Bean v. Matteucci

Petitioner: Travis LeRoy Bean
Respondent: Dolly Matteucci
Case Number: 3:2018cv01765
Filed: October 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Anna J Brown
Referring Judge: Marco A Hernandez
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2018 Filing 17 Brief in Support of Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Filed by Travis LeRoy Bean. (Related document(s): Response to Order to Show Cause #14 , Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus 2241 #1 .) (Loewy, Oliver)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: Granting Motion to File Under Seal #13 . Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (jp)
October 31, 2018 Filing 15 Exhibits (Attachment A) re Response to Order to Show Cause #14 . Filed by Dolly Matteucci. (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (Boyd, Kristen)
October 31, 2018 Filing 14 Response to Order to Show Cause . Filed by Dolly Matteucci. (Boyd, Kristen)
October 31, 2018 Filing 13 Unopposed Motion to Seal Respondent's Exhibit 101. Filed by Dolly Matteucci. (Boyd, Kristen)
October 16, 2018 Filing 12 Notice of Attorney Substitution:Attorney Kristen E. Boyd is substituted as counsel of record in place of Attorney Lynn David Larsen Filed by Dolly Matteucci. (Boyd, Kristen)
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER APPOINTING CO-COUNSEL. The Federal Public Defender is appointed as co-counsel for Travis LeRoy Bean pursuant to the provisions of 18 U.S.C. 3006A. Specifically, the Federal Public Defender has designated AFPD Oliver Loewy as counsel to be appointed. Signed on 10/12/2018 by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (jp)
October 12, 2018 Filing 10 Acceptance and Acknowledgment of Service of Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and Scheduling Order upon the US Attorney on behalf of Respondent Filed by Dolly Matteucci. (Larsen, Lynn)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Expedited Habeas Corpus Scheduling Order Serving Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus 2241 #1 on respondent. Signed on 10/9/2018 by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (Attachments: #1 Acceptance and Acknowledgment of Service Form, #2 Petition) (joha) (Attachment 1 replaced with corrected 2241 form on 10/11/2018) (joha).
October 9, 2018 Filing 8 Sealed Documents Supporting Habeas Petition #1 . (DOCUMENT FILED UNDER SEAL). Filed by Travis LeRoy Bean. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Attachment, #3 Attachment, #4 Attachment) (joha)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Petitioner's Motion for Leave to File Sealed Documents Supporting Habeas Petition (#4 ) is granted, but his request for emergency interim relief is denied. The Court will, however, issue an Expedited Scheduling Order in this case. Signed on 10/9/2018 by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (joha)
October 5, 2018 Filing 6 Civil Cover Sheet regarding Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus 2241 #1 . Filed by Travis LeRoy Bean. (Baker, Elizabeth)
October 5, 2018 Filing 5 Notice of Case Reassignment: This case has been reassigned from Judge Anna J. Brown to Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (eo)
October 4, 2018 Filing 4 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Documents Supporting Habeas Petition and Request for Emergency Interim Relief. Filed by Travis LeRoy Bean. (joha)
October 4, 2018 Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Anna J. Brown. (joha)
October 4, 2018 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet regarding Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus 2241 #1 . Filed by Travis LeRoy Bean. (Baker, Elizabeth)
October 3, 2018 Filing 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241- Federal) Filing Fee in amount of $5 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5581093. Filed by Travis LeRoy Bean against Oregon State Hospital. (Baker, Elizabeth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bean v. Matteucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Travis LeRoy Bean
Represented By: Elizabeth J.C. Baker
Represented By: Gordon Mallon
Represented By: Oliver W. Loewy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Dolly Matteucci
Represented By: Lynn David Larsen
Represented By: Kristen E. Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?