Coonrod v. Columbus McKinnon Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Mark Coonrod
Defendant: Columbus McKinnon Corporation
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Konecranes, Inc.
3Rd Party Defendant: ACE Industries, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv01530
Filed: August 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Office: Portland (3) Office
Presiding Judge: John V Acosta
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2018 Filing 24 Affidavit of Service upon ACE Industries, Inc. served on 10/15/2018 Filed by Konecranes, Inc.. (Hill, Jessica)
October 11, 2018 Filing 23 Summons Issued Electronically as to ACE Industries, Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (ecp)
October 11, 2018 Filing 22 Proposed Summons Filed by Konecranes, Inc.. (Hill, Jessica)
October 10, 2018 Filing 17 Third Party Complaint against ACE Industries, Inc. . Filed by Konecranes, Inc.. (Hill, Jessica)
October 5, 2018 Filing 21 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Erin E. Connare (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: eeconnare. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Erin E. Connare for Columbus McKinnon Corporation. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5573264 issued. Signed on 10/5/2018 by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (ecp)
October 5, 2018 Filing 19 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Kevin J. English (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: kjenglish. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Kevin J. English for Columbus McKinnon Corporation. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5573253 issued. Signed on 10/5/2018 by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (ecp)
September 27, 2018 Filing 16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Erin E. Connare . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5573264. Filed by Columbus McKinnon Corporation. (Tarter, Ryan)
September 27, 2018 Filing 15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Kevin J. English . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5573253. Filed by Columbus McKinnon Corporation. (Tarter, Ryan)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Judge Acosta - GRANTING the stipulated motion #13 to extend the case management deadlines as amended by the court: (1) Discovery to be completed and a joint ADR report filed by 4/17/19. (2) Dispositive motions, if any, to be filed by 5/17/19. (3) DEFERRING the filing of a joint pretrial order, at this time. (4) STRIKING the 12/10/18 Rule 16 Conference from the court's calendar. (peg)
September 24, 2018 Filing 13 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines . Filed by Konecranes, Inc.. (Hill, Jessica)
September 19, 2018 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Konecranes, Inc.. (Hill, Jessica)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Judge Acosta - GRANTING Defendant Konecranes Inc.'s stipulated motion #9 for extension of time from 9/10/18 to 10/10/18, by which to file their third-party complaint. (peg)
September 10, 2018 Filing 10 Declaration of Jessica D. Hill in Support of Motion for Leave to Continue Time to File Third Party Complaint. Filed by Konecranes, Inc.. (Related document(s): Motion to continue #9 .) (Hill, Jessica)
September 10, 2018 Filing 9 Stipulated Motion to Continue Time to File Third Party Complaint. Filed by Konecranes, Inc.. (Hill, Jessica)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Acosta - SETTING a Telephone Rule 16 Conference for Monday, December 10, 2018 at 10:00AM. The court's conference line information will be sent to the parties by separate entry. (peg)
August 27, 2018 Filing 7 Answer to Complaint following a Notice of Removal (Related Doc. #1 ) . Filed by Konecranes, Inc.. (Hill, Jessica)
August 27, 2018 Filing 6 Answer to Complaint following a Notice of Removal (Related Doc. #1 ) . Filed by Columbus McKinnon Corporation. (Miller, Graham)
August 27, 2018 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance of Graham B. Miller appearing on behalf of Columbus McKinnon Corporation Filed by on behalf of Columbus McKinnon Corporation. (Miller, Graham)
August 20, 2018 Filing 4 Civil Cover Sheet regarding Notice of Removal, #1 . Filed by Columbus McKinnon Corporation. (Miller, Graham)
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 12/18/2018. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 1/17/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 1/17/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (ecp)
August 20, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Columbus McKinnon Corporation. (Miller, Graham)
August 20, 2018 Filing 1 Notice of Removal of Case Number 18CV29707 from Multnomah County Court. Filing Fee in amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5523465 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by Columbus McKinnon Corporation. (Miller, Graham)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coonrod v. Columbus McKinnon Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Coonrod
Represented By: Marybeth Wosko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Konecranes, Inc.
Represented By: Jessica D. Hill
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Eden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Columbus McKinnon Corporation
Represented By: Ryan Tarter
Represented By: Graham B. Miller
Represented By: Erin E. Connare
Represented By: Kevin J. English
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: ACE Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?