L.W. v. Commissioner Social Security Administration

Plaintiff: Love Washington and L.W.
Defendant: Commissioner Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2018cv01646
Filed: September 10, 2018
Court: Oregon District Court
Presiding Judge: Marco A Hernandez
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:0405g
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 22, 2018 8 Notice of Appearance of Lisa Goldoftas appearing on behalf of Commissioner Social Security Administration Filed by on behalf of Commissioner Social Security Administration. (Goldoftas, Lisa)
October 4, 2018 7 Return of Service Executed as to Commissioner Social Security Administration served on 9/26/2018, answer due on 1/24/2019. Service specifically made upon Local U.S. Attorney, Regional Counsel or Agency, and the U.S. Attorney General. (Wall, George)
September 14, 2018 6 Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction regarding #1 Social Security Complaint,. A corrected PDF has been uploaded and has replaced the incorrect attachment. The Notice of Electronic Filing will be regenerated to all parties. The pdf documents (complaint and civil cover sheet were redacted to identify minor plaintiff with initials) (cw)
September 14, 2018 5 Summons Issued Electronically as to Commissioner Social Security Administration. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (rs)
September 14, 2018 4 Featured Case Social Security Procedural Order and Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Marco A. Hernandez. Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (rs)
September 13, 2018 3 Featured Case ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis #2 . Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (jp)
September 10, 2018 2 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP . Filed by Love Washington. (Wall, George)
September 10, 2018 1 Complaint to Review Final Decision of Commissioner (In forma pauperis status selected). Filed by Love Washington against Commissioner Social Security Administration (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons). (Wall, George) (Main Document 1 replaced on 9/14/2018) (cw). (Attachment 1 replaced on 9/14/2018) (cw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: L.W. v. Commissioner Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Social Security Administration
Represented By: Renata Gowie
Represented By: Lisa Goldoftas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Love Washington
Represented By: George J. Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L.W.
Represented By: George J. Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?