Box (Larragoitiy) v. Commissioner Social Security Administration

Plaintiff: Melanie R Box (Larragoitiy) and Melanie R. Box
Defendant: Commissioner Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2018cv01629
Filed: September 6, 2018
Court: Oregon District Court
Presiding Judge: Michael W Mosman
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:0405g
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 22, 2018 11 Notice of Appearance of Erin F. Highland appearing on behalf of Commissioner Social Security Administration Filed by on behalf of Commissioner Social Security Administration. (Highland, Erin)
October 2, 2018 10 Summons Issued Electronically as to Commissioner Social Security Administration. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (sss)
September 26, 2018 9 Featured Case ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis #8 . Signed on 9/26/2018 by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (kms)
September 25, 2018 8 Amended Application for Leave to Proceed IFP . Filed by Melanie R. Box. (Wall, George)
September 25, 2018 7 Featured Case ORDER: DENYING Plaintiff's Second Application for Leave to Proceed IFP #5 with leave to amend. If resubmitting an Application for Leave to Proceed IFP, Plaintiff is instructed to complete all sections of the application by 10/9/2018. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (dls)
September 24, 2018 6 Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction regarding #5 Application for leave to proceed ifp. The PDF attached to this entry at filing was incorrect. The document contained the incorrect party names. A corrected PDF has been uploaded and has replaced the incorrect attachment. The Notice of Electronic Filing will be regenerated to all parties. (cw)
September 21, 2018 5 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP . Filed by Melanie R. Box. (Wall, George) (Main Document 5 replaced on 9/24/2018) (cw).
September 10, 2018 4 Featured Case ORDER: DENYING Plaintiff's Application for Leave to Proceed IFP #2 with leave to amend. If resubmitting an Application for Leave to Proceed IFP, Plaintiff is instructed to complete all sections of the application by 9/24/2018. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (kms)
September 7, 2018 3 Featured Case Social Security Procedural Order and Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael W. Mosman. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (sss)
September 6, 2018 2 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP . Filed by Melanie R Box (Larragoitiy). (Wall, George)
September 6, 2018 1 Complaint to Review Final Decision of Commissioner (In forma pauperis status selected). Filed by Melanie R Box (Larragoitiy) against Commissioner Social Security Administration (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons). (Wall, George)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Box (Larragoitiy) v. Commissioner Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Social Security Administration
Represented By: Erin F. Highland
Represented By: Renata Gowie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melanie R Box (Larragoitiy)
Represented By: George J. Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melanie R. Box
Represented By: George J. Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?