Zielke v. The Specialists Inc et al
Plaintiff: Daniel A Zielke and Daniel A. Zielke
Defendant: James R Dahl, The Specialists Inc., The Specialists Inc and James R. Dahl
Case Number: 3:2018cv01657
Filed: September 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Marco A Hernandez
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2018 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by James R. Dahl, The Specialists Inc. (Webster, Ronald)
October 30, 2018 Filing 6 Answer to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Filed by The Specialists Inc, James R. Dahl. (Webster, Ronald)
October 23, 2018 Filing 5 Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge.
October 23, 2018 Filing 4 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by The Specialists Inc waiver sent on 09/17/2018. Filed by Daniel A. Zielke. (Slezak, Richard) Modified docket text on 10/30/2018 to correct sent date per pleading (jtj).
October 23, 2018 Filing 3 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by James R. Dahl waiver sent on 09/17/2018. Filed by Daniel A. Zielke. (Slezak, Richard) Modified docket text on 10/30/2018 to correct sent date per pleading (jtj).
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Marco A. Hernandez and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 1/11/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 2/11/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 2/11/2019. Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (jtj)
September 12, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint. Personal Injury MVA Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5551000 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Daniel A Zielke against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (Slezak, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zielke v. The Specialists Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel A Zielke
Represented By: Richard E. Slezak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel A. Zielke
Represented By: Richard E. Slezak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James R Dahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Specialists Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Specialists Inc
Represented By: Ronald F. Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James R. Dahl
Represented By: Ronald F. Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?