Campanile et al v. Daimler North America Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Tamara Campanile and Lawrence Campanile
Defendant: Daimler North America Corporation and Daimler Trucks North America LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv01716
Filed: September 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Youlee Yim You
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2018 Filing 7 MINUTES of Proceedings: Telephonic Rule 16 Conference held on 10/31/2018. Notice Regarding Civil Case Procedures attached. New case schedule is as follows: Deadline to amend pleadings and join parties is Friday, 5/10/2019. Fact Discovery is to be completed by Friday, 5/24/2019. Expert Discovery to be completed by Monday, 6/24/2019. Defendants' Expert Disclosures are due by Monday, 6/24/2019. Plaintiffs' Expert Disclosures are due by Wednesday, 7/24/2019. Rebuttal Expert Disclosures, if any, are due by Wednesday, 8/7/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by Wednesday, 8/7/2019. Dispositive Motions, if any, are due by Monday, 9/9/2019. The parties may file written consents to proceed before a Magistrate Judge at any time, but the court recommends that consent forms be filed before a dispositive motion (i.e., motion to dismiss, motion for summary judgment) is heard. The consent form may be found in the court's Notice of Case Assignment (ECF #3 , p. 6). For more information regarding the role of magistrate judges and consenting to magistrate jurisdiction, see https://ord.uscourts.gov/index.php/court-info/judges /consenting-to-magistrate-judge-jurisdiction. Any discovery matters will be handled on an informal basis. Unless otherwise ordered, in the event a discovery motion is filed, no written response to the motion will be required. Timothy J. Coleman and William S.T. Wood present as counsel for plaintiffs. Kevin R. Schock and Robert L. Aldisert present as counsel for defendants. Court Reporter: None. Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You presiding. (pvh)
October 31, 2018 Filing 6 Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge.
October 3, 2018 Filing 5 Answer to Complaint following a Notice of Removal (Related Doc. #1 ) . Filed by Daimler North America Corporation, Daimler Trucks North America LLC. (Aldisert, Robert)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Scheduling Order: SETTING a Telephonic Rule 16 Conference for Wednesday, 10/31/2018, at 09:00AM (by telephone) before Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. Local Rules 16-2 and 26-1 require that counsel confer prior to the conference. At the conference, counsel should be prepared to discuss the status of the case, relevant dates and deadlines, and any other significant issues. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 1/24/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 2/25/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (rs)
September 26, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by All Defendants. (Aldisert, Robert)
September 26, 2018 Filing 1 Notice of Removal of Case Number 18CV39295 from Multnomah County. Filing Fee in amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5571775 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by Daimler North America Corporation, Daimler Trucks North America LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet). (Aldisert, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Campanile et al v. Daimler North America Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tamara Campanile
Represented By: Timothy J. Coleman
Represented By: William S. T. Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence Campanile
Represented By: Timothy J. Coleman
Represented By: William S. T. Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daimler North America Corporation
Represented By: Robert L. Aldisert
Represented By: Kevin R. Schock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daimler Trucks North America LLC
Represented By: Robert L. Aldisert
Represented By: Kevin R. Schock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?