Johnston v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration

Plaintiff: Dwight D. Johnston, Jr.
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration and Commissioner Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2018cv01648
Filed: September 10, 2018
Court: Oregon District Court
Presiding Judge: Ann L Aiken
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 18, 2018 16 Featured Case ORDER: Granting Motion for Extension of Time #15 . Counsel is to file the response form if representation is accepted, if a conflict of interest exists, or if termination of the appointment is requested for a reason other than a conflict of interest by 11/26/2018. Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
October 18, 2018 15 Motion for Extension of Time To Respond to Order Conditionally Appointing Pro Bono Counsel. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (DeJong, Timothy)
October 12, 2018 14 Clerk's Notice of Mailing to Dwight D. Johnston, Jr. regarding Order Appointing Pro Bono Counsel #13 . (ck)
October 12, 2018 13 Featured Case Order Appointing Timothy S. DeJong for Dwight D. Johnston, Jr as Pro Bono Counsel (All Purpose Appointment). Counsel is to file the attached response form if representation is accepted, if a conflict of interest exists, or if termination of the appointment is requested for a reason other than a conflict of interest by 10/26/2018. Signed on 10/12/2018 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
October 12, 2018 12 Clerk's Notice of Mailing to Dwight D. Johnston, Jr. regarding Order Terminating Pro Bono Counsel #11 . (ck)
October 12, 2018 11 Featured Case Order Terminating Cliff J. Wilson as Pro Bono Counsel. Signed on 10/12/2018 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
October 12, 2018 10 Pro Bono Appointment Response. Termination of the appointment is requested because counsel's upcoming trail calendar and other workload does not allow for sufficient availability to accept this assignment.. Filed by Dwight D. Johnston, Jr. (Related document(s): Order Appointing Pro Bono Counsel, #8 .) (Wilson, Cliff)
October 3, 2018 9 Clerk's Notice of Mailing to Dwight D. Johnston, Jr. regarding Order Appointing Pro Bono Counsel #8 . (ck)
October 3, 2018 8 Featured Case Order Appointing Cliff J. Wilson for Dwight D. Johnston, Jr as Pro Bono Counsel (All Purpose Appointment). Counsel is to file the attached response form if representation is accepted, if a conflict of interest exists, or if termination of the appointment is requested for a reason other than a conflict of interest by 10/17/2018. Signed on 10/3/2018 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
October 3, 2018 7 Clerk's Notice of Mailing to Dwight D. Johnston, Jr regarding Order on Motion for Appointment of Counsel, ECF no. 6, and Order on motion/application for leave to proceed ifp #5 . (ck)
October 3, 2018 6 Featured Case ORDER: Granting Motion for Appointment of Counsel #3 . Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
October 3, 2018 5 Featured Case ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis #1 . Signed on 10/3/2018 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
September 11, 2018 4 Featured Case Social Security Procedural Order and Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Ann L. Aiken. Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (sss)(Mailed to Plaintiff this date)
September 10, 2018 3 Motion for Appointment of Pro Bono Counsel. Filed by Dwight D. Johnston, Jr. (sss)
September 10, 2018 2 Complaint to Review Final Decision of Commissioner. Filed by Dwight D. Johnston, Jr. against Commissioner of Social Security Administration. (sss)
September 10, 2018 1 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Dwight D. Johnston, Jr. (sss) Modified to correct filer on 9/18/2018 . NEF regenerated (sss).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnston v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Represented By: Renata Gowie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Social Security Administration
Represented By: Renata Gowie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dwight D. Johnston, Jr.
Represented By: Timothy S. DeJong
Represented By: Cliff J. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?