Brown et al v. Bank of America, N.A.

Plaintiff: Andrea D. Brown, Deliverance Brown and Roosevelt Brown
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Case Number: 3:2018cv01492
Filed: August 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Office: Portland (3) Office
Presiding Judge: Marco A Hernandez
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2018 Filing 10 Plaintiffs' Notice of Dismissal. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (joha)
August 30, 2018 Filing 9 Clerk's Notice of Mailing to All Plaintiffs regarding Order on motion for extension of time 8 . (jp)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Granting in Part Motion for Extension of Time #7 . Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss is due by 10/3/2018. Plaintiffs should also be aware of Local Rule 7, which provides general guidelines for motions practice and the default time limits for motions other than motions filed pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 56. All of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure can be found on the website for the U.S. District Court for the District of Oregon. Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (jp)
August 27, 2018 Filing 7 Motion for Extension of Time. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (joha)
August 20, 2018 Filing 6 Declaration of James P. Laurick . Filed by Bank of America, N.A.. (Related document(s): Request for Judicial Notice #5 , Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #4 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11) (Laurick, James)
August 20, 2018 Filing 5 Request for Judicial Notice Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #4 . Filed by Bank of America, N.A.. (Laurick, James)
August 20, 2018 Filing 4 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Oral Argument requested. Filed by Bank of America, N.A.. (Laurick, James)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Marco A. Hernandez and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 12/12/2018. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 1/11/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 1/11/2019. Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (joha)
August 13, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Bank of America, N.A.. (Laurick, James)
August 13, 2018 Filing 1 Notice of Removal of Case Number 17CV54587 from Multnomah County Circuit Court. Filing Fee in amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5516712 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by Bank of America, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet). (Laurick, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown et al v. Bank of America, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: James P. Laurick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea D. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deliverance Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roosevelt Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?