Summit Foods, Inc. v. Viking Packaging Technologies, Inc

Plaintiff: Summit Foods, Inc.
Defendant: Viking Packaging Technologies, Inc., dba Viking Masek Global Packaging Technologies, a Wisconsin corporation and Viking Packaging Technologies, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv01470
Filed: August 8, 2018
Court: Oregon District Court
Office: Portland (3) Office
Presiding Judge: Michael H Simon
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other Contract Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
September 28, 2018 11 Featured Case Opinion and Order - Defendant's motion to dismiss or transfer venue (ECF #5 ) is DENIED. Signed on 9/28/2018 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja) (Main Document 11 replaced on 10/1/2018) (eo).
September 12, 2018 10 Reply to Motion to Dismiss or Transfer Venue Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 #5 . Filed by Viking Packaging Technologies, Inc.. (Edling, Emilie)
August 29, 2018 9 Declaration of James P. Laurick . Filed by Summit Foods, Inc.. (Related document(s): Response in Opposition to Motion #7 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Laurick, James)
August 29, 2018 8 Declaration of Mark D. Smith . Filed by Summit Foods, Inc.. (Related document(s): Response in Opposition to Motion #7 .) (Laurick, James)
August 29, 2018 7 Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss or Transfer Venue Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 #5 Oral Argument requested. Filed by Summit Foods, Inc.. (Laurick, James)
August 15, 2018 6 Declaration of R.C. Huhn . Filed by Viking Packaging Technologies, Inc.. (Related document(s): Motion to Dismiss #5 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Edling, Emilie)
August 15, 2018 5 Motion to Dismiss or Transfer Venue Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Filed by Viking Packaging Technologies, Inc.. (Edling, Emilie)
August 9, 2018 4 Featured Case Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael H. Simon and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 12/7/2018. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 1/7/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 1/7/2019. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (ecp)
August 8, 2018 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Viking Packaging Technologies, Inc., dba Viking Masek Global Packaging Technologies, a Wisconsin corporation. (Edling, Emilie)
August 8, 2018 2 Notice re Notice of Removal, #1 to Plaintiff Filed by Viking Packaging Technologies, Inc., dba Viking Masek Global Packaging Technologies, a Wisconsin corporation. (Related document(s): Notice of Removal, #1 .) (Edling, Emilie)
August 8, 2018 1 Notice of Removal of Case Number 18CV28195 from Washington County Circuit Court. Filing Fee in amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5511956 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by Viking Packaging Technologies, Inc., dba Viking Masek Global Packaging Technologies, a Wisconsin corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet). (Edling, Emilie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Summit Foods, Inc. v. Viking Packaging Technologies, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viking Packaging Technologies, Inc., dba Viking Masek Global Packaging Technologies, a Wisconsin corporation
Represented By: Emilie K. Edling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viking Packaging Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Emilie K. Edling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Summit Foods, Inc.
Represented By: James P. Laurick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?