Jones, as guardian ad litem for Brandy Tuchscherer v. City of Portland
Plaintiff: Randi Jones, as guardian ad litem for Brandy Tuchscherer
Defendant: City of Portland
Case Number: 3:2018cv01485
Filed: August 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Office: Portland (3) Office
Presiding Judge: Stacie F Beckerman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities Act - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2018 Filing 9 Answer to #8 Amended Complaint , Counterclaim Randi Jones, as guardian ad litem for Brandy Tuchscherer. Filed by City of Portland. (Bailey, Ryan)
September 6, 2018 Filing 8 Amended Complaint . Filed by Randi Jones, as guardian ad litem for Brandy Tuchscherer against City of Portland. (Snyder, Daniel)
August 22, 2018 Filing 7 Return of Service Executed as to City of Portland served on 8/17/2018, answer due on 9/7/2018. (Snyder, Daniel)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Guardian ad Litem (ECF No. #4 ). Ordered on 8/21/2018 by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (gw)
August 17, 2018 Filing 5 Declaration of Daniel Snyder in Support of Motion Appointing Guardian ad Litem. Filed by Randi Jones, as guardian ad litem for Brandy Tuchscherer. (Related document(s): Motion - Miscellaneous #4 .) (Snyder, Daniel)
August 17, 2018 Filing 4 Motion for Guardian ad Litem. Filed by Randi Jones, as guardian ad litem for Brandy Tuchscherer. (Snyder, Daniel)
August 16, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to City of Portland. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (rs)
August 16, 2018 Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (rs)
August 10, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5515184 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Randi Jones, as guardian ad litem for Brandy Tuchscherer against City of Portland (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons). (Snyder, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones, as guardian ad litem for Brandy Tuchscherer v. City of Portland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randi Jones, as guardian ad litem for Brandy Tuchscherer
Represented By: Carl Lee Post
Represented By: Daniel J. Snyder
Represented By: John D. Burgess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Portland
Represented By: Ryan C. Bailey
Represented By: Michael Jeter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?