Euteneier v. Quality Loan Service Corporation of WA et al
Plaintiff: Amanda Euteneier
Defendant: Quality Loan Service Corporation of WA and Does 1 to 50
Case Number: 3:2018cv01376
Filed: July 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Office: Portland (3) Office
Presiding Judge: Michael W Mosman
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2018 Filing 15 Plaintiff's Reply to Defendant's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint. Filed by Amanda Euteneier. (joha)
August 20, 2018 Filing 14 Clerk's Notice of Mailing to Amanda Euteneier regarding Discovery order, #13 . (rs)
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael W. Mosman and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 12/18/2018. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 1/17/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 1/17/2019. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (rs)
August 16, 2018 Filing 12 Clerk's Notice of Mailing to Amanda Euteneier regarding Order on motion/application for leave to proceed ifp #11 . (kms)
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis #10 . Signed on 8/16/2018 by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (kms)
August 15, 2018 Filing 10 Amended Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Amanda Euteneier. (rs)
August 13, 2018 Filing 9 Answer to #1 Complaint Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 . Filed by Quality Loan Service Corporation of WA. (Thomas, John)
August 1, 2018 Filing 8 Clerk's Notice of Mailing to Amanda Euteneier regarding Order on motion/application for leave to proceed ifp, 7 . (kms)
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Plaintiff's Application to Proceed IFP #2 is DENIED with leave to refile. Plaintiff has fourteen days to refile the Application and provide more detailed information on Question 2a, Question 6, and Question 8. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (kms)
July 24, 2018 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Quality Loan Service Corporation of WA. (Thomas, John)
July 24, 2018 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance of John M. Thomas appearing on behalf of Quality Loan Service Corporation of WA Filed by on behalf of Quality Loan Service Corporation of WA. (Thomas, John)
July 20, 2018 Filing 4 Request for Waiver of service. Filed by Amanda Euteneier. (cw)
July 20, 2018 Filing 3 Notice of Lis Pendens by Amanda Euteneier Filed by Amanda Euteneier. (cw)
July 20, 2018 Filing 2 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Amanda Euteneier. (cw)
July 20, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Amanda Euteneier against Does 1 to 50, Quality Loan Service Corporation of WA (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (cw) (cw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Euteneier v. Quality Loan Service Corporation of WA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Euteneier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Loan Service Corporation of WA
Represented By: John M. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?