Dauven et al v. U.S. Bancorp
Plaintiff: Christiana Dauven and Theodore (Ted) Dauven
Defendant: U.S. Bancorp
Case Number: 3:2018cv01637
Filed: September 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: John V Acosta
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Property Damage
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2018 Filing 15 Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. (sss)
October 19, 2018 Filing 14 Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) Agreement. Filed by Christiana Dauven, Theodore (Ted) Dauven. (sss) (Main Document 14 replaced on 10/23/2018) (sss).
October 12, 2018 Filing 13 Reply In Support to Motion to Dismiss Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 #8 . Filed by U.S. Bancorp. (Van Der Weele, Philip)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order for Administrative Correction of the Record pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 60(a) regarding Response to Motion, #11 filed by Theodore (Ted) Dauven, Christiana Dauven. A Clerical error has been discovered in the case record. The Clerk is directed to make the following administrative corrections to the record and, if necessary, regenerate the Notice of Electronic Filing to all parties: Page 5 was missing from the originally submitted filing. Page 5 has been added and the NEF will be regenerated to all parties. (Mailed to plaintiffs this date.) (sss)
October 1, 2018 Filing 11 Response to Motion to Dismiss (titled by filer as: Plaintiff's Motion Opposing Defendant's Motion to Dismiss) Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 #8 . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (sss) (Main Document 11 replaced on 10/5/2018) (sss).
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Acosta - Defendant's Motion to Dismiss #8 will be taken under advisement by the Court as of 10/22/18. Plaintiffs' response to this motion is due no later than 9/28/18. (copy of this order mailed to plaintiffs) (peg)
September 14, 2018 Filing 9 Request for Judicial Notice. Filed by U.S. Bancorp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit) (Van Der Weele, Philip)
September 14, 2018 Filing 8 Motion to Dismiss Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Filed by U.S. Bancorp. (Van Der Weele, Philip)
September 14, 2018 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by U.S. Bancorp. (Van Der Weele, Philip)
September 12, 2018 Filing 6 Clerk's Notice of Mailing to Theodore (Ted) and Christiana Dauven regarding Order on Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice, #5 . (ecp)
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Peter A. Talevich for U.S. Bancorp. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5549485 issued. Signed on 9/12/2018 by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (ecp)
September 11, 2018 Filing 4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Peter A. Talevich . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5549485. Filed by U.S. Bancorp. (Van Der Weele, Philip)
September 10, 2018 Filing 3 Clerk's Notice of Mailing to Theodore (Ted) Dauven and Christiana Dauven regarding Notice of Case Assignment #2 . (joha)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 1/8/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 2/7/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 2/7/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (jtj)
September 7, 2018 Filing 1 Notice of Removal of Case Number 18CV34093 from Multnomah Circuit Court. Filing Fee in amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5545040 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by U.S. Bancorp (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet). (Van Der Weele, Philip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dauven et al v. U.S. Bancorp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christiana Dauven
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theodore (Ted) Dauven
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bancorp
Represented By: Philip S. Van Der Weele
Represented By: Peter A. Talevich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?