLC, Urban Farmacy, LLC, Visionary Enterprises, Inc., WWMP, LLC, Mason Reed Walker, John Philip Widmer, Julie Ann Widmer, Willamette Valley Resources LLC, Marek Ryszard Zamojski, Joe Zhou. (Tinker, Alexander)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 366 ORDER: The plaintiff shall file a RICO case statement in this action within 21 days of the District Court's final order regarding defendants' motions to sever for improper joinder #193 & #199 . Signed on 1/28/19 by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (gm)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 365 ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo: Findings & Recommendation #364 is referred to Judge Michael H. Simon for review. The parties shall have fourteen (14) days from the date of service of a copy of this recommendation within which to file specific written objections with the court. Thereafter, the parties shall have fourteen (14) days within which to file a response to the objections. (gm)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 364 Findings & Recommendation: Defendants' motions to sever #193 & #199 should be granted in part and the retail defendants should be severed from this action. In anticipation of Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 motions, the court will issue a separate order requiring plaintiff to file a RICO case statement. The deadline for filing answers or otherwise responding to the amended complaint by defendants shall be 14 days after plaintiff files the RICO case statement. Signed on 1/28/19 by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (gm)
January 24, 2019 Filing 363 Motion for Award of Service Costs and Attorneys' Fees Pertaining to Service of Process on Defendant The Green Planet, Inc.. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration) (McCart, Rachel)
January 24, 2019 Filing 362 Motion for Award of Service Costs and Attorneys' Fees Pertaining to Service of Defendant Justin James West. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration) (McCart, Rachel)
January 24, 2019 Filing 361 Motion for Award of Service Costs and Attorneys' Fees Pertaining to Service of Defendant Miranda Marie Murray. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration) (McCart, Rachel)
January 24, 2019 Filing 360 Motion for Award of Service Costs and Attorneys' Fees Pertaining to Service of Process on Defendant Travis James Moffatt. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration) (McCart, Rachel)
January 23, 2019 Filing 359 Affidavit of Service upon Tristan Levi Kuhns served on 1/11/2019 (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proof of Mailing) Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
January 23, 2019 Filing 358 Affidavit of Service upon Robert Truvette Taylor served on 1/7/2019 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
January 23, 2019 Filing 357 Acceptance/Acknowledgement of Service on BCC Holdings, LLC served on 9/19/2018; Dror Bezalel served on 9/19/2018; David Craig Bryant served on 9/19/2018; Bula Farms, LLC served on 9/19/2018; Joshua John Cino served on 9/19/2018; Columbia Alternative Medical Center LLC served on 9/19/2018; Michael Connor Degance served on 9/19/2018; Dispenserve LLC served on 9/19/2018; Todd James Fulscher served on 9/19/2018; Gregg Goldenberg served on 9/19/2018; Gorge Green Cross Inc. served on 9/19/2018; Grand, LLC served on 9/19/2018; Green Mart, LLC served on 9/19/2018; Jake Clifford Kalil Hill served on 9/19/2018; Hilltop Pharmaceuticals Inc. served on 9/19/2018; Ryan Chandler Huggins served on 9/19/2018; Craig Sean Leivent served on 9/19/2018; Megawood Enterprises Inc. served on 9/19/2018; Abdullah Frakes Naimi served on 9/19/2018; OG3, LLC served on 9/19/2018; Powellhurst Alternative Medical Center LLC served on 9/19/2018; Puregon LLC served on 9/19/2018; Michael James Rachford served on 9/19/2018; Michelle Renee Reschert served on 9/19/2018; 5 of Us L.L.C. served on 9/19/2018; David Arlen Alport served on 9/19/2018; Anna Marie Schrab served on 9/19/2018; Dennis Wayne Sivers served on 9/19/2018; Matthew Scott Walstatter served on 9/19/2018; Meghan Walstatter served on 9/19/2018; Ian Robert Watson served on 9/19/2018; Daniel Neil Westman served on 9/19/2018; Williams LLC served on 9/19/2018; Terry Emmett Wilson served on 9/19/2018; Julie Louise Worley served on 9/19/2018 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
January 22, 2019 Filing 356 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS before Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo: Oral Argument held 1/22/19. Order: Defendants Talent Health Club LLC, Melissa Giersbach, Jamin Giersbach, Midori Retail LLC, Hawthco One Corporation, Derek Herman, Joseph Haddad, JJH Law, Green Planet Inc., Miranda Murray West, Justin West and Travis Moffatt's Motion to Sever and Dismiss for Improper Joinder #193 and Defendants Evette Pavich, Nicolas Pavich and N&A Investments LLC's Motion to Sever, Dismiss for Improper Joinder, and Require Separate Filing Fees #199 are taken under advisement as of 1/22/2019. Rachel McCart present as counsel for plaintiff(s). Alexander Tinker; Keith Pitt; Clifford Davidson present as counsel for defendant(s). Court Reporter: Ryan White. (gm)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 355 ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo: Changing the Oral Argument regarding Defendants Talent Health Club LLC, Melissa Giersbach, Jamin Giersbach, Midori Retail LLC, Hawthco One Corporation, Derek Herman, Joseph Haddad, JJH Law, Green Planet Inc., Miranda Murray West, Justin West and Travis Moffatt's Motion to Sever and Dismiss for Improper Joinder #193 and Defendants' Evette Pavich, Nicolas Pavich and N&A Investments LLC's Motion to Sever, Dismiss for Improper Joinder, and Require Separate Filing Fees #199 from a Telephonic Oral Argument to an in-person Oral Argument scheduled for 1/22/2019 at 10:00AM in Portland Courtroom 10B before Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. Plaintiff's counsel and Defendants' counsel that authored the two motions to dismiss may appear in person and the remainder counsel are welcome to appear by telephone, or in person. (gm)
January 4, 2019 Filing 354 Affidavit of Service upon Robert J. Metcalfe served on 1/2/2019 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
January 4, 2019 Filing 353 Affidavit of Service upon Stonies, LLC served on 1/2/2019 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
December 20, 2018 Filing 352 Notice of Appearance of Colin P. Mackenzie appearing on behalf of Steven William Pitzer Filed by on behalf of Steven William Pitzer. (Mackenzie, Colin)
December 20, 2018 Filing 351 Notice of Appearance of Colin P. Mackenzie appearing on behalf of Steven James Lemma Filed by on behalf of Steven James Lemma. (Mackenzie, Colin)
December 20, 2018 Filing 350 Notice of Appearance of Colin P. Mackenzie appearing on behalf of CO2 Company Auction House LLC, Kevin Patrick Walsh, Ryan Joseph Walsh Filed by on behalf of CO2 Company Auction House LLC, Kevin Patrick Walsh, Ryan Joseph Walsh. (Mackenzie, Colin)
December 20, 2018 Filing 349 Notice of Appearance of Colin P. Mackenzie appearing on behalf of Andrew Joseph Buck, Nehalem Bay Wellness, Ltd. Filed by on behalf of Andrew Joseph Buck, Nehalem Bay Wellness, Ltd.. (Mackenzie, Colin)
December 19, 2018 Filing 348 Notice of Joinder in Reply to Motion, 339 Filed by Andrew Joseph Buck, CO2 Company Auction House LLC, Steven James Lemma, Nehalem Bay Wellness, Ltd., Steven William Pitzer, Kevin Patrick Walsh, Ryan Joseph Walsh. (Jacoby, Kevin)
December 19, 2018 Filing 347 Notice of Joinder in Reply to Motion, #339 Filed by BCC Holdings, LLC, Dror Bezalel, Tammy Lynne Brown, David Craig Bryant, Bula Farms, LLC, Joshua John Cino, Andrew Ryan Clinton, Columbia Alternative Medical Center LLC, Michael Connor Degance, Dispenserve LLC, Elsner Inc., James Michael Fisher, Kevin Lee Fisher, Todd James Fulscher, Gregg Goldenberg, Grand, LLC, Green Mart, LLC, Marc Groleau, Jake Clifford Kalil Hill, Hilltop Pharmaceuticals Inc., Ryan Chandler Huggins, Harold James Lareau, Craig Sean Leivent, Mario Salvatore Mamone, Megawood Enterprises Inc., Spencer J. Mullen, Abdullah Frakes Naimi, OG3, LLC, Powellhurst Alternative Medical Center LLC, Puregon LLC, Michael James Rachford, Sheri Lynn Ralston, Michelle Renee Reschert, David Arlen Alport, Anna Marie Schrab, Scissortail Farms, LLC, The 5 of Us L.L.C., The Gorge Green Cross Inc., Uplift Botanicals LLC, Matthew Scott Walstatter, Meghan Walstatter, Ian Robert Watson, Western Oregon Dispensary Inc., Daniel Neil Westman, Williams LLC, Teran Forest Wilson, Terry Emmett Wilson, Wolf D LLC, Julie Louise Worley. (Related document(s): Reply to Motion, #339 .) (DeCristo, Joshua)
December 18, 2018 Filing 346 Notice of Joinder in Reply Filed by Justin Gedde, Happy Lane, LLC, Ptown Investments, LLC, Aligra Marie Rainy, Willow Management LLC. (Swider, Robert)
December 18, 2018 Filing 345 Summons Issued Electronically as to Robert Truvette Taylor. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (rs) Modified on 12/18/2018 to replace document with the correct summons, NEF regenerated. (rs).
December 17, 2018 Filing 344 Notice of Joinder in Reply to Motion, #339 Filed by JAMA Industry LLC, Jennifer Ann Pitzer. (Related document(s): Reply to Motion, #339 .) (Wilner-Nugent, Bear)
December 17, 2018 Filing 343 Notice of Joinder in Reply to Motion, #339 Filed by Canby Growing Farms, Inc., David Gary Sather. (Related document(s): Reply to Motion, #339 .) (Bell, Aaron)
December 17, 2018 Filing 342 Notice of Joinder to Defendant's Reply Filed by Brandon Dale Decamp, Jered Dwayne Decamp, Herbal Remedies 2 Inc.. (Novotny, Cary)
December 17, 2018 Filing 341 Notice of Joinder in Reply to Motion, #339 Filed by Connie Renee Barnes, Michelle Renee Barnes, Bloom Well, Inc., Jason Cain, Mark Steven Capps, Greenlink Retail, Inc., Timothy Lee Horst, Joel Jennings, Jeremy Scott Kwit, Little Amsterdam Wellness Center LLC, Pacific Highway Investments, LLC, Taylor Jordan Rembowski, Agronomy, LLC, Salmon Run Holdings, LLC, TLC Medical, Inc., Tidepool Cannon Beach, Inc., Tidepool Northeast, Inc., Tidepool Oregon City, Inc., Tidewater Retail, Inc., Patrick Stephen Todd, Case Dennison Van Dorne. (Related document(s): Reply to Motion, #339 .) (Goldberg, Matthew)
December 17, 2018 Filing 340 Reply to Motion to Sever and Dismiss for Improper Joinder #199 . Filed by N&A Investments, LLC, Evette Marie Pavich, Nicholas Louis Pavich, Jr. (Pitt, Keith)
December 17, 2018 Filing 339 Reply to Motion to Sever and Dismiss for Improper Joinder #199 . Filed by Jamin A. Giersbach, Melissa A. Giersbach, Joseph James Haddad, Hawthco One Corporation, Derek Scott Herman, JJH Law, a Professional Corporation, Travis James Moffatt, Miranda Marie Murray, Talent Health Club LLC, The Green Planet, Inc., Justin James West. (Davidson, Clifford)
December 11, 2018 Filing 338 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Kind Leaf Pendleton LLC. (Tinker, Alexander)
December 11, 2018 Filing 337 Proposed Summons Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
December 11, 2018 Filing 336 Notice of Appearance of Megan K. Houlihan appearing on behalf of David Douglas Demarre, Ancient Remedies LLC, The Joint on Market Street LLC Filed by on behalf of David Douglas Demarre, Ancient Remedies LLC, The Joint on Market Street LLC. (Houlihan, Megan)
December 11, 2018 Filing 335 Notice of Appearance of Jon P. Stride appearing on behalf of David Douglas Demarre, Ancient Remedies LLC, The Joint on Market Street LLC Filed by on behalf of David Douglas Demarre, Ancient Remedies LLC, The Joint on Market Street LLC. (Stride, Jon)
December 11, 2018 Filing 334 Notice of Appearance of Alexander M. Tinker appearing on behalf of David Douglas Demarre, Ancient Remedies LLC, The Joint on Market Street LLC Filed by on behalf of David Douglas Demarre, Ancient Remedies LLC, The Joint on Market Street LLC. (Tinker, Alexander)
December 10, 2018 Filing 333 Affidavit of Service upon Gregory Neale Perrin served on 10/16/2018 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
December 10, 2018 Filing 332 Affidavit of Service upon Tyson J. Lewis served on 10/16/2018 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
December 10, 2018 Filing 331 Affidavit of Service upon Elsner Inc. served on 10/11/2018 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
December 10, 2018 Filing 330 Affidavit of Service upon Little Amsterdam Wellness Center LLC served on 10/11/2018 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
December 10, 2018 Filing 329 Affidavit of Service upon High Noon Farm LLC served on 10/11/2018 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
December 10, 2018 Filing 328 Affidavit of Service upon Robert Jay Wayman served on 10/16/2018 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
December 10, 2018 Filing 327 Affidavit of Service upon Michelle Renee Barnes served on 10/11/2018 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
December 10, 2018 Filing 326 Summons Issued Electronically as to Tristan Levi Kuhns. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (rs)
December 10, 2018 Filing 325 Affidavit of Service upon Connie Renee Barnes served on 10/25/2018 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
December 10, 2018 Filing 324 Affidavit of Service upon Tammy Lynne Brown served on 10/23/2018 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
December 10, 2018 Filing 323 Affidavit of Service upon Andrew Ryan Clinton served on 10/21/2018 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
December 10, 2018 Filing 322 Affidavit of Service upon Farma on Hawthorne, Inc. served on 10/22/2018 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
December 10, 2018 Filing 321 Affidavit of Service upon Uplift Botanicals LLC served on 10/22/2018 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
December 10, 2018 Filing 320 Affidavit of Service upon James Michael Fisher served on 10/23/2018 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
December 10, 2018 Filing 319 Affidavit of Service upon Kevin Lee Fisher served on 10/23/2018 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
December 10, 2018 Filing 318 Affidavit of Service upon Marc Groleau served on 10/22/2018 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
December 10, 2018 Filing 317 Affidavit of Service upon Melissa Ann Kruse served on 10/22/2018 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
December 10, 2018 Filing 316 Affidavit of Service upon Mario Salvatore Mamone served on 10/22/2018 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
December 10, 2018 Filing 315 Affidavit of Service upon The New Amsterdam LLC served on 10/23/2018 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
December 10, 2018 Filing 314 Affidavit of Service upon Marek Ryszard Zamojski served on 10/23/2018 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
December 10, 2018 Filing 313 Affidavit of Service upon Hai Chheng Gov served on 10/23/2018 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
December 10, 2018 Filing 312 Affidavit of Service upon Samuel Swain Heywood served on 10/22/2018 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
December 10, 2018 Filing 311 Affidavit of Service upon Kip Lyle Rowles served on 10/22/2018 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
December 10, 2018 Filing 310 Affidavit of Service upon Justin Gedde served on 10/28/2018 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
December 10, 2018 Filing 309 Affidavit of Service upon Patrick James Learned served on 10/28/2018 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
December 10, 2018 Filing 308 Affidavit of Service upon Aligra Marie Rainy served on 10/11/2018 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
December 10, 2018 Filing 307 Notice of Joinder in Motion to Sever, #193 Filed by Tammy Lynne Brown. (Related document(s): Motion to Sever, #193 .) (DeCristo, Joshua)
December 10, 2018 Filing 306 Notice of Appearance of Joshua S. DeCristo appearing on behalf of Tammy Lynne Brown Filed by on behalf of Tammy Lynne Brown. (DeCristo, Joshua)
December 10, 2018 Filing 305 Affidavit of Service upon Alexander Nicholas Pavich served on 10/11/2018 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
December 10, 2018 Filing 304 Affidavit of Service upon Oregon Candy Farm, LLC served on 10/11/2018 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
December 10, 2018 Filing 303 Affidavit of Service upon Ptown Investments, LLC served on 10/11/2018 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
December 10, 2018 Filing 302 Affidavit of Service upon Willow Management LLC served on 10/11/2018 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
December 10, 2018 Filing 301 Affidavit of Service upon Happy Lane, LLC served on 10/11/2018 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
December 10, 2018 Filing 300 Affidavit of Service upon Chronic Creations LLC served on 10/11/2018 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
December 10, 2018 Filing 299 Affidavit of Service upon Teran Forest Wilson served on 10/21/2018 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
December 10, 2018 Filing 298 Affidavit of Service upon Scissortail Farms, LLC served on 10/21/2018 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
December 10, 2018 Filing 297 Affidavit of Service upon Sheri Lynn Ralston served on 10/11/2018 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
December 10, 2018 Filing 296 Affidavit of Service upon Western Oregon Dispensary Inc. served on 10/11/2018 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
December 10, 2018 Filing 295 Affidavit of Service upon Today's Herbal Choice, Inc. served on 10/16/2018 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
December 10, 2018 Filing 294 Affidavit of Service upon Merle Leon Thomas served on 10/16/2018 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
December 10, 2018 Filing 293 Affidavit of Service upon Green Box, LLC served on 11/10/2018 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
December 10, 2018 Filing 292 Affidavit of Service upon Adrian Nathaniel Wayman served on 11/10/2018 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
December 10, 2018 Filing 291 Affidavit of Service upon Adam Raymond Kirkwood served on 11/10/2018 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
December 10, 2018 Filing 290 Affidavit of Service upon David Gary Sather served on 10/18/2018 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
December 10, 2018 Filing 289 Affidavit of Service upon Canby Growing Farms, Inc. served on 10/12/2018 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
December 10, 2018 Filing 288 Affidavit of Service upon Justin James West served on 10/22/2018 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
December 10, 2018 Filing 287 Affidavit of Service upon Miranda Marie Murray served on 10/23/2018 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
December 10, 2018 Filing 286 Affidavit of Service upon The Green Planet, Inc. served on 10/22/2018 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
December 10, 2018 Filing 285 Affidavit of Service upon Travis James Moffatt served on 10/22/2018 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
December 10, 2018 Filing 284 Affidavit of Service upon Certified Portland LLC served on 11/20/2018 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
December 10, 2018 Filing 283 First Amended Proposed Summons for Tristan Levi Kuhns Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
December 5, 2018 Filing 282 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Willamette Valley Resources LLC. (Tinker, Alexander)
December 5, 2018 Filing 281 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by East Fork Agriculture LLC. (Tinker, Alexander)
December 5, 2018 Filing 280 Notice of Appearance of Megan K. Houlihan appearing on behalf of Lesta Amorette Bentley, Colby Lee Jackson, The Lucky Leaf LLC Filed by on behalf of Lesta Amorette Bentley, Colby Lee Jackson, The Lucky Leaf LLC. (Houlihan, Megan)
December 5, 2018 Filing 279 Notice of Appearance of Jon P. Stride appearing on behalf of Lesta Amorette Bentley, Colby Lee Jackson, The Lucky Leaf LLC Filed by on behalf of Lesta Amorette Bentley, Colby Lee Jackson, The Lucky Leaf LLC. (Stride, Jon)
December 5, 2018 Filing 278 Notice of Appearance of Alexander M. Tinker appearing on behalf of Lesta Amorette Bentley, Colby Lee Jackson, The Lucky Leaf LLC Filed by on behalf of Lesta Amorette Bentley, Colby Lee Jackson, The Lucky Leaf LLC. (Tinker, Alexander)
December 4, 2018 Filing 277 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Sugar Tree Farm, LLC. (Tinker, Alexander)
December 3, 2018 Filing 276 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Uplift Botanicals LLC. (DeCristo, Joshua)
December 3, 2018 Filing 275 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Wolf D LLC. (DeCristo, Joshua)
December 3, 2018 Filing 274 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Western Oregon Dispensary Inc.. (DeCristo, Joshua)
December 3, 2018 Filing 273 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Scissortail Farms, LLC. (DeCristo, Joshua)
December 3, 2018 Filing 272 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Elsner Inc.. (DeCristo, Joshua)
December 3, 2018 Filing 271 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by OG3, LLC. (DeCristo, Joshua)
December 3, 2018 Filing 270 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by The Gorge Green Cross Inc.. (DeCristo, Joshua)
December 3, 2018 Filing 269 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by The 5 of Us L.L.C.. (DeCristo, Joshua)
December 3, 2018 Filing 268 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Megawood Enterprises Inc.. (DeCristo, Joshua)
December 3, 2018 Filing 267 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Puregon LLC. (DeCristo, Joshua)
December 3, 2018 Filing 266 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Hilltop Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (DeCristo, Joshua)
December 3, 2018 Filing 265 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Green Mart, LLC. (DeCristo, Joshua)
December 3, 2018 Filing 264 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Dispenserve LLC. (DeCristo, Joshua)
December 3, 2018 Filing 263 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Powellhurst Alternative Medical Center LLC. (DeCristo, Joshua)
December 3, 2018 Filing 262 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Columbia Alternative Medical Center LLC. (DeCristo, Joshua)
December 3, 2018 Filing 261 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by BCC Holdings, LLC. (DeCristo, Joshua)
December 3, 2018 Filing 260 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Bula Farms, LLC. (DeCristo, Joshua)
December 3, 2018 Filing 259 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Grand, LLC. (DeCristo, Joshua)
December 3, 2018 Filing 258 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Williams LLC. (DeCristo, Joshua)
December 3, 2018 Filing 257 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Certified Portland LLC. (Tinker, Alexander)
December 3, 2018 Filing 256 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Canyon Cannabis LLC. (Tinker, Alexander)
December 3, 2018 Filing 255 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by WWMP, LLC. (Tinker, Alexander)
December 3, 2018 Filing 254 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Visionary Enterprises, Inc.. (Tinker, Alexander)
December 3, 2018 Filing 253 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Urban Farmacy, LLC. (Tinker, Alexander)
December 3, 2018 Filing 252 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by 3 Kids, Inc.. (Tinker, Alexander)
December 3, 2018 Filing 251 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by 7Points Inc.. (Tinker, Alexander)
December 3, 2018 Filing 250 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by OC Joe, LLC. (Tinker, Alexander)
December 3, 2018 Filing 249 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by High Mountain Retail LLC. (Tinker, Alexander)
December 3, 2018 Filing 248 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by 1450 SE Orient, LLC. (Tinker, Alexander)
December 3, 2018 Filing 247 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Alpha Alternative Solutions, LLC. (Tinker, Alexander)
December 3, 2018 Filing 246 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by All Systems as Promised, Inc.. (Tinker, Alexander)
November 30, 2018 Filing 245 Certificate of Service by All Plaintiffs of Response in Opposition to Motion #243 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
November 30, 2018 Filing 244 Affidavit of Service upon Duzon Enterprises, LLC served on 11/27/2018 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
November 29, 2018 Filing 243 Response in Opposition to Motion to Sever and Dismiss for Improper Joinder #199 , Motion to Sever and Dismiss for Improper Joinder #193 Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
November 28, 2018 Filing 242 Notice of Appearance of Megan K. Houlihan appearing on behalf of K J K Enterprises LLC, Izidor Mikhli, Kip Lyle Rowles, Yisroel N. Shenkman, The New Amsterdam LLC, Jerrod Thompson, Kent Thompson Filed by on behalf of K J K Enterprises LLC, Izidor Mikhli, Kip Lyle Rowles, Yisroel N. Shenkman, The New Amsterdam LLC, Jerrod Thompson, Kent Thompson. (Houlihan, Megan)
November 28, 2018 Filing 241 Notice of Appearance of Jon P. Stride appearing on behalf of K J K Enterprises LLC, Izidor Mikhli, Kip Lyle Rowles, Yisroel N. Shenkman, The New Amsterdam LLC, Jerrod Thompson, Kent Thompson Filed by on behalf of K J K Enterprises LLC, Izidor Mikhli, Kip Lyle Rowles, Yisroel N. Shenkman, The New Amsterdam LLC, Jerrod Thompson, Kent Thompson. (Stride, Jon)
November 28, 2018 Filing 240 Notice of Appearance of Alexander M. Tinker appearing on behalf of K J K Enterprises LLC, Izidor Mikhli, Kip Lyle Rowles, Yisroel N. Shenkman, The New Amsterdam LLC, Jerrod Thompson, Kent Thompson Filed by on behalf of K J K Enterprises LLC, Izidor Mikhli, Kip Lyle Rowles, Yisroel N. Shenkman, The New Amsterdam LLC, Jerrod Thompson, Kent Thompson. (Tinker, Alexander)
November 27, 2018 Filing 239 Notice of Appearance of Megan K. Houlihan appearing on behalf of Certified Portland LLC, Adam Raymond Kirkwood, Joseph River Perkins Filed by on behalf of Certified Portland LLC, Adam Raymond Kirkwood, Joseph River Perkins. (Houlihan, Megan)
November 27, 2018 Filing 238 Notice of Appearance of Jon P. Stride appearing on behalf of Certified Portland LLC, Adam Raymond Kirkwood, Joseph River Perkins Filed by on behalf of Certified Portland LLC, Adam Raymond Kirkwood, Joseph River Perkins. (Stride, Jon)
November 27, 2018 Filing 237 Notice of Appearance of Alexander M. Tinker appearing on behalf of Certified Portland LLC, Adam Raymond Kirkwood, Joseph River Perkins Filed by on behalf of Certified Portland LLC, Adam Raymond Kirkwood, Joseph River Perkins. (Tinker, Alexander)
November 20, 2018 Filing 236 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Willow Management LLC. (Swider, Robert)
November 20, 2018 Filing 235 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Ptown Investments, LLC. (Swider, Robert)
November 20, 2018 Filing 234 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Oregon Candy Farm, LLC. (Swider, Robert)
November 20, 2018 Filing 233 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Happy Lane, LLC. (Swider, Robert)
November 20, 2018 Filing 232 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Chronic Creations LLC. (Swider, Robert)
November 20, 2018 Filing 231 Notice to Join Motion to Sever and Dismiss. Filed by Happy Lane, LLC. (Swider, Robert) Modified on 11/21/2018 to remove "Oral Argument Requested", NEF regenerated. (rs). Modified on 11/21/2018 (rs). Modified on 11/26/2018 to term pending motion status. (gm)
November 19, 2018 Filing 230 Affidavit of Service upon K J K Enterprises LLC served on 11/17/2018 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
November 15, 2018 Filing 229 Notice of Joinder in Motion to Sever, #193 Filed by James Michael Fisher, Kevin Lee Fisher. (Related document(s): Motion to Sever, #193 .) (DeCristo, Joshua)
November 15, 2018 Filing 228 Notice of Appearance of Joshua S. DeCristo appearing on behalf of James Michael Fisher, Kevin Lee Fisher Filed by on behalf of James Michael Fisher, Kevin Lee Fisher. (DeCristo, Joshua)
November 14, 2018 Filing 227 Notice of Joinder in Motion to Sever, #193 Filed by Andrew Joseph Buck, CO2 Company Auction House LLC, Nehalem Bay Wellness, Ltd., Steven William Pitzer, Kevin Patrick Walsh, Ryan Joseph Walsh. (Related document(s): Motion to Sever, #193 .) (Jacoby, Kevin)
November 14, 2018 Filing 226 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by CO2 Company Auction House LLC, Kevin Patrick Walsh, Ryan Joseph Walsh. (Jacoby, Kevin)
November 14, 2018 Filing 225 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Andrew Joseph Buck, Nehalem Bay Wellness, Ltd.. (Jacoby, Kevin)
November 14, 2018 Filing 224 Notice of Joinder in Motion to Sever, #193 Filed by BCC Holdings, LLC, Dror Bezalel, David Craig Bryant, Bula Farms, LLC, Joshua John Cino, Andrew Ryan Clinton, Columbia Alternative Medical Center LLC, Michael Connor Degance, Dispenserve LLC, Elsner Inc., Todd James Fulscher, Gregg Goldenberg, Grand, LLC, Green Mart, LLC, Marc Groleau, Jake Clifford Kalil Hill, Hilltop Pharmaceuticals Inc., Ryan Chandler Huggins, Harold James Lareau, Craig Sean Leivent, Mario Salvatore Mamone, Megawood Enterprises Inc., Spencer J. Mullen, Abdullah Frakes Naimi, OG3, LLC, Powellhurst Alternative Medical Center LLC, Puregon LLC, Michael James Rachford, Sheri Lynn Ralston, Michelle Renee Reschert, David Arlen Alport, Anna Marie Schrab, Scissortail Farms, LLC, Dennis Wayne Sivers, The 5 of Us L.L.C., The Gorge Green Cross Inc., Uplift Botanicals LLC, Matthew Scott Walstatter, Meghan Walstatter, Ian Robert Watson, Western Oregon Dispensary Inc., Daniel Neil Westman, Williams LLC, Teran Forest Wilson, Terry Emmett Wilson, Wolf D LLC, Julie Louise Worley. (Related document(s): Motion to Sever, #193 .) (DeCristo, Joshua)
November 13, 2018 Filing 223 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Little Amsterdam Wellness Center LLC. (Goldberg, Matthew)
November 13, 2018 Filing 222 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Pacific Highway Investments, LLC. (Goldberg, Matthew)
November 13, 2018 Filing 221 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by TLC Medical, Inc.. (Goldberg, Matthew)
November 13, 2018 Filing 220 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Tidewater Retail, Inc.. (Goldberg, Matthew)
November 13, 2018 Filing 219 Notice of Joinder in Motion to Sever, #193 Filed by P.W.C.C., LLC. (Related document(s): Motion to Sever, #193 .) (Knivila, K.)
November 13, 2018 Filing 218 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Tidepool Oregon City, Inc.. (Goldberg, Matthew)
November 13, 2018 Filing 217 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Tidepool Northeast, Inc.. (Goldberg, Matthew)
November 13, 2018 Filing 216 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by P.W.C.C., LLC. (Knivila, K.)
November 13, 2018 Filing 215 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Tidepool Cannon Beach, Inc.. (Goldberg, Matthew)
November 13, 2018 Filing 214 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Salmon Run Holdings, LLC. (Goldberg, Matthew)
November 13, 2018 Filing 213 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Greenlink Retail, Inc.. (Goldberg, Matthew)
November 13, 2018 Filing 212 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Bloom Well, Inc.. (Goldberg, Matthew)
November 13, 2018 Filing 211 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Agronomy, LLC. (Goldberg, Matthew)
November 13, 2018 Filing 210 Corporate Disclosure Statement Corporate Disclosure. Filed by Herbal Remedies 2 Inc.. (Novotny, Cary)
November 13, 2018 Filing 209 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by T.R. Jones LLC. (Novotny, Cary)
November 13, 2018 Filing 208 Notice of Joinder of Defendants T.R. Jones LLC dba Club Sky High, Herbal Remedies 2 Inc., Brandon Dale DeCamp, and Jered Dwayne DeCamp to Defendants' Pending Motion to Sever and Motion to Dismiss for Improper Joinder Filed by Brandon Dale Decamp, Jered Dwayne Decamp, Herbal Remedies 2 Inc., T.R. Jones LLC. (Novotny, Cary)
November 13, 2018 Filing 207 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by JAMA Industry LLC. (Wilner-Nugent, Bear)
November 13, 2018 Filing 206 Notice of Joinder in Motion to Sever, #193 and Dismiss Filed by JAMA Industry LLC, Jennifer Ann Pitzer. (Related document(s): Motion to Sever, #193 .) (Wilner-Nugent, Bear)
November 13, 2018 Filing 205 Notice of Joinder in Motion to Sever, #193 Filed by Canby Growing Farms, Inc., David Gary Sather. (Related document(s): Motion to Sever, #193 .) (Bell, Aaron)
November 13, 2018 Filing 204 Notice of Joinder in Motion to Sever, #193 MOTION TO JOIN (ORAL ARGUMENT REQUESTED) Filed by Robb Randolph Arnold, Attikus Enterprises, Inc., William Hal Blair, Jeffrey Lynn Buckley, Canyon Cannabis LLC, Cindy G. Cusick, Mark Alan Cusick, East Fork Agriculture LLC, Robert Marion Elam, Farma on Hawthorne, Inc., Joel Matthew Fischer, James Ambrose Galba, Robert David Galloway, Hai Chheng Gov, Hannah Elizabeth Hayes, Herbal Grasslands, LLC, Samuel Swain Heywood, High Mountain Retail LLC, High Noon Farm LLC, Aaron Howard, Nathan Cole Howard, Jaclyn M. Iwanski, Jayne Inc., Kind Leaf Pendleton LLC, Donald F. Kirby, David Alan Kline, Brandon Joel Krenzler, La Mota Hollywood, LLC, Tyson J. Lewis, Melissa Sue Maguire, Rod James Maguire, Medicine Tree LLC, Aaron Robert Mitchell, Roy Allen Mitchell, Michael R. Munzing, OC Joe, LLC, Christopher Dale Ostlund, Steven Penman, Gregory Neale Perrin, Jason Reynolds, Ralph O. Robinson, Benjamin James Robison, 1450 SE Orient, LLC, 3 Kids, Inc., 7Points Inc., Samuel Alexander, All Systems as Promised, Inc., Alpha Alternative Solutions, LLC, Margaret Renee Amala, David Neal Schwimmer, Matthew Correy Schwimmer, Darlene Siegel, Sugar Tree Farm, LLC, Varasay Joe Sysavath, Demetrios N. Themelis, Tropicannabis, LLC, Urban Farmacy, LLC, Visionary Enterprises, Inc., WWMP, LLC, Mason Reed Walker, John Philip Widmer, Julie Ann Widmer, Willamette Valley Resources LLC, Marek Ryszard Zamojski, Joe Zhou. (Related document(s): Motion to Sever, #193 .) (Stride, Jon)
November 13, 2018 Filing 203 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Canby Growing Farms, Inc.. (Bell, Aaron)
November 13, 2018 Filing 202 Notice of Joinder in Motion to Sever, #193 Filed by Connie Renee Barnes, Michelle Renee Barnes, Bloom Well, Inc., Jason Cain, Mark Steven Capps, Greenlink Retail, Inc., Timothy Lee Horst, Joel Jennings, Jeremy Scott Kwit, Little Amsterdam Wellness Center LLC, Pacific Highway Investments, LLC, Taylor Jordan Rembowski, Agronomy, LLC, Salmon Run Holdings, LLC, TLC Medical, Inc., Tidepool Cannon Beach, Inc., Tidepool Northeast, Inc., Tidepool Oregon City, Inc., Tidewater Retail, Inc., Patrick Stephen Todd, Case Dennison Van Dorne. (Related document(s): Motion to Sever, #193 .) (Goldberg, Matthew)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo: Setting Defendants Talent Health Club LLC, Melissa Giersbach, Jamin Giersbach, Midori Retail LLC, Hawthco One Corporation, Derek Herman, Joseph Haddad, JJH Law, Green Planet Inc., Miranda Murray West, Justin West and Travis Moffatt's Motion to Sever and Dismiss for Improper Joinder #199 and Defendants' Evette Pavich, Nicolas Pavich and N&A Investments LLC's Motion to Sever, Dismiss for Improper Joinder, and Require Separate Filing Fees #193 on the Telephonic Oral Argument Calendar of 1/22/2019 at 10:00AM in Portland Chambers before Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (gm)
November 13, 2018 Filing 200 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by N&A Investments, LLC. (Pitt, Keith)
November 13, 2018 Filing 199 Motion to Sever and Dismiss for Improper Joinder. Oral Argument requested. Filed by N&A Investments, LLC, Evette Marie Pavich, Nicholas Louis Pavich, Jr. (Pitt, Keith)
November 13, 2018 Filing 198 Notice of Appearance of Joshua S. DeCristo appearing on behalf of Harold James Lareau, Uplift Botanicals LLC Filed by on behalf of Harold James Lareau, Uplift Botanicals LLC. (DeCristo, Joshua)
November 13, 2018 Filing 197 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by JJH Law, a Professional Corporation. (Eyman, Drew)
November 13, 2018 Filing 196 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Talent Health Club LLC. (Eyman, Drew)
November 13, 2018 Filing 195 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Midori Retail, LLC. (Eyman, Drew)
November 13, 2018 Filing 194 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by The Green Planet, Inc.. (Eyman, Drew)
November 13, 2018 Filing 193 Motion to Sever and Dismiss for Improper Joinder. Oral Argument requested. Filed by Jamin A. Giersbach, Melissa A. Giersbach, Joseph James Haddad, Hawthco One Corporation, Derek Scott Herman, JJH Law, a Professional Corporation, Midori Retail, LLC, Travis James Moffatt, Miranda Marie Murray, Talent Health Club LLC, The Green Planet, Inc., Justin James West. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A) (Davidson, Clifford)
November 12, 2018 Filing 192 Notice of Appearance of Megan K. Houlihan appearing on behalf of Robb Randolph Arnold, Canyon Cannabis LLC, Cindy G. Cusick, Mark Alan Cusick, Herbal Grasslands, LLC, High Noon Farm LLC, Jayne Inc., Tyson J. Lewis, Roy Allen Mitchell, Gregory Neale Perrin Filed by on behalf of Robb Randolph Arnold, Canyon Cannabis LLC, Cindy G. Cusick, Mark Alan Cusick, Herbal Grasslands, LLC, High Noon Farm LLC, Jayne Inc., Tyson J. Lewis, Roy Allen Mitchell, Gregory Neale Perrin. (Houlihan, Megan)
November 12, 2018 Filing 191 Notice of Appearance of Jon P. Stride appearing on behalf of Robb Randolph Arnold, Canyon Cannabis LLC, Cindy G. Cusick, Mark Alan Cusick, Herbal Grasslands, LLC, High Noon Farm LLC, Jayne Inc., Tyson J. Lewis, Roy Allen Mitchell, Gregory Neale Perrin Filed by on behalf of Robb Randolph Arnold, Canyon Cannabis LLC, Cindy G. Cusick, Mark Alan Cusick, Herbal Grasslands, LLC, High Noon Farm LLC, Jayne Inc., Tyson J. Lewis, Roy Allen Mitchell, Gregory Neale Perrin. (Stride, Jon)
November 12, 2018 Filing 190 Notice of Appearance of Alexander M. Tinker appearing on behalf of Robb Randolph Arnold, Canyon Cannabis LLC, Cindy G. Cusick, Mark Alan Cusick, Herbal Grasslands, LLC, High Noon Farm LLC, Jayne Inc., Tyson J. Lewis, Roy Allen Mitchell, Gregory Neale Perrin Filed by on behalf of Robb Randolph Arnold, Canyon Cannabis LLC, Cindy G. Cusick, Mark Alan Cusick, Herbal Grasslands, LLC, High Noon Farm LLC, Jayne Inc., Tyson J. Lewis, Roy Allen Mitchell, Gregory Neale Perrin. (Tinker, Alexander)
November 6, 2018 Filing 189 Summons Issued Electronically as to Duzon Enterprises, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (rs)
November 6, 2018 Filing 188 Summons Issued Electronically as to Certified Portland LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (rs)
November 6, 2018 Filing 187 Affidavit of Service upon Nicholas Louis Pavich, Jr served on 10/28/2018 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mailing) Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
November 6, 2018 Filing 186 Affidavit of Service upon Harold James Lareau served on 11/2/2018 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mailing) Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
November 6, 2018 Filing 185 Affidavit of Service upon Herbal Grasslands, LLC served on 10/29/2018 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
November 6, 2018 Filing 184 Proposed Summons for Duzon Enterprises, LLC Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
November 6, 2018 Filing 183 Affidavit of Service upon Ancient Remedies LLC served on 11/1/2018 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mailing) Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
November 6, 2018 Filing 182 Affidavit of Service upon David Douglas Demarre served on 11/1/2018 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mailing) Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
November 6, 2018 Filing 181 Affidavit of Service upon Cindy G. Cusick served on 10/29/2018 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
November 6, 2018 Filing 180 Affidavit of Service upon Denise K. Concannon served on 11/3/2018 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
November 6, 2018 Filing 179 Affidavit of Service upon Mia Marie Bullock served on 10/27/2018 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mailing) Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
November 6, 2018 Filing 178 Affidavit of Service upon Wendy Dawn Brisbin served on 10/19/2018 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mailing) Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
November 6, 2018 Filing 177 First Amended Proposed Summons for Certified Portland, LLC Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
November 5, 2018 Filing 176 Notice of Appearance of Allison C. Bizzano appearing on behalf of Connie Renee Barnes, Michelle Renee Barnes, Little Amsterdam Wellness Center LLC Filed by on behalf of Connie Renee Barnes, Michelle Renee Barnes, Little Amsterdam Wellness Center LLC. (Bizzano, Allison)
November 5, 2018 Filing 175 Notice of Appearance of Matthew A. Goldberg appearing on behalf of Connie Renee Barnes, Michelle Renee Barnes, Little Amsterdam Wellness Center LLC Filed by on behalf of Connie Renee Barnes, Michelle Renee Barnes, Little Amsterdam Wellness Center LLC. (Goldberg, Matthew)
November 5, 2018 Filing 174 Acceptance/Acknowledgement of Service on Robb Randolph Arnold served on 10/15/2018; Attikus Enterprises, Inc. served on 10/15/2018; East Fork Agriculture LLC served on 10/15/2018; Robert Marion Elam served on 10/15/2018; Joel Matthew Fischer served on 10/15/2018; Robert David Galloway served on 10/15/2018; High Mountain Retail LLC served on 10/15/2018; Aaron Howard served on 10/15/2018; Nathan Cole Howard served on 10/15/2018; Jaclyn M. Iwanski served on 10/15/2018; Jayne Inc. served on 10/15/2018; Donald F. Kirby served on 10/15/2018; Melissa Sue Maguire served on 10/15/2018; Rod James Maguire served on 10/15/2018; Michael R. Munzing served on 10/15/2018; OC Joe, LLC served on 10/15/2018; Christopher Dale Ostlund served on 10/15/2018; Steven Penman served on 10/15/2018; Jason Reynolds served on 10/15/2018; 1450 SE Orient, LLC served on 10/15/2018; 3 Kids, Inc. served on 10/15/2018; 7Points Inc. served on 10/15/2018; Samuel Alexander served on 10/15/2018; All Systems as Promised, Inc. served on 10/15/2018; Margaret Renee Amala served on 10/15/2018; David Neal Schwimmer served on 10/15/2018; Matthew Correy Schwimmer served on 10/15/2018; Sugar Tree Farm, LLC served on 10/15/2018; Varasay Joe Sysavath served on 10/15/2018; Demetrios N. Themelis served on 10/15/2018; Urban Farmacy, LLC served on 10/15/2018; Visionary Enterprises, Inc. served on 10/15/2018; WWMP, LLC served on 10/15/2018; Mason Reed Walker served on 10/15/2018; John Philip Widmer served on 10/15/2018; Julie Ann Widmer served on 10/15/2018; Joe Zhou served on 10/15/2018 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
November 1, 2018 Filing 173 Notice of Appearance of Aaron J. Bell appearing on behalf of Canby Growing Farms, Inc., David Gary Sather Filed by on behalf of Canby Growing Farms, Inc., David Gary Sather. (Bell, Aaron)
November 1, 2018 Filing 172 Notice of Appearance of Megan K. Houlihan appearing on behalf of Farma on Hawthorne, Inc., Samuel Swain Heywood, Kind Leaf Pendleton LLC, Brandon Joel Krenzler, Varasay Joe Sysavath, Tropicannabis, LLC Filed by on behalf of Farma on Hawthorne, Inc., Samuel Swain Heywood, Kind Leaf Pendleton LLC, Brandon Joel Krenzler, Varasay Joe Sysavath, Tropicannabis, LLC. (Houlihan, Megan)
November 1, 2018 Filing 171 Notice of Appearance of Jon P. Stride appearing on behalf of Farma on Hawthorne, Inc., Samuel Swain Heywood, Kind Leaf Pendleton LLC, Brandon Joel Krenzler, Varasay Joe Sysavath, Tropicannabis, LLC Filed by on behalf of Farma on Hawthorne, Inc., Samuel Swain Heywood, Kind Leaf Pendleton LLC, Brandon Joel Krenzler, Varasay Joe Sysavath, Tropicannabis, LLC. (Stride, Jon)
November 1, 2018 Filing 170 Notice of Appearance of Alexander M. Tinker appearing on behalf of Farma on Hawthorne, Inc., Samuel Swain Heywood, Kind Leaf Pendleton LLC, Brandon Joel Krenzler, Varasay Joe Sysavath, Tropicannabis, LLC Filed by on behalf of Farma on Hawthorne, Inc., Samuel Swain Heywood, Kind Leaf Pendleton LLC, Brandon Joel Krenzler, Varasay Joe Sysavath, Tropicannabis, LLC. (Tinker, Alexander)
October 31, 2018 Filing 169 Notice of Appearance of Robert A. Swider appearing on behalf of Chronic Creations LLC, Justin Gedde, Happy Lane, LLC, Oregon Candy Farm, LLC, Alexander Nicholas Pavich, Ptown Investments, LLC, Aligra Marie Rainy, Willow Management LLC Filed by on behalf of Chronic Creations LLC, Justin Gedde, Happy Lane, LLC, Oregon Candy Farm, LLC, Alexander Nicholas Pavich, Ptown Investments, LLC, Aligra Marie Rainy, Willow Management LLC. (Swider, Robert)
October 30, 2018 Filing 168 Notice of Appearance of Clifford S. Davidson appearing on behalf of Travis James Moffatt, Miranda Marie Murray, The Green Planet, Inc., Justin James West Filed by on behalf of Travis James Moffatt, Miranda Marie Murray, The Green Planet, Inc., Justin James West. (Davidson, Clifford)
October 29, 2018 Filing 167 Affidavit of Service upon Gregory Lynn Tidey, Jr served on 10/17/2018 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
October 29, 2018 Filing 166 Affidavit of Service upon Spencer J. Mullen served on 10/23/2018 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mailing) Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
October 29, 2018 Filing 165 Affidavit of Service upon Buddha's Wellness Center LLC served on 10/17/2018 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
October 29, 2018 Filing 164 Affidavit of Service upon Evette Marie Pavich served on 10/28/2018 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
October 29, 2018 Filing 163 Affidavit of Service upon Joseph River Perkins served on 10/28/2018 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
October 29, 2018 Filing 162 Affidavit of Service upon Nole Emerson Bullock served on 10/27/2018 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
October 29, 2018 Filing 161 Notice of Appearance of Megan K. Houlihan appearing on behalf of Jeffrey Lynn Buckley, James Ambrose Galba, Hai Chheng Gov, La Mota Hollywood, LLC, Medicine Tree LLC, Aaron Robert Mitchell, Ralph O. Robinson, Marek Ryszard Zamojski Filed by on behalf of Jeffrey Lynn Buckley, James Ambrose Galba, Hai Chheng Gov, La Mota Hollywood, LLC, Medicine Tree LLC, Aaron Robert Mitchell, Ralph O. Robinson, Marek Ryszard Zamojski. (Houlihan, Megan)
October 29, 2018 Filing 160 Notice of Appearance of Jon P. Stride appearing on behalf of Jeffrey Lynn Buckley, James Ambrose Galba, Hai Chheng Gov, La Mota Hollywood, LLC, Medicine Tree LLC, Aaron Robert Mitchell, Ralph O. Robinson, Marek Ryszard Zamojski Filed by on behalf of Jeffrey Lynn Buckley, James Ambrose Galba, Hai Chheng Gov, La Mota Hollywood, LLC, Medicine Tree LLC, Aaron Robert Mitchell, Ralph O. Robinson, Marek Ryszard Zamojski. (Stride, Jon)
October 29, 2018 Filing 159 Notice of Appearance of Alexander M. Tinker appearing on behalf of Jeffrey Lynn Buckley, James Ambrose Galba, Hai Chheng Gov, La Mota Hollywood, LLC, Medicine Tree LLC, Aaron Robert Mitchell, Ralph O. Robinson, Marek Ryszard Zamojski Filed by on behalf of Jeffrey Lynn Buckley, James Ambrose Galba, Hai Chheng Gov, La Mota Hollywood, LLC, Medicine Tree LLC, Aaron Robert Mitchell, Ralph O. Robinson, Marek Ryszard Zamojski. (Tinker, Alexander)
October 29, 2018 Filing 158 Affidavit of Service upon Canyon Cannabis LLC served on 10/25/2018 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
October 29, 2018 Filing 157 Affidavit of Service upon Roy Allen Mitchell served on 10/24/2018 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mailing) Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
October 29, 2018 Filing 156 Affidavit of Service upon The Lucky Leaf LLC served on 10/18/2018 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mailing) Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
October 29, 2018 Filing 155 Affidavit of Service upon Colby Lee Jackson served on 10/18/2018 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo: Granting Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time #153 . The deadlines established in this court's earlier Order 119 are adjusted as follows and as modified: Defendants shall have until 11/13/2018 to file the motion, Plaintiff shall respond to the motion by 11/29/2018, and the reply is due 12/17/2018. The deadline for filing answers or otherwise responding to the amended complaint by Defendants shall be 14 days after the court rules on the motion. (gm)
October 25, 2018 Filing 153 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion Addressing Propriety of Joinder per ECF No. 119. Filed by Jamin A. Giersbach, Melissa A. Giersbach, Joseph James Haddad, Hawthco One Corporation, Derek Scott Herman, JJH Law, a Professional Corporation, Midori Retail, LLC, Talent Health Club LLC. (Davidson, Clifford)
October 24, 2018 Filing 152 Notice of Appearance of Jason E. Hirshon appearing on behalf of Evette Marie Pavich Filed by on behalf of Evette Marie Pavich. (Hirshon, Jason)
October 24, 2018 Filing 151 Amended Summons Issued Electronically as to Herbal Grasslands, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (rs)
October 19, 2018 Filing 150 Notice of Appearance of Jason E. Hirshon appearing on behalf of Nicholas Louis Pavich, Jr and N&A Investments, LLC Filed by on behalf of Nicholas Louis Pavich, Jr. (Hirshon, Jason)
October 19, 2018 Filing 149 Affidavit of Service upon Mark Alan Cusick served on 10/18/2018 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
October 19, 2018 Filing 148 Affidavit of Service upon Randall Jon Mallette served on 10/16/2018 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mailing) Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
October 19, 2018 Filing 147 Affidavit of Service upon Izidor Mikhli served on 10/16/2018 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mailing) Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
October 19, 2018 Filing 146 Affidavit of Service upon Yisroel N. Shenkman served on 10/16/2018 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mailing) Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
October 19, 2018 Filing 145 Affidavit of Service upon James Samuel Wakefield served on 10/15/2018 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mailing) Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
October 19, 2018 Filing 144 Amended Declaration of Mailing Affidavit of Service of Affidavit of Service #137 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
October 19, 2018 Filing 143 Affidavit of Service upon Medicine Tree LLC served on 10/13/2018 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mailing) Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
October 19, 2018 Filing 142 Affidavit of Service upon Vernonia's Natural Choice LLC served on 10/12/2018 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mailing) Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
October 19, 2018 Filing 141 Affidavit of Service upon Zachary Carl Kohler served on 10/12/2018 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mailing) Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
October 19, 2018 Filing 140 Affidavit of Service upon Cherry City Compassion Inc. served on 10/15/2018 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
October 18, 2018 Filing 139 First Amended Proposed Summons Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
October 17, 2018 Filing 138 Notice of Appearance Filed by David Craig Bryant, Andrew Ryan Clinton, Elsner Inc., Marc Groleau, Jake Clifford Kalil Hill, Mario Salvatore Mamone, Spencer J. Mullen, Abdullah Frakes Naimi, Sheri Lynn Ralston, Scissortail Farms, LLC, Ian Robert Watson, Western Oregon Dispensary Inc., Teran Forest Wilson, Wolf D LLC. (DeCristo, Joshua)
October 16, 2018 Filing 137 Affidavit of Service upon James Ambrose Galba served on 10/13/2018 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mailing) Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
October 16, 2018 Filing 136 Affidavit of Service upon The Holistic Choice Inc. served on 10/15/2018 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
October 16, 2018 Filing 135 Affidavit of Service upon Jeffrey Lynn Buckley served on 10/16/2018 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
October 15, 2018 Filing 134 Affidavit of Service upon Wolf D LLC served on 10/12/2018 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
October 15, 2018 Filing 133 Affidavit of Service upon Allison Colt Gantzer served on 10/12/2018 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mailing) Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
October 15, 2018 Filing 132 Affidavit of Service upon N&A Investments, LLC served on 10/15/2018 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
October 15, 2018 Filing 131 Affidavit of Service upon Tropicannabis, LLC served on 10/12/2018 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
October 15, 2018 Filing 130 Affidavit of Service upon The Joint on Market Street LLC served on 10/12/2018 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
October 15, 2018 Filing 129 Affidavit of Service upon Kind Leaf Pendleton LLC served on 10/12/2018 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
October 15, 2018 Filing 128 Affidavit of Service upon Brandon Joel Krenzler served on 10/14/2018 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
October 15, 2018 Filing 127 First Amended Complaint . Filed by Laura L. Underwood against All Defendants. (McCart, Rachel)
October 15, 2018 Filing 126 Notice of Attorney Withdrawal: Marjorie A. Elken Filed by Benjamin James Robison, Alpha Alternative Solutions, LLC. (Elken, Marjorie)
October 12, 2018 Filing 125 Notice of Appearance of Megan K. Houlihan appearing on behalf of Benjamin James Robison, Alpha Alternative Solutions, LLC Filed by on behalf of Benjamin James Robison, Alpha Alternative Solutions, LLC. (Houlihan, Megan)
October 12, 2018 Filing 124 Notice of Appearance of Alexander M. Tinker appearing on behalf of Benjamin James Robison, Alpha Alternative Solutions, LLC Filed by on behalf of Benjamin James Robison, Alpha Alternative Solutions, LLC. (Tinker, Alexander)
October 12, 2018 Filing 123 Notice of Appearance of Jon P. Stride appearing on behalf of Benjamin James Robison, Alpha Alternative Solutions, LLC Filed by on behalf of Benjamin James Robison, Alpha Alternative Solutions, LLC. (Stride, Jon)
October 4, 2018 Filing 122 Notice of Appearance of Cary Collin Novotny appearing on behalf of Brandon Dale Decamp, Jered Dwayne Decamp Filed by on behalf of Brandon Dale Decamp, Jered Dwayne Decamp. (Novotny, Cary)
October 2, 2018 Filing 121 Notice of Appearance of Paul T. Loney appearing on behalf of Herbal Remedies 2 Inc. Filed by on behalf of Herbal Remedies 2 Inc.. (Loney, Paul)
October 2, 2018 Filing 120 Notice of Appearance of Paul T. Loney appearing on behalf of T.R. Jones LLC Filed by on behalf of T.R. Jones LLC. (Loney, Paul)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo: Certain defendants have filed motions requesting a status conference and/or a briefing schedule to address the issue of whether joinder of over two hundred defendants in this action is proper (documents #8 & #113 ). The motions are denied in part and granted in part as follows: the requesting defendants may file a motion, after plaintiff files the amended complaint, addressing the propriety of joinder of all defendants in this single action. Any other defendants may join in that motion and need not file separate motions. The filing of such motion will not waive any other pleading defenses under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 or otherwise that defendants may wish to raise in response to the complaint or amended complaint.. Defendants shall have until November 5, 2018 to file the motion, plaintiff shall respond to the motion by November 21, 2018, and the reply is due December 7, 2018. The deadline for filing answers or otherwise responding to the amended complaint by defendants shall be 14 days after the court rules on the motion. (gm)
September 25, 2018 Filing 118 Summons Issued Electronically as to Merle Leon Thomas, Jerrod Thompson, Kent Thompson, Gregory Lynn Tidey, Jr, Today's Herbal Choice, Inc., Tropicannabis, LLC, Uplift Botanicals LLC, Vernonia's Natural Choice LLC, James Samuel Wakefield, Ian Robert Watson, Adrian Nathaniel Wayman, Robert Jay Wayman, Justin James West, Western Oregon Dispensary Inc., Willow Management LLC, Teran Forest Wilson, Wolf D LLC, Marek Ryszard Zamojski. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (rs)
September 25, 2018 Filing 117 Summons Issued Electronically as to Aligra Marie Rainy, Sheri Lynn Ralston, Milton John Robinson, Ralph O. Robinson, Kip Lyle Rowles, David Gary Sather, Scissortail Farms, LLC, Yisroel N. Shenkman, Stonies, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (rs)
September 25, 2018 Filing 116 Summons Issued Electronically as to Alexander Nicholas Pavich, Evette Marie Pavich, Nicholas Louis Pavich, Jr, Joseph River Perkins, Gregory Neale Perrin, Ptown Investments, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (rs)
September 25, 2018 Filing 115 Summons Issued Electronically as to Harold James Lareau, Patrick James Learned, Tyson J. Lewis, Little Amsterdam Wellness Center LLC, Randall Jon Mallette, Mario Salvatore Mamone, Medicine Tree LLC, Robert J. Metcalfe, Izidor Mikhli, Roy Allen Mitchell, Travis James Moffatt, Spencer J. Mullen, Miranda Marie Murray, N&A Investments, LLC, Abdullah Frakes Naimi, Oregon Candy Farm, LLC, The Lucky Leaf LLC, The New Amsterdam LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (rs)
September 25, 2018 Filing 114 Summons Issued Electronically as to Colby Lee Jackson, K J K Enterprises LLC, Kind Leaf Pendleton LLC, Adam Raymond Kirkwood, Zachary Carl Kohler, Brandon Joel Krenzler, Melissa Ann Kruse, Tristan Levi Kuhns, The Joint on Market Street LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (rs)
September 25, 2018 Filing 113 Second Request for Status Conference, and/or Briefing Schedule, Regarding Issue of "Swarm Joinder" and Whether Plaintiff Should Be Required to Pay More than One Filing Fee to Maintain this Action. Filed by Jamin A. Giersbach, Melissa A. Giersbach, Joseph James Haddad, Hawthco One Corporation, Derek Scott Herman, JJH Law, a Professional Corporation, Midori Retail, LLC, Talent Health Club LLC. (Davidson, Clifford)
September 25, 2018 Filing 112 Summons Issued Electronically as to Happy Lane, LLC, Herbal Grasslands, LLC, Herbal Remedies 2 Inc., Samuel Swain Heywood, High Noon Farm LLC, Jake Clifford Kalil Hill, The Holistic Choice Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (rs)
September 25, 2018 Filing 111 Summons Issued Electronically as to James Ambrose Galba, Allison Colt Gantzer, Justin Gedde, Hai Chheng Gov, Green Box, LLC, Marc Groleau, The Green Planet, Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (rs)
September 25, 2018 Filing 110 Summons Issued Electronically as to Brandon Dale Decamp, Jered Dwayne Decamp, David Douglas Demarre, Troy H. Duzon, Elsner Inc., Farma on Hawthorne, Inc., James Michael Fisher, Kevin Lee Fisher. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (rs)
September 25, 2018 Filing 109 Summons Issued Electronically as to Canby Growing Farms, Inc., Canyon Cannabis LLC, Capitol Green Leaf LLC, Certified Portland LLC, Cherry City Compassion Inc., Chronic Creations LLC, Andrew Ryan Clinton, Denise K. Concannon, Cindy G. Cusick, Mark Alan Cusick. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (rs)
September 25, 2018 Filing 108 Summons Issued Electronically as to Ancient Remedies LLC, Connie Renee Barnes, Michelle Renee Barnes, Lesta Amorette Bentley, Wendy Dawn Brisbin, Tammy Lynne Brown, David Craig Bryant, Jeffrey Lynn Buckley, Buddha's Wellness Center LLC, Mia Marie Bullock, Nole Emerson Bullock. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (rs)
September 25, 2018 Filing 107 Proposed Summons (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons, #6 Proposed Summons, #7 Proposed Summons, #8 Proposed Summons, #9 Proposed Summons, #10 Proposed Summons, #11 Proposed Summons, #12 Proposed Summons, #13 Proposed Summons, #14 Proposed Summons, #15 Proposed Summons, #16 Proposed Summons, #17 Proposed Summons) Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
September 25, 2018 Filing 106 Proposed Summons (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons, #6 Proposed Summons, #7 Proposed Summons, #8 Proposed Summons) Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
September 25, 2018 Filing 105 Proposed Summons (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons) Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
September 25, 2018 Filing 104 Proposed Summons (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons, #6 Proposed Summons, #7 Proposed Summons, #8 Proposed Summons, #9 Proposed Summons, #10 Proposed Summons, #11 Proposed Summons, #12 Proposed Summons, #13 Proposed Summons, #14 Proposed Summons, #15 Proposed Summons, #16 Proposed Summons, #17 Proposed Summons) Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
September 25, 2018 Filing 103 Proposed Summons (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons, #6 Proposed Summons, #7 Proposed Summons, #8 Proposed Summons) Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
September 25, 2018 Filing 102 Proposed Summons (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons, #6 Proposed Summons) Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
September 25, 2018 Filing 101 Proposed Summons (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons, #6 Proposed Summons) Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
September 25, 2018 Filing 100 Proposed Summons (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons, #6 Proposed Summons, #7 Proposed Summons) Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
September 25, 2018 Filing 99 Proposed Summons (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons, #6 Proposed Summons, #7 Proposed Summons, #8 Proposed Summons, #9 Proposed Summons) Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
September 25, 2018 Filing 98 Proposed Summons (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons, #6 Proposed Summons, #7 Proposed Summons, #8 Proposed Summons, #9 Proposed Summons, #10 Proposed Summons) Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo: Granting the parties' Joint Motion to Set Deadlines #93 as follows: First Amended Complaint due 10/15/2018. Response to First Amended Complaint due by 11/5/2018. Plaintiff's amendment will count as Plaintiff's one amendment as a matter of course, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(1). (gm)
September 21, 2018 Filing 96 Notice of Attorney Withdrawal: Filed by La Mota Hollywood, LLC, Aaron Robert Mitchell. (Goldberg, Matthew)
September 21, 2018 Filing 95 Notice of Attorney Withdrawal: Filed by La Mota Hollywood, LLC, Aaron Robert Mitchell. (Bizzano, Allison)
September 20, 2018 Filing 94 Notice of Case Reassignment: This case has been reassigned from Magistrate Judge Paul Papak to Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (eo)
September 20, 2018 Filing 93 Joint Motion to Set Deadlines for Plaintiff to File First Amended Complaint, and for Defendants to Respond Thereto (joint motion by Plaintiff and all appearing defendants). Filed by Jamin A. Giersbach, Melissa A. Giersbach, Joseph James Haddad, Hawthco One Corporation, Derek Scott Herman, JJH Law, a Professional Corporation, Midori Retail, LLC, Talent Health Club LLC. (Davidson, Clifford)
September 19, 2018 Filing 92 Notice of Appearance of Joshua S. DeCristo appearing on behalf of BCC Holdings, LLC, Dror Bezalel, Bula Farms, LLC, Joshua John Cino, Columbia Alternative Medical Center LLC, Michael Connor Degance, Dispenserve LLC, Todd James Fulscher, Gregg Goldenberg, Grand, LLC, Green Mart, LLC, Hilltop Pharmaceuticals Inc., Ryan Chandler Huggins, Craig Sean Leivent, Megawood Enterprises Inc., OG3, LLC, Powellhurst Alternative Medical Center LLC, Puregon LLC, Michael James Rachford, Michelle Renee Reschert, Anna Marie Schrab, David Arlen Alport, Dennis Wayne Sivers, The 5 of Us L.L.C., The Gorge Green Cross Inc., Matthew Scott Walstatter, Meghan Walstatter, Daniel Neil Westman, Williams LLC, Teran Forest Wilson, Julie Louise Worley Filed by on behalf of BCC Holdings, LLC, Dror Bezalel, Bula Farms, LLC, Joshua John Cino, Columbia Alternative Medical Center LLC, Michael Connor Degance, Dispenserve LLC, Todd James Fulscher, Gregg Goldenberg, Grand, LLC, Green Mart, LLC, Hilltop Pharmaceuticals Inc., Ryan Chandler Huggins, Craig Sean Leivent, Megawood Enterprises Inc., OG3, LLC, Powellhurst Alternative Medical Center LLC, Puregon LLC, Michael James Rachford, Michelle Renee Reschert, Anna Marie Schrab, David Arlen Alport, Dennis Wayne Sivers, The 5 of Us L.L.C., The Gorge Green Cross Inc., Matthew Scott Walstatter, Meghan Walstatter, Daniel Neil Westman, Williams LLC, Teran Forest Wilson, Julie Louise Worley. (DeCristo, Joshua)
September 17, 2018 Filing 91 Notice of Appearance of K. Bruce Knivila appearing on behalf of Michael James Scarbrough Filed by on behalf of Michael James Scarbrough. (Knivila, K.)
September 17, 2018 Filing 90 Notice re Notice #89 , Attorney Appearance #88 , Notice of Appearance of K. Bruce Knivila appearing on behalf of P.W.C.C., LLC Filed by on behalf of P.W.C.C., LLC. (Related document(s): Notice #89 , Attorney Appearance #88 .) (Knivila, K.)
September 17, 2018 Filing 89 Notice re Attorney Appearance #88 Filed by John Jeffrey Plummer. (Related document(s): Attorney Appearance #88 .) (Knivila, K.)
September 17, 2018 Filing 88 Notice of Appearance of K. Bruce Knivila appearing on behalf of Stephen Andrew Bailey Filed by on behalf of Stephen Andrew Bailey. (Knivila, K.)
September 13, 2018 Filing 87 Notice of Attorney Withdrawal: of Counsel Robert E. Kim Filed by Jamin A. Giersbach, Melissa A. Giersbach, Joseph James Haddad, Hawthco One Corporation, Derek Scott Herman, JJH Law, a Professional Corporation, Midori Retail, LLC, Talent Health Club LLC. (Kim, Robert)
September 10, 2018 Filing 86 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Joseph James Haddad waiver sent on 7/24/2018. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
September 10, 2018 Filing 85 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by JJH Law, a Professional Corporation waiver sent on 7/24/2018. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
September 10, 2018 Filing 84 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Stephen Andrew Bailey waiver sent on 8/13/2018. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
September 10, 2018 Filing 83 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Michael James Scarbrough waiver sent on 8/13/2018. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
September 10, 2018 Filing 82 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by John Jeffrey Plummer waiver sent on 8/13/2018. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
September 10, 2018 Filing 81 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by P.W.C.C., LLC waiver sent on 8/13/2018. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
September 10, 2018 Filing 80 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by P.W.C.C., LLC waiver sent on 8/28/2018. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
September 5, 2018 Filing 79 Notice of Appearance of Matthew A. Goldberg appearing on behalf of Bloom Well, Inc., Jason Cain, Mark Steven Capps, Greenlink Retail, Inc., Timothy Lee Horst, Joel Jennings, Jeremy Scott Kwit, La Mota Hollywood, LLC, Aaron Robert Mitchell, Pacific Highway Investments, LLC, Taylor Jordan Rembowski, Salmon Run Holdings, LLC, Agronomy, LLC, TLC Medical, Inc., Tidepool Cannon Beach, Inc., Tidepool Northeast, Inc., Tidepool Oregon City, Inc., Tidewater Retail, Inc., Patrick Stephen Todd, Case Dennison Van Dorne Filed by on behalf of Bloom Well, Inc., Jason Cain, Mark Steven Capps, Greenlink Retail, Inc., Timothy Lee Horst, Joel Jennings, Jeremy Scott Kwit, La Mota Hollywood, LLC, Aaron Robert Mitchell, Pacific Highway Investments, LLC, Taylor Jordan Rembowski, Salmon Run Holdings, LLC, Agronomy, LLC, TLC Medical, Inc., Tidepool Cannon Beach, Inc., Tidepool Northeast, Inc., Tidepool Oregon City, Inc., Tidewater Retail, Inc., Patrick Stephen Todd, Case Dennison Van Dorne. (Goldberg, Matthew)
September 5, 2018 Filing 78 Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction regarding #77 Attorney Appearance. A corrected PDF has been uploaded and has replaced the incorrect attachment. The Notice of Electronic Filing will be regenerated to all parties. (rs)
August 31, 2018 Filing 77 Notice of Appearance of Allison C. Bizzano appearing on behalf of Bloom Well, Inc., Jason Cain, Mark Steven Capps, Greenlink Retail, Inc., Timothy Lee Horst, Joel Jennings, Jeremy Scott Kwit, La Mota Hollywood, LLC, Aaron Robert Mitchell, Pacific Highway Investments, LLC, Taylor Jordan Rembowski, Salmon Run Holdings, LLC, Agronomy, LLC, TLC Medical, Inc., Tidepool Cannon Beach, Inc., Tidepool Northeast, Inc., Tidepool Oregon City, Inc., Tidewater Retail, Inc., Patrick Stephen Todd, Case Dennison Van Dorne Filed by on behalf of Bloom Well, Inc., Jason Cain, Mark Steven Capps, Greenlink Retail, Inc., Timothy Lee Horst, Joel Jennings, Jeremy Scott Kwit, La Mota Hollywood, LLC, Aaron Robert Mitchell, Pacific Highway Investments, LLC, Taylor Jordan Rembowski, Salmon Run Holdings, LLC, Agronomy, LLC, TLC Medical, Inc., Tidepool Cannon Beach, Inc., Tidepool Northeast, Inc., Tidepool Oregon City, Inc., Tidewater Retail, Inc., Patrick Stephen Todd, Case Dennison Van Dorne. (Bizzano, Allison) (Main Document 77 replaced on 9/5/2018) (cw).
August 29, 2018 Filing 76 Notice of Appearance of Kevin J. Jacoby appearing on behalf of CO2 Company Auction House LLC, Kevin Patrick Walsh, Ryan Joseph Walsh Filed by on behalf of CO2 Company Auction House LLC, Kevin Patrick Walsh, Ryan Joseph Walsh. (Jacoby, Kevin)
August 29, 2018 Filing 75 Notice of Appearance of Andrew C. DeWeese appearing on behalf of CO2 Company Auction House LLC, Kevin Patrick Walsh, Ryan Joseph Walsh Filed by on behalf of CO2 Company Auction House LLC, Kevin Patrick Walsh, Ryan Joseph Walsh. (DeWeese, Andrew)
August 29, 2018 Filing 74 Notice of Appearance of Andrew C. DeWeese appearing on behalf of Andrew Joseph Buck, Nehalem Bay Wellness, Ltd. Filed by on behalf of Andrew Joseph Buck, Nehalem Bay Wellness, Ltd.. (DeWeese, Andrew)
August 29, 2018 Filing 73 Notice of Appearance of Kevin J. Jacoby appearing on behalf of Andrew Joseph Buck, Nehalem Bay Wellness, Ltd. Filed by on behalf of Andrew Joseph Buck, Nehalem Bay Wellness, Ltd.. (Jacoby, Kevin)
August 29, 2018 Filing 72 Notice of Appearance of Kevin J. Jacoby appearing on behalf of Steven William Pitzer Filed by on behalf of Steven William Pitzer. (Jacoby, Kevin)
August 29, 2018 Filing 71 Notice of Appearance of Andrew C. DeWeese appearing on behalf of Steven William Pitzer Filed by on behalf of Steven William Pitzer. (DeWeese, Andrew)
August 28, 2018 Filing 70 Notice of Appearance of Jon P. Stride appearing on behalf of Hannah Elizabeth Hayes Filed by on behalf of Hannah Elizabeth Hayes. (Stride, Jon)
August 28, 2018 Filing 69 Notice of Appearance of Alexander M. Tinker appearing on behalf of Hannah Elizabeth Hayes Filed by on behalf of Hannah Elizabeth Hayes. (Tinker, Alexander)
August 28, 2018 Filing 68 Notice of Appearance of Megan K. Houlihan appearing on behalf of Hannah Elizabeth Hayes Filed by on behalf of Hannah Elizabeth Hayes. (Houlihan, Megan)
August 27, 2018 Filing 67 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Covey William Baack waiver sent on 7/24/2018. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
August 27, 2018 Filing 66 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Sabrina Clare Baack waiver sent on 7/24/2018. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
August 27, 2018 Filing 65 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Steven William Pitzer waiver sent on 7/24/2018. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
August 27, 2018 Filing 64 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Steven James Lemma waiver sent on 7/24/2018; Wee Farms, LLC waiver sent on 7/24/2018. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
August 27, 2018 Filing 63 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by CO2 Company Auction House LLC waiver sent on 7/24/2018; Kevin Patrick Walsh waiver sent on 7/24/2018; Ryan Joseph Walsh waiver sent on 7/24/2018. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
August 27, 2018 Filing 62 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Andrew Joseph Buck waiver sent on 7/24/2018; Nehalem Bay Wellness, Ltd. waiver sent on 7/24/2018. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
August 27, 2018 Filing 61 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Willamette Valley Resources LLC waiver sent on 7/24/2018. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
August 27, 2018 Filing 60 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Darlene Siegel waiver sent on 7/24/2018. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
August 27, 2018 Filing 59 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by David Alan Kline waiver sent on 7/24/2018. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
August 27, 2018 Filing 58 Notice of Appearance of Jon P. Stride appearing on behalf of East Fork Agriculture LLC, Robert Marion Elam, Joel Matthew Fischer, High Mountain Retail LLC, Aaron Howard, Nathan Cole Howard, Jaclyn M. Iwanski, Donald F. Kirby, Melissa Sue Maguire, Rod James Maguire, Michael R. Munzing, OC Joe, LLC, Christopher Dale Ostlund, 1450 SE Orient, LLC, 3 Kids, Inc., 7Points Inc., Samuel Alexander, All Systems as Promised, Inc., Demetrios N. Themelis, Visionary Enterprises, Inc., WWMP, LLC, Mason Reed Walker, John Philip Widmer, Julie Ann Widmer, Joe Zhou Filed by on behalf of East Fork Agriculture LLC, Robert Marion Elam, Joel Matthew Fischer, High Mountain Retail LLC, Aaron Howard, Nathan Cole Howard, Jaclyn M. Iwanski, Donald F. Kirby, Melissa Sue Maguire, Rod James Maguire, Michael R. Munzing, OC Joe, LLC, Christopher Dale Ostlund, 1450 SE Orient, LLC, 3 Kids, Inc., 7Points Inc., Samuel Alexander, All Systems as Promised, Inc., Demetrios N. Themelis, Visionary Enterprises, Inc., WWMP, LLC, Mason Reed Walker, John Philip Widmer, Julie Ann Widmer, Joe Zhou. (Stride, Jon)
August 27, 2018 Filing 57 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Rachel Lillian Jones waiver sent on 7/24/2018. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
August 27, 2018 Filing 56 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by T.R. Jones LLC waiver sent on 7/24/2018. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
August 27, 2018 Filing 55 Notice of Appearance of Megan K. Houlihan appearing on behalf of East Fork Agriculture LLC, Robert Marion Elam, Joel Matthew Fischer, High Mountain Retail LLC, Aaron Howard, Nathan Cole Howard, Jaclyn M. Iwanski, Donald F. Kirby, Melissa Sue Maguire, Rod James Maguire, Michael R. Munzing, OC Joe, LLC, Christopher Dale Ostlund, 1450 SE Orient, LLC, 3 Kids, Inc., 7Points Inc., Samuel Alexander, All Systems as Promised, Inc., Demetrios N. Themelis, Visionary Enterprises, Inc., WWMP, LLC, Mason Reed Walker, John Philip Widmer, Julie Ann Widmer, Joe Zhou Filed by on behalf of East Fork Agriculture LLC, Robert Marion Elam, Joel Matthew Fischer, High Mountain Retail LLC, Aaron Howard, Nathan Cole Howard, Jaclyn M. Iwanski, Donald F. Kirby, Melissa Sue Maguire, Rod James Maguire, Michael R. Munzing, OC Joe, LLC, Christopher Dale Ostlund, 1450 SE Orient, LLC, 3 Kids, Inc., 7Points Inc., Samuel Alexander, All Systems as Promised, Inc., Demetrios N. Themelis, Visionary Enterprises, Inc., WWMP, LLC, Mason Reed Walker, John Philip Widmer, Julie Ann Widmer, Joe Zhou. (Houlihan, Megan)
August 27, 2018 Filing 54 Notice of Appearance of Alexander M. Tinker appearing on behalf of East Fork Agriculture LLC, Robert Marion Elam, Joel Matthew Fischer, High Mountain Retail LLC, Aaron Howard, Nathan Cole Howard, Jaclyn M. Iwanski, Donald F. Kirby, Melissa Sue Maguire, Rod James Maguire, Michael R. Munzing, OC Joe, LLC, Christopher Dale Ostlund, 1450 SE Orient, LLC, 3 Kids, Inc., 7Points Inc., Samuel Alexander, All Systems as Promised, Inc., Demetrios N. Themelis, Visionary Enterprises, Inc., WWMP, LLC, Mason Reed Walker, John Philip Widmer, Julie Ann Widmer, Joe Zhou Filed by on behalf of East Fork Agriculture LLC, Robert Marion Elam, Joel Matthew Fischer, High Mountain Retail LLC, Aaron Howard, Nathan Cole Howard, Jaclyn M. Iwanski, Donald F. Kirby, Melissa Sue Maguire, Rod James Maguire, Michael R. Munzing, OC Joe, LLC, Christopher Dale Ostlund, 1450 SE Orient, LLC, 3 Kids, Inc., 7Points Inc., Samuel Alexander, All Systems as Promised, Inc., Demetrios N. Themelis, Visionary Enterprises, Inc., WWMP, LLC, Mason Reed Walker, John Philip Widmer, Julie Ann Widmer, Joe Zhou. (Tinker, Alexander)
August 27, 2018 Filing 53 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Timothy Lee Horst waiver sent on 7/24/2018. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
August 27, 2018 Filing 52 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Pacific Highway Investments, LLC waiver sent on 7/24/2018. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
August 27, 2018 Filing 51 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Taylor Jordan Rembowski waiver sent on 7/24/2018. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
August 27, 2018 Filing 50 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by TLC Medical, Inc. waiver sent on 7/24/2018. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
August 27, 2018 Filing 49 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Tidewater Retail, Inc. waiver sent on 7/24/2018. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
August 27, 2018 Filing 48 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Tidepool Oregon City, Inc. waiver sent on 7/24/2018. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
August 27, 2018 Filing 47 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Tidepool Northeast, Inc. waiver sent on 7/24/2018. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
August 27, 2018 Filing 46 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Tidepool Cannon Beach, Inc. waiver sent on 7/24/2018. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
August 27, 2018 Filing 45 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Salmon Run Holdings, LLC waiver sent on 7/24/2018. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
August 27, 2018 Filing 44 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Patrick Stephen Todd waiver sent on 7/24/2018. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
August 27, 2018 Filing 43 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Mark Steven Capps waiver sent on 7/24/2018. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
August 27, 2018 Filing 42 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by La Mota Hollywood, LLC waiver sent on 7/24/2018. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
August 27, 2018 Filing 41 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Joel Jennings waiver sent on 7/24/2018. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
August 27, 2018 Filing 40 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Jeremy Scott Kwit waiver sent on 7/24/2018. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
August 27, 2018 Filing 39 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Jason Cain waiver sent on 7/24/2018. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
August 27, 2018 Filing 38 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Greenlink Retail, Inc. waiver sent on 7/24/2018. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
August 27, 2018 Filing 37 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Case Dennison Van Dorne waiver sent on 7/24/2018. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
August 27, 2018 Filing 36 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Agronomy, LLC waiver sent on 7/24/2018. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
August 27, 2018 Filing 35 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Aaron Robert Mitchell waiver sent on 7/24/2018. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
August 27, 2018 Filing 34 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Midori Retail, LLC waiver sent on 7/24/2018. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
August 24, 2018 Filing 33 Notice of Appearance of Robert E. Kim appearing on behalf of Joseph James Haddad, JJH Law, a Professional Corporation Filed by on behalf of Joseph James Haddad, JJH Law, a Professional Corporation. (Kim, Robert)
August 24, 2018 Filing 32 Notice of Appearance of Clifford S. Davidson appearing on behalf of Joseph James Haddad, JJH Law, a Professional Corporation Filed by on behalf of Joseph James Haddad, JJH Law, a Professional Corporation. (Davidson, Clifford)
August 24, 2018 Filing 31 Corporate Disclosure Statement for Alpha Alternative Solutions, LLC. Filed by Alpha Alternative Solutions, LLC. (Elken, Marjorie)
August 24, 2018 Filing 30 Notice of Appearance of Jon P. Stride appearing on behalf of Margaret Renee Amala, Attikus Enterprises, Inc., William Hal Blair, Robert David Galloway, David Alan Kline, Steven Penman, Jason Reynolds, David Neal Schwimmer, Matthew Correy Schwimmer, Darlene Siegel, Sugar Tree Farm, LLC, Urban Farmacy, LLC, Willamette Valley Resources LLC Filed by on behalf of Margaret Renee Amala, Attikus Enterprises, Inc., William Hal Blair, Robert David Galloway, David Alan Kline, Steven Penman, Jason Reynolds, David Neal Schwimmer, Matthew Correy Schwimmer, Darlene Siegel, Sugar Tree Farm, LLC, Urban Farmacy, LLC, Willamette Valley Resources LLC. (Stride, Jon)
August 24, 2018 Filing 29 Notice of Appearance of Megan K. Houlihan appearing on behalf of Attikus Enterprises, Inc., David Neal Schwimmer, Matthew Correy Schwimmer Filed by on behalf of Attikus Enterprises, Inc., David Neal Schwimmer, Matthew Correy Schwimmer. (Houlihan, Megan)
August 24, 2018 Filing 28 Notice of Appearance of Alexander M. Tinker appearing on behalf of Attikus Enterprises, Inc., David Neal Schwimmer, Matthew Correy Schwimmer Filed by on behalf of Attikus Enterprises, Inc., David Neal Schwimmer, Matthew Correy Schwimmer. (Tinker, Alexander)
August 23, 2018 Filing 27 Notice of Change of Address. for Plaintiffs' Counsel Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
August 23, 2018 Filing 26 Notice of Appearance of Robert E. Kim appearing on behalf of Midori Retail, LLC Filed by on behalf of Midori Retail, LLC. (Kim, Robert)
August 23, 2018 Filing 25 Notice of Appearance of Clifford S. Davidson appearing on behalf of Midori Retail, LLC Filed by on behalf of Midori Retail, LLC. (Davidson, Clifford)
August 21, 2018 Filing 24 Notice of Appearance of Megan K. Houlihan appearing on behalf of David Alan Kline, Darlene Siegel, Willamette Valley Resources LLC Filed by on behalf of David Alan Kline, Darlene Siegel, Willamette Valley Resources LLC. (Houlihan, Megan)
August 21, 2018 Filing 23 Notice of Appearance of Alexander M. Tinker appearing on behalf of David Alan Kline, Darlene Siegel, Willamette Valley Resources LLC Filed by on behalf of David Alan Kline, Darlene Siegel, Willamette Valley Resources LLC. (Tinker, Alexander)
August 21, 2018 Filing 22 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Alpha Alternative Solutions, LLC waiver sent on 7/24/2018. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
August 21, 2018 Filing 21 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Benjamin James Robison waiver sent on 7/24/2018. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
August 21, 2018 Filing 20 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by JAMA Industry LLC waiver sent on 7/24/2018; Jennifer Ann Pitzer waiver sent on 7/24/2018. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
August 20, 2018 Filing 19 Notice of Appearance of Marjorie A. Elken appearing on behalf of Benjamin James Robison, Alpha Alternative Solutions, LLC Filed by on behalf of Benjamin James Robison, Alpha Alternative Solutions, LLC. (Elken, Marjorie)
August 17, 2018 Filing 18 Notice of Joinder in Request, #8 Filed by JAMA Industry LLC, Jennifer Ann Pitzer. (Related document(s): Request, #8 .) (Wilner-Nugent, Bear)
August 17, 2018 Filing 17 Notice of Appearance of Bear Wilner-Nugent appearing on behalf of JAMA Industry LLC, Jennifer Ann Pitzer Filed by on behalf of JAMA Industry LLC, Jennifer Ann Pitzer. (Wilner-Nugent, Bear)
August 16, 2018 Filing 16 Notice of Appearance of Megan K. Houlihan appearing on behalf of William Hal Blair, Robert David Galloway, Steven Penman, Jason Reynolds, Margaret Renee Amala, Sugar Tree Farm, LLC, Urban Farmacy, LLC Filed by on behalf of William Hal Blair, Robert David Galloway, Steven Penman, Jason Reynolds, Margaret Renee Amala, Sugar Tree Farm, LLC, Urban Farmacy, LLC. (Houlihan, Megan)
August 16, 2018 Filing 15 Notice of Appearance of Alexander M. Tinker appearing on behalf of William Hal Blair, Robert David Galloway, Steven Penman, Jason Reynolds, Margaret Renee Amala, Sugar Tree Farm, LLC, Urban Farmacy, LLC Filed by on behalf of William Hal Blair, Robert David Galloway, Steven Penman, Jason Reynolds, Margaret Renee Amala, Sugar Tree Farm, LLC, Urban Farmacy, LLC. (Tinker, Alexander)
August 13, 2018 Filing 14 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Talent Health Club LLC waiver sent on 7/24/2018. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
August 13, 2018 Filing 13 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Derek Scott Herman waiver sent on 7/24/2018. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
August 13, 2018 Filing 12 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Hawthco One Corporation waiver sent on 7/24/2018. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
August 13, 2018 Filing 11 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Melissa A. Giersbach waiver sent on 7/24/2018. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
August 13, 2018 Filing 10 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Jamin A. Giersbach waiver sent on 7/24/2018. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
August 10, 2018 Filing 9 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by William Hal Blair waiver sent on 7/24/2018. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
August 9, 2018 Filing 8 Request for Status Conference, and/or Briefing Schedule, re Issue of "Swarm Joinder" and Whether Plaintiff Should Be Required to Pay More Than One Filing Fee to Maintain This Action. Filed by Jamin A. Giersbach, Melissa A. Giersbach, Hawthco One Corporation, Derek Scott Herman, Talent Health Club LLC. (Davidson, Clifford)
August 7, 2018 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance of Robert E. Kim appearing on behalf of Hawthco One Corporation, Derek Scott Herman Filed by on behalf of Hawthco One Corporation, Derek Scott Herman. (Kim, Robert)
August 7, 2018 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance of Clifford S. Davidson appearing on behalf of Hawthco One Corporation, Derek Scott Herman Filed by on behalf of Hawthco One Corporation, Derek Scott Herman. (Davidson, Clifford)
August 7, 2018 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance of Robert E. Kim appearing on behalf of Jamin A. Giersbach, Melissa A. Giersbach, Talent Health Club LLC Filed by on behalf of Jamin A. Giersbach, Melissa A. Giersbach, Talent Health Club LLC. (Kim, Robert)
August 7, 2018 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance of Clifford S. Davidson appearing on behalf of Jamin A. Giersbach, Melissa A. Giersbach, Talent Health Club LLC Filed by on behalf of Jamin A. Giersbach, Melissa A. Giersbach, Talent Health Club LLC. (Davidson, Clifford)
August 6, 2018 Filing 3 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Bloom Well, Inc. waiver sent on 7/24/2018. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McCart, Rachel)
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Paul Papak and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 11/28/2018. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 12/28/2018. Pretrial Order is due by 12/28/2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Paul Papak. (eo)
July 20, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5489977 Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Laura L. Underwood against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Part 2 of Complaint, #2 Part 3 of Complaint, #3 Part 4 of Complaint). (McCart, Rachel) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/23/2018: #4 Part 5 of Complaint.) (eo). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/31/2018: #5 Part 6 of Complaint, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (eo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Underwood v. 1450 SE Orient, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denise K. Concannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael R. Munzing
Represented By: Jon P. Stride
Represented By: Alexander M. Tinker
Represented By: Megan K. Houlihan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aligra Marie Rainy
Represented By: Robert A. Swider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T.R. Jones LLC
Represented By: Cary Collin Novotny
Represented By: Paul T. Loney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mason Reed Walker
Represented By: Jon P. Stride
Represented By: Alexander M. Tinker
Represented By: Megan K. Houlihan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO2 Company Auction House LLC
Represented By: Kevin J. Jacoby
Represented By: Andrew C. DeWeese
Represented By: Colin P. Mackenzie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sugar Tree Farm, LLC
Represented By: Jon P. Stride
Represented By: Alexander M. Tinker
Represented By: Megan K. Houlihan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BCC Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Joshua S. DeCristo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meghan Walstatter
Represented By: Joshua S. DeCristo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Troy H. Duzon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alpha Alternative Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Marjorie A. Elken
Represented By: Alexander M. Tinker
Represented By: Megan K. Houlihan
Represented By: Jon P. Stride
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Visionary Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Jon P. Stride
Represented By: Alexander M. Tinker
Represented By: Megan K. Houlihan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K J K Enterprises LLC
Represented By: Jon P. Stride
Represented By: Alexander M. Tinker
Represented By: Megan K. Houlihan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven James Lemma
Represented By: Kevin J. Jacoby
Represented By: Colin P. Mackenzie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Jeffrey Plummer
Represented By: K. Bruce Knivila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa Ann Kruse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathan Cole Howard
Represented By: Jon P. Stride
Represented By: Alexander M. Tinker
Represented By: Megan K. Houlihan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connie Renee Barnes
Represented By: Matthew A. Goldberg
Represented By: Allison C. Bizzano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stonies, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Varasay Joe Sysavath
Represented By: Jon P. Stride
Represented By: Alexander M. Tinker
Represented By: Megan K. Houlihan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OG3, LLC
Represented By: Joshua S. DeCristo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Andrew Bailey
Represented By: K. Bruce Knivila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Steven Capps
Represented By: Allison C. Bizzano
Represented By: Matthew A. Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capitol Green Leaf LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hannah Elizabeth Hayes
Represented By: Jon P. Stride
Represented By: Alexander M. Tinker
Represented By: Megan K. Houlihan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Jay Wayman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Reynolds
Represented By: Jon P. Stride
Represented By: Alexander M. Tinker
Represented By: Megan K. Houlihan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin James Robison
Represented By: Marjorie A. Elken
Represented By: Alexander M. Tinker
Represented By: Megan K. Houlihan
Represented By: Jon P. Stride
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Columbia Alternative Medical Center LLC
Represented By: Joshua S. DeCristo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greenlink Retail, Inc.
Represented By: Allison C. Bizzano
Represented By: Matthew A. Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elsner Inc.
Represented By: Joshua S. DeCristo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colby Lee Jackson
Represented By: Jon P. Stride
Represented By: Alexander M. Tinker
Represented By: Megan K. Houlihan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jake Clifford Kalil Hill
Represented By: Joshua S. DeCristo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jayne Inc.
Represented By: Jon P. Stride
Represented By: Alexander M. Tinker
Represented By: Megan K. Houlihan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel Swain Heywood
Represented By: Jon P. Stride
Represented By: Alexander M. Tinker
Represented By: Megan K. Houlihan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Canyon Cannabis LLC
Represented By: Jon P. Stride
Represented By: Alexander M. Tinker
Represented By: Megan K. Houlihan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Douglas Demarre
Represented By: Jon P. Stride
Represented By: Alexander M. Tinker
Represented By: Megan K. Houlihan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Megawood Enterprises Inc.
Represented By: Joshua S. DeCristo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregg Goldenberg
Represented By: Joshua S. DeCristo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merle Leon Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vernonia's Natural Choice LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3 Kids, Inc.
Represented By: Jon P. Stride
Represented By: Alexander M. Tinker
Represented By: Megan K. Houlihan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel Alexander
Represented By: Jon P. Stride
Represented By: Alexander M. Tinker
Represented By: Megan K. Houlihan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Lucky Leaf LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nole Emerson Bullock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa A. Giersbach
Represented By: Clifford S. Davidson
Represented By: Robert E. Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: East Fork Agriculture LLC
Represented By: Jon P. Stride
Represented By: Alexander M. Tinker
Represented By: Megan K. Houlihan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marc Groleau
Represented By: Joshua S. DeCristo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wee Farms, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald F. Kirby
Represented By: Jon P. Stride
Represented By: Alexander M. Tinker
Represented By: Megan K. Houlihan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ian Robert Watson
Represented By: Joshua S. DeCristo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Lee Horst
Represented By: Allison C. Bizzano
Represented By: Matthew A. Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The New Amsterdam LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Marion Elam
Represented By: Jon P. Stride
Represented By: Alexander M. Tinker
Represented By: Megan K. Houlihan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Connor Degance
Represented By: Joshua S. DeCristo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Scott Walstatter
Represented By: Joshua S. DeCristo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Arlen Alport
Represented By: Joshua S. DeCristo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Williams LLC
Represented By: Joshua S. DeCristo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kent Thompson
Represented By: Jon P. Stride
Represented By: Alexander M. Tinker
Represented By: Megan K. Houlihan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert David Galloway
Represented By: Jon P. Stride
Represented By: Alexander M. Tinker
Represented By: Megan K. Houlihan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Powellhurst Alternative Medical Center LLC
Represented By: Joshua S. DeCristo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tristan Levi Kuhns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travis James Moffatt
Represented By: Clifford S. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie Louise Worley
Represented By: Joshua S. DeCristo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael James Scarbrough
Represented By: K. Bruce Knivila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dror Bezalel
Represented By: Joshua S. DeCristo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin James West
Represented By: Clifford S. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N&A Investments, LLC
Represented By: Keith A. Pitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Stephen Todd
Represented By: Allison C. Bizzano
Represented By: Matthew A. Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Renee Reschert
Represented By: Joshua S. DeCristo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bula Farms, LLC
Represented By: Joshua S. DeCristo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Michael Fisher
Represented By: Joshua S. DeCristo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie Ann Widmer
Represented By: Jon P. Stride
Represented By: Alexander M. Tinker
Represented By: Megan K. Houlihan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spencer J. Mullen
Represented By: Joshua S. DeCristo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: High Mountain Retail LLC
Represented By: Jon P. Stride
Represented By: Alexander M. Tinker
Represented By: Megan K. Houlihan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Happy Lane, LLC
Represented By: Robert A. Swider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midori Retail, LLC
Represented By: Clifford S. Davidson
Represented By: Robert E. Kim
Represented By: Drew L. Eyman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yisroel N. Shenkman
Represented By: Jon P. Stride
Represented By: Alexander M. Tinker
Represented By: Megan K. Houlihan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Herbal Remedies 2 Inc.
Represented By: Cary Collin Novotny
Represented By: Paul T. Loney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joel Matthew Fischer
Represented By: Jon P. Stride
Represented By: Alexander M. Tinker
Represented By: Megan K. Houlihan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allison Colt Gantzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ptown Investments, LLC
Represented By: Robert A. Swider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salmon Run Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Allison C. Bizzano
Represented By: Matthew A. Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uplift Botanicals LLC
Represented By: Joshua S. DeCristo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medicine Tree LLC
Represented By: Megan K. Houlihan
Represented By: Alexander M. Tinker
Represented By: Jon P. Stride
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anna Marie Schrab
Represented By: Joshua S. DeCristo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evette Marie Pavich
Represented By: Jason E. Hirshon
Represented By: Keith A. Pitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Penman
Represented By: Jon P. Stride
Represented By: Alexander M. Tinker
Represented By: Megan K. Houlihan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scissortail Farms, LLC
Represented By: Joshua S. DeCristo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kip Lyle Rowles
Represented By: Jon P. Stride
Represented By: Alexander M. Tinker
Represented By: Megan K. Houlihan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zachary Carl Kohler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jaclyn M. Iwanski
Represented By: Jon P. Stride
Represented By: Alexander M. Tinker
Represented By: Megan K. Houlihan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Dawn Brisbin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Patrick Walsh
Represented By: Kevin J. Jacoby
Represented By: Andrew C. DeWeese
Represented By: Colin P. Mackenzie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy Scott Kwit
Represented By: Allison C. Bizzano
Represented By: Matthew A. Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OC Joe, LLC
Represented By: Jon P. Stride
Represented By: Alexander M. Tinker
Represented By: Megan K. Houlihan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Robert Mitchell
Represented By: Allison C. Bizzano
Represented By: Matthew A. Goldberg
Represented By: Megan K. Houlihan
Represented By: Alexander M. Tinker
Represented By: Jon P. Stride
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ralph O. Robinson
Represented By: Megan K. Houlihan
Represented By: Alexander M. Tinker
Represented By: Jon P. Stride
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Gary Sather
Represented By: Aaron J. Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Philip Widmer
Represented By: Jon P. Stride
Represented By: Alexander M. Tinker
Represented By: Megan K. Houlihan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Izidor Mikhli
Represented By: Jon P. Stride
Represented By: Alexander M. Tinker
Represented By: Megan K. Houlihan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Green Box, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hilltop Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Joshua S. DeCristo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Green Mart, LLC
Represented By: Joshua S. DeCristo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold James Lareau
Represented By: Joshua S. DeCristo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas Louis Pavich, Jr.
Represented By: Jason E. Hirshon
Represented By: Daniel H. Lerner
Represented By: Keith A. Pitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Dale Decamp
Represented By: Cary Collin Novotny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Neal Schwimmer
Represented By: Jon P. Stride
Represented By: Alexander M. Tinker
Represented By: Megan K. Houlihan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Joint on Market Street LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rod James Maguire
Represented By: Jon P. Stride
Represented By: Alexander M. Tinker
Represented By: Megan K. Houlihan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Gedde
Represented By: Robert A. Swider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Gorge Green Cross Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Little Amsterdam Wellness Center LLC
Represented By: Matthew A. Goldberg
Represented By: Allison C. Bizzano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The 5 of Us L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Herbal Grasslands, LLC
Represented By: Jon P. Stride
Represented By: Alexander M. Tinker
Represented By: Megan K. Houlihan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roy Allen Mitchell
Represented By: Jon P. Stride
Represented By: Alexander M. Tinker
Represented By: Megan K. Houlihan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farma on Hawthorne, Inc.
Represented By: Jon P. Stride
Represented By: Alexander M. Tinker
Represented By: Megan K. Houlihan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheri Lynn Ralston
Represented By: Joshua S. DeCristo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tropicannabis, LLC
Represented By: Jon P. Stride
Represented By: Alexander M. Tinker
Represented By: Megan K. Houlihan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Lynn Tidey, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Cain
Represented By: Allison C. Bizzano
Represented By: Matthew A. Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph River Perkins
Represented By: Jon P. Stride
Represented By: Alexander M. Tinker
Represented By: Megan K. Houlihan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adrian Nathaniel Wayman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bloom Well, Inc.
Represented By: Allison C. Bizzano
Represented By: Matthew A. Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Truvette Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph James Haddad
Represented By: Clifford S. Davidson
Represented By: Robert E. Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TLC Medical, Inc.
Represented By: Allison C. Bizzano
Represented By: Matthew A. Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Agronomy, LLC
Represented By: Matthew A. Goldberg
Represented By: Allison C. Bizzano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rachel Lillian Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Chandler Huggins
Represented By: Joshua S. DeCristo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attikus Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Jon P. Stride
Represented By: Alexander M. Tinker
Represented By: Megan K. Houlihan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Howard
Represented By: Jon P. Stride
Represented By: Alexander M. Tinker
Represented By: Megan K. Houlihan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Raymond Kirkwood
Represented By: Jon P. Stride
Represented By: Alexander M. Tinker
Represented By: Megan K. Houlihan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Demetrios N. Themelis
Represented By: Jon P. Stride
Represented By: Alexander M. Tinker
Represented By: Megan K. Houlihan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taylor Jordan Rembowski
Represented By: Allison C. Bizzano
Represented By: Matthew A. Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Holistic Choice Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Willamette Valley Resources LLC
Represented By: Jon P. Stride
Represented By: Alexander M. Tinker
Represented By: Megan K. Houlihan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Covey William Baack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Today's Herbal Choice, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Urban Farmacy, LLC
Represented By: Jon P. Stride
Represented By: Alexander M. Tinker
Represented By: Megan K. Houlihan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jered Dwayne Decamp
Represented By: Cary Collin Novotny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Willow Management LLC
Represented By: Robert A. Swider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nehalem Bay Wellness, Ltd.
Represented By: Kevin J. Jacoby
Represented By: Andrew C. DeWeese
Represented By: Colin P. Mackenzie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Canby Growing Farms, Inc.
Represented By: Aaron J. Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tidepool Oregon City, Inc.
Represented By: Allison C. Bizzano
Represented By: Matthew A. Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tidepool Cannon Beach, Inc.
Represented By: Allison C. Bizzano
Represented By: Matthew A. Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: La Mota Hollywood, LLC
Represented By: Allison C. Bizzano
Represented By: Matthew A. Goldberg
Represented By: Megan K. Houlihan
Represented By: Alexander M. Tinker
Represented By: Jon P. Stride
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Lee Fisher
Represented By: Joshua S. DeCristo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Hal Blair
Represented By: Jon P. Stride
Represented By: Alexander M. Tinker
Represented By: Megan K. Houlihan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tidepool Northeast, Inc.
Represented By: Allison C. Bizzano
Represented By: Matthew A. Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael James Rachford
Represented By: Joshua S. DeCristo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Highway Investments, LLC
Represented By: Allison C. Bizzano
Represented By: Matthew A. Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cherry City Compassion Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derek Scott Herman
Represented By: Clifford S. Davidson
Represented By: Robert E. Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Wayne Sivers
Represented By: Joshua S. DeCristo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Alan Kline
Represented By: Jon P. Stride
Represented By: Alexander M. Tinker
Represented By: Megan K. Houlihan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kind Leaf Pendleton LLC
Represented By: Jon P. Stride
Represented By: Alexander M. Tinker
Represented By: Megan K. Houlihan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Puregon LLC
Represented By: Joshua S. DeCristo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven William Pitzer
Represented By: Kevin J. Jacoby
Represented By: Andrew C. DeWeese
Represented By: Colin P. Mackenzie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darlene Siegel
Represented By: Jon P. Stride
Represented By: Alexander M. Tinker
Represented By: Megan K. Houlihan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grand, LLC
Represented By: Joshua S. DeCristo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oregon Candy Farm, LLC
Represented By: Robert A. Swider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duzon Enterprises, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua John Cino
Represented By: Joshua S. DeCristo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JJH Law, a Professional Corporation
Represented By: Clifford S. Davidson
Represented By: Robert E. Kim
Represented By: Drew L. Eyman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMA Industry LLC
Represented By: Bear Wilner-Nugent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Joel Krenzler
Represented By: Jon P. Stride
Represented By: Alexander M. Tinker
Represented By: Megan K. Houlihan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerrod Thompson
Represented By: Jon P. Stride
Represented By: Alexander M. Tinker
Represented By: Megan K. Houlihan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miranda Marie Murray
Represented By: Clifford S. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Green Planet, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lesta Amorette Bentley
Represented By: Jon P. Stride
Represented By: Alexander M. Tinker
Represented By: Megan K. Houlihan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cindy G. Cusick
Represented By: Jon P. Stride
Represented By: Alexander M. Tinker
Represented By: Megan K. Houlihan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa Sue Maguire
Represented By: Jon P. Stride
Represented By: Alexander M. Tinker
Represented By: Megan K. Houlihan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexander Nicholas Pavich
Represented By: Robert A. Swider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buddha's Wellness Center LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick James Learned
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tammy Lynne Brown
Represented By: Joshua S. DeCristo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wolf D LLC
Represented By: Joshua S. DeCristo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Case Dennison Van Dorne
Represented By: Allison C. Bizzano
Represented By: Matthew A. Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1450 SE Orient, LLC
Represented By: Jon P. Stride
Represented By: Alexander M. Tinker
Represented By: Megan K. Houlihan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Renee Barnes
Represented By: Matthew A. Goldberg
Represented By: Allison C. Bizzano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Joseph Buck
Represented By: Kevin J. Jacoby
Represented By: Andrew C. DeWeese
Represented By: Colin P. Mackenzie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dispenserve LLC
Represented By: Joshua S. DeCristo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Ambrose Galba
Represented By: Megan K. Houlihan
Represented By: Alexander M. Tinker
Represented By: Jon P. Stride
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Correy Schwimmer
Represented By: Jon P. Stride
Represented By: Alexander M. Tinker
Represented By: Megan K. Houlihan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chronic Creations LLC
Represented By: Robert A. Swider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randall Jon Mallette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Sean Leivent
Represented By: Joshua S. DeCristo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margaret Renee Amala
Represented By: Jon P. Stride
Represented By: Alexander M. Tinker
Represented By: Megan K. Houlihan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WWMP, LLC
Represented By: Jon P. Stride
Represented By: Alexander M. Tinker
Represented By: Megan K. Houlihan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marek Ryszard Zamojski
Represented By: Megan K. Houlihan
Represented By: Alexander M. Tinker
Represented By: Jon P. Stride
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teran Forest Wilson
Represented By: Joshua S. DeCristo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Ann Pitzer
Represented By: Bear Wilner-Nugent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]